McFadden v. El Centro, City of et al

Plaintiff: Andrew McFadden
Defendant: El Centro, City of and DOES
Case Number: 3:2010cv02042
Filed: September 30, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant (Doc. 34 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk shall enter Judgment in favor of the Defendant and against the Plaintiff. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 9/26/2012. (mdc) Modified on 9/27/2012 to edit text; NEF was not regenerated. (mdc)
June 25, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Re Doc. 40 ): The parties are granted 60 days to re-open discovery. Plaintiff shall file a response to the Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant by 9/7/2012. Defendant shall file a reply by 9/14/2012. Parties are instructed to immediately contact the Magistrate Judge in order to facilitate expedited discovery. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 6/25/2012. (mdc)
November 8, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 22 ) Motion to be Relieved as Counsel is granted. Douglas Geyman is no longer the attorney of record for Plaintiff Andrew McFadden in this case. No later than 90 days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff Andrew McFadden must file a motion for substitution pursuant to Local Rule 83.3, requesting an order of substitution and indicating whether he will represent himself or have new counsel to represent him in this action. If no motion for substitution is filed within 90 days fro m the date of this Order, Plaintiff's claims against Defendant City of El Centro will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 11/8/2011. (Per Order, a copy of this Order was mailed to Plaintiff's last known address indicated in this Order.) (mdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McFadden v. El Centro, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew McFadden
Represented By: Thomas R Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Centro, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?