Jackson v. Dumanis et al

Plaintiff: Richard Edward Jackson, III
Defendant: William D Gore, Bonnie Dumanis, Captain Pena and Dr. Noranyo
Case Number: 3:2010cv02200
Filed: October 18, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Each pending Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED in its entirety. (Docs. 78 , 79 ). The Motions to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint filed by Defendants County of San Diego, William Gore, Captain Pena and Dr. Noranyo are GRANTED. (Docs. [ 65], 73 ). Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default Judgment and Request for Permission to File Electronically are DENIED. (Docs. 70 , 72 ). The Third Amended Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk of the Court shall close this case. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 3/11/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
March 13, 2012 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 58 Report and Recommendation; Granting 22 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Bonnie Dumanis, William Gore, and Captain Pena; Granting 56 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant County of San Diego. The 12 Complaint filed by Pla intiff Richard Jackson is Dismissed with Prejudice as to Plaintiff's claims regarding medical treatment for his mental health issues at San Diego Central Detention Facility and Dismissed without Prejudice as to Plaintiff's claims regarding his placement in a safety cell at San Diego Central Detention Facility. No later than sixty (60) days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 3/13/2012.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
June 27, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing U.S. Marshal To Effect Service Of Amended Complaint Pursuant To Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(c)(3) & 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(d): The Clerk shall issue a summons as to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 12 ). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 6/27/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; IFP package prepared, including all documents indicated in the Order.) (mdc) (jcj).
April 11, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING First Amended Complaint for Failing to State a Claim and for Seeking Monetary Damages Against Defendants who are Immune: The case is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff is granted 45 days from the date this Order is "Filed&q uot; in which to file an amended complaint which addresses each deficiency of pleading noted. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a court approved form § 1983 complaint to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/11/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(1983 form sent)(lmt)(av1).
January 19, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Granting Moton To Proceed In Forma Pauperis, (2) Denying Motion To Appoint Counsel Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(e)(1), and (3) Granting Leave To File A First Amended Complaint (Re Doc. 4 ): Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date this Order is "Filed" in which to file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/18/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (mdc)
November 22, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE without Prejudice for Failing to Prepay Civil Filing Fees and/or Failing to Move to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 11/22/2010.(Sent IFP form to Plaintiff)(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Dumanis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Edward Jackson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Dumanis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Noranyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?