Ameranth, Inc. v. Pizza Hut, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ameranth, Inc.
Defendant: Pizza Hut, Inc., QuikOrder, Inc., IPDEV Co., Starbucks Corporation, Ticketmob, LLC, Orbitz, LLC, Marriott International, Inc., ., Domino's Pizza, LLC, Ticketbiscuit, LLC, Hilton International Co., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, Inc., Seamless North America, LLC, Best Western International, Inc., EMN8, Inc., Opentable, Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., ATX Innovation, Inc., Mobo Systems, Inc., Domino's Pizza, Inc., Agilysys, Inc., Fandango, Inc., Wanderspot LLC, Grubhub, Inc., Ticketmaster, LLC, Renaissance Hotel Operating Company, Kayak Software Corporation, Pizza Hut of America, Inc., Oracle Corporation, Hotwire, Inc., The Ritz Carlton Hotel Company, LLC, Apple, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Eventbrite, Inc., Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Hyatt Corporation, Laughstub LLC, Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., Hotels.com, LP, Hilton Resorts Corporation, Hilton Worldwide, Inc., O-Web Technologies LTD, NAAMA Networks, Inc., Exit 41, LLC, Usablenet, Inc., Papa John's USA, Inc., Micros Systems, Inc, Netwaiter, LLC, ORDR.IN, Inc., Ticketfly, Inc., Travelocity.com, LP and Stubhub, Inc.
Amicus Curiae: Electronic Frontier Foundation
Case Number: 3:2011cv01810
Filed: August 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William V Gallo
Referring Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 0271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Order by Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Motions and Judge Association terminated: #978 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney to Withdraw Anthony Nimmo as Counsel for Agilysys, Inc. filed by Agilysys, Inc. Notice was filed as a motion in error.(no document attached) (jak)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Order by Judge Dana M. Sabraw: The following motions have been denied as moot: #956 MOTION to Strike Claim Chart in Support of IPDEV's Motion for Summary Judgment re Written Description and Enablement in the Specification of the '449 Patent filed by Ameranth, Inc., #1027 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by QuikOrder, Inc., Pizza Hut of America, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., #1121 MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Expert Reports of Dr. Sam Malek, Dr. Michael Shamos, and Dr. Jeffrey F. Brown filed by QuikOrder, Inc., Pizza Hut of America, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., #1124 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-infringement filed by QuikOrder, Inc., #1261 MOTION to Bifurcate defense of patent ineligibility for bench trial filed by Pizza Hut, Inc., #1266 In Limine MOTION to Preclude Evidence (Nos. 1-5) filed by QuikOrder, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., #1269 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence Or Mention Of The Invalidating Of Other Related Patents Not In Suit filed by Ameranth, Inc., #1270 In Limine MOTION To Exclude Disparaging References To Patent Holder And Evidence Or Mention Of Other Ameranth Litigation (MIL No. 2) filed by Ameranth, Inc., #1271 In Limine MOTION To Exclude Arguments Or Representations That An Award Of Damages Would Increase Prices Charged By Defendants To Consumers (MIL No. 3) filed by Ameranth, Inc., #1273 In Limine MOTION In Limine MOTION To Preclude Claims Constructions And Interpretations Inconsistent With The Court's Constructions And To Exclude Prior Art References And Invalidity Or Non-Infringement Defenses Or Expert Opinions Not Previously Di filed by Ameranth, Inc., #1274 In Limine MOTION To Exclude Evidence Or Argument That The Accused Product Practices Other Patents Or Art, And Non-Infringing Alternative Not Revealed Until Supplemental Report (MIL No. 5) filed by Ameranth, Inc. (no document attached) (jak)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1460 ORDER Granting #1267 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/8/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1458 ORDER Granting #1218 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/8/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1456 ORDER Granting #1215 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/8/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1454 ORDER Granting #1212 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/8/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1452 ORDER Granting #1189 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/8/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1450 ORDER Granting #1186 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/8/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1448 ORDER Granting #1182 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/8/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1446 ORDER Granting #1179 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/8/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1444 ORDER Granting #1176 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/8/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1442 ORDER Granting #1169 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/8/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1440 ORDER Granting #1165 Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/8/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1438 ORDER Granting #1161 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/8/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1436 ORDER Granting #1158 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/8/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1434 ORDER Granting #1152 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/8/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1432 ORDER Granting #1150 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/8/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1430 ORDER Granting #1141 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/8/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1428 ORDER Granting #1128 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/8/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1426 ORDER Granting #1125 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/8/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1424 ORDER Granting #1122 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/8/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1422 ORDER Granting #1118 Domino's Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/8/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1420 ORDER Granting #1110 Domino's Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/8/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1418 ORDER Granting #1107 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/8/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1416 ORDER Granting #1099 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1414 ORDER Granting #1086 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/8/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1412 ORDER Granting #1028 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/8/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1410 ORDER Granting #995 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/8/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1408 ORDER Granting #957 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1407 NOTICE of Change of Address by William J. Caldarelli (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1406 TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER by Ameranth, Inc., for proceedings held on 9/21/2018 re #1401 Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William). (Main Document 1406 replaced on 11/9/2018 with flattened .pdf, which was originally e-filed as an active fillable form. Edited docket text re title of filed document.) (akr).
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1405 ORDER STAYING CASE PENDING APPEAL. In light of Ameranth's appeal of the Court's order and judgment of unpatentability of the '077 Patent in member case No. 12cv0733, the Court stays all other pending cases in these coordinated proceedings. Upon issuance of a final decision from the Federal Circuit, the parties shall request that the stay be lifted so these cases may proceed. The parties shall include a copy of the Federal Circuit's final decision with that request. The Clerk of Court shall administratively close these cases. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/30/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1404 USCA Case Number 19-1141 for #1401 Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit filed by Ameranth, Inc. (akr)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1403 OBJECTION by Ameranth, Inc. re #1402 MOTION for Entry of Judgment . (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1402 Request for Entry of Judgment filed as - SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., Marriott International, Inc. Defendants' Request for Entry of Judgment. (Saros, Nick) Modified on 10/30/2018 to match document title; motion added (aef).
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1401 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit as to #1395 Order Granting Defendants Domino's Pizza, LLC and Domino's Pizza, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment, by Ameranth, Inc. (Filing fee $ 505 receipt number 0974-11834663.) (Caldarelli, William). (Modified on 10/25/2018: Added link to Order. Notice of Appeal electronically transmitted to the US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit.) (akr).
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1400 NOTICE Defendants' Submission in Support of Proposed Judgment by Apple, Inc., Eventbrite, Inc., Hilton International Co., Hilton Resorts Corporation, Hilton Worldwide, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, Inc., Ticketfly, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Gibson, Erin) (aef).
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1399 NOTICE AMERANTH, INC.'S Status Report on Form of Judgment to be entered and proposed Form of Judgment by Ameranth, Inc. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1398 ORDER Granting #1397 Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to File Joint Proposed Judgment/Judgments or Status Report. The joint motion is GRANTED. The parties have until October 9, 2018 to submit to the Court either a joint proposed judgment/judgments or a joint status report. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/2/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1397 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Judgment/Judgments or Status Report by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1396 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Motion Hearing) held on 9/21/2018, before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 10/17/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/29/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/26/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. Notice of Filing of Official Transcript only.) (akr)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1395 ORDER Granting Defendants Domino's Pizza, LLC and Domino's Pizza, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court grants Domino's motion for summary judgment of unpatentability, and vacates all dates currently set in these cases. The parties shall meet and confer on the form of judgment, i.e., whether judgment should be entered in the lead case on all claims or whether judgment should be entered in each individual case, and submit either a joint proposed judgment/judgments or a joint status report on or before October 2, 2018. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/25/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1394 Minute Order. The settlement conference set for September 26, 2018 (Ameranth and Papa John's) is VACATED, to be rescheduled at a later date. (no document attached) (ajf)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1393 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Settlement Conference (Ameranth and Domino's) held on 9/25/2018. Case did not resolve.(no document attached) (ajf)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1392 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Domino's Jury Instructions with Authority, #2 Exhibit B - Domino's Clean Copy of Jury Instructions)(Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1391 NOTICE - Special Verdict by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC (Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1390 Witness List by Ameranth, Inc. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1389 OBJECTION by Ameranth, Inc. AMERANTH, INC.'S OBJECTIONS TO DOMINO'S SUPPLEMENTAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1388 NOTICE - JOINT SET OF PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Ameranth, Inc. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1387 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Ameranth, Inc. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1386 NOTICE JOINT STATEMENT OF THE CASE by Ameranth, Inc. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1385 Witness List by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1384 MOTION Ameranth's Ex Parte Motion Re Bringing Audiovisual Equipment Into The Courtroom During Trial by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1383 NOTICE - AMERANTH'S SPECIAL VERDICT FORM by Ameranth, Inc. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1382 Proposed Voir Dire by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1381 Proposed Voir Dire by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC. (Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1380 TRIAL BRIEF by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC. (Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1379 TRIAL BRIEF by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1378 Exhibit List by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC.. (Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1377 Witness List by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC. (Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1376 Ex Parte MOTION to Bring Audio Visual Equipment Into the Courtroom During Trial by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC. (Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1375 NOTICE of Joinder by Papa John's USA, Inc. re #1120 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Unpatentability (Davison, Dan) (aef).
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1374 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1369 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff Ameranth, Inc.'s Brief In Support Of Discovery Dispute (Supplemental brief per Clerk's instruction) filed by Grubhub, Inc., Seamless North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of E. Faragi, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Faragi, Eric) (aef).
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1373 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing Date on Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. No. 1358 by O-Web Technologies LTD. (Licygiewicz, Arthur) (aef).
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1372 MINUTE ORDER. The Court will convene a continued settlement conference with Ameranth and the Domino's entities on September 25, 2018, beginning at 7:30 a.m. PST. SO ORDERED by Judge William V. Gallo on September 21, 2018.(no document attached) (ajf)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1371 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Motion Hearing re Motion for Summary Judgment held on 9/21/2018. Court to issue order. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney William Caldarelli, Ethan Watts). (Defendant Attorney Tom Cunningham, Frank Angileri). (no document attached) (jak)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1370 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1362 Ex Parte MOTION for Joinder re #1074 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness - Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To GrubHub's Ex Parte Application To Join Other Defendants' Motions For Summary Judgment filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (sjm).
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1369 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff Ameranth, Inc.'s Brief In Support Of Discovery Dispute by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Brandon J. Witkow In Support Of Plaintiff Ameranth, Inc.'s Brief In Support Of Discovery Dispute)(Caldarelli, William) (sjm).
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1368 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1367 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Boggs, Elizabeth) (dlg).
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1367 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Boggs, Elizabeth) (dlg).
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1366 MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Expert Reports of Drs. Brown and Malek by Grubhub, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities (Redacted), #2 Declaration E. Boggs, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22)(Boggs, Elizabeth) (sjm).
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1365 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1364 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (dlg).
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1364 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (dlg).
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1363 MOTION to Exclude Ameranth, Inc.'s Motion To Exclude Opinions Of: (1) Stephen Becker; (2) Kenneth Free; (3) Nathaniel Polish; (4) Itamar Simonson by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memorandum Of Points & Authorities In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Motion To Exclude Opinions Of: (1) Stephen Becker; (2) Kenneth Free; (3) Nathaniel Polish; (4) Itamar Simonson, #2 Declaration Declaration of William J. Caldarelli In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Notice Of Lodgment Of Documents In Support Of Motion To Exclude Opinions Of: (1) Stephen Becker; (2) Kenneth Free; (3) Nathaniel Polish; (4) Itamar Simonson, #3 Notice Notice Of Lodgment Of Exhibits In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Motion To Exclude Opinions Of: (1) Stephen Becker; (2) Kenneth Free; (3) Nathaniel Polish; (4) Itamar Simonson, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8(a), #12 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (sjm).
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1362 Ex Parte MOTION for Joinder re #1074 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness by Grubhub, Inc., Seamless North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Faragi, Eric) (sjm).
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1361 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1360 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Faragi, Eric) (dlg).
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1360 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Faragi, Eric) (dlg).
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1359 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Invalidity by Grubhub, Inc., Seamless North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of E. Faragi in support, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22)(Faragi, Eric) (sjm).
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1358 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by O-Web Technologies LTD. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Sheryl H. Love, #3 Exhibit 1 - Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 2 - Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 3 - Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit 4 - Filed Under Seal, #7 Exhibit 5 - Filed Under Seal, #8 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Ryan Younker, #9 Exhibit 7 - Claim 13 of USP 8,146,077, #10 Exhibit 8 - Filed Under Seal, #11 Exhibit 9 - Reply & Amdt, #12 Exhibit 10 - Excerpts of Doc 922-1, #13 Exhibit 11 - Excerpts of 3-23-18 Hearing, #14 Exhibit 12 - Filed Under Seal, #15 Exhibit 13 - Filed Under Seal, #16 Exhibit 14 - Excerpts of Shamos Depo, #17 Exhibit 15 - Excerpts of Doc 1181, #18 Exhibit 16 - Claim Construction Order, #19 Exhibit 17 - Filed Under Seal, #20 Exhibit 18 - 8,146,077 Patent, #21 Exhibit 19 - 3-27-18 (86) - IPDEV v Ameranth, #22 Exhibit 20 - Excerpts of Doc 1140)(Licygiewicz, Arthur) (aef).
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1357 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1356 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Licygiewicz, Arthur) (aef).
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1356 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Licygiewicz, Arthur) (aef).
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1355 NOTICE of Appearance of Sean M. Casey by Joseph R.R. Tache on behalf of Best Western International, Inc. (Tache, Joseph) (aef).
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1353 ORDER Re #876 Motion to File Documents Under Seal in Support of Ameranth's Opposition to Defendant Ticketfly Inc.'s Motion to Strike Ameranth's Infringement Contentions. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Ameranth's Motion to File Documents Under Seal is GRANTED, and the following documents may be filed under seal pursuant to Local Rule 79.2: An un-redacted copy of Ameranth's brief in Opposition to Defendant Ticketfly, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Ameranth's Infringement Contentions; Exhibit 1-3. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/14/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1352 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1298 In Limine MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff From Using Inadmissible Evidence From Previous Cases and Communications, #1297 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence or Arguments About CBM Petition Institution Denials by the PTAB, #1307 In Limine MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff from Offering Evidence of Secondary Consideration, #1291 In Limine MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff from Offering Evidence of Size, Wealth, Entire Market Value, or Overall Online Revenues of Defendants, #1294 In Limine MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff from Offering Impermissible Character and Opinion Testimony CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1351 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1298 In Limine MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff From Using Inadmissible Evidence From Previous Cases and Communications, #1294 In Limine MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff from Offering Impermissible Character and Opinion Testimony DECLARATION OF WITKOW IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITIONS TO DOMINO'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE FROM PREVIOUS CASES AND COMMUNICATIONS AND MOTION TO PRECLUDE CHARACTER AND OPINION TESTIMONY filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1350 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1307 In Limine MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff from Offering Evidence of Secondary Consideration filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1349 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1298 In Limine MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff From Using Inadmissible Evidence From Previous Cases and Communications filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1348 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1291 In Limine MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff from Offering Evidence of Size, Wealth, Entire Market Value, or Overall Online Revenues of Defendants filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1347 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1294 In Limine MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff from Offering Impermissible Character and Opinion Testimony filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1346 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1297 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence or Arguments About CBM Petition Institution Denials by the PTAB filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1345 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1344 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1344 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1343 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1303 In Limine MOTION MOTIONS IN LIMINE 1 THROUGH 5 Response to Motion in Limine No. 1 (To Exclude Evidence Or Mention Of The Invalidity Of Other Patents Not In Suit) filed by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Thomas W. Cunningham, #2 Exhibit 1 - Excerpt of deposition transcript of Christine Meyer, Ph.D., #3 Exhibit 2 - Excerpt of deposition transcript of Jeffrey F. Brown, Ph.D. - FILED UNDER SEAL, #4 Exhibit 3 - Excerpt of Brown Starbucks Report - FILED UNDER SEAL)(Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1342 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1303 In Limine MOTION MOTIONS IN LIMINE 1 THROUGH 5 Response to Motion in Limine No. 5 (To Exclude Evidence Or Argument That The Accused Product Practices Other Patents Or Art) filed by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC. (Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1341 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1303 In Limine MOTION MOTIONS IN LIMINE 1 THROUGH 5 Response to Motion in Limine No. 4 (To Preclude Claims Constructions And Interpretations Inconsistent With The Court's Constructions And To Exclude Prior Art References And Invalidity Defenses Not Previously Disclosed) filed by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC. (Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1340 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1303 In Limine MOTION MOTIONS IN LIMINE 1 THROUGH 5 Response to Motion in Limine No. 3 (To Exclude Arguments Or Representations That An Award of Damages Would Increase Prices Charged To Consumers) filed by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC. (Cunningham, Thomas)(aef).
