Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America v. Highland Partnership, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Defendant: Highland Partnership, Inc., Bay Boulevard, LLC, The Gill Family Trust, Ian Murray Gill, Gail Stoorza-Gill, John David Gardner and Carolyn Marie Gardner
Case Number: 3:2010cv02503
Filed: December 6, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2013 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 125 Motion for Bench Trial. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/8/13. (cge)
November 26, 2012 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 87 Motion for Summary Judgment on its First Amended Complaint; and granting Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 11/26/12. (cge)
September 20, 2011 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants' Counterclaims is granted with leave to amend as to the first, second, third, and fifth causes of action, and denied as to the fourth cause of action. Defendant's must file their amended counterclaims by 11/04/11. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 09/20/11. (cge)
January 13, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Striking Notice of Removal. The Notice of Removal [doc. no. 11] filed by Defendants has no effect and shall be stricken. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 1/13/11.(jer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America v. Highland Partnership, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: Christopher M. Bunge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highland Partnership, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Boulevard, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Gill Family Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Murray Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail Stoorza-Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John David Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Marie Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?