Morvil Technology, LLC v. Ablation Frontiers, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Morvil Technology, LLC
Defendant: Ablation Frontiers, Inc., Medtronic Ablation Frontiers LLC and Medtronic, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv02088
Filed: October 7, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Referring Judge: Bernard G. Skomal
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2013 191 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 130 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1). Defendants' counterclaims with respect to the '917, '481, and '964 patents are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 4/11/2013. (knb)
August 10, 2012 123 Opinion or Order of the Court CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/10/2012.(knb)
May 31, 2012 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part 114 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 5/31/2012. (knb)(jrd)
March 8, 2012 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute Re Plaintiff's Request to Compel Documents Withheld by Defendants Under the "Common Legal Interest" Doctrine: Denying 60 MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit B to Joint Submiss ion, and Denying 63 Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute re Plaintiff's Request to Compel Documents Withheld by Defendants Under the "Common Legal Interest" Doctrine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 3/8/2012. (knb)(jrd)
October 4, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 27 Granting Stipulation REGARDING TRANSFER OF THIS CASE TO THE U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/4/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)[Transferred from California Northern on 10/7/2010.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morvil Technology, LLC v. Ablation Frontiers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morvil Technology, LLC
Represented By: Joseph A. Culig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ablation Frontiers, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Tsutomu Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic Ablation Frontiers LLC
Represented By: Paul Tsutomu Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Tsutomu Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?