Carvajal v. Pride Industries et al

Plaintiff: Cezar Carvajal
Defendant: Pride Industries and DOES
Case Number: 3:2010cv02319
Filed: November 9, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Dana M. Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2014 140 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Decision Following Trial and Order for Entry of Judgment. Judgment is entered in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/13/2014. (srm)(jrd)
July 15, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: Waiver of Jury Trial. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/15/2013. (srm)
April 22, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part 32 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court Denies Defendant's motion for summary judgment as to the first cause of action for violation of Title I of the ADA and Grants Defendant's motion for summary judgment as to all the remaining causes ofaction. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/22/2013. (srm)
January 11, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING First Amended Complaint without prejudice for failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e (2)(B)(ii). Plaintiff may file a second amended complaint on or before January 31, 2011. Plaintiff's 7 amended request for appointment of counsel is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 1/11/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
November 18, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and dismissing complaint without prejudice for failing to state a claim upon which relief can be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). Plaintiff may file an amended complaint on or before December 10, 2010. Plaintiff's 3 request for appointment of counsel is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/18/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carvajal v. Pride Industries et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cezar Carvajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pride Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?