Scorpio Music S.A. et al v. Willis Featured Case
Plaintiff: Scorpio Music S.A. and Can't Stop Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Victor Willis
Case Number: 3:2011cv01557
Filed: July 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MINUTE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 7/12/2013 at 10:00 AM is reset for 10/9/2013 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 7/8/2013.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)(jrd)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Granting Stipulation Regarding Scheduling Order and Issuing First Amended Case Management Conference Order Regulating Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings 76 . The settlement conference set for July 12, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. remains on calendar. No memoranda of law or contentions of fact are to be filed except in a bench trial. In that case, the Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law is due by 12/24/2013. A Proposed Pretrial Order is due by 1/14/2014. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 1/21/2014 at 3:30 PM before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 6/24/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(vam)(jrd)
June 19, 2013 Filing 76 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Henri Belolo, Can't Stop Productions, Inc., Scorpio Music S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 [proposed] order)(Besser, Robert) Modified on 6/20/2013-changed motion event and edited docket text; QC mailer sent regarding wrong event, using s/, and filing proposed order (vam).
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 58 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 6/3/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)(jrd)
May 16, 2013 Filing 74 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Lien served on Brian D. Caplan, Stewart L. Levy on 05/16/2013, filed by Michael E. Moore, Jason A. Rodenbo. (Fickel, Mary) (rlu).
May 16, 2013 Filing 73 NOTICE by Michael E. Moore, Jason A. Rodenbo of Lien (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Fickel, Mary) (rlu).
May 10, 2013 Filing 72 MINUTE ORDER, Motions Submitted 58 MOTION for Summary Adjudication (no document attached) (rfm)
May 9, 2013 Filing 71 ANSWER to 35 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Henri Belolo, Can't Stop Productions, Inc., Scorpio Music S.A..(Besser, Robert) (rlu).
May 3, 2013 Filing 70 REPLY to Response to Motion re 58 MOTION for Summary Adjudication filed by Can't Stop Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Besser, Robert) qc email re signature on pos on 5/6/2013 (rlu).
April 26, 2013 Filing 69 DECLARATION re 67 Response in Opposition to Motion (Victor Willis Decl.) by Defendant Victor Willis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Noss, Walter) qc email re should have been filed as attachment to ecf no 67 on 4/29/2013 (rlu).
April 26, 2013 Filing 68 DECLARATION re 67 Response in Opposition to Motion by Defendant Victor Willis. (Noss, Walter) qc email re should have been filed as attachment to ecf no 67 on 4/29/2013 (rlu).
April 26, 2013 Filing 67 RESPONSE in Opposition re 58 MOTION for Summary Adjudication filed by Victor Willis. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts)(Noss, Walter) qc email re atty should file on own behalf on 4/29/2013 (rlu).
April 18, 2013 Filing 66 NOTICE - Portions of Transcript of a Deposition of Victor Willis taken in another Action, submitted by Henri Belolo, Can't Stop Productions, Inc., Scorpio Music S.A. (leh)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Denying 59 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Plaintiffs' Motion to File Documents Under Seal is Denied, and the Exhibits in question (Doc. 60 ) shall be filed on the public docket. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 4/18/2013. (leh)
April 18, 2013 Filing 64 NOTICE of Non-Compliance with Local Rule 5.1(a) Legibility, re 63 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Victor Willis. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
April 17, 2013 Filing 63 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Victor Willis re 62 Order to Show Cause,,. (Noss, Walter) (rlu).
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why Deposition Transcript Excerpts should not be Filed on the Public Docket. The Court orders Defendant Victor Willis to show cause why the transcript excerpts should not be filed on the public docket. If Mr. Willis believes that there are compelling reasons for filing the transcript excerpts under seal, he must specify the reasons in a response to this order to show cause. Such response is due on or before April 17, 2013. Failure to file a response will result in the public filing of the exhibits. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 4/12/2013.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
April 11, 2013 Filing 61 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks:Settlement Conference was held on 4/11/2013. Settlement Conference is set for 7/12/2013 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 4/11/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
March 29, 2013 Filing 60 [Denied, Per Order on 4/18/2013] - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 59 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Besser, Robert) (sjt) Modified on 4/19/2013 Motion to Seal Docs Denied, Docs Filed on Public Docket(leh).
March 29, 2013 Filing 59 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Besser, Robert) (sjt).
March 29, 2013 Filing 58 MOTION for Summary Adjudication by Scorpio Music S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Statement of Facts)(Besser, Robert) qc email re s/ signature on 4/2/2013 (rlu).
