Epps v. Grannis et al

Plaintiff: Omar Ernest Epps
Defendant: N Grannis, Larry Small, T Ochoa, G J Janda, R Powell, B Lew, R Madden, M Carpio, M D Greenwood, G Hopper, B Bentley, I Pickett and W Meister
Case Number: 3:2010cv01949
Filed: September 17, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2013 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendants' 128 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 9/21/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
August 19, 2013 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 121 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/19/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
July 25, 2013 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Denying Plaintiff's 123 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 7/24/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)(jrd)
July 23, 2013 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Denying Defendants' 112 First Ex Parte Application to Correct the Court's Clerical Error; and (2) Denying Defendants' 117 Second Ex Parte Application to Correct the Court's Clerical Error. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 7/23/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
July 15, 2013 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendant's 111 Ex Parte Application to Continue Time for Completing Discovery or Filing Dispositive Motions. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 7/15/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
June 27, 2013 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Disposing of Order to Shaw Cause, Dismissing Some Claims as Moot, and Amending Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 6/27/2013.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)(jrd)
March 27, 2012 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Adopting in Part and Declining in Part 68 Report and Recommendation re 47 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 3/26/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
September 20, 2011 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Adopting Report and Recommendation; (2) Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 9/20/2011.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
August 23, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Adopting 59 Report and Recommendation; Denying Plaintiff's 20 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/22/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
July 26, 2011 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 20 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 7/26/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)(jrd)
December 22, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Granting Plaintiff's (Doc. 2 ) Motion To Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Imposing No Initial Partial Filing Fee And Garnishing Balance From Prisoner's Trust Account Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a), And (2) Directing U.S. Marsha l To Effect Service Of Complaint Pursuant To Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(c)(3) & 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(d). Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 12/21/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; Order electronically transmitted to Matthew Cate, Secretary CDCR.) (mdc) Modified on 12/23/2010 - IFP package prepared; NEF regenerated. (mdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Epps v. Grannis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Ernest Epps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N Grannis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Ochoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G J Janda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Lew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Carpio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M D Greenwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Hopper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Bentley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Meister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?