Brittni Cottle-Banks v. Cox Communications, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Brittni Cottle-Banks
Defendant: Cox Communications, Inc. and DOES
Case Number: 3:2010cv02133
Filed: October 13, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: William V. Gallo
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court REDACTED ORDER Denying 48 Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Class; Denying 48 Plaintiff's Motion for Spoliation Sanctions. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/21/2013. (srm)
November 26, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 36 , 41 Plaintiff's Motions to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/26/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
December 30, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 4 Motion to Stay Case Pending Decision of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation to Consolidate and Transfer Tag-Along Action. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 12/30/2010. (knh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brittni Cottle-Banks v. Cox Communications, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittni Cottle-Banks
Represented By: Sabrina S. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan R Hamler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?