Lopez v. Giurbino et al
Plaintiff: |
Michael Anthony Lopez |
Defendant: |
B Narvis, M Ayala, Alicia Garcia, L Kastner, G J Giurbino, Uribe Domingo, Jr, N Grannis, M Hodges, Dennis Brown, Unnamed Defendant 1, D Foston and Unnamed Defendant 2 |
Case Number: |
3:2011cv01079 |
Filed: |
May 17, 2011 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
Imperial |
Presiding Judge: |
Peter C. Lewis |
Presiding Judge: |
Barry Ted Moskowitz |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 4, 2014 |
Filing
65
ORDER Granting Defendant's 45 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 3/3/2014. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
|
May 20, 2013 |
Filing
55
ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 50 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. The Court Denies Plaintiff's request without prejudice, as neither the interests of justice nor exceptional circumstances warrant appointment of counsel at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter C. Lewis on 5/20/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
|
March 21, 2013 |
Filing
46
ORDER Providing Notice to Pro Se Prisoner of Requirements for Opposing Summary Judgment Pursuant to Klingele / Rand and Setting Briefing Schedule: Any Opposition (including any supporting documents) must be filed with the Court and served on all par ties by 5/3/2013. If you do not wish to oppose Defendants' Motion, you should file and serve a "Notice of Non-Opposition" by that same date to let both the Court and Defendants know that the Motion is unopposed. If you do file and serv e an Opposition, Defendants must file and serve their Reply to that Opposition by 5/10/2013. Motion Hearing re 45 Motion for Summary Judgment set for 5/17/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 15B before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. Unless otherwise requested and ordered, no appearances are required on 5/17/2013, and no oral argument will be heard. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 3/20/2013.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
|
March 5, 2012 |
Filing
23
ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 21 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 3/5/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)(jrd)
|
February 21, 2012 |
Filing
22
ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part Defendants' 17 Motion to Dismiss pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 12(b)(6). The Court Denies Defendants Kastner and Garcias Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint on respondeat superior grounds, Grants Defe ndants Uribe and Browns Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint on respondeat superior grounds and Grants Defendant Grannis and Hodges Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First and Fourteenth Amendment claims against them. Plaintiff has thirty (30) days from the entry of this Order to file a First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff can also choose not to file a First Amended Complaint and instead this action can go forward on the remaining claims. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 2/21/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)
|
September 6, 2011 |
Filing
7
ORDER (1) Granting 2 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, (2) Denying 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, (3) Dismissing Defendants, and (4) Directing U.S. Marshal to Effect Service of Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(c)(3) & 28 U.S.C. § 1915(d). (Order electronically transmitted to Matthew Cate, Secretary CDCR, IFP Package Mailed). Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 9/6/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)(jrd)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?