Hardisty v. Moore et al
Plaintiff: John T. Hardisty
Defendant: Harold Maxine Moore, Elaine K. Moore, The 1998 Harold M. Moore Revocable Trust, Mark Peluso and State Insulation, LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv01591
Filed: July 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Anthony J. Battaglia
Presiding Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 264 Motion for Post-Judgment Relief. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 1/25/2018. (jah)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 260 Motion to Determine Lien Satisfaction. Once the appeal has been resolved and the stay imposed by posting the supersedeas bond has been lifted, Plaintiff may renew his request. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 4/25/2017. (jah)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 215 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 11/2/2015. (jah)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 236 AMENDED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff in the amount of $675,101.66 and against Melanie Moore and State Insulation LLC, an Arizona limited liability company on 10 Pla's second cause of act ion for aiding and abetting intentional torts; and 2) against Dfts Harold M. Moore and Elaine K. Moore aka Melanie K. Moore on Pla's third cause of action for fraud. Harold M. Moore, Elaine K. Moore aka Melanie L. Moore, and State Insulation LLC are jointly liable for this amount. Judgment is entered against Pla and in favor of Dfts State Insulation LLC, a Arizona limited liability company and State Insulation LLC, a Nevada limited liability company, on Pla's third cause of action for fraud. Judgment is entered against Pla and in favor of Dfts Harold M. Moore and Elaine K. Moore on Pla's fourth cause of action for constructive fraud. Judgment is entered against Pla and in favor of Harold M. Moore on Pla's sixth cause of action for securities fraud. Judgment is entered against Plaintiff and in favor of Harold M. Moore, Elaine K. Moore, and State Insulation LLC, a Nevada limited liability company, and The 1998 Harold M. Moore Revocable Trust, on Pla's seventh cau se of action for conversion and Pla's ninth cause of action for conspiracy. Judgment is entered against Pla and in favor of of Dft The 1998 Harold M. Moore Revocable Trust on Pla's second cause of action for aiding and abetting intentional torts, Pla's third casue of action for fraud. Judgment is entered against Pla and in favor of State Insulation LLC, a Nevada linited liability company, on Pla's second cause of action for aiding and abetting intentional torts. Pursuant to R ule 68, judgment is entered in favor of Counter-claimant Harold M. Moore and against Counter-defendant John Hardisty in the sum of $750,000.00. This shall be the total amount to be paid on account of any liability claimed by the Counter-Claimant in this action. Clerk instructed to issue an Second Amended Judgment, which vacates and supersedes the Clerk's Amended Judgment 209 issued on 2/23/2015. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 10/22/2015. (jah)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 125 Ex Parte Motion to Compel Defendants' Attendance at Trial and 125 Ex Parte Motion to Exclude Documents Withheld from Production. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 9/10/2014. (jah)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 59 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/18/14. (cge)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting Defendant's 35 Motion to Dismiss the first and tenth causes of action with prejudice; and grants Defendants uncontested motion to strike. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 10/09/12. (cge)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 26 Motion to Dismiss. The Court grants the motion to dismiss as to the first and fifth causes of action and denies the motion to dismiss as to the fourth, seventh, and ninth causes of act ion. The fifth cause of action is dismissed with prejudice, and the first cause of action is dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff has thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to submit an amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 5/2/12. (cge)
December 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting Defendants' 10 Motion to Dismiss as to Defendants Elaine Moore and Mark Peluso. The second cause of action is dismissed with prejudice, and the fifth cause of action is dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff has thirty (30) days to submit an amended Complaint correcting the deficiencies noted herein. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 12/29/11. (cge)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardisty v. Moore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John T. Hardisty
Represented By: William B Federman
Represented By: Ali M.M. Mojdehi
Represented By: Joshua D Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Maxine Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine K. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The 1998 Harold M. Moore Revocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Peluso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Insulation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?