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1339 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1303 In Limine MOTION MOTIONS IN LIMINE 1 THROUGH 5 Response to Motion in Limine No. 2 (To Exclude Disparaging References To Patent Holder And Evidence Or Mention Of Other Ameranth Litigation) filed by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC. (Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1338 ORDER Granting #1334 Joint Motion for Voluntary Dismissal Dismissal with Prejudice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: (a) Ameranth's complaint and claims for relief against Pizza Hut and QuikOrder; and (b) Pizza Hut and QuikOrder's counterclaims and claims for relief against Ameranth, are hereby dismissed with prejudice, with each side to bear its own fees and costs incurred. Pursuant to D.I. 1283, Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo will retain jurisdiction over the parties for the purpose of enforcing the terms of the confidential settlement agreement between the parties. Nothing herein shall operate as a dismissal of any of Ameranth's complaints or claims for relief against any of the other parties to the lawsuits consolidated under Lead Case No. 11-cv-1810. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/13/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1337 ORDER Vacating Settlement Disposition Conference. In light of the joint motion to dismiss (Doc. No. 1334) Pizza Hut, Inc.; Pizza Hut of America, Inc.; and QuickOrder, Inc., the telephonic settlement disposition conference scheduled for September 21, 2018, at 8:30 a.m. is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/12/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1336 MOTION to Seal a Previously Filed Document Unopposed re #841 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal by IPDEV Co.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Proof of Service)(Warnecke, Andrew) (aef).
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1335 ORDER Granting #1333 Ex Parte Motion for Reconsideration. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall not file publicly the documents subject to Ameranth's motion to seal (Dkt. No. 814), and the DLA Defendants shall submit redacted versions of those documents and/or identify by declaration any documents that should be sealed in their entirety. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/12/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1334 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Joint Motion For Voluntary Mutual Dismissal With Prejudice By: (1) Ameranth, Inc.; (2) Pizza Hut, LLC; and (3) QuikOrder, Inc. by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1333 Ex Parte MOTION for Reconsideration re #1326 Order on Motion to File Documents Under Seal by Apple, Inc., Eventbrite, Inc., Hilton International Co., Hilton Resorts Corporation, Hilton Worldwide, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Jacob Anderson)(Gibson, Erin)Attorney Erin Paige Gibson added to party Hilton International Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Erin Paige Gibson added to party Hilton Resorts Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Erin Paige Gibson added to party Hilton Worldwide, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Erin Paige Gibson added to party Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, Inc.(pty:dft) (aef).
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1332 NOTICE of Appearance of Brent Caslin on behalf of Marriott International, Inc., Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., Renaissance Hotel Operating Company, and The Ritz Carlton Hotel Company, LLC by Brent Caslin on behalf of Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., Marriott International, Inc., Renaissance Hotel Operating Company, The Ritz Carlton Hotel Company, LLC (Caslin, Brent)Attorney Brent Caslin added to party Marriott Hotel Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Brent Caslin added to party Marriott International, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Brent Caslin added to party Renaissance Hotel Operating Company(pty:dft), Attorney Brent Caslin added to party The Ritz Carlton Hotel Company, LLC(pty:dft) (aef).
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Motions and Judge Association terminated: #923 MOTION to Seal a Previously Filed Document re #783 MOTION for Summary Adjudication of Unenforceability of '449 Patent Based On Inequitable Conduct In Prosecution of '739 Patent and '645 Application, #784 MOTION to filed by IPDEV Co. Motion was granted in case 14cv1303, Order #65 .(no document attached) (jak)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1331 ORDER Denying #1300 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/10/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1330 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Conference held on 9/10/2018(no document attached) (ajf)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1328 ORDER Re #802 Motion to File Documents Under Seal in Support of Best Western International, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/10/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1327 ORDER Granting #1306 Joint Motion to Extend Expert Discovery and Dispositive Motions Deadline (as to Ameranth and Mobo Systems, Inc. d/k/a OLO Only). Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/10/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1326 ORDER Denying #814 Ameranth's Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/10/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1325 ORDER Denying #825 Motion to Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/10/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1323 ORDER Granting #828 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal in Support of Defendant Ticketfly Inc.'s Motion to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/10/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1322 ORDER Denying #841 Motion to File Documents Under Seal in Support of Ameranth's Motion for Summary Adjudication of Unenforceability of '449 Patent for Inequitable Conduct in its Prosecution. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/10/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1320 ORDER Re #1317 Plaintiff Ameranth, Inc.'s Motion to File Documents Under Seal in Support of Plaintiff Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Sanctions. The clerk of the Court shall seal Exhibits 2, 3, and 4 to Ameranth's Notice Of Lodgment Of Exhibits In Support Of Ameranth Inc.'s Opposition To Defendants' Motion For Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/10/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1319 ORDER Granting #1290 Joint Motion to Extend Expert Discovery and Dispositive Motions Deadline (as to Ameranth and Starbucks Only). Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/10/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1318 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 9/10/2018*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1317 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) Modified on 9/10/2018 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1317 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Caldarelli, William)(aef).
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1316 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1300 MOTION for Sanctions Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 Plaintiff Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To Defendants' Motion For Sanctions filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Plaintiff Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To Defendants' Motion For Sanctions, #2 Declaration Declaration Of Keith McNally, #3 Declaration Declaration of Kyle Bagley, #4 Declaration Declaration of Ben West, #5 Notice Notice of Lodgment, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1315 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1314 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1314 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1313 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1120 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Unpatentability Plaintiff Ameranth, Inc.s Supplemental Opposition To Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment Under 35 U.S.C. Section 101 filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration Of Michael Shamos, Ph.D., #2 Declaration Declaration Of John Osborne, #3 Declaration Declaration Of Keith McNally, #4 Notice Notice Of Lodgment, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #25 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1312 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1311 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1311 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1310 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC re #1297 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence or Arguments About CBM Petition Institution Denials by the PTAB CORRECTED Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Domino's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Arguments About CBM Petition Institution Denials by the PTAB. (Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1309 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1308 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1308 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1307 In Limine MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff from Offering Evidence of Secondary Consideration by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities FILED UNDER SEAL, #2 Declaration Thomas W. Cunningham, #3 Exhibit 1 - Ludlow dep excerpts, #4 Exhibit 2 - Shamos Report excerpts, #5 Exhibit 3 - McNally 1-11-09 Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 - McNally 8-19-09 Declaration, #7 Exhibit 5 - FILED UNDER SEAL McNally dep excerpts 3-12-18, #8 Exhibit 6 - FILED UNDER SEAL Bergfeld dep excerpts, #9 Exhibit 7 - FILED UNDER SEAL McNally 3-14-18 dep excerpts, #10 Exhibit 8 - Decision CBM2015-00080)(Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1306 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Plaintiff Ameranth And Defendant Mobo Systems, Inc. D/K/A Olo's Joint Motion To Extend Deadlines by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1304 ORDER Granting #1301 Domino's Motion to File Documents Under Seal. The Clerk of the Court shall seal Domino's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of its Motion for Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 Sanctions and Exhibits 1, 2, 3, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9 and 10 thereto. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/7/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1303 In Limine MOTION MOTIONS IN LIMINE 1 THROUGH 5 by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities MOTION LIMINE 2 TO EXCLUDE DISPARAGING REFERENCES TO PATENT HOLDER AND EVIDENCE OR MENTION OF OTHER AMERANTH LITIGATION, #2 Memo of Points and Authorities MOTION IN LIMINE 3 TO EXCLUDE ARGUMENTS OR PRESENTATIONS THAT AN AWARD OF DAMAGES WOULD INCREASE PRICES CHARGED TO CONSUMERS, #3 Memo of Points and Authorities MOTION IN LIMINE 4 TO PRECLUDE CLAIMS CONSTRUCTIONS AND INTERPRETATIONS INCONSISTENT WITH COURT'S CONSTRUCTIONS AND TO EXCLUDE PRIOR ART REFERENCES AND INVALIDITY DEFENSES NOT PREVIOUSLY DISCLOSED, #4 Memo of Points and Authorities MOTION IN LIMINE 5 TO EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT THAT THE ACCUSED PRODUCT PRACTICES OTHER PATENTS OR ART)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1302 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1301 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Cunningham, Thomas)(aef).
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1301 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1300 MOTION for Sanctions Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit 1 - Cunningham 5-8-18 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts of McNally Dep, #4 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Thomas W. Cunningham, #5 Exhibit 4 - Bitheist Amended Subpoena, #6 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts of Bagley Dep, #7 Exhibit 6 - Text Messages, #8 Exhibit 7 - 2-15-18 McNally to Bagley Email, #9 Exhibit 8 - 2-15-18 Email McNally to Bagley, #10 Exhibit 9 - Email produced by Ameranth)(Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1299 Minute Order. for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Denying as moot #833 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal filed by QuikOrder, Inc., Pizza Hut of America, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc.. (no document attached) (jak)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1298 In Limine MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff From Using Inadmissible Evidence From Previous Cases and Communications by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Thomas W. Cunningham, #3 Exhibit 1 - Harker Dep Excerpts, #4 Exhibit 2 - IPDEV Transcript)(Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1297 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence or Arguments About CBM Petition Institution Denials by the PTAB by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Thomas W. Cunningham, #3 Exhibit 1 - Decision)(Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1296 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1295 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Cunningham, Thomas)(aef).
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1295 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1294 In Limine MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff from Offering Impermissible Character and Opinion Testimony by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities FILED UNDER SEAL, #2 Declaration Thomas W. Cunningham, #3 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts of Dep of Judd Goldfeder, #4 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts of Dep of John Harker - FILED UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit 3 - Excerpts of Ameranth v Menusoft Trial Transcript morning 9-13-10, #6 Exhibit 4 - Excerpts of Dep of Katherine Sanders - FILED UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts of Ameranth v Menusoft trial transcript afternoon 9-13-10, #8 Exhibit 6 - Ameranth Press Release 4-6-01, #9 Exhibit 7 - Excerpts of Dep of Keith McNally - FILED UNDER SEAL)(Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1293 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1292 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1292 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Cunningham, Thomas)(aef).
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1291 In Limine MOTION to Preclude Plaintiff from Offering Evidence of Size, Wealth, Entire Market Value, or Overall Online Revenues of Defendants by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Thomas W. Cunningham, #3 Exhibit 1 - Expert Report of Jeffrey F. Brown, Ph.D.)(Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1290 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Plaintiff Ameranth's And Defendant Starbucks Corporation's Joint Motion To Extend Expert Discovery And Dispositive Motion Deadlines by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1289 ORDER Scheduling Discovery Conference. The Court will convene a telephonic discovery conference with counsel for Ameranth and Domino's Pizza, LLC/Inc. on September 10, 2018 at 12:00 p.m. PST. The Court will initiate the call. Domino's discovery dispute statement is due by 2:00 p.m. PST on September 7, 2018. Ameranth's response is due no later than 11:59 p.m. on the same day. Both statements are limited to 7 pages of substance. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/6/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1288 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Settlement Conference held on 9/4/2018(no document attached) (ajf)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1287 ORDER Granting #1285 Domino's Ex Parte Motion on issues regarding unpatentability under 35 U.S.C. 101. Domino's ex parte motion to join Pizza Hut's motion for summary judgment of unpatentability is granted. The motion shall be reset for hearing on September 21, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. Ameranth may file a supplemental opposition on or before September 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/30/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1286 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1285 Ex Parte Motion on Issues Regarding Unpatentability Under 35 U.S.C. 101 Plaintiff Ameranth, Inc.'s Partial Opposition To Defendant Domino's Pizza's Ex Parte Application filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1285 Ex Parte Motion on Issues Regarding Unpatentability Under 35 U.S.C. 101 by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Cunningham, Thomas) Modified on 8/29/2018-to match document title (aef).
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1284 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Ameranth, Inc. (Docket No. 1282). (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1283 NOTICE of Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge by Ameranth, Inc. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1282 ***DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER ECF #1284 *** - ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Consent To Jurisdiction By A United States Magistrate Judge. (Caldarelli, William) Modified on 8/27/2018-QC mailer sent re wrong event (aef). Modified on 8/27/2018-to withdraw document (aef).
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1281 ORDER Granting #1279 Joint Motion to Extend Certain Expert-Related Deadlines and Dispositive Motions Cutoff (as to Ameranth and Grubhub only) Ameranth shall provide to GrubHub, and GrubHub shall provide to Ameranth, rebuttal expert reports no later than August 25, 2018. The expert and third-party discovery deadline between Ameranth and GrubHub is extended September 17, 2018, and the dispositive motion deadline between Ameranth and GrubHub only is extended September 17, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/23/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1279 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File - Plaintiff Ameranth's And Defendant GrubHub's Joint Motion To Extend Time For Expert Depositions by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1278 ORDER regarding transcript of sealed settlement proceedings on August 20, 2018.(ajf)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Order by Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Motions and Judge Association terminated: #892 Ex Parte MOTION to Allow the Use of Electrical Equipment in the Courtroom During Claim Construction Hearing filed by Ameranth, Inc. is denied as moot. (no document attached) (jak)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Order by Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Motions and Judge Association terminated: The following motions were ruled on in Case 14cv1303-DMS, Order #86 : Granting #922 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ameranth, Inc.; Denying #935 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Ameranth's Inequitable Conduct Claims filed by IPDEV Co.; Denying #937 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Written Description Support and Enablement in the Specification of the '449 Patent filed by IPDEV Co.; Denying #938 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Ameranth's First through Fourth and Eight Through Fourteenth Affirmative Defenses filed by IPDEV Co. (no document attached) (jak)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1277 ORDER Vacating Scheduling Order and Scheduling Settlement Disposition Conference (as to action against Pizza Hut, Inc.; Pizza Hut of America, Inc.; and Quickorder, Inc. only) On or before September 19, 2018, the parties shall file a joint motion to dismiss this action in its entirety and with prejudice. A telephonic settlement disposition conference is scheduled for September 21, 2018, at 8:30 a.m. The trial Scheduling Order involving Defendants (Doc. No. 1248) is VACATED in its entirety. The August 22, 2018 hearing (see Doc. No. 1264) set before the Honorable Dana M. Sabraw is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/20/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1276 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Continued Mandatory Settlement Conference between Ameranth, Pizza Hut, and QuickOrder held on August 28, 2018. Case resolved as to these parties only. Terms set forth on record. Record ordered SEALED. Order setting deadlines to issue.(no document attached) (ajf)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1275 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 2/8/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1267 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Yu, George) (aef). Modified on 2/11/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1274 In Limine MOTION To Exclude Evidence Or Argument That The Accused Product Practices Other Patents Or Art, And Non-Infringing Alternative Not Revealed Until Supplemental Report (MIL No. 5) by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1273 In Limine MOTION In Limine MOTION To Preclude Claims Constructions And Interpretations Inconsistent With The Court's Constructions And To Exclude Prior Art References And Invalidity Or Non-Infringement Defenses Or Expert Opinions Not Previously Disclosed (MIL No. 4) by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1272 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by QuikOrder, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc. re #1268 Notice of Lodgment,, filed by QuikOrder, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc. . (Yu, George) (aef).
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1271 In Limine MOTION To Exclude Arguments Or Representations That An Award Of Damages Would Increase Prices Charged By Defendants To Consumers (MIL No. 3) by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1270 In Limine MOTION To Exclude Disparaging References To Patent Holder And Evidence Or Mention Of Other Ameranth Litigation (MIL No. 2) by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1269 In Limine MOTION to Exclude Evidence Or Mention Of The Invalidating Of Other Related Patents Not In Suit by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1268 ***DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER ECF #1272 *** - NOTICE of Lodgment by Pizza Hut, Inc., QuikOrder, Inc. re #1267 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan (under seal), #3 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan (under seal), #4 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan (under seal), #5 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan (under seal), #6 Exhibit G to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan (under seal), #7 Exhibit H to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan (under seal), #8 Exhibit R to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan (under seal))(Yu, George) Modified on 8/20/2018 to withdraw document (aef).
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1267 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Yu, George) (aef).
