Ivy Hotel San Diego, LLC et al v. Houston Casualty Company

Plaintiff: Ivy Hotel San Diego, LLC and Kelly Hospitality, LLC
Defendant: Houston Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2010cv02183
Filed: October 20, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 43 Motion to Compel. The documents as well as a privilege log must be produced no later than November 4, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 10/17/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mtb)
May 19, 2011 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Joint Motion for Protective Order; (2) Protective Order as Modified By The Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 5/19/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mtb)
October 21, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING Complaint For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Granting Leave to Amend. This action is dismissed with leave to amend. If Plaintiffs choose to file an amended complaint, they must do so no later than November 4, 2010. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 10/21/2010.(srm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ivy Hotel San Diego, LLC et al v. Houston Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivy Hotel San Diego, LLC
Represented By: Michael T McColloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Hospitality, LLC
Represented By: Michael T McColloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?