Yeoman et al v. Ikea U.S.A. West, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Reid Yeoman
Defendant: Ikea U.S.A. West, Inc. and DOES
Case Number: 3:2011cv00701
Filed: April 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
Presiding Judge: Bernard G. Skomal
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441pr Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The Ninth Circuit vacated this Court's judgment and remanded the action with instructions that this Court dismiss the action without prejudice for lack of standing. Accordingly, Court dismisses without prejudice this action for lack of standing. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 3/29/2017. (jah)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 261 Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings, or in the Alternative to Decertify the Class. Court grants Ikea's motion to decertify the Class. As the Class has been decertified, Ikea& #039;s motion pursuant to FRCP Rule 52(c) for judgment on partial findings as to the Class is moot. Ikea's Rule 52(c) as to Plaintiff is denied. Court sets damages phase of Trial as to Plaintiff's individual claim for 1/27/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Cynthia Bashant. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 12/4/2014. (jah)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER Granting 170 192 212 Motions to Seal. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 8/18/2014. (rlu)
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER Denying Defendant's Motion To Belatedly Amend The Schedule In Order To File A Motion For Summary Judgment As To The Claims Of Absent Class Members (Re Doc. 138 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 3/20/2014. (mdc)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER Denying 127 Motion in Limine Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 2/20/2014. (srm)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER: The Motion to File Documents Under Seal Pursuant to Stipulated Protective Order (Doc. 133 ) remains pending before the Court. Defendant shall file supplemental materials in support of the request to seal no later than ten (10) days from the date this Order is filed. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/15/2014. (mdc)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER: The Amended Motion to Compel Notice to the Certified Class filed by Plaintiffs (Doc. 95 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 11/5/2013. (mdc)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER: The Objections to the Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiffs' Motion to Reopen Discovery and Extend Expert Deadlines (Doc. 116 ) filed by Plaintiffs are overruled. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 10/22/2013. (mdc)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER Granting In Part And Denying In Part Plaintiffs' Motion To Reopen Discovery And Extend Expert Deadlines (Re Doc. 100 ): The motion to reopen discovery and designate another expert is DENIED. The motion is GRANTED as it relates to Plaintiffs' request to extend time to take depositions of the expert witnesses Defendant designated to testify at trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 7/10/2013. (mdc)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: The (Doc. 18 ) Motion to Consolidate Related Actions is granted. No later than ten days from the date of this order, Plaintiff may seek leave to file a First Amended Complaint in Yeoman v. IKEA U.S.A. West, Inc., Case No. 11cv701 WQH ( BGS) to add Plaintiff Rita Medellin and Medellin's counsel. Upon filing of the First Amended Complaint, the Clerk of the Court shall administratively close Medellin v. IKEA U.S. West, Inc., Case No. 11cv921 WQH (BGS). The (Doc. 18 ) Motion to Appoint Interim Class Counsel is denied as moot. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 10/27/2011. (mdc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yeoman et al v. Ikea U.S.A. West, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reid Yeoman
Represented By: Timothy Gordon Blood
Represented By: Leslie E. Hurst
Represented By: Thomas Joseph O'Reardon, II
Represented By: Paula M. Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ikea U.S.A. West, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Shoji Kawabata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?