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1266 In Limine MOTION to Preclude Evidence (Nos. 1-5) by Pizza Hut, Inc., QuikOrder, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Arun J. Mohan, #3 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan (under seal), #4 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan (under seal), #5 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan, #6 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan, #7 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan, #8 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan, #9 Exhibit G to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan, #10 Exhibit H to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan, #11 Exhibit I to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan (under seal), #12 Exhibit J to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan (under seal), #13 Exhibit K to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan (under seal), #14 Exhibit L to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan (under seal), #15 Exhibit M to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan (under seal), #16 Exhibit N to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan (under seal), #17 Exhibit O to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan (under seal), #18 Exhibit P to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan (under seal), #19 Exhibit Q to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan (under seal), #20 Exhibit R to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan, #21 Exhibit S to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan (under seal))(Yu, George)(aef).
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1265 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Mandatory Settlement Conference (between Ameranth, Pizza Hut, and QuickOrder) held on August 17, 2018. Settlement not reached at this time. Further settlement discussions set for August 20, 2018 at 6:00 a.m. via telephone. The Court will initiate the teleconferences.(no document attached) (ajf)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1264 ORDER Setting Hearing. (Re ECF #1120 ) Pizza Hut's motion for summary judgment of unpatentability is currently pending before the Court. The Court would like to hear argument on this motion, and thus sets the motion for telephonic hearing on August 22, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/17/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1263 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Final Pretrial Conference) held on 8/3/2018, before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 9/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. Notice of Filing of Official Transcript only.) (akr)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1262 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule. (Re ECF #1261 ) Ameranth shall file any opposition to the motion on or before August 22, 2018. No reply brief will be accepted. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/15/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1261 MOTION to Bifurcate defense of patent ineligibility for bench trial by Pizza Hut, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Beres, Joel) Modified on 8/15/2018-QC mailer sent re missing hearing date and time (aef).
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1260 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance for Gino D. Serpe by IPDEV Co. (Serpe, Gino) (aef).
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1259 NOTICE Of Errata (Docket No. 1237-6 - Exhibit 5(c) to Ameranth's Pre-Trial Order With Pizza Hut-QuikOrder) by Ameranth, Inc. re #1237 Notice (Other),, (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1258 ORDER on Discovery Disputes (Starbucks Mobile Payment)(Parties: Ameranth and Starbucks). Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/9/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1257 Amended Order Re: Expert Reports, Discovery, and Motions Deadlines (Ameranth and Grubhub/Seamless only). (ECF #1255 ) Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/9/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1256 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Kathleen Boggs on behalf of Grubhub, Inc., Seamless North America, LLC (Boggs, Elizabeth)Attorney Elizabeth Kathleen Boggs added to party Grubhub, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth Kathleen Boggs added to party Seamless North America, LLC(pty:dft) (aef).
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1255 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Unopposed) by Grubhub, Inc., Seamless North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proof of Service)(Faragi, Eric) (aef).
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1254 NOTICE of Stipulation re Authenticity of Previously Produced Taco Bell Documents by Ameranth, Inc., Apple, Inc., Eventbrite, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Fandango, Inc., Grubhub, Inc., Hilton International Co., Hilton Resorts Corporation, Hilton Worldwide, Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotels.com, LP, Hotwire, Inc., Hyatt Corporation, Kayak Software Corporation, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., Marriott International, Inc., Mobo Systems, Inc., O-Web Technologies LTD, Opentable, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Papa John's USA, Inc., Renaissance Hotel Operating Company, Seamless North America, LLC, Starbucks Corporation, Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, Inc., Stubhub, Inc., The Ritz Carlton Hotel Company, LLC, Ticketfly, Inc., Ticketmaster, LLC, Travelocity.com, LP, Usablenet, Inc. (Davison, Dan) (aef).
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1253 ORDER Granting #1252 Second Joint Motion for Extension of Expert Discovery Deadlines (Ameranth and Starbucks Corporation Only). Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/7/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1252 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Plaintiff Ameranth's And Defendants Starbucks Corporation's Second Joint Motion To Extend Deadlines by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1251 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Ameranth, Inc. re #1250 Joint MOTION Extension of Expert Report Exchanges & Discovery and Motion Deadlines Plaintiff Ameranth's And Defendant Starbucks Corporation's Second Joint Motion To Extend Deadlines filed by Ameranth, Inc. . (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1250 ***DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER ECF #1251 *** - Joint MOTION Extension of Expert Report Exchanges & Discovery and Motion Deadlines Plaintiff Ameranth's And Defendant Starbucks Corporation's Second Joint Motion To Extend Deadlines by Ameranth, Inc. (Caldarelli, William) Modified on 8/6/2018 to withdraw document (aef).
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1249 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1027 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Ameranth, Inc.s Supplemental Claim Construction Brief For Master Menu Claim Term - filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Expert Declaration of Michael I. Shamos, Ph.D. In Support Of Ameranths Supplemental Claim Construction Brief For Master Menu Claim Term, #2 Declaration Declaration of Ethan M. Watts In Support Of Ameranths Supplemental Claim Construction Brief For Master Menu Claim Term, #3 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1248 ORDER re: Trial (Pizza Hut and Quikorder) Jury Trial set for 9/4/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 13A before Judge Dana M. Sabraw., Motion In Limine Hearing set for 8/31/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 13A before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/03/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1247 ORDER re: Trial (Papa John's) Jury Trial set for 11/13/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 13A before Judge Dana M. Sabraw., Motion In Limine Hearing set for 11/9/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 13A before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/03/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1246 ORDER re: Trial (Domino's). Jury Trial set for 10/1/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 13A before Judge Dana M. Sabraw., Motion In Limine Hearing set for 9/21/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 13A before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/03/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1245 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Pretrial Conference held on 8/3/2018. Court to issue order. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney William Caldarelli, Lee Hejmanowski, Ethan Watts). (Defendant Attorney Matthew Mock, George Yu, Christine Feller, Thomas Rammer, Christopher Bruno, Joel Beers, Melissa Smith, Arun Mohan, Richard Zembek, Stephanie Debrow, Frank Angeleri, Thomas Cunningham). (no document attached) (jak)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1244 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Defendant Papa John's USA, Inc. Defendants' Supplemental Claim Construction Brief on "Master Menu". (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Davison, Dan) (aef).
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1243 NOTICE Of Errata (Docket No. 1237-11 - Exhibit 8(a) to Ameranth's Pre-Trial Order With Pizza Hut-QuikOrder) by Ameranth, Inc. re #1237 Notice (Other),, (Caldarelli, William) (jpp).
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1242 ORDER re #1233 ex parte motion for an order adjusting trial and pretrial dates for Hotel Company Defendants. Memoranda of Contentions of Fact and Law deadline is adjusted from December 28, 2018 to February 1, 2019. Proposed final pretrial conference order deadline is adjusted from January 18, 2019 to February 22, 2019. The final pretrial conference scheduled on the calendar of the Honorable Dana M. Sabraw is adjusted from January 25, 2019 to March 1, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. the first trial date for this group, for Defendant Marriot, is adjusted from February 25, 2019 to April 1, 2019; the date on which the trials of the remaining Defendants in this group will commence is adjusted from March 25, 2019 to April 29, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/02/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1241 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of James S. Renard, re #1240 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/30/2018.(dsn)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1240 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11500741.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Renard, James) (dsn)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1239 NOTICE Joint Pre-Trial Order (Papa John's) by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5(a), #6 Exhibit 5(b), #7 Exhibit 5(c), #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8(a), #11 Exhibit 8(b), #12 Exhibit 8(c), #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jpp).
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1238 NOTICE Joint Pre-Trial Order (Domino's) by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5(a), #6 Exhibit 5(b), #7 Exhibit 5(c), #8 Exhibit 6(a), #9 Exhibit 6(b), #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8(a), #12 Exhibit 8(b), #13 Exhibit 8(c), #14 Exhibit 9(a), #15 Exhibit 9(b), #16 Exhibit 9(c), #17 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (jpp).
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1237 NOTICE Joint Pre-Trial Order (Pizza Hut-QuikOrder) by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 5(a), #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5(b), #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5(c), #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6(a), #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6(b), #9 Exhibit Exhibit 6(c), #10 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 8(a), #12 Exhibit Exhibit 8(b), #13 Exhibit Exhibit 8(c), #14 Exhibit Exhibit 9(a), #15 Exhibit Exhibit 9(b), #16 Proof of Service, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Caldarelli, William) (jpp).
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1236 ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING In Re: motion for summary judgment of noninfringement filed by Defendants QuikOrder, Inc. and Pizza Hut, LLC. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 07/27/2018.(jpm)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1235 NOTICE of Non-Opposition by Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., Marriott International, Inc., Renaissance Hotel Operating Company, The Ritz Carlton Hotel Company, LLC re #1233 Ex Parte MOTION Extension of trial and related dates Plaintiff Ameranth, Inc.'s Ex Parte Motion For Order Adjusting Trial And Pretrial Dates For Hotel Company Defendants (Saros, Nick) (jpp).
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1234 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1203 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Expert Declarations in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Papa John's USA, Inc.. (Davison, Dan) (aef).
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1233 Ex Parte MOTION Extension of trial and related dates Plaintiff Ameranth, Inc.'s Ex Parte Motion For Order Adjusting Trial And Pretrial Dates For Hotel Company Defendants by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memorandum Of Points & Authorities In Support Of Plaintiff Ameranth, Inc.'s Ex Parte Motion For Order Adjusting Trial And Pretrial Dates For Hotel Company Defendants, #2 Declaration Declaration of William J. Caldarelli In Support Of Plaintiff Ameranth, Inc.'s Ex Parte Motion For Order Adjusting Trial And Pretrial Dates For Hotel Company Defendants, #3 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1232 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1217 MOTION to Strike the Declarations of Dr. Sam Malek, Dr. Michael Shamos, and Michel Cardinal That Were Filed in Support of Ameranth's Opposition to Domino's Motion for Summary Adjudication filed by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC. (Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1231 RESPONSE re #1202 Order, Declaration Of Keith McNally In Response To Order On Discovery Disputes Following In Camera Review [Dkt. No. 1202] filed by Ameranth, Inc. (Caldarelli, William)(acc).
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1230 OBJECTION by Ameranth, Inc. Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To Defendant Papa John's USA, Inc.'s Motion To Strike Ameranth's Expert Declarations In Opposition To Motion For Summary Judgment. (Caldarelli, William) (jdt).
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1229 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1124 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-infringement Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To Defendant QuikOrder, Inc.'s Motion To Strike Ameranth's Expert Declarations In Opposition To Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (jdt).
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1228 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1217 MOTION to Strike the Declarations of Dr. Sam Malek, Dr. Michael Shamos, and Michel Cardinal That Were Filed in Support of Ameranth's Opposition to Domino's Motion for Summary Adjudication filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (jdt).
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1227 ORDER Re: Oral Argument. Defendants' summary judgment motions are currently scheduled for hearing on July 20, 2018. The Court finds these matters suitable for decision without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). Accordingly, the July 20, 2018 hearing is vacated. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/16/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1225 ORDER Granting #1207 Starbucks Corporation's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal in Support of its Discovery Dispute Submission Regarding Mobile Payment. The Clerk of the Court shall seal Doc. No. 1206-4: Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Patrick J. McKeever in Support of Starbucks Corporation's Discovery Dispute Submission Regarding Mobile Payment. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/16/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1223 ORDER Re Plaintiff Ameranth, Inc.'s Motion to Seal in Support of its Motion Re Discovery Dispute with Starbucks. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Ameranth's Motion to File Document Under Seal (Doc. No. 1204) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/16/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1222 ORDER Denying #1042 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/16/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1221 ORDER Denying #1041 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/16/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1220 ORDER Denying #1082 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/16/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1219 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 2/8/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1218 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Cunningham, Thomas) (aef). Modified on 2/11/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1218 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1217 MOTION to Strike the Declarations of Dr. Sam Malek, Dr. Michael Shamos, and Michel Cardinal That Were Filed in Support of Ameranth's Opposition to Domino's Motion for Summary Adjudication by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 1 - Ameranth's Expert Disclosure, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of John Rondini (Under Seal), #4 Exhibit 3 - 3-23-18 Dep Transcript of Sam Malek (Under Seal), #5 Exhibit 4 - Ameranth's Infringement Contentions 4-1-13, #6 Exhibit 5 - Ameranth's Infringement Contentions 7-5-17, #7 Exhibit 6 - Exhibit C to Sam Malek's March 2018 Infringement Report (Under Seal), #8 Exhibit 7 - July 2018 email from Ben West to Tom Cunningham, #9 Exhibit 8 - 10-25-17 Dep Trans of Michael Shamos)(Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1216 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 2/8/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1215 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Cunningham, Thomas) (aef). Modified on 2/11/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1215 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1214 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1109 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration John P. Rondini, #2 Exhibit 18 - 11-15-17 Dep Trans of Michael Shamos, #3 Exhibit 19 - Screen Capture (Under Seal), #4 Exhibit 20 - Screen Capture (Under Seal), #5 Exhibit 21 - Screen Capture (Under Seal), #6 Exhibit 22 - Portion of 6.2 to Ameranth's Opp to Domino's Mot for Summary Judgment, #7 Exhibit 23 - Transcript excerpts of 5-14-18 dep of Malek 30b6 (Under Seal), #8 Exhibit 24 - Transcript excerpts of 5-14-18 dep of Malek (Under Seal))(Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1213 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1212 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Yu, George) (aef). (Main Document 1213 replaced on 2/11/2019) (aef).
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1212 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Yu, George) (aef).
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1211 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1124 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-infringement (under seal) filed by QuikOrder, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Objections and Motion to Strike Ameranth's Expert Declarations (under seal), #2 Declaration of Arun J. Mohan, #3 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan, #4 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan, #5 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan, #6 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan, #7 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan, #8 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan, #9 Exhibit G to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan, #10 Exhibit H to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan (under seal), #11 Exhibit I to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan (under seal), #12 Exhibit J to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan (under seal))(Yu, George) (aef).
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1210 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1120 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Unpatentability filed by Pizza Hut of America, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. IPDEV DE# 71-1, #2 Exhibit B. Post Grant Review Certificates)(Smith, Melissa) (aef).
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1209 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Plaintiff Ameranth, Inc. re Discovery Dispute with Starbucks. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Ben West in Support of Plaintiff Ameranth, Inc.'s Motion re Discovery Dispute with Starbucks, #2 Notice Plaintiff Ameranth, Inc.'s Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits in Support of Its Motion re Discovery Dispute with Starbucks, #3 Exhibit NOL Ex. A, #4 Exhibit NOL Ex. B, #5 Exhibit NOL Ex. C, #6 Exhibit NOL Ex. D, #7 Exhibit NOL Ex. E, #8 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1208 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 7/16/2018*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1207 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (McKeever, Patrick) (aef). (Main Document 1208 replaced on 7/16/2018) (aef). Modified on 7/16/2018 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1207 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (McKeever, Patrick) (aef).
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1206 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Defendant Starbucks Corporation (Starbucks Corporation's Discovery Dispute Submission Regarding Mobile Payment). (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick J. McKeever, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3 - REDACTED, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(McKeever, Patrick) (aef).
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1205 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 7/16/2018*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1204 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (aef). (Main Document 1205 replaced on 7/16/2018) (aef). Modified on 7/16/2018 to add filed date of lodgment (aef).
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1204 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1203 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Expert Declarations in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by Papa John's USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Davison, Dan) (aef).
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1202 ORDER on Discovery Disputes Following in Camera Review. (ECF #1035 , 1048 , 1050 , 1070 , #1103 ) No later than July 20, 2018, Ameranth shall file a declaration a total of 3 pages maximum. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/13/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1201 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1200 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Davison, Dan) (aef).
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1200 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Davison, Dan) (aef).
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1199 ORDER Denying #1197 Plaintiff Ameranth and Defendant O-Web Technologies Ltd.'s Second Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/12/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1198 ORDER Re: Oral Argument. The parties' Daubert motions are currently scheduled for hearing on July 13, 2018. The Court finds these matters suitable for decision without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). Accordingly, the July 13, 2018 hearing is vacated. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/11/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1197 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff Ameranth's And Defendant O-Web's Joint Motion To Extend Time To Provide Expert Reports by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1196 ORDER on #1044 Joint Motion to Substitute Defendants Pizza Hut, Inc.'s and Pizza Hut of America, Inc.'s Transferee and Successor in Interest. Pizza Hut, LLC is substituted as a defendant to the suit for the original defendants Pizza Hut, Inc. and Pizza Hut of America, Inc. This Order shall serve as actual notice of this action upon Pizza Hut, LLC. Pizza Hut, LLC is hereby deemed substituted in to the existing pleadings and discovery in this action for the originally named Pizza Hut defendant entities. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/9/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1195 ORDER Granting #1143 Joint Motion Re Substitution of Successor-In-Interest Grubhub Holdings Inc. The Court hereby Orders GrubHub Holdings Inc. is hereby substituted into the existing pleadings and discovery in this action for and in place of the originally named defendants, GrubHub, Inc. and Seamless North America, LLC. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/9/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1194 ORDER Granting #1164 Joint Motion to Extend Expert Reports, Expert Discovery, and Motions Deadlines (Ameranth, Grubhub, and Seamless Only). Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/9/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
July 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1193 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 2/8/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1176 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Yu, George) (aef). Modified on 2/11/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
July 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1192 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by QuikOrder, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., Pizza Hut of America, Inc. re #1177 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document . (Yu, George) (aef).
