Lambert v. Soto et al

Plaintiff: Jawanta J Lambert
Defendant: Frank Soto, Shady M Villalobos and Unidentified Yard Physician
Case Number: 3:2010cv01976
Filed: September 20, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ;and granting Defendants' 32 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's claim for deliberate indifference against Defendants Villalobos and Soto. The Court denies without prejudice Defendants' Motion to Dismiss on the grounds of qualified immunity. Second Amended Complaint due 1/11/13. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 11/21/12.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
August 8, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 Third Motion for Assignment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 8/8/12.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
March 19, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ; granting 17 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice and with leave to amend. Amended Complaint due 05/30/12. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/19/12.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cge)
January 14, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiff's 5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing U.S. Marshal to effect service of Complaint; the Secretary of California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, or his designee, shall collect from Plaintiff's prison trust account the $350 balance of the filing fee owed in this case by collecting monthly payments from the account in an amount equal to twenty percent (20%) of the preceding month's income and forward payments to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2); defendants are thereafter ordered to reply to Plaintiff's Complaint within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a) (Order electronically transmitted to Matthew Cate, Secretary CDCR) ; Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 1/13/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lambert v. Soto et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jawanta J Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shady M Villalobos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Yard Physician
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?