United Brands Company, Inc. v. Anheuser-Bush, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: United Brands Company, Inc.
Defendant: Anheuser-Bush, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv02281
Filed: November 4, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Roger T. Benitez
Referring Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2012 67 Featured Case ORDER granting 66 Joint Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 10/15/12. (cge) (av1).
October 10, 2012 66 JOINT MOTION for Dismissal by Anheuser-Busch, Inc., United Brands Company, Inc. (Peterson, Marcus) (Modified to correct event, email sent to atty on 10/11/2012) (cge).
September 14, 2012 65 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford:The parties recently filed a Notice of Settlement indicating they intend to dismiss the case within 45 days. As a result, all Scheduling Order dates are VACATED. A telephonic Settlement Disposition Conference has been set for 11/9/2012 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the telephonic conference. The court will vacate the conference if the parties file the appropriate dismissal papers before 11/9/2012. (no document attached) (plh)
September 11, 2012 64 NOTICE of Settlement by United Brands Company, Inc. (Behmer, Brian) (cge).
June 28, 2012 63 Featured Case SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 12/19/2012 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 6/28/12. (cge) (jrl).
June 15, 2012 62 Joint MOTION to Continue Pretrial Dates by United Brands Company, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brian Behmer, # 2 Proof of Service)(Behmer, Brian) (s/ does not match login, email sent to atty) (cge).
May 1, 2012 61 Featured Case ORDER granting 60 Motion To File Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Confidential and Trade Secret Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 4/30/12. (cge) (jcj).
April 23, 2012 60 Joint MOTION To File [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Confidential and Trade Secret Information by United Brands Company, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proof of Service)(Dix, Nancy) (cge).
April 19, 2012 59 Featured Case AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER re 57 Motion to Continue: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/19/2013 01:30 PM before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 11/19/2012 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/12/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 04/18/12. (cge) (jcj).
April 10, 2012 58 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: The Mandatory Settlement Conference has been RESET on the calendar of Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford for 9/19/2012 at 09:30 AM. Counsel shall lodge confidential settlement briefs directly with the chambers of Magistrate Judge Crawford by either messenger or by email to the Court at efile_crawford@casd.uscourts.gov. In preparing for the conference, the parties are ordered to read and follow the settlement conference procedures set forth in the chambers rules for Judge Crawford shown on the court's website.(plh)
April 5, 2012 57 MOTION to Continue Unopposed Motion to Continue Scheduled Dates by United Brands Company, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brian Behmer, # 2 Proof of Service)(Behmer, Brian) (cge).
April 4, 2012 56 Featured Case TRANSFER ORDER: This case is transferred from the calendar of the Honorable William McCurine, Jr. to the calendar of the Honorable Karen S. Crawford for all further proceedings. All conference or hearing dates set before Magistrate Judge McCurine, if any, are Hereby Vacated and will be rescheduled before Magistrate Judge Crawford. No later than May 4, 2012, counsel/parties are ordered to contact Magistrate Judge Crawfords chambers to reschedule vacated matters. Any dates set before the district judge remain unchanged. The new case number is 10cv2281-AJB(KSC). Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 4/4/12.(ecs) (jcj).
February 14, 2012 54 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference held on 2/10/12. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 9/19/2012 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William McCurine Jr.. Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order due by 2/8/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/15/2013 01:30 PM before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 2/14/12.(cge) (jcj).
February 10, 2012 55 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr: Settlement Conference held on 2/10/2012. Order issued.(CD# 2/10/2012 n/a). (Plaintiff Attorney Nancy O. Dix). (Defendant Attorney Bobby Ghajar). (rab)
January 23, 2012 53 Featured Case ORDER granting 50 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorneys Daniel G Lamb, Jr,Richard H Zaitlen, Bobby A. Ghajar, and Marcus D. Peterson added in case for Anheuser-Busch, Inc. Attorneys Ben West, Jeffrey Alan Feasby, and Denis F. Shanagher terminated. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/23/12. (cge) (jcj).
December 27, 2011 52 Featured Case ORDER granting 51 Joint Motion to Continue Rule 26 Compliance Deadlines. Rule 26(f) conference shall be completed by 1/27/2012. Discovery Plan shall be lodged with Magistrate Judge McCurine by 2/3/2012. Settlement/Case Management Conference set for 2/10/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom C before Magistrate Judge William McCurine Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 12/27/2011. (jah) (jcj).
December 23, 2011 51 Joint MOTION to Extend Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference Deadlines by Anheuser-Busch, Inc., United Brands Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bobby Ghajar in Support of Motion to Extend Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference Deadlines)(Ghajar, Bobby) (lmt).