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1191 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 2/8/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1189 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (aef). Modified on 2/11/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1190 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 2/8/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1189 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (aef). Modified on 2/11/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1189 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1188 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1112 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Michel Cardinal, #2 Declaration Expert Declaration of Sam Malek, Ph.D, #3 Declaration Expert Declaration of Michael I. Shamos, #4 Declaration Declaration of Michael D. Fabiano, #5 Notice Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits, #6 Exhibit NOL - Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit NOL - Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit NOL - Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit NOL - Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit NOL - Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit NOL - Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit NOL - Exhibit 7, #13 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1187 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 2/8/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1186 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (aef). Modified on 2/11/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1186 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1185 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1109 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Plaintiff Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To Domino's Pizza, LLC And Domino's PIzza, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration Of Michel Cardinal In Support Of Ameranth's Opposition To Domino's Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement, #2 Declaration Declaration Of Sam Malek, Ph.D. In Support Of Ameranth's Opposition To Domino's Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement - FILED UNDER SEAL, #3 Declaration Declaration Of Michael I. Shamos, Ph.D. In Support Of Ameranth's Opposition To Domino's Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement, #4 Declaration Declaration Of Ben West In Support Of Ameranth's Opposition To Domino's Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement, #5 Proof of Service, #6 Notice Notice Of Lodgment Of Exhibits In Support Of Ameranth's Opposition To Domino's Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 6.1, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 6.2, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 6.3)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1184 MEMORANDUM OF FACTS AND CONTENTIONS OF LAW by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1183 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 2/8/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1182 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (aef). Modified on 2/11/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1182 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1181 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1124 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-infringement Ameranth's Opposition To Defendant QuikOrder, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement (Web Pages/Sychronization And Different Number Of Screens) filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts Ameranth's Civil LR 7.1(f) Separate Statement Of Reasons In Opposition And Material Facts In Dispute In Support Of Ameranth's Opposition To Defendant QuikOrder, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement (Web Pages/Sychronization And Different Number Of Screens), #2 Declaration Declaration Of Michel Cardinal In Support Of Ameranth's Opposition To Defendant QuikOrder, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement (Web Pages/Sychronization And Different Number Of Screens), #3 Declaration Declaration Of Sam Malek, Ph.D. In Support Of Ameranth's Opposition To Defendant QuikOrder, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement (Web Pages/Sychronization And Different Number Of Screens), #4 Declaration Declaration Of Ethan Watts In Support Of Ameranth's Opposition To Defendant QuikOrder, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement (Web Pages/Sychronization And Different Number Of Screens), #5 Notice Notice Of Lodgment Of Exhibits In Support Of Ameranth's Opposition To Defendant QuikOrder, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement (Web Pages/Sychronization And Different Number Of Screens), #6 Proof of Service, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1180 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 2/8/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1179 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Cunningham, Thomas) (aef). Modified on 2/11/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1179 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1178 MEMORANDUM OF FACTS AND CONTENTIONS OF LAW by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Domino's Exhibit List)(Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1177 ***DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER ECF #1192 *** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1176 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Yu, George) (aef). Modified on 7/9/2018 to withdraw document (aef).
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1176 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Yu, George) (aef).
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1175 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1174 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Zembek, Richard) (rmc).
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1174 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Zembek, Richard) (rmc).
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1173 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1121 MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Expert Reports of Dr. Sam Malek, Dr. Michael Shamos, and Dr. Jeffrey F. Brown filed by Pizza Hut of America, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., QuikOrder, Inc.. (Yu, George) (aef).
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1172 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1171 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Zembek, Richard) (rmc).
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1171 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Zembek, Richard) (rmc).
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1170 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 2/8/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1169 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Cunningham, Thomas) (rmc). Modified on 2/11/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1169 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Cunningham, Thomas) (rmc).
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1168 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1117 MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Expert Reports of Dr. Jeffery Brown, Dr. Sam Malek and Dr. Michael Shamos (FILED UNDER SEAL) filed by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC. (Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1167 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1120 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Unpatentability Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To Defendant Pizza Hut's Motion For Summary Judgment Of Unpatentability Of '077 Claims 1, 6, 8, 13, 17 (35 USC Section 101) filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To Defendant Pizza Hut's Motion For Summary Judgment Of Unpatentability Of '077 Claims 1, 6, 8, 13, 17 (35 USC Section 101), #2 Declaration Declaration Of John Osborne In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To Defendant Pizza Hut's Motion For Summary Judgment Of Unpatentability Of '077 Claims 1, 6, 8, 13, 17 (35 USC Section 101), #3 Notice Ameranth, Inc.'s Notice Of Lodgment Of Exhibits In Support Of Its Opposition To Defendant Pizza Hut's Motion For Summary Judgment Of Unpatentability Of '077 Claims 1, 6, 8, 13, 17 (35 USC Section 101), #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 18)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1166 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 2/8/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1165 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Caldarelli, William) (rmc). Modified on 2/11/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1165 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (rmc).
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1164 Joint MOTION Re Extension of Time for Expert Reports (AMERANTH V. GRUBHUB-SEAMLESS) by Ameranth, Inc. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1163 ORDER Re: Oral Argument. Defendants' motion for summary judgment of indefiniteness (Docket No. #1074 ) is currently scheduled for hearing on 7/6/2018. The Court finds this matter suitable for decision without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). Accordingly, the 7/6/2018 hearing is vacated. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/2/2018. (jdt).
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1162 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 2/8/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1161 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (aef). Modified on 2/11/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1161 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1160 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1121 MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Expert Reports of Dr. Sam Malek, Dr. Michael Shamos, and Dr. Jeffrey F. Brown (Pizza Hut, Inc., Pizza Hut Of America, Inc. & QuikOrder, Inc.) filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To QuikOrder, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., And Pizza Hut Of America, Inc.'s Motion To Exclude Testimony And Expert Reports Of Dr. Jeffrey Brown, Dr. Sam Malek, And Dr. Michael Shamos, #2 Declaration Declaration Of William J. Caldarelli In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To QuikOrder, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., And Pizza Hut Of America, Inc.'s Motion To Exclude Testimony And Expert Reports Of Dr. Jeffrey Brown, Dr. Sam Malek, And Dr. Michael Shamos, #3 Notice Notice Of Lodgment In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To QuikOrder, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., And Pizza Hut Of America, Inc.'s Motion To Exclude Testimony And Expert Reports Of Dr. Jeffrey Brown, Dr. Sam Malek, And Dr. Michael Shamos, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1159 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 2/8/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1158 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (aef). Modified on 2/11/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1158 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1157 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1130 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Reports and Testimony of Jeffrey F. Brown, Sam Malek, and Michael Shamos (Papa John's USA, Inc.) filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To Papa John's USA, Inc.'s Motion To Exclude Testimony And Expert Reports Of Dr. Jeffrey Brown, Dr. Sam Malek, And Dr. Michael Shamos, #2 Declaration Declaration Of William J. Caldarelli In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To Papa John's USA, Inc.'s Motion To Exclude Testimony And Expert Reports Of Dr. Jeffrey Brown, Dr. Sam Malek, And Dr. Michael Shamos, #3 Notice Notice Of Lodgment In Support Of Plaintiff Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To Papa John's USA, Inc.'s Motion To Exclude Testimony And Expert Reports Of Dr. Jeffrey Brown, Dr. Sam Malek, And Dr. Michael Shamos, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1156 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Ameranth, Inc. re #1155 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Ameranth, Inc. . (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1155 ***DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER ECF #1156 *** - RESPONSE in Opposition re #1130 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Reports and Testimony of Jeffrey F. Brown, Sam Malek, and Michael Shamos (Papa John's USA, Inc.) filed by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Plaintiff Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To Papa John's USA, Inc.'s Motion To Exclude Testimony And Expert Reports Of Dr. Jeffrey Brown, Dr. Sam Malek, And Dr. Michael Shamos, #2 Declaration Declaration of William J. Caldarelli In Support Of Plaintiff Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To Papa John's USA, Inc.'s Motion To Exclude Testimony And Expert Reports Of Dr. Jeffrey Brown, Dr. Sam Malek, And Dr. Michael Shamos, #3 Notice Notice Of Lodgment In Support Of Plaintiff Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To Papa John's USA, Inc.'s Motion To Exclude Testimony And Expert Reports Of Dr. Jeffrey Brown, Dr. Sam Malek, And Dr. Michael Shamos)(Caldarelli, William) Modified on 7/3/2018 to withdraw document (aef).
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1154 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1117 MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Expert Reports of Dr. Jeffery Brown, Dr. Sam Malek and Dr. Michael Shamos filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of William J. Caldarelli ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Domino's Motion to Exclude Testimony, #2 Notice Notice of Lodgment ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Domino's Motion to Exclude Testimony, #3 Exhibit Notice of Lodgment - Ex. 1, #4 Exhibit Notice of Lodgment - Ex. 2, #5 Exhibit Notice of Lodgment - Ex. 3, #6 Exhibit Notice of Lodgment - Ex. 4, #7 Exhibit Notice of Lodgment - Ex. 5, #8 Exhibit Notice of Lodgment - Ex. 6, #9 Exhibit Notice of Lodgment - Ex. 7, #10 Exhibit Notice of Lodgment - Ex. 8, #11 Exhibit Notice of Lodgment - Ex. 9a, #12 Exhibit Notice of Lodgment - Ex. 9b, #13 Exhibit Notice of Lodgment - Ex. 10)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1153 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 2/8/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1152 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William)(mxn). Modified on 2/11/2019 to add file date of lodgment(aef).
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1152 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William)(mxn).
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1151 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 2/8/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1150 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Yu, George)(mxn). Modified on 2/11/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1150 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Yu, George)(mxn).
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1149 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1106 MOTION to Exclude Opinions Of: (1) Ivan T. Hofmann, (2) Christine S. Meyer, Ph.D., (3) Keith R. Ugone, Ph.D., (4) Steven R. Kursh, Ph.D. (under seal) filed by Pizza Hut of America, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., QuikOrder, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas W. Cunningham, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Thomas W. Cunningham (under seal), #3 Declaration of Stephanie N. DeBrow, #4 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Stephanie N. DeBrow (under seal), #5 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Stephanie N. DeBrow (under seal), #6 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Stephanie N. DeBrow (under seal), #7 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Stephanie N. DeBrow (under seal), #8 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Stephanie N. DeBrow (under seal), #9 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Stephanie N. DeBrow (under seal), #10 Exhibit G to the Declaration of Stephanie N. DeBrow (under seal), #11 Exhibit H to the Declaration of Stephanie N. DeBrow (under seal), #12 Declaration of Arun J. Mohan, #13 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan (under seal), #14 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan (under seal))(Yu, George) (aef).
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1148 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1144 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Davison, Dan) (aef).
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1147 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Papa John's USA, Inc. re #1145 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document . (Davison, Dan) (aef).
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1146 DECLARATION of Stephanie N. DeBrow in Support of Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness by Defendant Papa John's USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 15)(Davison, Dan) (aef).
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1145 ***DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER ECF #1147 *** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1144 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Davison, Dan) Modified on 6/29/2018 to withdraw document (aef).
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1144 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Davison, Dan) (aef).
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1143 Joint MOTION to Substitute Party - JOINT MOTION RE SUBSTITUTION OF SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST GRUBHUB HOLDINGS INC. by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1142 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 2/8/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1141 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (aef). Modified on 2/11/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1141 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Caldarelli, William)(aef).
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1140 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1074 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness (Defendants Papa John's & Domino's) filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration Of John W. Osborne In Support Of Ameranth's Opposition To Defendants Papa John's And Domino's Motion For Summary Judgment Of Indefiniteness (Real Time), #2 Notice Notice Of Lodgment In Support Of Ameranth's Opposition To Defendants Papa John's And Domino's Motion For Summary Judgment Of Indefiniteness (Real Time), #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - UNDER SEAL, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - UNDER SEAL, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 15)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1139 NOTICE of Filing Replacement Exhibit 6 to Document No. 1130 by Papa John's USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6-Replacement)(Davison, Dan) (aef).
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1138 MOTION to Withdraw and Replace Exhibit 6 to Document No. 1130 by Papa John's USA, Inc.. (Davison, Dan) (aef).
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1137 ORDER Re: Oral Argument. Defendants QuikOrder, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc. and Pizza Hut of America, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment of noninfringement, and Defendants Domino's Pizza, LLC, Domino's Pizza, Inc., O-Web Technologies Ltd., Usablenet, Inc., Mobo Systems, Inc., Agilysys, Inc. and Ticketbiscuit, LLC's motion to dismiss for lack of standing are currently scheduled for hearing on June 22, 2018.The Court finds these matters suitable for decision without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). Accordingly, the June 22, 2018 hearing is vacated. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/20/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1136 ORDER Granting #1134 Motion to Allow Pizza Hut Inc., Pizza Hut of America, Inc., and QuikOrder,Inc. to Complete Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Ameranth, Inc. The joint motion is GRANTED. Pizza Hut and QuikOrder may depose the Ameranth Rule 30(b)(6) designees on or before June 29, 2018 for up to 2 hours. The deposition shall count against Pizza Hut's and QuikOrder's deposition time for Ameranth fact-controlled and Rule 30(b)(6) witnesses under the terms of the Court's case management orders. Further requests to extend the deadline herein will not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 6/19/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1135 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1027 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement (Master Menu/Master Database) Reply filed by Defendants QuikOrder, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., And Pizza Hut Of America, Inc. filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Verification Of Sam Malek, Ph.D. In Support Of Ameranth's Response And Opposition To Defendants QuikOrder, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., and Pizza Hut Of America, Inc.'s Objections And Motion To Strike Ameranth's Expert Declarations Submitted In Opposition To Motion For Summary Judgment (Master Menu/Master Database), #2 Declaration Declaration of Verification Of Michael I. Shamos, Ph.D. In Support Of Ameranth's Response And Opposition To Defendants QuikOrder, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., and Pizza Hut Of America, Inc.'s Objections And Motion To Strike Ameranth's Expert Declarations Submitted In Opposition To Motion For Summary Judgment (Master Menu/Master Database), #3 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1134 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery of Ameranth by 30(b)(6) Deposition by Pizza Hut of America, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., QuikOrder, Inc.. (Bruno, Christopher) (aef).
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1133 NOTICE of Appearance by Lillian Jennifer Mao on behalf of Oracle Corporation (Mao, Lillian)Attorney Lillian Jennifer Mao added to party Oracle Corporation(pty:dft) (aef).
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1132 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1131 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Davison, Dan) (aef).
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1131 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Davison, Dan) (aef).
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1130 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Reports and Testimony of Jeffrey F. Brown, Sam Malek, and Michael Shamos by Papa John's USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Richard S. Zembek, #2 Exhibit 8, #3 Exhibit 9, #4 Exhibit 12, #5 Exhibit 14, #6 Exhibit 15)(Davison, Dan) (aef).
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1129 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 2/8/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1128 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Yu, George) (aef). Modified on 2/11/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1128 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Yu, George) (aef).
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1127 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1027 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Pizza Hut of America, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., QuikOrder, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration (Supplemental) of Thomas A. Rammer, #2 Exhibit G to the Supplemental Declaration of Thomas A. Rammer (Under Seal), #3 Exhibit H to the Supplemental Declaration of Thomas A. Rammer, #4 Exhibit I to the Supplemental Declaration of Thomas A. Rammer (Under Seal), #5 Objections and Motion to Strike Ameranth's Expert Declarations Submitted in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment (Under Seal), #6 Proof of Service)(Yu, George) (aef).
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1126 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 2/8/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1125 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Yu, George)(aef). Modified on 2/11/2019 to add filed date of lodgment (aef).
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1125 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Yu, George) (aef).
