Tran v. Gore et al

Plaintiff: Hoang Minh Tran
Defendant: William D Gore, Schroeder, Omar Ortega, Michael Dalbratt and Nicholas Ramirez
Case Number: 3:2010cv02457
Filed: November 29, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Luis Obispo
Referring Judge: William V. Gallo
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting In Part 60 Report and Recommendation; Granting 31 Motion to Compel; Denying without prejudice Motion for Sanctions; Denying 41 Motion to Dismiss; Denying 46 Motion for Relief. If Plaintiff chooses to go forward with this a ction, Defendants may renew their motion for sanctions. The Court Grants Plaintiff 30 days within which to either respond to the outstanding discovery or file a request for dismissal.Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 8/30/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
April 29, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Regarding Defendants' Motion for Sanctions and Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. Nos. 31 , 41 ); and ORDER After Order to Show Cause Hearing Recommending Terminating Sanctions Against Plaintiff Hoang Minh Tran . It is Ordered that no later than May 28, 2013 any party to this action may file written objections with the Court and serve a copy on all parties. The document should be captioned "Objections to Report and Recommendation." It is further Ordered that any reply to the objections shall be filed with the Court and served on all parties no later than June 13, 2013. The parties are advised that failure to file objections within the specified time may waive the right to raise those objections on appeal of the Court's order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/29/2013.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
February 25, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 38 Motion Requesting Competency Hearing based on Plaintiff's Mental and Physical Disability pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. Rule 17(c) ; and Denying without prejudice Allen Tracy Gilmore's 49 E x Parte Motion and Request for Court to Appoint Next Friend or Appoint Counsel to Litigate on Behalf of Hoang Minh Tran due to Incompetence. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 2/25/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
November 20, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 35 Motion Entitlement of ADA. Plaintiff has not shown that under the ADA or Rehabilitation Act, he is entitled to appointment of counsel. Accordingly, the Court hereby DENIES without prejudice Plaintiffs Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 11/20/2012.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (sjt)
September 19, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Without Prejudice Plaintiff's 29 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/19/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)(jrd)
June 27, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 21 Motions for Entry of Default, Default Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Sanctions. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 6/27/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)(jrd)
September 19, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) Dismissing Defendant William D. Gore; and (2) Directing U.S. Marshal to effect service of amended complaint pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 4(c)(3) & 28 U.S.C. § 1915(d).Defendant William D. Gore is Dismissed from this action. The Clerk shal l issue a summons as to Plaintiff's 7 First Amended Complaint upon the remaining Defendants and shall forward it to Plaintiff along with a blank U.S. Marshal Form 285 for each of these Defendants. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 9/19/11. (IFP Package sent to defendant)(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)
May 2, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Granting Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; (2) Denying Motion for Appointment of Counsel Without Prejudice; and (3) Dismissing Claims for Failing to State a Claim Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915(e)(2)(B) & 1915A(b). Plaintiff h as thirty (30) days to either: (1) notify the Court of his intention to proceed with the claims that the Court has determined survive the sua sponte screening process; or (2) file an amended complaint which addresses each deficiency of pleading noted above. (Order electronically transmitted to Matthew Cate, Secretary CDCR). Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 5/2/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tran v. Gore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hoang Minh Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Dalbratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?