December 22, 2011 50 MOTION TO Substitute Attorney by Anheuser-Busch, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Feasby, Jeffrey). Modified on 12/23/2011 - Wrong event, should be Motion. Captioned to wrong judge. Email sent to Atty (jah).
November 28, 2011 49 Featured Case ORDER FOLLOWING EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION CONFERENCE: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 11/28/11. Settlement could not be reached at this time. Case Management Conference set for 1/20/2012 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William McCurine Jr. Settlement Conference set for 1/20/2012 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William McCurine Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 11/28/11.(cge) (jcj).
November 28, 2011 48 Featured Case ORDER granting 47 Joint Request to Allow Parties to Bring Canned Alcoholic Beverages to Early Neutral Evaluation Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 11/28/11. (cge) (jcj).
November 21, 2011 47 Joint MOTION to Allow Parties to Bring Canned Alcoholic Beverages to Early Neutral Evaluation Hearing by Anheuser-Busch, Inc., United Brands Company, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Feasby, Jeffrey) (cge).
November 16, 2011 46 Featured Case ORDER Granting request for permission to appear telephonically at Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. The Anheuser-Busch representative is permitted to appear telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 11/16/11.(ecs) (jrl).
October 17, 2011 45 Featured Case NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 11/28/2011 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William McCurine Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 10/17/11.(cge) (jcj).
October 14, 2011 44 ANSWER to [Second] 38 Amended Complaint with jury demand, by Anheuser-Busch, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Feasby, Jeffrey) (cge).
October 3, 2011 43 Featured Case ORDER granting 41 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Anheuser-Busch, Inc. answer due 10/14/2011. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 10/03/11. (cge) (jcj).
September 30, 2011 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Anheuser-Busch, Inc. re 40 Notice of Withdrawal of Document, (Feasby, Jeffrey) (cge).
September 29, 2011 41 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Anheuser-Busch, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Feasby, Jeffrey) (cge).
September 29, 2011 40 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Anheuser-Busch, Inc. re 39 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Anheuser-Busch, Inc. (Feasby, Jeffrey) No proof of service, QC mailer sent to atty (cge).
September 29, 2011 39 DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN per 40 - Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Anheuser-Busch, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Order, # 2 Proof of Service)(Feasby, Jeffrey) Modified text to indicate document withdrawn on 9/30/2011 (cge).
September 16, 2011 38 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Second Amended Complaint against Anheuser-Busch, Inc., filed by United Brands Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2, # 3 Exhibit B-1, # 4 Exhibit B-2, # 5 Exhibit C-1, # 6 Exhibit C-2, # 7 Exhibit C-3, # 8 Exhibit C-4) (Dix, Nancy) (cge).
August 24, 2011 37 Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia: Motion Hearing held on 8/24/2011 re 21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, granting in part and denying in part as set forth on the record 21 Motion to Dismiss; Counsel to file Amended Complaint by 09/16/11. (Court Reporter Jeannette Hill).(Plaintiff Attorney Chris Beal).(Defendant Attorney Ben West, Jeffrey Alan Feasby). (ymm)
August 19, 2011 36 Featured Case ORDER granting 33 Joint Motion to Allow Parties to Bring Canned Alcoholic Beverages to Hearing On Defendant's Motion To Dismiss scheduled for 08/24/11 at 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 08/19/11. (cge) (jcj).
August 19, 2011 35 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2011 02:30 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. (ymm)
July 21, 2011 34 Order by Judge Battaglia: Motions Submitted 21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. The Court finds this motion suitable for determination on the papers and without oral argument in accordance with Civil Local Rule 7.1.d.1. Accordingly, no appearances are required and the motion will be deemed submitted as of this date.(sc)
July 20, 2011 33 Joint MOTION To Allow Parties To Bring Canned Alcoholic Beverages To Hearing On Defendant's Motion To Dismiss re 21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by United Brands Company, Inc. (Dix, Nancy) (cge).
June 15, 2011 32 Featured Case ORDER granting 31 Joint Motion to Continue. The hearing date of 6/16/11 at 10:00 AM for Anheuser-Busch's Motion to Dismiss is continued to 7/21/11 at 1:30 PM before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 06/15/11. (cge) (cap).
June 13, 2011 31 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing Date for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Anheuser-Bush, Inc., United Brands Company, Inc. (Dix, Nancy) (cge).
June 9, 2011 30 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 6/16/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. (ymm)
March 14, 2011 29 Featured Case ORDER of Transfer: Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned to this case and Judge Anthony J. Battaglia is now assigned to this case. The new case number is 10cv2281-AJB (WMC). All pending motion dates and pretrial conference dates currently scheduled before Judge Benitez are vacated. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 3/14/2011.(knh) (jcj).