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1124 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-infringement by QuikOrder, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities (Under Seal), #2 Declaration of Christopher M. Bruno, #3 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Christopher M. Bruno, #4 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Christopher M. Bruno, #5 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Christopher M. Bruno, #6 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Christopher M. Bruno (Under Seal), #7 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Christopher M. Bruno (Under Seal), #8 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Christopher M. Bruno, #9 Exhibit G to the Declaration of Christopher M. Bruno, #10 Exhibit H to the Declaration of Christopher M. Bruno, #11 Exhibit I to the Declaration of Christopher M. Bruno, #12 Exhibit J to the Declaration of Christopher M. Bruno, #13 Exhibit K to the Declaration of Christopher M. Bruno, #14 Exhibit L to the Declaration of Christopher M. Bruno, #15 Exhibit M to the Declaration of Christopher M. Bruno, #16 Exhibit N to the Declaration of Christopher M. Bruno (Under Seal), #17 Proof of Service)(Yu, George) (aef).
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1123 ***FILES AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 2/8/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1122 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Yu, George) (aef). Modified on 2/11/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1122 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Yu, George)(aef).
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1121 MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Expert Reports of Dr. Sam Malek, Dr. Michael Shamos, and Dr. Jeffrey F. Brown by Pizza Hut of America, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., QuikOrder, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities (Under Seal), #2 Declaration of Arun J. Mohan, #3 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan (Under Seal), #4 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan (Under Seal), #5 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan, #6 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan (Under Seal), #7 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan, #8 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan, #9 Exhibit G to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan (Under Seal), #10 Exhibit H to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan, #11 Exhibit I to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan, #12 Exhibit J to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan, #13 Exhibit K to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan (Under Seal), #14 Exhibit L to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan, #15 Exhibit M to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan, #16 Exhibit N to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan (Under Seal), #17 Exhibit O to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan (Under Seal), #18 Exhibit P to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan (Under Seal), #19 Exhibit Q to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan (Under Seal), #20 Exhibit R to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan, #21 Exhibit S to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan, #22 Exhibit T to the Declaration of Arun J. Mohan, #23 Proof of Service)(Yu, George) (aef).
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1120 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Unpatentability by Pizza Hut of America, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Melissa H. Smith, #3 Exhibit A. Highlighted US Pat. No. 8,146,077 Showing Additions, #4 Exhibit B. Decision in CBM2014-00014, #5 Exhibit C. Decision in CBM2017-00053, #6 Exhibit D. Expert Report of Dr. Hugh M. Smith as to Unpatentability of '077 Patent, #7 Exhibit E. Ameranth Amended Responses to Third Set of Common Interrogatories, #8 Exhibit F. Excerpts from Inventor Transcripts)(Smith, Melissa) (aef).
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1119 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 2/8/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1118 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Cunningham, Thomas) (aef). Modified on 2/10/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1118 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Cunningham, Thomas) (aef). (aef).
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1117 MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Expert Reports of Dr. Jeffery Brown, Dr. Sam Malek and Dr. Michael Shamos by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities (Under Seal), #2 Declaration of Thomas Cunningham, #3 Exhibit 1 (Under Seal), #4 Exhibit 2 (Under Seal), #5 Exhibit 3 (Under Seal), #6 Exhibit 4 (Under Seal), #7 Exhibit 5 - Ameranth Inc. Issued a New 21st Century Communications 'Data Synchronization, #8 Exhibit 6 (Under Seal), #9 Exhibit 7 (Under Seal), #10 Exhibit 8 (Under Seal), #11 Exhibit 9 (Under Seal), #12 Exhibit 10 (Under Seal), #13 Exhibit 11 (Under Seal), #14 Exhibit 12 - August 21 2009 Reply and Amendment, #15 Exhibit 13 (Under Seal), #16 Exhibit 14 - Ameranth Response w_Exhibits, #17 Exhibit 15 - CBM2015-00080 Final Written Decision, #18 Exhibit 16 - CBM2015-00082 Final Written Decision, #19 Exhibit 17 - Shamos Expert Rebuttal Report On Validity, #20 Exhibit 18 - US Patent 8146077, #21 Exhibit 19 - Notice of Allowance, #22 Exhibit 20 (Under Seal), #23 Exhibit 21 (Under Seal), #24 Exhibit 22 (Under Seal), #25 Exhibit 23 (Under Seal))(Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1116 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1115 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Davison, Dan) (aef).
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1115 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Davison, Dan) (aef).
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1114 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1113 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Davison, Dan) (aef).
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1113 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Davison, Dan) (aef).
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1112 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Papa John's USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Stephanie S. DeBrow, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Davison, Dan) (aef).
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1111 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 2/8/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1110 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Cunningham, Thomas)(aef). Modified on 2/10/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1110 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1109 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities (Under Seal), #2 Declaration Decl. of Thomas Cunningham, #3 Exhibit 1 (Under Seal), #4 Exhibit 2 - Shamos Deposition Excerpts 05.29.18, #5 Exhibit 3 - US Patent 8146077, #6 Exhibit 4 - August 21 2009 Reply and Amendment, #7 Exhibit 5 - CBM2015-00081 Patent Owner Preliminary Reponse, #8 Exhibit 6 - Claim Construction Order, #9 Exhibit 7 - Brief in Support of Ameranth's Motion for Summary Judgment, #10 Exhibit 8 - IPDEV v Ameranth Motion Hearing transcript, #11 Exhibit 9 (Under Seal), #12 Exhibit 10 (Under Seal), #13 Exhibit 11 (Under Seal), #14 Exhibit 12 (Under Seal), #15 Exhibit 13 (Under Seal), #16 Exhibit 14 - Domino's Web Captures, #17 Exhibit 15 - Order Granting Ameranth MSJ, #18 Exhibit 16 (Under Seal), #19 Exhibit 17 - Shamos Deposition Excerpt)(Cunningham, Thomas)(aef).
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1108 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 2/8/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1107 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William)(aef). (Modified on 2/10/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1107 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1106 MOTION to Exclude Opinions Of: (1) Ivan T. Hofmann, (2) Christine S. Meyer, Ph.D., (3) Keith R. Ugone, Ph.D., (4) Steven R. Kursh, Ph.D. by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memorandum Of Points & Authorities In Support Of Motion To Exclude Opinions Of: (1) Ivan T. Hofmann, (2) Christine S. Meyer, Ph.D., (3) Keith R. Ugone, Ph.D., (4) Steven R. Kursh, Ph.D., #2 Declaration Declaration of Brandon J. Witkow In Support Of Motion To Exclude Opinions Of: (1) Ivan T. Hofmann, (2) Christine S. Meyer, Ph.D., (3) Keith R. Ugone, Ph.D., (4) Steven R. Kursh, Ph.D., #3 Notice Notice Of Lodgment In Support Of Motion To Exclude Opinions Of: (1) Ivan T. Hofmann, (2) Christine S. Meyer, Ph.D., (3) Keith R. Ugone, Ph.D., (4) Steven R. Kursh, Ph.D., #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 15a, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 15b, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #23 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1105 ORDER Granting #1093 Motion to Withdraw Brian Chih-Kaung Chang as Counsel for Oracle Corporation. The Motion to Withdraw Brian Chang as Counsel for Oracle Corporation is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/14/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1104 ORDER Granting #1094 Motion to Withdraw Amanda Branch as Counsel for Oracle Corporation. The Motion to Withdraw Amanda Branch as Counsel for Oracle Corporation is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/14/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1103 AMENDED ORDER to Lodge Documents for In Camera Review. No later than noon on June 22, 2018, Ameranth shall lodge for in camera review all of the documents it has withheld based on attorney-client, work-product, and common interest grounds as referenced in Doc. Nos. 1035, 1051, and 1067. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 6/14/2018.(aef)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1102 REPLY - Other re #1101 Order, Ameranth's Request For Extension Of Time To Lodge Documents For In Camera Review filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1101 ORDER to Lodge Documents for In Camera Review. No later than noon on June 18, 2018, Ameranth shall lodge for in camera review all of the documents it has withheld based on attorney-client, work-product, and common interest grounds as referenced in Doc. Nos. 1035, 1051, and 1067. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 6/14/2018.(aef)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1100 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 2/8/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1099 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Caldarelli, William) (aef). Modified on 2/10/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1099 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1098 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1041 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal - Ameranth's Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Keith McNally In Support Of Ameranth's Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction/Standing, #2 Notice Notice of Lodgment of Exhibits In Support Of Ameranth's Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction/Standing, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - filed under seal, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 14 - filed under seal, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #18 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1097 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Ameranth, Inc. re #1081 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Ameranth, Inc. . (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1096 ORDER Granting #1095 Plaintiff Ameranth and Defendant O-Web Technologies Ltd.'s Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 6/12/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1095 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery , File Motions & Serve Opening & Rebuttal Reports by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1094 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Amanda Branch as Counsel for Oracle Corporation by Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amanda Branch)(Branch, Amanda) (aef).
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1093 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Brian Chang as Counsel for Oracle Corporation by Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian Chang)(Chang, Brian) (aef).
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1092 ORDER Granting #1091 Plaintiff Ameranth and Defendant Mobo Systems, Inc. d/b/a OLO's Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 6/11/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1091 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery & Serve Opening & Rebuttal Experts Reports, & To File Motions (AMERANTH - MOBO-OLO) by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1090 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1086 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 4 Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 5 Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 7 Filed Under Seal, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 8 Filed Under Seal, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 9 Filed Under Seal, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 10 Filed Under Seal, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 11 Filed Under Seal, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 12 Filed Under Seal, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 13 Filed Under Seal, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 14 Filed Under Seal, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 15 Filed Under Seal, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 16 Filed Under Seal, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 17 Filed Under Seal)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1089 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Ameranth, Inc. re #1086 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal filed by Ameranth, Inc. . (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1088 ***DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER ECF #1089 *** - RESPONSE in Opposition re #1086 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 17)(Caldarelli, William) Modified on 6/11/2018 to withdraw document (aef).
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1087 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 2/8/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1086 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (aef). Modified on 2/10/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1086 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1085 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1027 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement (Master Menu/Master Database) filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Ethan M. Watts In Support Of Ameranth's Opposition To Defendants QuikOrder, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., and Pizza Hut Of America, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement (Master Menu/Master Database), #2 Statement of Facts Separate Statement Of Reasons In Opposition And Material Facts In Dispute In Support Of Ameranth's Opposition To Defendants QuikOrder, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., and Pizza Hut Of America, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement (Master Menu/Master Database), #3 Declaration Declaration of Dr. Shamos In Support Of Ameranth's Opposition To Defendants QuikOrder, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., and Pizza Hut Of America, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement (Master Menu/Master Database), #4 Notice Notice Of Lodgment Of Exhibits In Support Of Ameranth's Opposition To Defendants QuikOrder, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., and Pizza Hut Of America, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement (Master Menu/Master Database), #5 Exhibit Exhibit 18 to Notice Of Lodgment Of Exhibits In Support Of Ameranth's Opposition To Defendants QuikOrder, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., and Pizza Hut Of America, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement (Master Menu/Master Database), #6 Exhibit Exhibit 19 to Notice Of Lodgment Of Exhibits In Support Of Ameranth's Opposition To Defendants QuikOrder, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., and Pizza Hut Of America, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement (Master Menu/Master Database), #7 Exhibit Exhibit 20 to Notice Of Lodgment Of Exhibits In Support Of Ameranth's Opposition To Defendants QuikOrder, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., and Pizza Hut Of America, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement (Master Menu/Master Database), #8 Exhibit Exhibit 21 to Notice Of Lodgment Of Exhibits In Support Of Ameranth's Opposition To Defendants QuikOrder, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., and Pizza Hut Of America, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement (Master Menu/Master Database), #9 Exhibit Exhibit 22 to Notice Of Lodgment Of Exhibits In Support Of Ameranth's Opposition To Defendants QuikOrder, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., and Pizza Hut Of America, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement (Master Menu/Master Database), #10 Exhibit Exhibit 23 to Notice Of Lodgment Of Exhibits In Support Of Ameranth's Opposition To Defendants QuikOrder, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., and Pizza Hut Of America, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement (Master Menu/Master Database), #11 Exhibit Exhibit 24 to Notice Of Lodgment Of Exhibits In Support Of Ameranth's Opposition To Defendants QuikOrder, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., and Pizza Hut Of America, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement (Master Menu/Master Database), #12 Exhibit Exhibit 25 to Notice Of Lodgment Of Exhibits In Support Of Ameranth's Opposition To Defendants QuikOrder, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., and Pizza Hut Of America, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement (Master Menu/Master Database), #13 Exhibit Exhibit 26 to Notice Of Lodgment Of Exhibits In Support Of Ameranth's Opposition To Defendants QuikOrder, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., and Pizza Hut Of America, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement (Master Menu/Master Database), #14 Exhibit Exhibit 27 to Notice Of Lodgment Of Exhibits In Support Of Ameranth's Opposition To Defendants QuikOrder, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., and Pizza Hut Of America, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement (Master Menu/Master Database), #15 Exhibit Exhibit 28 to Notice Of Lodgment Of Exhibits In Support Of Ameranth's Opposition To Defendants QuikOrder, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., and Pizza Hut Of America, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement (Master Menu/Master Database), #16 Exhibit Exhibit 29 to Notice Of Lodgment Of Exhibits In Support Of Ameranth's Opposition To Defendants QuikOrder, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., and Pizza Hut Of America, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement (Master Menu/Master Database), #17 Exhibit Exhibit 30 to Notice Of Lodgment Of Exhibits In Support Of Ameranth's Opposition To Defendants QuikOrder, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., and Pizza Hut Of America, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement (Master Menu/Master Database), #18 Exhibit Exhibit 31 to Notice Of Lodgment Of Exhibits In Support Of Ameranth's Opposition To Defendants QuikOrder, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., and Pizza Hut Of America, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement (Master Menu/Master Database), #19 Proof of Service Proof Of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1084 ORDER Setting Hearing Dates and Briefing Schedules (Pizza Companies and System Providers). All of the Daubert motions shall be scheduled for hearing on July 13, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. Each party's motion shall be filed on or before June 15, 2018. All of the summary judgment motions shall be scheduled for hearing on July 20, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. These motions shall also be filed on or before June 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/8/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1083 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1082 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1082 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1081 ***DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER ECF #1097 *** - RESPONSE in Opposition re #1041 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal In Support Of Defendants' Notice Of And Motion To Dismiss filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Keith McNally ISO Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction/Standing, #2 Notice NOL ISO Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction/Standing, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to NOL ISO Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction/Standing, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to NOL ISO Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction/Standing, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to NOL ISO Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction/Standing, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to NOL ISO Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction/Standing, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to NOL ISO Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction/Standing, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6 [FILED UNDER SEAL] to NOL ISO Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction/Standing, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to NOL ISO Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction/Standing, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 8 to NOL ISO Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction/Standing, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 9 to NOL ISO Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction/Standing, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 10 to NOL ISO Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction/Standing, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 11 to NOL ISO Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction/Standing, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 12 to NOL ISO Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction/Standing, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 13 to NOL ISO Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction/Standing, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 14 [FILED UNDER SEAL] to NOL ISO Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction/Standing, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 15 to NOL ISO Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction/Standing, #18 Proof of Service Proof Of Service ISO Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction/Standing)(Caldarelli, William)(aef). Modified on 6/12/2018 to withdraw document (aef).
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1080 ORDER Granting #1079 Plaintiff Ameranth's and Defendants Starbucks Corporation's Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/7/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1079 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File To Extend Deadlines by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1078 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Usablenet, Inc. re #1077 Notice (Other) of Withdrawal of Philip J. Bonoli as Counsel for Usablenet, Inc. (Bonoli, Philip) (aef).
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1077 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Philip J. Bonoli as Counsel for Usablenet, Inc. by Usablenet, Inc. (Bonoli, Philip)(aef).
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1076 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1075 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Davison, Dan) (aef).
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1075 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Davison, Dan) (aef).
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1074 NOTICE of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness by Papa John's USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George W. Jordan, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit 11, #9 Exhibit 12, #10 Exhibit 13, #11 Exhibit 14)(Davison, Dan) (aef).
