Travis Bondurant v. People of the State of California

Petitioner: Travis Bondurant
Respondent: People of the State of California
Case Number: 3:2010cv01945
Filed: September 15, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Kern
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Marilyn L. Huff
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2011 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION granting Respondent's Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice; and Dismissing Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Certificate of Appealability denied. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 08/05/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
April 11, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction 43 . Plaintiff has not carried his burden of showing that a temporary restraining order or preliminary injunction should be issued. Accordingly, the Court DENIES Plaintiff's motion. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 04/08/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge) (cap).
March 10, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Request for Interlocutory Appeal re 29 Notice of Appeal filed by Travis Bondurant. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 3/10/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu). Modified on 3/10/2011 to note the USCA Case No. is 11-55387. NEF regenerated to US Court of Appeals. (akr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travis Bondurant v. People of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Travis Bondurant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: People of the State of California
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?