Moyle et al v. Liberty Mutual Retirement Benefit Plan et al

Plaintiff: Geoffrey Moyle, Pauline Arwood, Thomas Rollason, Jeannie Sanders and ROES
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Retirement Benefit Plan, Liberty Mutual Retirement Plan Retirement Board, Liberty Mutual Insurance Group and DOES
Case Number: 3:2010cv02179
Filed: October 19, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Presiding Judge: Dana M. Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2017 336 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 332 Motion Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; Directing Issuance of Notice; and Setting Final Approval Hearing. A hearing on the Final Approval and Dismissal of the Action shall be held on March 2, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. before the undersigned Judge in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/15/17. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
April 11, 2017 308 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's 296 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court grants Defendants' motion to the extent that Plaintiffs Rollason and Arwood's claims are barred by the statute of limitations and denies Defendants' motion as to the remaining claims. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/11/17. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
December 19, 2016 302 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Parties to File Additional Briefing. Defendants shall file a brief no longer than 10 pages, to address these issues on or before January 6, 2017. Plaintiffs shall file an opposition, no longer than 10 pages, on or before January 13 2017. Defendants shall file a reply, no longer then 5 pages, on or before January 20, 2017. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/19/16.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
December 15, 2016 300 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Providing Tentative Ruling re Supplemental 296 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant's. Counsel are advised that the Court's rulings are tentative and the Court will entertain additional arguments at the hearing on December 16, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/15/16.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
October 14, 2016 292 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule for Supplemental Briefing on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants shall file a supplemental brief, no longer than 10 pages, to address any recent developments in the law on or before October 28, 20 16. Plaintiffs shall file an opposition, no longer than 10 pages, on or before November 10, 2016. Defendants shall file a reply of no longer than 5 pages on or before November 18, 2016. A hearing is set on December 16, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/14/16.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
July 1, 2013 252 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 212 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying 213 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court Grants Defendants' motion for summary judgment on all causes of action in the third amended complaint; and Denies Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment as to the second and fourth causes of action. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/1/2013. (srm)
January 14, 2013 228 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 211 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Experts Stratman and Stumpff and Exclude Rebuttal Report, Amended Rebuttal Report, and Anticipated Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Paul M. Secunda. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 1/14/13. (Dembin, Mitchell)
January 7, 2013 223 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 201 Ex Parte MOTION for Discovery Dispute re Rollason's Requests for Production of Documents. As provided herein, to the extent that Defendants are required to produce additional documents, such production must be completed by January 25, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 1/7/13. (Dembin, Mitchell)
October 30, 2012 186 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on 180 Joint MOTION for Discovery Resolution of Discovery Dispute with Respect to Four Executive Depositions. As provided in the attached Order, to the extent the joint motion involves a motion to quash the depositions of the four present an d former executives pursuant to the "apex doctrine" the motion is DENIED. To the extent that the joint motion involves a motion to exceed the 10 deposition limit of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, that motion is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 10/30/12. (Dembin, Mitchell)
October 15, 2012 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 172 Motion for Reconsideration of 160 Regarding the Production of Certain Hewitt Documents. As provided herein, the motion for reconsideration is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 10/15/12. (Dembin, Mitchell)
September 27, 2012 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on 143 Joint MOTION for Discovery Dispute Determination re Privilege Resolution. As provided herein, documents subject to production are to be produced no later than October 12, 2012, absent agreement of the parties or further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 9/27/12. (Dembin, Mitchell)
September 14, 2011 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend. No later than September 21, 2011 Plaintiffs shall file and serve the proposed amended complaint attached to their motion as Exhibit A. Defendants' response to the second amended complaint, if any, must be filed and served within the time set forth in Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(3). Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/14/11. (lao)
April 25, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Denying Motion to Dismiss Second and Third Claims, (2) Granting in part Motion to Dismiss improperly named Defendants, (3) Denying Motion to Dismiss First claim as to Plaintiff Moyle, and (4) Granting Motion to Strike demand for Trial by Jury re 10 . Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 4/25/11. (lao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moyle et al v. Liberty Mutual Retirement Benefit Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geoffrey Moyle
Represented By: Matthew B Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pauline Arwood
Represented By: Matthew B Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Rollason
Represented By: Matthew B Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannie Sanders
Represented By: Matthew B Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Retirement Benefit Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Retirement Plan Retirement Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?