Martin v. Escalante et al

Plaintiff: Damon Martin
Defendant: M Escalante, E Benyard, A Favila, Domingo Uribe, Jr., D Foston and M Hodges Wilkins
Case Number: 3:2010cv02387
Filed: November 18, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Michael M. Anello
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 26, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dismissing action. The time permitted by the Court for Plaintiff to comply with the Court's Orders has since passed and Plaintiff has failed to file any pleadings to comply with the Court's Orders. Thus, the Court Dismisses this action for all the reasons set forth in the Court's December 29, 2010 Order and for failing to comply with the Courts February 25, 2011 Order. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 5/26/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lao)
December 29, 2010 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT: It is hereby ordered that Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff is granted 45 days leave from the date this Order is "Filed" inw hich to file a Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 12/29/2010. (1983 Form Mailed to Plaintiff)(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
November 23, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; and (2) Dismissing Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Purusant to 28USC§§ 1915(e)(2) and 1915A(b). Plaintiff is GRANTED forty five (45) days leave from the date this Order is "Filed" in which to file a First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 11/23/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. Mailed form § 1983 complaint to Plaintiff. )(jer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Escalante et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Escalante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Benyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Favila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domingo Uribe, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Foston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Hodges Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?