Anderson et al v. California, State of et al

Plaintiff: Lisa Anderson and Elise J. Anderson
Defendant: California, State of, Carol J. Risley, Carlos Flores, Darlene Jean, Douglas Vaughn, Amber Dawes, Rueben Gonzales, Estella Gonzales, Febe Luna, Jesse Dose and Lordes Dose
Case Number: 3:2010cv02216
Filed: October 26, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Granting 9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Dismissing First Amended Complaint with Leave to Amend for Failure to State a Claim; and Denying as Moot 10 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is granted thirty days from the date this Order is Filed in which to file a Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 3/30/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
December 6, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this action, she must pay the required $350 filing fee or submit an amended motion to proceed IFP that accurately identifies all of her monthly financial obligations and demonstrates that she lacks the resources to pay the cost of commencing this action by 1/10/2011. If Plaintiff does not pay the required filing fee or submit an amended motion to proceed IFP by the date stated, her case will be subject to dismissal. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 12/6/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
October 27, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Denying 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Denying as Moot 3 Request for Appointment of Counsel. The Court cannot determine if Lisa is indigent within the meaning of the IFP statute and therefore Denies her motion to proceed IFP without prejudice. If Lisa wishes to proceed with this action, she must file an amended complaint and pay the $350 filing fee, or submit a renewed motion to proceed in forma pauperis, by 11/16/2010. If Plaintiff Elise intends to represent h erself in this action, she must file her own motion to proceed in forma pauperis and sign the amended complaint on her own behalf by 11/16/2010. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 10/27/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson et al v. California, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elise J. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol J. Risley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlene Jean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Dawes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rueben Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estella Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Febe Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Dose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lordes Dose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?