Kimpel v. Marquez et al
Plaintiff: |
Jay G Kimpel |
Defendant: |
I Marquez, D. Martinez, A Buenrostro, Rico and Rink |
Case Number: |
3:2011cv01084 |
Filed: |
May 16, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
San Diego |
Presiding Judge: |
Louisa S Porter |
Presiding Judge: |
Janis L. Sammartino |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 19, 2012 |
Filing
101
ORDER (1) ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ; and (2) granting 38 Motion to Dismiss. The Court adopts Magistrate Judge Lewis's R&R in its entirety and grants defendants' motion to dismiss, with prejudice. This order concludes the litigation in this matter and all pending motions are hereby considered moot. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/18/2012.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jao)
|
April 30, 2012 |
Filing
67
ORDER denying 66 Motion for Complete Copies of all Docket Entries: the Clerk of Court shall send Plaintiff a copy of the current docket sheet. If Plaintiff can identify the specific docket entries he needs, and explain why he needs them, the Court will reconsider his request. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 4/30/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)
|
March 22, 2012 |
Filing
55
ORDER denying 54 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 3/22/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)
|
September 26, 2011 |
Filing
14
ORDER denying plaintiff's 13 Motion to Appoint Counsel without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 9/26/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
|
September 6, 2011 |
Filing
6
ORDER: (1) granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Imposing no initial partial filing fee and garnishing balance from prisoner's trust account; (2) denying 4 Motion for Legal Access to Law Library and denying 5 Motion to Appoint Counsel without Prejudice; and (3) Directing US Marshal to effect service of complaint: The Secretary CDCR, or his designee, is ordered to collect from prison trust account the $350 balance of the filing fee owed in this case by collecti ng monthly payments from the trust account in an amount equal to 20% of the preceding month income credited to the account and forward payments to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 in accordance with 28 USC 1915(b)(2). Order electronically transmitted to Matthew Cate, Secretary CDCR. Clerk to prepare IFP package. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/6/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)(IFP package sent)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?