Grant v. Capital Management Services, L.P. et al

Plaintiff: Wade Grant
Defendant: Capital Management Services, L.P. and DOES
Case Number: 3:2010cv02471
Filed: December 1, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Referring Judge: Bernard G. Skomal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2014 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Settlement Agreement is incorporated by reference into this Order. The Court has jurisdiction over the subject matter of this litigation, the parties, and all persons within the Class. The Joint Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Se ttlement (Doc. 118 ) is granted. The unopposed Motion for Attorneys' Fees & Costs, and Incentive Award to Class Representative (Doc. 119 ) is granted. The Court awards and orders Defendant to pay Class Counsel $475,000.00 in total for att orneys' fees and costs. The Court further awards and orders Defendant to pay an amount of $5,000.00 to Plaintiff Wade Grant. These awarded amounts are immediately due and payable. This litigation is dismissed with prejudice and, except as p rovided herein or in the Settlement Agreement, without costs. The Court finds that there is no just reason for delay and expressly directs entry of Judgment. The parties shall submit a proposed judgment for signature by the Court. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 3/5/2014. (mdc)
December 11, 2013 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The joint motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement (Doc. 111 ) is granted. The settlement class is certified for settlement purposes only under Rule 23(b)(2). The Court appoints Plaintiff Wade Grant as class representative. The Court appoints Frantz Law Group, APLC, Adler Law Group, APLC, and Keegan & Baker, LLP as class counsel. A hearing shall be held on 1/31/2014 at 09:30 AM. All papers in support of the final approval of the settlement shall be filed with the Court on or before 1/20/2014. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 12/11/2013. (mdc)
June 12, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Case (Doc. 35 ) filed by Defendant Capital Management Services, L.P. and the Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions (Doc. 43 ) filed by Plaintiff Wade Grant are DENIED. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 6/12/2012. (mdc)
August 19, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The (Doc. 22 ) Application for Stay of the Order of Remand Pending Appeal filed by Defendant Capital Management Services, L.P. is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 8/19/2011. (mdc) Modified on 8/19/2011 - Notified the appeals clerk re this filing. (mdc)
April 11, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Of Remand: The (Doc. 11 ) Motion to Remand the Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff is granted. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1447(c), this action is remanded to the California Superior Court for the County of San Diego, where it was originally filed and assigned Case No.3702010-00100521-CU-NP-CTL. Plaintiff's request for attorney's fees and costs is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/11/2011. (mdc) (av1).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant v. Capital Management Services, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wade Grant
Represented By: James Patrick Frantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Management Services, L.P.
Represented By: Daniel D McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?