Green v. The State of California Board of Parole Hearings

Petitioner: Donald Green
Respondent: The State of California Board of Parole Hearings
Case Number: 3:2010cv02516
Filed: December 7, 2010
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Imperial
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) ADOPTING 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and (2) granting 9 Motion to Dismiss: the Court ADOPTS the R&R in full. Respondent's motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Petitioner's petition for writ of habeas corpus is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Petitioner's bringing his claim under 42 U.S.C. § 1983. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/23/12.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)
August 29, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) ADOPTING 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; (2) granting Respondent's 9 Motion to Dismiss; and (3) denying Certificate of Appealability: This Order concludes the litigation in this matter. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/29/11.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)
July 26, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER sua sponte Substituting respondent. Matthew Cate added. L S McEwen terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 7/26/2011.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mtb)
December 20, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Dismissing Case Without Prejudice: To have the case reopened, Petitioner may submit a copy of this order along with the requisite fee and a First Amended Petition which cures the ple ading deficiencies noted above no later than 2/22/11. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Petitioner a blank First Amended Petition form. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/20/10. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; form and copy of order sent)(lmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. The State of California Board of Parole Hearings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Donald Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The State of California Board of Parole Hearings
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?