Swanson et al v. Holder et al

Plaintiff: George B Swanson and Natalie M Swanson
Defendant: Eric Holder, Tom Vilsack, Tom Tidwell, Ken Salazar, Bob Abbey and Thomas Gillett
Case Number: 3:2010cv02363
Filed: November 16, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Irma E. Gonzalez
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant's 38 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 38 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Court dismisses Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint with prejudice. Clerk directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 5/8/2012. (jah)
January 24, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' 26 Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative, 26 Motion for Summary Judgment. Court grants Dfts' motion to dismiss and dismisses Plaintiffs' Complaint. Court dismisses with prejudice Plaintiffs' cause of action for declaratory relief and dismisses without prejudice Plaintiffs' causes of action for conversion, trepass to chattels, negligence and injunctive relief. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint w/in 21 calendar days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 1/24/2012. (jah)
October 4, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' 13 Motion to Set Aside Default. Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 10/4/2011. jah)
August 26, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiffs' 11 Motion for Default Judgment. Court notes that Plaintiffs' motion was filed w/o obtaining a hearing date from Chambers. Court directs Plaintiffs to obtain a hearing date from Chambers prior to filing any future motions in accordance w/ Local Civil Rule 7.1(b). Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 8/26/2011. (jah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swanson et al v. Holder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George B Swanson
Represented By: Marie C. Mirch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie M Swanson
Represented By: Marie C. Mirch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Holder
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Vilsack
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Tidwell
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Salazar
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Abbey
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Gillett
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?