March 1, 2011 28 Minute Order issued by the Honorable Roger T. Benitez: Submitting 21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Court to issue Order. Motion Hearing date of 03/07/2011 10:30AM is hereby vacated. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(gxr)
February 28, 2011 27 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Anheuser-Bush, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Feasby, Jeffrey) (knh).
February 28, 2011 26 RESPONSE in Support re 21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Anheuser-Bush, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Feasby, Jeffrey) (knh).
February 25, 2011 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Alan Feasby on behalf of Anheuser-Bush, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Feasby, Jeffrey) (knh).
February 25, 2011 24 Featured Case ORDER Granting 23 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorneys Jeffrey A. Feasby, Denis F. Shanager, and Ben West of Luce, Forward, Hamilton & Scripps LLP are substituted in place of Bobby A. Ghajar, Peter E. Moll, and Alan S. Cooper of Howrey LLP. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 2/25/2011. (knh) (jrl).
February 22, 2011 23 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Jeffrey A. Feasby by Anheuser-Bush, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proof of Service)(Feasby, Jeffrey) Contacted attorney re Proposed Order on 2/23/2011 (knh).
February 18, 2011 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re 21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Opposition to Defendant Anheuser-Busch, Inc,'s Motion To Dismiss filed by United Brands Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Dix, Nancy) (knh).
January 24, 2011 21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Anheuser-Bush, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support Of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)(Ghajar, Bobby) (knh).
January 20, 2011 20 Notice of Withdraw 19 MOTION to Strike 16 Amended Complaint by Anheuser-Bush, Inc. (Ghajar, Bobby) Modified to correct event on 1/20/2011 (knh).
January 11, 2011 19 WITHDRAWN re 20 Notice of Withdrawal. MOTION to Strike 16 Amended Complaint by Anheuser-Bush, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support)(Ghajar, Bobby) (knh).
January 10, 2011 18 Featured Case ORDER Denying as Moot 14 Motion to Dismiss. The January 18, 2011 hearing date on the motion to dismiss is vacated. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 1/7/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knh) (mam).
January 7, 2011 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United Brands Company, Inc. re 16 Amended Complaint Service by Mail (Dix, Nancy) (knh).
January 6, 2011 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Anheuser-Bush, Inc., filed by United Brands Company, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Dix, Nancy) (knh).
December 15, 2010 15 PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Alan S. Cooper appearing for Defendant Anheuser-Bush, Inc. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
December 10, 2010 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Anheuser-Bush, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss)(Ghajar, Bobby) (knh).
December 2, 2010 13 PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Peter E Moll appearing for Defendant Anheuser-Bush, Inc. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
November 22, 2010 12 Featured Case ORDER Granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Defendant Anheuser-Bush, Inc. shall have until December 10, 2010 to file an answer or otherwise respond to Brands' Complaint. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 11/22/2010. (knh) (jrl).
November 19, 2010 11 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Anheuser-Bush, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond, # 2 Declaration of Peter Moll In Support of Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond)(Ghajar, Bobby) Contacted attorney re Proposed Order not to be efiled on 11/22/2010 (knh).
November 19, 2010 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Bobby A Ghajar on behalf of Anheuser-Bush, Inc. (Ghajar, Bobby) (knh).
November 11, 2010 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Brands Company, Inc.. Anheuser-Bush, Inc. served on 11/5/2010, answer due 11/29/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Dix, Nancy) (tkl).
November 10, 2010 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina D Yates on behalf of United Brands Company, Inc. (Yates, Christina) (tkl).
November 10, 2010 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United Brands Company, Inc. re 4 Notice of Appearance, 5 Notice of Appearance, 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Plaintiff United Brands Company, Inc. (Dix, Nancy) (tkl).
November 9, 2010 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Brands Company, Inc. (Dix, Nancy) Contacted attorney re missing proof of service on 11/10/2010 (knh).
November 9, 2010 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher James Beal on behalf of United Brands Company, Inc. (Beal, Christopher) Contacted attorney re missing proof of service on 11/10/2010 (knh).
November 9, 2010 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Behmer on behalf of United Brands Company, Inc. (Behmer, Brian) Contacted attorney re missing proof of service on 11/10/2010 (knh).
November 5, 2010 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mtb)
November 4, 2010 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *3,263,454*, *3,465,813*, *85/139,185* (mtb) (cap).
November 4, 2010 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Anheuser-Bush, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0974-3046636.), filed by United Brands Company, Inc. (Copyright letter sent).The new case number is 3:10-cv-2281-BEN-WMC. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr. are assigned to the case. (Dix, Nancy)(mtb) Modified text on 11/5/2010 (mtb). (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/5/2010) (mtb) (mam).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Brands Company, Inc. v. Anheuser-Bush, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Brands Company, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy O Dix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anheuser-Bush, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?