Johnson v. California Department of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Anthony Rashad Johnson
Defendant: California Department of Corrections, E. J. Pimental, Sergeant Kulodrovic and Sanchez,
Case Number: 3:2010cv02184
Filed: October 19, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 33 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. For the reasons stated herein, the Court Grants Defendants' Motion and Dismisses this action without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is ordered to close the case file. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 3/13/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
October 6, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 11 Motion to Amend the Complaint; Denying 14 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. The Clerk of the Court is directed to docket the Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint, attached to his Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 10/6/2011. (IFP Package Prepared) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
November 24, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Granting Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; (2) Sua Sponte Dismissing Defendant California Department of Corrections; (3) Directing US Marshal to Effect Service Upon Remaining Defendants. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 11/24/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. California Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Rashad Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. J. Pimental
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Kulodrovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanchez,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?