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1073 PRO HAC APPROVED: Sheryl Hoke Love appearing for Counter Claimants O-Web Technologies LTD, O-Web Technologies LTD, Defendant O-Web Technologies LTD (no document attached) (dsn)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1072 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Love, Sheryl). ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11292695. see ECF No. #1071 ) (dsn)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1071 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11292695.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Love, Sheryl) (dsn)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1069 ORDER Granting #1066 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. The Clerkof Court is directed to seal the documents lodged at docket 1067 pursuant to Local Rule 79.2. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 6/4/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1068 ORDER Granting #1065 Joint Motion to Extend Time to Take Deposition of Dr. Michael Shamos. The discovery cutoff date is extended to June 27, 2018 for the limited purpose of taking the deposition of Dr. Michael Shamos. This Order shall not impact any other deadlines established by the Court's Scheduling Order, as previously amended. (Dkt. No. #898 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 06/01/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1067 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 6/4/2018*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1066 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (aef) Modified on 6/4/2018 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1066 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1065 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery to Take the Deposition of Dr. Michael Shamos by Pizza Hut of America, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., QuikOrder, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Mohan, Arun) (aef).
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1064 ORDER Granting #1063 Plaintiff Ameranth's and Defendants Grubhub's and Seamless' Joint Motion to Extend Time to Provide Expert Reports. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Ameranth shall provide to GrubHub and Seamless, and GrubHub and Seamless shall provide to Ameranth, opening expert written reports by no later than July 12, 2018. Ameranth shall provide to GrubHub and Seamless, and GrubHub and Seamless shall provide to Ameranth, rebuttal expert reports by no later than July 31, 2018. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/31/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1063 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Extend Time To Provide Expert Reports by Ameranth, Inc. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1062 NOTICE of Appearance by William E. Thomson, Jr on behalf of Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC (Thomson, William)Attorney William E. Thomson, Jr added to party Domino's Pizza, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney William E. Thomson, Jr added to party Domino's Pizza, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney William E. Thomson, Jr added to party Domino's Pizza, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney William E. Thomson, Jr added to party Domino's Pizza, LLC(pty:cc), Attorney William E. Thomson, Jr added to party Domino's Pizza, LLC(pty:cc), Attorney William E. Thomson, Jr added to party Domino's Pizza, LLC(pty:dft) (aef).
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1061 NOTICE Stipulation Regarding Substitution of Defendant Pizza Hut, LLC as proper Defendant by Ameranth, Inc. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1060 ORDER Approving #1057 Substitution of Attorney. Jared Bobrow of Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP, located at 1000 Marsh Road, Menlo Park, California, 94025, (650) 614-7400, is hereby SUBSTITUTED as counsel of record in place of Jared Bobrow of Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/24/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1059 ORDER Granting #1058 Joint Motion to Extend Dates for Taking Deposition of Tillster, Inc. The discovery cutoff date is extended to June 1, 2018 only for the purpose of taking the deposition of Tillster, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/24/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1058 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery to Take the Deposition of Third Party Tillster, Inc. by Pizza Hut of America, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., QuikOrder, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Mohan, Arun) (aef).
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1057 Joint MOTION to Substitute Attorney for Defendant by Oracle Corporation. (Bobrow, Jared) (aef).
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1056 AMENDED ORDER on Discovery Dispute (Limitations on Defendants' Expert Depositions) (Parties: Ameranth; QuikOrder; Hyatt; Usablenet; Oracle; Mobo; Starwood; Hilton; Eventbrite; Ticketfly; Apple; Marriott; Starbucks; Papa Johns; Agilysys; Dominos) Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/23/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1055 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Brandy Shannell Nolan (Re: Doc. No. #1052 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/22/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrd)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1054 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Conference held on 5/22/2018. (Topic: defendants' deposition of expert Shamos) (Attorneys: William Calderelli; Thomas Rammer; Chris Bruno; Christine Feller; Laura Miller; Andrew Zappia; Brian Chang; Matt Buccellato; Rob Williams; Nick Saros; Patrick McKeever; Dan D. Davison; Nick Merker; Tom W. Cunningham)(no document attached) (ajf)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1053 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Mock on behalf of Pizza Hut of America, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., QuikOrder, Inc. (Mock, Matthew)Attorney Matthew Mock added to party Pizza Hut of America, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Mock added to party Pizza Hut, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Mock added to party QuikOrder, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Mock added to party QuikOrder, Inc.(pty:dft) (aef).
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1052 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11239005.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Nolan, Brandy)(jrd)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1049 ORDER Granting #1036 Motion to File Documents Under Seal in Support of Plaintiff's Submission Re Discovery Disputes. The Clerk of Court is directed to seal the following documents pursuant to Local Rule 79.2: Exhibits A and K to Docket No. 1035. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/18/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1047 ORDER Granting #1033 Motion to File Documents Under Seal in Support of Defendants' Submission Re Discovery Disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/18/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1046 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Arun John Mohan (Re: Doc. No. #1039 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/15/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrd)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1045 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Ahmed M.T. Riaz by Pizza Hut of America, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., QuikOrder, Inc.. (Riaz, Ahmed) (aef).
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1044 Joint MOTION to Substitute Party Defendants Pizza Hut, Inc.'s And Pizza Hut Of America, Inc.'s Transferee And Successor In Interest by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1043 DECLARATION re #1041 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal Declaration of Taylor N. Mauze in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Expedia, Inc., Fandango, Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotels.com, LP, Hotwire, Inc., Kayak Software Corporation, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Opentable, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Papa John's USA, Inc., Stubhub, Inc., Ticketmaster, LLC, Travelocity.com, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit 11, #9 Exhibit 12, #10 Exhibit 13, #11 Exhibit 14, #12 Exhibit 16)(Davison, Dan) (aef).
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1042 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1041 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Davison, Dan) (aef).
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1041 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Davison, Dan) (aef).
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1040 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Conference held on 5/15/2018(no document attached) (ajf)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1039 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11211165.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Mohan, Arun)(jrd)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1038 ORDER on Discovery Dispute (Limitations of Defendants' Expert Depositions)(Parties: Ameranth, Pizza Hut, Papa John's, Domino's & Quick Order) Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/10/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1037 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1036 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1036 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1035 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Counter Defendant Ameranth, Inc. Re Discovery Disputes Concerning: (1) Proportionality Of Requests For Licensee Communications; and (2) Application Of Common Interest Doctrine Protection To Communications With Litigation Funding Sources. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1034 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 5/18/2018*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1033 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Saros, Nick) (aef). Modified on 5/18/2018 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1033 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Saros, Nick) (aef).
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1032 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Conference held on 5/4/2018. Court made oral rulings on the record. (Topic: continued Iron Mountain source code storage fees) (Parties involved: Ameranth Inc.; Grub Hub Inc.; Seamless North America) (Attorneys: William Calderelli; Michael Fabiano; Eric Faragi)(no document attached) (ajf)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1031 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Defendant Papa John's USA, Inc. re #1026 Order, Defendants' Supplemental Briefing on Discovery Dispute (Limitations on Defendants' Expert Depositions). (Davison, Dan) (aef).
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1030 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Plaintiff Ameranth, Inc. re #337 Order on Discovery Dispute (Limitations on Defendants' Expert Depositions). (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hejmanowski, Lee) (aef).
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1029 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 2/8/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #1028 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Yu, George) (aef). Modified on 2/10/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1028 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Yu, George) (aef).
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1027 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Pizza Hut of America, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., QuikOrder, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities (Under Seal), #2 Declaration of Marc Asher (Under Seal), #3 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Marc Asher, #4 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Marc Asher (Under Seal), #5 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Marc Asher (Under Seal), #6 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Marc Asher, #7 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Marc Asher (Under Seal), #8 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Marc Asher (Under Seal), #9 Exhibit G to the Declaration of Marc Asher, #10 Exhibit H to the Declaration of Marc Asher (Under Seal), #11 Exhibit I to the Declaration of Marc Asher (Under Seal), #12 Exhibit J to the Declaration of Marc Asher, #13 Exhibit K to the Declaration of Marc Asher (Under Seal), #14 Exhibit L to the Declaration of Marc Asher (Under Seal), #15 Exhibit M to the Declaration of Marc Asher, #16 Exhibit N to the Declaration of Marc Asher (Under Seal), #17 Exhibit O to the Declaration of Marc Asher (Under Seal), #18 Exhibit P to the Declaration of Marc Asher, #19 Exhibit Q to the Declaration of Marc Asher (Under Seal), #20 Exhibit R to the Declaration of Marc Asher (Under Seal), #21 Exhibit S to the Declaration of Marc Asher (Under Seal), #22 Exhibit T to the Declaration of Marc Asher (Under Seal), #23 Exhibit U to the Declaration of Marc Asher (Under Seal), #24 Exhibit V to the Declaration of Marc Asher (Under Seal), #25 Exhibit W to the Declaration of Marc Asher (Under Seal), #26 Exhibit X to the Declaration of Marc Asher (Under Seal), #27 Exhibit Y to the Declaration of Marc Asher (Under Seal, #28 Declaration of Thomas A. Rammer, #29 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Thomas A. Rammer, #30 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Thomas A. Rammer (Under Seal), #31 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Thomas A. Rammer, #32 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Thomas A. Rammer, #33 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Thomas A. Rammer (Under Seal), #34 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Thomas A. Rammer, #35 Proof of Service)(Yu, George) (aef).
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1026 ORDER for Supplemental Briefing on Discovery Dispute (Limitations on Defendants' Expert Depositions) (Parties: Ameranth, Pizza Hut, Papa John's, Domino's & Quickorder) No later than 8:00 a.m. on May 3, 2018, each side of this dispute shall file supplemental briefing (5 pages maximum; no exhibits permitted). Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/1/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1025 ORDER on Defendant Best Western International's Substitution of Attorneys Or Record Herein. (ECF #952 ) Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 83.3(f)(2) Defendant's motion is GRANTED. The Clerk shall update the Courts docket to reflect the substitution. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 4/26/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1024 ORDER Granting #1022 Joint Motion to Extend Dates for Rebuttal Expert Witness Report's and Expert Witness Discovery Cutoff. The rebuttal expert witness reports must be served on or before May 4, 2018. The expert witness discovery cutoff date for these parties only is extended to June 1, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/26/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1023 ORDER Granting #1020 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Initiate Discovery Conference. The joint motion is GRANTED. These parties are ordered to continue to meet and confer in good faith to resolve the dispute. However, should their efforts fail and Court intervention be necessary, the parties shall jointly contact the Court no later than May 11, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/26/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1022 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery for Rebuttal Expert Witness Reports and Expert Witness Discovery Cutoff by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hejmanowski, Lee) (aef).
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Conference held on 4/26/2018.(no document attached) (ajf)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1020 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File To Initiate Discovery Conference Regarding Starbucks' Discovery Responses by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1019 NOTICE of Appearance of Lee E. Hejmanowski by Lee Everett Hejmanowski on behalf of Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hejmanowski, Lee)Attorney Lee Everett Hejmanowski added to party Ameranth, Inc.(pty:pla) (aef).
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1018 MINUTE ORDER. A telephonic discovery conference is hereby scheduled for April 26, 2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. (Parties involved: Ameranth, Inc.; Papa John's USA, Inc.; Domino's Pizza, Inc.; Domino's Pizza, LLC; Pizza Hut, Inc.; Pizza Hut of America, Inc.; QuickOrder, Inc.) SO ORDERED by Judge William V. Gallo on April 24, 2018.(no document attached) (ajf)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1017 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Ahmed M.T. Riaz, re #1015 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 04/18/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Conference (Ameranth; O-Web Technologies LTD) held on 4/18/2018.(no document attached) (ajf)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1015 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11128207.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Riaz, Ahmed)(jrd)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1014 ORDER Granting #969 Defendant Ticketfly, Inc.'s Motion to Withdraw Michael Page, James S. Tsuei, and Timothy Chen Saulsbury. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 4/16/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1013 ORDER Granting #1012 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Initiate Discovery Conference. The joint motion is GRANTED. These parties are ordered to continue to meet and confer in good faith to resolve the dispute. However, should their efforts fail and Court intervention be necessary, the parties shall jointly contact the Court no later than May 14, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/16/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1012 Joint MOTION Extend Time to Initiate Discovery Conference re Ameranth's Discovery Responses by Starbucks Corporation. (McKeever, Patrick) (aef).
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1011 ORDER Scheduling Telephonic Discovery Dispute Conference (Ameranth and O-Web Technologies, Ltd. ONLY) A telephonic discovery dispute conference is hereby scheduled for April 18, 2018, at 1:00 p.m. PST. In addition to counsel for Ameranth and counsel for O-Web, a corporate representative from O-Web shall also participate in the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/12/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1010 ORDER Granting #1009 Joint Motion for Extention of Time to Initiate Discovery Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/12/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1009 Joint MOTION to Extend Time to Initiate Discovery Conference re Ameranth's Discovery Responses by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC. (Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1008 ORDER Denying #985 Motion to Compel without Prejudice. Defendants' motion to compel is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/11/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1007 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Defendants Apple, Inc., Eventbrite, Inc., Ticketfly, Inc. re #985 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Motion to Compel, #1005 Order,, . (Gibson, Erin) (aef).
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1006 Response to Order for Supplemental Briefing re #1005 filed as - SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Counter Defendant Ameranth, Inc. by Plaintiff Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) Modified on 4/5/2018 to match document title (aef).
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1005 ORDER for Supplemental Briefing. No later than 8:00 a.m. on April 5, 2018, the parties involved in the discovery dispute briefed under Docket Nos. 985 and 1002 shall file supplemental briefing: 1. The total number of unanswered interrogatories that have been propounded by both sides and remain pending; and 2. The total number of interrogatories each side has propounded and answered to date. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/4/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1004 ORDER Granting #1001 Joint Motion to Extend Expert-Related Deadlines. All rebuttal expert reports are due and shall be served on or before April 27, 2018. All discovery, fact and expert, shall be completed on or before May 25, 2018. All dispositive motions, including those addressing Daubert issues, shall be filed on or before June 8, 2018. No other dates on the schedule set forth in the Doc. No. 898 Order are changed by this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/2/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1003 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Ameranth, Inc. re #994 MOTION to Strike The Excessive Obviousness Combinations In The Invalidity Expert Reports of Steven R. Kursh, Ph.d., Stephen Gray, and Alex C. Snoeren, Ph.D filed by Ameranth, Inc. . (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1002 RESPONSE in Opposition re #985 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Motion to Compel filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of William J. Caldarelli In Support Of Plaintiff Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Compel, #2 Exhibit One, #3 Exhibit Two, #4 Exhibit Three, #5 Exhibit Four, #6 Proof of Service Plaintiff Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To Defendants' Motion To Compel)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1001 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File To Extend Expert-Related Deadlines by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1000 ORDER Granting #933 Defendants' Motion for Leave to Rely on an Alternative Obviousness Combination and (2) Granting #936 Oracle's Motion for Leave to Modify its Amended Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 3/29/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 999 ORDER Denying #949 Ameranth's Motion to Strike Joint Defendants' Amended Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 3/29/2018. (aef)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 998 ORDER Granting #997 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Initiate Discovery Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/28/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 997 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File To Initiate Discovery Conference With O-Web Technologies, Ltd. by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 996 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 2/8/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #995 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Caldarelli, William) (aef). Modified on 2/10/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 995 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 994 ***DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER ECF #1003 *** - MOTION to Strike The Excessive Obviousness Combinations In The Invalidity Expert Reports of Steven R. Kursh, Ph.d., Stephen Gray, and Alex C. Snoeren, Ph.D by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memo of Points & Authorities In Support Of Ameranth's Motion To Strike The Excessive Obviousness Combinations In The Invalidity Expert Reports of Steven R. Kursh, Ph.d., Stephen Gray, and Alex C. Snoeren, Ph.D., #2 Declaration Declaration of Brandon J. Witkow In Support Of Ameranth's Motion To Strike The Excessive Obviousness Combinations In The Invalidity Expert Reports of Steven R. Kursh, Ph.d., Stephen Gray, and Alex C. Snoeren, Ph.D, #3 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef). Modified on 4/3/2018 to withdraw document (aef).
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 993 ORDER Granting #991 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Initiate Discovery Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/28/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 992 ORDER Granting #990 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Initiate Discovery Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/28/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 991 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File To Extend Time To Initiate Discovery Conference With Mobo Systems, Inc. by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 990 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File To Initiate Discovery Conference by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 989 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Taylor N. Mauze (Re: Doc. No. #981 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 3/26/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrd)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 988 ORDER granting #982 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Provide Expert Infringement and Damages Reports for Ameranth and Domino's. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/27/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 986 ORDER Granting Defendant's #983 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/27/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mxn)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 985 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Motion to Compel by Apple, Inc., Eventbrite, Inc., Ticketfly, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Erin Gibson, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3 under seal)(Gibson, Erin) (anh).
