Andrews v. Knowles et al

Petitioner: Marcus Andrews
Respondent: Mike Knowles and Bill Lockyer
Case Number: 3:2010cv02109
Filed: October 7, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 2, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 27 Report and Recommendation and Dismissing Petition without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 9/2/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
June 1, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without Prejudice Petitioner's 19 Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 6/1/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
March 17, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without Prejudice Petitioner's 12 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 3/17/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)
October 14, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING Petition without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 10/14/2010.(sent Petitioner copy of petition form and Order)(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrews v. Knowles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marcus Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mike Knowles
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bill Lockyer
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?