Foster v. The People of the State of California

Petitioner: Derryl Foster
Respondent: The People of the State of California
Case Number: 3:2010cv01952
Filed: September 15, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Kern
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing Case Without Prejudice. If Petitioner wishes to proceed with this case, he must submit, no later than May 31, 2011, a copy of this Order with the $5.00 fee or with adequate proof of his inability to pay the fee AND a Second Ame nded Petition which cures the pleading deficiencies noted above. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 4/4/2011.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. Mailed Petitioner a blank Southern District of California In Forma Pauperis Application and a Second Amended Petition form, along with a copy of this order.)(jer)
January 5, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 4 Motion for Appointment of Counsel and Dismissing Case Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 12/28/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)
October 1, 2010 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Without Prejudice Request Stay and Abeyance. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 10/1/10.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster v. The People of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Derryl Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The People of the State of California
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?