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 984 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 3/27/2018] - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #983 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Gibson, Erin)(mxn). (Main Document 984 replaced on 3/27/2018) (mxn). Modified on 3/27/2018 to add file date of lodgment (mxn).
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 983 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Gibson, Erin)(mxn).
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 982 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File To Extend Time To Provide Expert Infringement And Damages Reports For Ameranth And Domino's by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (anh).
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 981 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11050949.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Mauze, Taylor)(jrd)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 980 ORDER re oral argument. Defendants motion for leave to rely on an alternative obviousness combination, Oracles motion for leave to modify its amended infringement contentions and Ameranths motion to strike joint Defendants amended invalidity contentions are currently scheduled for hearing on March 29, 2018. The Court finds these matters suitable for decision without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). Accordingly, the March 29, 2018 hearing is vacated. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 3/26/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 979 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-11046822.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Elrakabawy, Marwan) QC mailer sent re: missing one signature. Atty to refile (ajs).
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 978 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney to Withdraw Anthony Nimmo as Counsel for Agilysys, Inc. by Agilysys, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Nicholas R. Merker, #2 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Pettit, Jonathan) (aef).
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 977 REPLY to Response to Motion re #936 MOTION for Leave to Modify Amended Invalidity Contentions filed by Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian Chang)(Bobrow, Jared) (aef).
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 976 REPLY to Response to Motion re #933 MOTION Defendants' Motion for Leave to Rely on an Alternative Obviousness Combination filed by Expedia, Inc., Fandango, Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotels.com, LP, Hotwire, Inc., Kayak Software Corporation, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Opentable, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Papa John's USA, Inc., Stubhub, Inc., Ticketmaster, LLC, Travelocity.com, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proof of Service)(Davison, Dan) (aef).
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 975 ORDER Granting #970 Joint Motion to Extend Time to Provide Expert Infringement and Damages Reports for Pizza Hut and QuickOrder. Ameranth shall provide opening expert written reports on infringement and damages for both Pizza Hut and QuikOrder by no later than March 28, 2018. Pizza Hut and QuikOrder shall provide rebuttal expert reports on infringement and damages by no later than April 11, 2018. No additional extensions will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/22/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 974 REPLY - Other re #949 MOTION to Strike Joint Defendants' Amended Preliminary Invalidity Contentions For U.S. Patent No. 8,146,077 filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 973 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #936 MOTION for Leave to Modify Amended Invalidity Contentions filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 972 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #933 MOTION Defendants' Motion for Leave to Rely on an Alternative Obviousness Combination filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 971 RESPONSE in Opposition re #949 MOTION to Strike Joint Defendants' Amended Preliminary Invalidity Contentions For U.S. Patent No. 8,146,077 filed by ATX Innovation, Inc., Agilysys, Inc., Apple, Inc., Best Western International, Inc., Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC, Eventbrite, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Fandango, Inc., Grubhub, Inc., Hilton International Co., Hilton Resorts Corporation, Hilton Worldwide, Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotels.com, LP, Hotwire, Inc., Hyatt Corporation, Kayak Software Corporation, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., Marriott International, Inc., Mobo Systems, Inc., O-Web Technologies LTD, Opentable, Inc., Oracle Corporation, Orbitz, LLC, Papa John's USA, Inc., Pizza Hut of America, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., QuikOrder, Inc., Renaissance Hotel Operating Company, Seamless North America, LLC, Starbucks Corporation, Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, Inc., The Ritz Carlton Hotel Company, LLC, Ticketbiscuit, LLC, Ticketfly, Inc., Ticketmaster, LLC, Travelocity.com, LP, Usablenet, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian Chang, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Bobrow, Jared) (aef).
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 970 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File To Extend Time To Provide Expert Infringement And Damages Reports For Pizza Hut And QuikOrder by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 969 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Michael Page, James S. Tsuei, and Timothy Chen Saulsbury by Ticketfly, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Timothy Chen Saulsbury)(Saulsbury, Timothy) (aef).
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 968 ORDER granting #963 Second Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Initiate Discovery Conference. The joint motion is GRANTED. Ameranth and Papa Johns USA Inc. are ordered to continue to meet and confer in good faith to resolve the dispute. However, should their efforts fail and Court intervention be necessary, the parties shall jointly contact the Court no later than March 23, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/9/2018. (ajf)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 967 REPLY to Response to Motion re #938 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Ameranth's First through Fourth and Eight Through Fourteenth Affirmative Defenses filed by IPDEV Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Orr, Brian) (aef).
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 966 RESPONSE in Opposition re #956 MOTION to Strike Claim Chart in Support of IPDEV's Motion for Summary Judgment re Written Description and Enablement in the Specification of the '449 Patent filed by IPDEV Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew C. Warnecke in Support of IPDEV's response to Ameranth's Objection and Request to Strike Claim Chart in Support of IPDEV's Motion for Summary Judgment Re Written Description and Enablement, #2 Notice of Lodgment in Support of IPDEV's Response to Ameranth's Objection and Request to Strike Claim Chart in Support of IPDEV's Motion for Summary Judgment Re Written Description and Enablement, #3 Exhibit ACW 1, #4 Proof of Service)(Warnecke, Andrew) (aef).
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 965 REPLY to Response to Motion re #937 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Written Description Support and Enablement in the Specification of the '449 Patent filed by IPDEV Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew C. Warnecke in support of IPDEV's Reply to Ameranth's Opposition to IPDEV's Motion for Summary Judgment Re Written Description Support and Enablement in the Specification of the '449 Patent, #2 Notice of Lodgment in Support of IPDEV's Reply to Ameranth's Opposition to IPDEV's Motion for Summary Judgment Re Written Description Support and Enablement In the Specification of The '499 Patent, #3 Exhibit ACW 1, #4 Exhibit ACW 2, #5 Proof of Service)(Warnecke, Andrew) (aef).
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 964 REPLY to Response to Motion re #935 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Ameranth's Inequitable Conduct Claims filed by IPDEV Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew C. Warnecke in Support of IPDEVs Reply to Ameranth's Oppsition to IPDEV's Motion for Summary Judgment on Ameranths Inequitable Conduct Claims, #2 Notice of Lodgment in Support of IPDEVs Reply to Ameranth's Opposition to IPDEV's Motion for Summary Judgment on Ameranth's Inequitable Conduct Claims, #3 Exhibit ACW 1, #4 Proof of Service)(Warnecke, Andrew) (aef).
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 963 Joint MOTION for Discovery To Extend Time To Initiate Discovery Conference Regarding Papa John's Discovery Responses by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Proof Of Service - Joint Motion)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 962 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Melissa H. Smith, re #960 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 03/07/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 961 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig S. Jepson on behalf of ATX Innovation, Inc. (Jepson, Craig)Attorney Craig S. Jepson added to party ATX Innovation, Inc.(pty:dft) (aef).
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 960 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10984270.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Smith, Melissa)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 959 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 2/8/2019*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #957 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (aef). Modified on 2/10/2019 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 958 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #935 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Ameranth's Inequitable Conduct Claims filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of John Osborne In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To IPDEV Co.'s MSJ Against Ameranth's Inequitable Conduct Claims, #2 Proof of Service, #3 Notice Notice Of Lodgment In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To IPDEV Co.'s MSJ Against Ameranth's Inequitable Conduct Claims, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - NOL In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To IPDEV Co.'s MSJ Against Ameranth's Inequitable Conduct Claims, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - NOL In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To IPDEV Co.'s MSJ Against Ameranth's Inequitable Conduct Claims, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - NOL In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To IPDEV Co.'s MSJ Against Ameranth's Inequitable Conduct Claims, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - NOL In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To IPDEV Co.'s MSJ Against Ameranth's Inequitable Conduct Claims, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - NOL In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To IPDEV Co.'s MSJ Against Ameranth's Inequitable Conduct Claims, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - NOL In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To IPDEV Co.'s MSJ Against Ameranth's Inequitable Conduct Claims, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - NOL In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To IPDEV Co.'s MSJ Against Ameranth's Inequitable Conduct Claims, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - NOL In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To IPDEV Co.'s MSJ Against Ameranth's Inequitable Conduct Claims, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - NOL In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To IPDEV Co.'s MSJ Against Ameranth's Inequitable Conduct Claims, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - NOL In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To IPDEV Co.'s MSJ Against Ameranth's Inequitable Conduct Claims, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - NOL In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To IPDEV Co.'s MSJ Against Ameranth's Inequitable Conduct Claims, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 12 - NOL In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To IPDEV Co.'s MSJ Against Ameranth's Inequitable Conduct Claims, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 13 - NOL In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To IPDEV Co.'s MSJ Against Ameranth's Inequitable Conduct Claims, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 14 - NOL In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To IPDEV Co.'s MSJ Against Ameranth's Inequitable Conduct Claims, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 15 - NOL In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To IPDEV Co.'s MSJ Against Ameranth's Inequitable Conduct Claims, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 16 - NOL In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To IPDEV Co.'s MSJ Against Ameranth's Inequitable Conduct Claims, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 17 - NOL In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To IPDEV Co.'s MSJ Against Ameranth's Inequitable Conduct Claims, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 18 - NOL In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To IPDEV Co.'s MSJ Against Ameranth's Inequitable Conduct Claims, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 19 - NOL In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To IPDEV Co.'s MSJ Against Ameranth's Inequitable Conduct Claims, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 20 - NOL In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To IPDEV Co.'s MSJ Against Ameranth's Inequitable Conduct Claims, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 21 - NOL In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To IPDEV Co.'s MSJ Against Ameranth's Inequitable Conduct Claims, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 22 - NOL In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To IPDEV Co.'s MSJ Against Ameranth's Inequitable Conduct Claims, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 23 - NOL In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To IPDEV Co.'s MSJ Against Ameranth's Inequitable Conduct Claims, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 24 - NOL In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To IPDEV Co.'s MSJ Against Ameranth's Inequitable Conduct Claims, #28 Exhibit Exhibit 25 - NOL In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To IPDEV Co.'s MSJ Against Ameranth's Inequitable Conduct Claims)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 957 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 956 OBJECTION by Ameranth, Inc. re #937 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Written Description Support and Enablement in the Specification of the '449 Patent and Request to Strike Claim Chart in Support of IPDEV's Motion for Summary Judgment re Written Description and Enablement in the Specification of the '449 Patent. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) Modified on 3/7/2018 motion to strike added (aef).
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 955 NOTICE of Change of Address by David E. Dunham (Dunham, David) Modified on 3/5/2018 QC mailer sent re document not signed (aef).
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 954 RESPONSE in Opposition re #937 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Written Description Support and Enablement in the Specification of the '449 Patent filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ben West, #2 Notice of Lodgment, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 953 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #938 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Ameranth's First through Fourth and Eight Through Fourteenth Affirmative Defenses filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Keith McNally In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To IPDEV's MSJ On Ameranth's First Through Fourth And Eighth Through Fourteenth Affirmative Defenses, #2 Declaration Declaration of John Osborne In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To IPDEV's MSJ On Ameranth's First Through Fourth And Eighth Through Fourteenth Affirmative Defenses, #3 Notice Notice Of Lodgment In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Opposition To IPDEV's MSJ On Ameranth's First Through Fourth And Eighth Through Fourteenth Affirmative Defenses, #4 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 952 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Defendant Best Western International's Substitution of Attorneys of Record Herein by Best Western International, Inc. (Tache, Joseph) Modified on 3/2/2018 QC mailer sent re s/signature; no hearing date and time (aef).
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 951 NOTICE of Appearance of Erin C. Witkow of witkow | baskin by Brandon J. Witkow on behalf of Ameranth, Inc. (Witkow, Brandon) (aef).
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 950 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Kathryn Branch on behalf of Oracle Corporation (Branch, Amanda)Attorney Amanda Kathryn Branch added to party Oracle Corporation(pty:dft) (aef).
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 949 MOTION to Strike Joint Defendants' Amended Preliminary Invalidity Contentions For U.S. Patent No. 8,146,077 by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memorandum of Points & Authorities In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Motion To Strike Joint Defendants' Amended Preliminary Invalidity Contentions For U.S. Patent No. 8,146,077, #2 Declaration Declaration of Brandon J. Witkow In Support Of Ameranth, Inc.'s Motion To Strike Joint Defendants' Amended Preliminary Invalidity Contentions For U.S. Patent No. 8,146,077, #3 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 948 ORDER granting #946 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Initiate Discovery Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 2/26/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 947 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew E. Buccellato on behalf of Mobo Systems, Inc. (Buccellato, Matthew)Attorney Matthew E. Buccellato added to party Mobo Systems, Inc.(pty:dft) (aef).
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 946 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery To Extend Time To Initiate Discovery Conference Regarding Pizza Hut's and QuikOrder's Discovery Responses by Ameranth, Inc.. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 945 ORDER Granting #941 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Initiate Discovery Conference. The parties are ordered to continue to meet and confer in good faith to resolve the disputes. However, should their efforts fail and Court intervention be necessary, the parties shall jointly contact the Court no later than March 9, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 2/26/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 944 REPLY to Response to Motion re #922 MOTION for Summary Judgment Reply To IPDEV's Opposition To Ameranth's MSJ Of Invalidity Due To Inadequate Written Description Under 35 USC 112 of All Claims Of U.S. Pat. No. 8,738,449 filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration Of Ben West In Support Of Ameranth's Reply To IPDEV Co.'s Opposition To Ameranth's MSJ Of Invalidity Due To Inadequate Written Description Under 35 USC 112 of All Claims Of U.S. Pat. No. 8,738,449, #2 Notice Notice Of Lodgment In Support Of Ameranth's Reply To IPDEV Co.'s Opposition To Ameranth's MSJ Of Invalidity Due To Inadequate Written Description Under 35 USC 112 of All Claims Of U.S. Pat. No. 8,738,449, #3 Proof of Service Certificate Of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 943 PRO HAC APPROVED: Erik Michael Bokar appearing for Defendant Hyatt Corporation (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (jrd)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 942 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10944973.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Bokar, Erik)(jrd)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 941 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Extend Time To Initiate Discovery Conference Regarding Domino's Discovery Responses by Ameranth, Inc. (Caldarelli, William) (aef).
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 940 Minute Order by Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Motion Hearing set for 3/30/2018 is vacated and reset to 3/29/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 13A before Judge Dana M. Sabraw, as to #936 MOTION for Leave to Modify Amended Invalidity Contentions , #933 MOTION Defendants' Motion for Leave to Rely on an Alternative Obviousness Combination. (no document attached) (jak)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 939 ORDER Resetting Hearing Date. (Re ECF #933 ) Motion Hearing reset for 3/30/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/20/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 938 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Ameranth's First through Fourth and Eight Through Fourteenth Affirmative Defenses by IPDEV Co.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Summary Judgment, #2 Declaration in Support of Summary Judgment, #3 Notice of Lodgment, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Proof of Service)(Warnecke, Andrew) (aef).
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 937 MOTION for Summary Judgment Re Written Description Support and Enablement in the Specification of the '449 Patent by IPDEV Co.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Summary Judgment, #2 Declaration in Support of Summary Judgment, #3 Notice of Lodgment, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4 (1of2), #8 Exhibit 4 (2of2), #9 Exhibit 5 (1-2), #10 Exhibit 5 (2-2), #11 Exhibit Statement of Incontrovertible Facts, #12 Proof of Service)(Warnecke, Andrew) (aef).
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 936 MOTION for Leave to Modify Amended Invalidity Contentions by Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Jared Bobrow, #3 Exhibit 1)(Bobrow, Jared) (aef).
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 935 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Ameranth's Inequitable Conduct Claims by IPDEV Co. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration in Support of Summary Judgment, #3 Notice of Lodgment, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3 (part 1 of 3), #7 Exhibit 3 (part 2 of 3), #8 Exhibit 3 (part 3 of 3), #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Proof of Service)(Warnecke, Andrew) (aef).
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 934 RESPONSE in Opposition re #922 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by IPDEV Co.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Opposition, #2 Declaration in Support of Opposition, #3 Notice of Lodgment, #4 Exhibit 1 (part 1/2), #5 Exhibit 1 (part 2/2), #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Proof of Service)(Warnecke, Andrew) (aef).
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 933 MOTION Defendants' Motion for Leave to Rely on an Alternative Obviousness Combination by Expedia, Inc., Fandango, Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotels.com, LP, Hotwire, Inc., Kayak Software Corporation, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Opentable, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Papa John's USA, Inc., Stubhub, Inc., Ticketmaster, LLC, Travelocity.com, LP. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Davison, Dan) Modified on 2/20/2018-QC mailer sent re proposed orders should not be attached (aef).
