Nicewander v. MTC Financial, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Holli Nicewander
Defendant: Onewest Bank, Freddie Mac Trust, All persons claiming by, through, or under such persons, all persons claiming any legal, or equitable right, title, estate, lien or interest in real property described in this complaint, Does, American Mortgage Network, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and Indymac Bank F.S.B.
Case Number: 3:2010cv02141
Filed: October 14, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 9, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 46 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Without Leave to Amend. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/29/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mtb)
August 17, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 , 18 defendants' motions to dismiss with leave to Amend. Motion to Dismiss Party. No later than September 12, 2011 Plaintiff must file either (1) a second amended complaint alleging additional facts regarding tender and facts addressing other issues raised in Defendants motions to dismiss; or (2) a notice of election not to file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/17/2011. (mtb)
January 24, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting (Doc. 13 ) Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint And Denying as Moot (Doc. 4 ) Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Expunge Lis Pendens. Plaintiff shall file the first amended complaint by 2/7/2011. The motion to dismiss and expunge lis pending is Denied Without Prejudice. The 2/7/2011 hearing date on Plaintiff's motion is Vacated. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 1/24/2011. (srm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nicewander v. MTC Financial, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onewest Bank
Represented By: William G Malcolm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freddie Mac Trust
Represented By: William G Malcolm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All persons claiming by, through, or under such persons, all persons claiming any legal, or equitable right, title, estate, lien or interest in real property described in this complaint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Mortgage Network
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: William G Malcolm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indymac Bank F.S.B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holli Nicewander
Represented By: Norberto F. Reyes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?