Franklin v. Jimenez et al
Plaintiff: |
Gregory A Franklin |
Defendant: |
J Jimenez, Hughey, S Garcia, T Molina, S Ramos, J Rodriguez and C Maciel |
Case Number: |
3:2011cv01240 |
Filed: |
June 6, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
Imperial |
Presiding Judge: |
John A. Houston |
Presiding Judge: |
Bernard G. Skomal |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 22, 2017 |
Filing
79
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that (1) Plaintiff's objections are Overruled; (2) The report and recommendation (Doc. No. 61 ) is Adopted in its entirety; (3) Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Doc. No. 57 ) is Granted; (4) Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (Doc. No. 43 ) is Denied; (5) Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend (Doc. No. 60 ) is Denied; (6) The report and recommendation (Doc. No. 58 ) is Adopted in its entirety; (7) Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction (Doc No. 52 ) is Denied; (8) The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment in favor of Defendants and terminate the action.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu) (sjt).
|
January 27, 2012 |
Filing
5
ORDER DISMISSING First Amended Complaint For Failing To State A Claim Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. Sections 1915(e)(2)(B) & 1915A(b): Plaintiff is granted 45 days leave from the date this Order is "Filed" in which to file a Second Amended Complaint which cures all the deficiencies of pleading noted. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 1/27/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; per Order, a blank 1983 Second Amended Complaint form also was sent to Plaintiff.) (mdc)
|
October 4, 2011 |
Filing
3
ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, imposing no initial partial filing fee and garnishing $350 balance from prisoner trust account; and dismissing action for failing to state a claim pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B) & 1915A(b). Plaintiff is granted 45 days leave to file a First Amended Complaint. (blank amended complaint form mailed to plaintiff).(Order electronically transmitted to Matthew Cate, Secretary CDCR). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 10/03/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?