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Denying 41 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 3/4/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)(jrd)
February 21, 2013 Filing 56 Minute Order: Settlement Conference held on 2/21/2013. A telephonic, attorneys-only Settlement Conference set for 4/11/2013 at 8:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 2/21/2013.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
January 18, 2013 Filing 55 REPLY - Other re 54 Reply - Other, 41 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim Defendant/Counterclaimant's Post-Oral Argument Brief on the Hogarth v. Burroughs Case filed by Victor Willis. (Noss, Walter) (rlu).
January 16, 2013 Filing 54 REPLY - Other re 41 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Post Oral Argument Brief on the Hogarth v. Burroughs Case filed by Henri Belolo, Can't Stop Productions, Inc., Scorpio Music S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of service)(Besser, Robert)(yeb).
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER: Telephonic, Attorneys-Only Settlement Conference set for 1/15/2013 is continued to 2/21/2013 at 8:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 1/11/2013.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)(jrd)
January 10, 2013 Filing 52 Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz: Motion Hearing held on 1/10/2013 41 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by Scorpio Music S.A., Can't Stop Productions, Inc., Henri Belolo- Motions Submitted, the Court will prepare a written order. (Court Reporter Barbara Harris).(Plaintiff Attorney Stewart Levy, Robert Besser).(Defendant Attorney Jonathan Ross, Charles Sanders). (no document attached) (lsf)
November 30, 2012 Filing 51 REPLY to Response to Motion re 41 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by Henri Belolo, Can't Stop Productions, Inc., Scorpio Music S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service (Certificate of Service))(Besser, Robert) (rlu).
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting 48 Motion for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae and Continue Hearing: The Court continues the hearing on the Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim to 1/10/2013 at 2:00 PM before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz, at which time the Court will entertain oral argument. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 11/14/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)(jrd)
November 14, 2012 Filing 49 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Songwriters' Guild of America (Chasin, Steven) (rlu).
November 14, 2012 Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae by Songwriters' Guild of America. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion of Songwriters Guild of America for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae, # 2 Memo of Points and Authorities of Amicus Party Songwriters Guild of America in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim)(Chasin, Steven) qc email re filing atty should be filing on own behalf on 11/14/2012 (rlu).
November 13, 2012 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re 41 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim filed by Victor Willis. (Noss, Walter) (rlu).
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting 45 Joint Motion to Stay Discovery and for an Extension of Time for Defendant/Counter-Claimant to Respond to the Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim re 41 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim. Motion Hearing continued to 12/7/2012 at 11:00 AM before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, there shall be no oral argument, and no personal appearances are necessary. Defendant/Counterclaimant's Opposition papers shall be served and filed no later than 11/13/2012. Plaintiff/Counterclaim-Defendants' Reply papers, if any, shall be served and filed no later than 11/30/2012. Discovery in the action is hereby stayed pending the determination of the Motion. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 10/29/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)(jrd)
October 24, 2012 Filing 45 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 41 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim and to Stay Discovery by Victor Willis. (Noss, Walter) (rlu).
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings: A Telephonic, attorneys-only settlement conference shall be held on 1/15/2012. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, if needed, is due by 10/22/2013. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/12/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2013 at 3:30 PM before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 10/22/2012.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER: A telephonic, attorneys-only settlement conference is set for 1/15/2013, at 8:30 AM. Counsel for Plaintiff is to initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 10/19/2012.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
October 22, 2012 Filing 42 Order Following ENE. Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 10/19/2012. Telephonic, attorneys-only Settlement Conference is set for 1/15/2013 at 8:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 10/22/2012.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
September 17, 2012 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaim by Henri Belolo, Can't Stop Productions, Inc., Scorpio Music S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in support of Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Request for Judicial Notice in support of Motion to Dismiss, # 3 Declaration of Henri Belolo, # 4 Proof of Service (Certificate of Service), # 5 Exhibit "A" to Request for Judicial Notice, # 6 Exhibit "B" to Request for Judicial Notice, # 7 Exhibit "C" to Request for Judicial Notice)(Besser, Robert) Modified on 9/17/2012 to edit text re Exhibit A - C(kaj). (rlu).
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 39 Ex Parte Application to Continue the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Authorizing Counterclaim Defendant Henri Belolo to Appear By Telephone: Early Neutral Evaluation set for 9/10/2012 is continued to 10/19/2012 at 8:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 8/31/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)
August 29, 2012 Filing 39 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue the early Neutral Evaluation Conference set for 9-10-12 and to authorize Henri Belolo to appear by phone by Can't Stop Productions, Inc., Scorpio Music S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert S. Besser in Support of Ex Parte Application)(Besser, Robert) (rlu).
