George v. Uribe et al
Plaintiff: |
Richard Earl George |
Defendant: |
Domingo Uribe, Alan Hernandez, Felipe Lopez, Jose Valasquez, Manuel Farias, L Valenzuela, F Gutierrez, J Carvajal, Alvarado and L Calderon |
Case Number: |
3:2011cv00070 |
Filed: |
January 12, 2011 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
Monterey |
Presiding Judge: |
Ruben B. Brooks |
Presiding Judge: |
Janis L. Sammartino |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 8, 2013 |
Filing
63
ORDER Revoking Plaintiff's in forma pauperis Status on Appeal. For the reasons discussed above, the Court certifies that Plaintiff's appeal is frivolous and not taken in good faith. Accordingly, it is HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff' ;s in forma pauperis status is REVOKED for purposes of his appeal; and (2) the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to notify the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals that the Court certifies, pursuant to Rule 24(a)(3)(A) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure, that Plaintiff's appeal is frivolous and not taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/8/2013. (USCA Case Number 13-55270. Order electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals. All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service.) (akr)
|
March 23, 2012 |
Filing
43
ORDER: (1) ADOPTING 37 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; and (2) granting 23 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss: Plaintiff's FAC is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. If Plaintiff wishes, he may file an amended complaint addressing the deficiencies noted within 45 days of the date that this Order is electronically docketed. If no amended complaint is received by that time, the Clerk shall close the file. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/23/12.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)
|
January 17, 2012 |
Filing
35
ORDER denying 33 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 1/17/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)
|
May 25, 2011 |
Filing
10
ORDER: (1) denying 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel; and (2) Directing U.S. Marshal to Effect Service of First Amended Complaint: Clerk to provide IFP package. U.S. Marshal shall serve a copy of the First Amended Complaint and summons upon each Defenda nt as directed by Plaintiff on each Form 285. Defendants are ORDERED to reply to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/24/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(IFP package sent) (CC: USM)(lmt)
|
March 21, 2011 |
Filing
3
ORDER: (1) granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; (2) dismissing Civil Action for Failure to State a Claim: the Secretary of the California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is ordered to collect from Plaintiff's prison trust account the $350 balance of the filing fee owed. Order electronically transmitted to Matthew Cate, Secretary CDCR. Plaintiff is granted 45 days leave from the date this Order is filed in which to file a First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/21/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt) (mam).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?