Jeffries v. McEwen

Petitioner: Allen Lynn Jeffries
Respondent: L. S. McEwen and The Attorney General of the State of California
Case Number: 3:2010cv02379
Filed: November 18, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Referring Judge: Mitchell D. Dembin
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 20, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Adopting 17 Report and Recommendation; Granting 14 Motion to Dismiss; and Dismissing 7 First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The Court concludes that the magistrate judge issued an accurate report and well-reasoned recommend ation that the First Amended Petition be dismissed. Accordingly, the Court adopts the Report and Recommendation in its entirety and Dismisses Petitioner's First Amended Petition for writ of habeas corpus without prejudice to Petitioner's ri ght to pursue his claims pursuant to Title 42 of the United States Code, section 1983. For the reasons set forth in detail in the Report and Recommendation, Petitioner has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right. Accordingly, a certificate of appealability should not issue in this action. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 12/20/2011. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
November 30, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying [] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Dismissing Case Without Prejudice. To have the case reopened, Petitioner must, by 2/1/2011, provide the Court with this order and the $5.00 filing fee, or this Order together wi th proof that Petitioner cannot pay the filing fee AND a First Amended Petition. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 11/30/2010. (Blank IFP Form and First Amended Petition Form mailed to Petitioner) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
November 17, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, CASE TRANSFERRED to Southern District of California. signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/15/2010. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E) [Transferred from California Eastern on 11/18/2010.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeffries v. McEwen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: L. S. McEwen
Represented By: Michael P. Rhoads
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Attorney General of the State of California
Represented By: Attorney General
Represented By: Michael P. Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Allen Lynn Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?