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting 37 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiffs to Respond to Counterclaim by Defendant: Plaintiffs shall have until 9/21/2012, to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 8/20/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu) (jcj).
August 16, 2012 Filing 37 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 35 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Can't Stop Productions, Inc., Scorpio Music S.A.. (Besser, Robert) (leh).
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference: Early Neutral Evaluation set for 9/10/2012 at 1:30 PM in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 8/6/2012.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)(jrd)
August 1, 2012 Filing 35 ANSWER to 31 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Can't Stop Productions, Inc., Scorpio Music S.A., Henri Belolo by Victor Willis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Noss, Walter) (rlu).
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting 33 Joint Motion for an Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Amended Complaint. Victor Willis answer due 8/1/2012. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 6/28/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rlu)(jrd)
June 19, 2012 Filing 33 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Victor Willis. (Noss, Walter) (rlu).
June 6, 2012 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Can't Stop Productions, Inc., Scorpio Music S.A. re 31 Amended Complaint, for Declaratory Relief (Besser, Robert) (rlu).
June 5, 2012 Filing 31 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against Victor Willis, filed by Scorpio Music S.A., Can't Stop Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" to First Amended Complaint for Declaratory Relief) (Besser, Robert) Notified atty re pos (ecs).
May 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting 6 Motion to Dismiss. The Court grants Plaintiffs leave to file an amended complaint within 30 days of the entry of this Order. If Plaintiffs do not file an amended complaint, this case shall be closed. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 5/7/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)
January 17, 2012 Filing 23 REPLY - Other re 6 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint (Plaintiffs' Request for Oral Argument) filed by Can't Stop Productions, Inc., Scorpio Music S.A. (Besser, Robert) (ecs).
January 13, 2012 Filing 22 REPLY - Other re 19 Order on Motion for Leave to File, 21 Reply - Other, in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Songwriters' Guild of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Chasin, Steven) (kaj).
January 6, 2012 Filing 21 REPLY - Other re 19 Order on Motion for Leave to File, 15 Order, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, 6 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Can't Stop Productions, Inc., Scorpio Music S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of service)(Besser, Robert) (ecs).
January 5, 2012 Filing 20 PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Stewart L. Levy appearing for Plaintiffs Can't Stop Productions, Inc., Scorpio Music S.A. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ldp)(jrd)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 14 Motion for Leave to File an Amicus Brief. On or before January 6, 2012, Plaintiffs may file a supplemental opposition brief to address arguments made in the SGAs brief. On or before January 13, 2012, SGA may file an amicus brief in reply to Defendant's opposition. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 12/16/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ecs)(jrd)
December 9, 2011 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re 14 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae MOTION to Dismiss filed by Songwriters' Guild of America. (Chasin, Steven) (ecs).
December 2, 2011 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re 6 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Can't Stop Productions, Inc., Scorpio Music S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Besser, Robert) (ecs).
December 2, 2011 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re 14 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae MOTION to Dismiss filed by Can't Stop Productions, Inc., Scorpio Music S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Besser, Robert) (ecs).
November 14, 2011 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae and Motion to Dismiss by Songwriters' Guild of America. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion of Songwriters' Guild of America for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae, # 2 Memorandum of Amicus Party Songwriters' Guild of America in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Chasin, Steven). Added MOTION to Dismiss on 11/15/2011 (ecs).
November 11, 2011 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re 6 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Defendant's Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Victor Willis. (Ross, Jonathan)(mtb).
November 7, 2011 Filing 12 AMENDED RESPONSE in Opposition re 6 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Amended to include attorney signature filed by Can't Stop Productions, Inc., Scorpio Music S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Certificate of Service)(Besser, Robert) (ecs).
November 4, 2011 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 6 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Can't Stop Productions, Inc., Scorpio Music S.A.. (Besser, Robert) Notified atty re pos (ecs).
November 4, 2011 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re 6 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Can't Stop Productions, Inc., Scorpio Music S.A.. (Besser, Robert) Notified atty re pos (ecs).
September 26, 2011 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Victor Willis. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Proof of Service)(Noss, Walter) (ecs).
July 14, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Victor Willis ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0974-3757464.), filed by Scorpio Music S.A., Can't Stop Productions, Inc. [ATTY MAIN][Copyright Letter t/w Complaint mailed] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Copyright Letter)The new case number is 3:11-cv-01557-BTM-RBB. Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks are assigned to the case. (Besser, Robert)(yeb) (cap).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scorpio Music S.A. et al v. Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scorpio Music S.A.
Represented By: Robert S. Besser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Can't Stop Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Robert S. Besser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?