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 932 ORDER Granting #931 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Initiate Discovery Conference. The joint motion is GRANTED. The parties are ordered to continue to meet and confer in good faith to resolve the dispute. However, should their efforts fail and Court intervention be necessary, the parties shall jointly contact the Court no later than March 9, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 2/15/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 931 Joint MOTION to Extend Time to Initiate Discovery Conference Regarding Pizza Hut's and Quikorder's Discovery Responses by Ameranth, Inc. (Caldarelli, William) (aef)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 930 ORDER Granting #928 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Initiate Discovery Conference. The joint motion is GRANTED. The parties are ordered to continue to meet and confer in good faith to resolve the dispute. However, should their efforts fail and Court intervention be necessary, the parties shall jointly contact the Court no later than March 9, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 2/14/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 929 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger Leonard Scott on behalf of Best Western International, Inc. (Scott, Roger)Attorney Roger Leonard Scott added to party Best Western International, Inc.(pty:dft) (aef).
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 928 Joint MOTION for Discovery To Extend Time To Initiate Discovery Conference Regarding Papa John's Discovery Responses by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate Of Service, #2 [Proposed] Order Granting Joint Motion To Extend Time To Initiate Discovery Conference Regarding Papa John's Discovery Responses)(Caldarelli, William) Modified on 2/12/2018- QC mailer sent re proposed orders should not be filed (aef).
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 927 PRO HAC APPROVED: Stephanie J Nelson appearing for Counter Claimant/Defendant Starbucks Corporation (no document attached) (kcm)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 925 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10893538.) (Nelson, Stephanie) (kcm).
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 926 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Christopher M. Bruno, re #924 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/5/2018.(kcm)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 924 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10883699) (Bruno, Christopher)(jrd)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 923 MOTION to Seal a Previously Filed Document re #783 MOTION for Summary Adjudication of Unenforceability of '449 Patent Based On Inequitable Conduct In Prosecution of '739 Patent and '645 Application, #784 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal by IPDEV Co.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Proof of Service)(Serpe, Gino) (aef).
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 922 NOTICE Of Motion & Motion For Summary Judgment Of Invalidity Due To Inadequate Written Description Under 35 USC Section 112 Of All Claims Of U.S. Patent No. 8,738,449 by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memo Of P's & A's ISO Ameranth, Inc.' MSJ Of Invalidity Due to Inadequate Written Description Under 35 USC Section 112 Of All Claims Of U.S. Patent No. 8,738,449, #2 Declaration Declaration Of Ben West ISO MSJ Of Invalidity Due To Inadequate Written Description Under 35 USC 112 Of All Claims Of Patent No. 8,738,449, #3 Notice Ameranth, Inc.'s Notice Of Lodgment ISO MSJ Of Invalidity Due To Inadequate Written Description Under 35 USC 112 Of All Claims Of U.S. Patent No. 8,738,449, #4 Proof of Service Certificate Of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 921 NOTICE Of Withdrawal Of Docket #918 Due To Inadvertent Filing Of Unredacted Material In The MSJ NOL by Ameranth, Inc. re #918 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Notice Ameranth's Notice Of Withdrawal Of Docket #918 Due To Inadvertent Filing Of Unredacted Material In The Motion For Summary Judgment NOL)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 919 ORDER Granting #786 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Leave to Seal is GRANTED and that Defendants may file the following documents under seal: Exhibit 1, Exhibit 2, Exhibit 3 and Exhibit 4. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 1/29/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 918 ***DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER ECF #921 *** - NOTICE Of Motion & MSJ Of Invalidity Due To Inadequate Written Description by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Dec of Ben West, #3 Notice NOL of Exhibits, #4 Proof of Service)(West, Ben) Modified on 1/30/2018 QC mailer sent re using wrong event (aef). Modified on 1/31/2018 to withdraw document; motion termed (aef).
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 917 ORDER Granting #641 Motion to Withdraw. The motion to withdraw as counsel for Ticketbiscuit filed by Brian Dunne, Matt Olavi and the firm of Olavi Dunne LLP is granted. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 1/29/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 916 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Michael E. Knierim, re #915 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 1/24/2018.(kcm)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 915 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number CAS097835.) (Knierim, Michael) (kcm)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 914 NOTICE of Change of Address by Brian Robert Orr (Orr, Brian) (aef).
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 913 NOTICE of Change of Address by Andrew C Warnecke (Warnecke, Andrew) (aef).
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 912 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Thomas A. Rammer II, re #911 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 1/10/2018.(kcm)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 911 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10770603.) (Rammer, Thomas) (kcm).
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 910 NOTICE (Defendant Starbucks Corporation's Supplemental Notice of Industry Group) by Starbucks Corporation re #903 Scheduling Order,, (McKeever, Patrick) (aef).
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 909 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10770603.) (Rammer, Thomas) (QC mailer sent re: Missing Signature)(kcm).
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 908 ORDER Construing Claims. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/28/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 907 ORDER to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Sonali D. Maitra terminated. Attorney Erin P. Gibson added as counsel of record for Ticketfly, Inc. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/28/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 906 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Claims Construction Hearing) held on 12/11/2017, before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 1/17/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/29/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/27/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. Notice of electronic filing only.) (akr)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 905 NOTICE OF IDENTIFICATION OF DEFENDANTS BY INDUSTRY GROUP by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 904 NOTICE (Defendant Starbucks Corporation's Notice of Industry Group) by Starbucks Corporation re #903 Scheduling Order,, (McKeever, Patrick) (aef).
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 903 Case Management Conference Order Regulating Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings (Miscellaneous Defendants). The Court held a Case Management Conference on 12/11/2017. The Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law is due by 10/4/2019. The Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order is due by 10/25/2019. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 11/1/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. The Jury Trial is set for 12/2/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/14/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 902 Case Management Conference Order Regulating Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings (Ticketing Companies). The Court held a Case Management Conference on 12/11/2017. The Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law is due by 7/5/2019. The Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order is due by 7/26/2019. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 8/2/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. The Jury Trial is set for 9/3/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/14/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 901 Case Management Conference Order Regulating Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings (Travel Aggregators). The Court held a Case Management Conference on 12/11/2017. The Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law is due by 4/5/2019. The Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order is due by 4/29/2019. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 5/3/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. The Jury Trial is set for 6/3/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/14/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 900 Case Management Conference Order Regulating Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings (Hotel Companies). The Court held a Case Management Conference on 12/11/2017. The Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law is due by 12/28/2018. The Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order is due by 1/18/2019. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 1/25/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. The Jury Trial is set for 2/25/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/14/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 899 Case Management Conference Order Regulating Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings (Food Ordering Companies). The Court held a Case Management Conference on 12/11/2017. The Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law is due by 9/28/2018. The Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order is due by 10/19/2018. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 10/26/2018 at 10:30 AM before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. The Jury Trial is set for 12/3/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/14/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 898 Case Management Conference Order Regulating Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings (Pizza Companies and System Providers). The Court held a Case Management Conference on 12/11/2017. The Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law is due by 7/6/2018. The Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order is due by 7/27/2018. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 8/3/2018 at 10:30 AM before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. The Jury Trial is set for 9/4/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/14/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 897 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Claims Construction Hearing held on 12/11/2017. The binders of exhibit slides submitted by the parties are marked as hearing exhibits, to be preserved by the parties. The claim construction is taken under submission, Court to issue a Markman order. Case Management Conference held on 12/11/2017. Court to issue an order re case management. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney William Caldarelli, Michael Fabiano, John Osborne). (Defendant Attorney Jared Bobrow, Brian Chang, Thomas Cunningham, Dan Davison, Stephanie DeBrow, Eric Faragi, Christine Wilson Feller, Erin Gibson, John Guaragna, Marc Karish (telephonically), Arthur Licygiewicz, Patrick McKeever, Lowell Mead, Laura Miller, Ryan Moran, Brian Orr, Gino Serpe, J Rick Tache, Natalie Taylor (telephonically), Andrew Warnecke, Robert Williams, Andrew Zappia, Richard Zembek.). (no document attached) (jak)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 896 JOINT HEARING STATEMENT by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 895 NOTICE of Lodgment by Ameranth, Inc. of Non-Institution Decision Regarding CBM Petition Challenging '077 Patent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 894 NOTICE of Lodgment by Ameranth, Inc. In Support of Plaintiff's Claim Constructions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 893 NOTICE of Supplemental Evidence in Support of Defendants' Claim Constructions by Expedia, Inc., Fandango, Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotels.com, LP, Hotwire, Inc., Kayak Software Corporation, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Opentable, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Papa John's USA, Inc., Stubhub, Inc., Ticketmaster, LLC, Travelocity.com, LP (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie N. DeBrow, #2 Exhibit A)(Davison, Dan)(aef).
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 892 Ex Parte MOTION to Allow the Use of Electrical Equipment in the Courtroom During Claim Construction Hearing by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 891 ORDER Denying #830 Ticketfly's Motion to Strike Ameranth's Infringement Contentions. Ticketfly's motion to strike is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/21/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 890 ORDER Denying Ameranth's Motion for Summary Adjudication of Unenforceability of '449 Patent for Inequitable Conduct in its Prosecution. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/16/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 889 NOTICE of Filing of Defendants' Amended Joint Claim Construction Chart and Worksheet by Expedia, Inc., Fandango, Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotels.com, LP, Hotwire, Inc., Kayak Software Corporation, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Opentable, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Papa John's USA, Inc., Stubhub, Inc., Ticketmaster, LLC, Travelocity.com, LP (Attachments: #1 Amended Joint Claim Construction Chart, #2 Amended Joint Claim Construction Worksheet)(Davison, Dan) (aef).
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 888 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Gilbert A. Greene as Counsel for by Expedia, Inc., Fandango, Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotels.com, LP, Hotwire, Inc., Kayak Software Corporation, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Opentable, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Papa John's USA, Inc., Stubhub, Inc., Ticketmaster, LLC, Travelocity.com, LP (Davison, Dan) (aef).
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 887 ORDER Re: Oral Argument. (ECF #830 ) Ticketfly's motion to strike Ameranth's amended infringement contentions is currently scheduled for hearing on November 17, 2017.The Court finds this matter suitable for decision without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). Accordingly, the November 17, 2017 hearing is vacated. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/13/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 886 REPLY to Response to Motion re #830 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions Reply in Support of Defendant Ticketfly Inc.s Motion to Strike Ameranths Deficient Infringement Contentions filed by Ticketfly, Inc.. (Saulsbury, Timothy) (aef).
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 885 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Joint Telephonic Conference held on 11/7/2017. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney William Caldarelli). (Defendant Attorney Richard Zembeck, Dan Davison, Andrew Warnecke, Brian Robert Orr, Robert Williams, Erin Gibson, Marc Karish, Jared Bobrow, Brian Chang, Laura Miller, Robert Williams, Erin Gibson, Eric Faragi, Joel Beres, Christine Feller, Matthew Bernstein, Louise Lu, Nick Saros, Tim Saulsbury, Art Licygiewicz, Joseph Tache, Michael Hopkins). (no document attached) (jak)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 884 RESPONSE re #865 Claim Construction Brief, filed by ATX Innovation, Inc., Agilysys, Inc., Apple, Inc., Best Western International, Inc., Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC, Eventbrite, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Fandango, Inc., Grubhub, Inc., Hilton International Co., Hilton Resorts Corporation, Hilton Worldwide, Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotels.com, LP, Hotwire, Inc., Hyatt Corporation, Kayak Software Corporation, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., Marriott International, Inc., Mobo Systems, Inc., O-Web Technologies LTD, Opentable, Inc., Oracle Corporation, Orbitz, LLC, Papa John's USA, Inc., Pizza Hut of America, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., QuikOrder, Inc., Renaissance Hotel Operating Company, Seamless North America, LLC, Starbucks Corporation, Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, Inc., Stubhub, Inc., The Ritz Carlton Hotel Company, LLC, Ticketbiscuit, LLC, Ticketfly, Inc., Ticketmaster, LLC, Travelocity.com, LP, Usablenet, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 21, #3 Exhibit 22, #4 Exhibit 23, #5 Exhibit 24, #6 Exhibit 25, #7 Exhibit 26)(Davison, Dan) (aef).
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 883 RESPONSE re #866 Claim Construction Brief,,, filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 19, #2 Exhibit 20, #3 Exhibit 21, #4 Exhibit 22, #5 Exhibit 23, #6 Exhibit 24, #7 Exhibit 25, #8 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 882 RESPONSE re #868 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 19, #2 Exhibit 20, #3 Exhibit 21, #4 Exhibit 22, #5 Exhibit 23, #6 Exhibit 24, #7 Exhibit 25, #8 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 881 RESPONSE TO CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by Hyatt Corporation. (Schneeweis, Gerald) (aef).
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 880 RESPONSE TO CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by Grubhub, Inc., Seamless North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Faragi, Eric) (aef).
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 879 RESPONSE TO CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by IPDEV Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew C. Warnecke, #2 Notice of Lodgment in Support, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(Warnecke, Andrew) (aef).
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 878 NOTICE of Filing of Amended Joint Claim Construction Chart and Worksheet by Hyatt Corporation re #781 Joint Hearing Statement, (Attachments: #1 Amended Joint Claim Construction Chart and Worksheet, #2 Proof of Service)(Schneeweis, Gerald) (aef).
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 877 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 9/14/2018*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #876 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (aef). Modified on 9/14/2018 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 876 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 875 RESPONSE in Opposition re #830 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ethan Watts, #2 Notice of Lodgment, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 874 ORDER Granting #854 Hyatt Corporation's Motion for Leave to Amend the Joint Claim Construction Chart and Worksheet. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/26/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 873 REPLY - Other re #840 MOTION for Summary Adjudication of '449 Patent for Inequitable Conduct In Its Prosecution filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 872 ORDER Granting #871 Joint Motion to Extend Time.Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/23/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 871 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Infringement Contentions for StubHub and Hotwire by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 870 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by Hyatt Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proof of Service)(Schneeweis, Gerald) (aef).
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 869 RESPONSE in Opposition re #840 MOTION for Summary Adjudication of '449 Patent for Inequitable Conduct In Its Prosecution filed by IPDEV Co.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of IPDEV's Opposition to Ameranths Motion for Summary Adjudication, #2 Declaration In Support of IPDEV's Opposition to Ameranths Motion for Summary Adjudication, #3 Notice of Lodgment In Support of IPDEV's Opposition to Ameranths Motion for Summary Adjudication, #4 Exhibit ACW 1, #5 Exhibit ACW 2, #6 Exhibit ACW 3, #7 Proof of Service)(Warnecke, Andrew) (aef).
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 868 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by IPDEV Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Andrew C Warnecke in Support of IPDEVs Opening Claim Construction Brief, #2 Notice of Lodgment in Support of IPDEVs Opening Claim Construction Brief, #3 Exhibit ACW 1, #4 Exhibit ACW 2, #5 Exhibit ACW 3, #6 Exhibit ACW 4, #7 Exhibit ACW 5, #8 Exhibit ACW 6, #9 Proof of Service)(Warnecke, Andrew) (aef).
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 867 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by Grubhub, Inc., Seamless North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Faragi, Eric) (aef).
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 866 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by Expedia, Inc., Fandango, Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotels.com, LP, Hotwire, Inc., Kayak Software Corporation, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Opentable, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Papa John's USA, Inc., Stubhub, Inc., Ticketmaster, LLC, Travelocity.com, LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Franz, #2 Declaration of Stephanie DeBrow, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20)(Davison, Dan) (aef).
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 865 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Declaration of Michael Shamos, Ph.D., #20 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 864 NON Opposition re #854 MOTION to Amend/Correct #781 Joint Hearing Statement, (Joint Claim Construction Chart and Worksheet) filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 863 ORDER Granting #862 Substitution of Attorneys for Defendant ATX Innovation, Inc. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/18/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 862 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by ATX Innovation, Inc.. (Costantini, Leanna) (aef).
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 861 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of David E. Dunham, re #853 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/10/2017.(kcm)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 860 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Natalie A. Taylor, re #851 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/10/2017.(kcm)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 859 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Jeffrey G. Toler, re #847 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/10/2017.(kcm)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 858 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Mobo Systems, Inc. re #807 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions filed by Mobo Systems, Inc. . (Mead, Lowell) (aef).
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 857 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by The Ritz Carlton Hotel Company, LLC, Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., Marriott International, Inc., Renaissance Hotel Operating Company re #810 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Infringement Contentions filed by Renaissance Hotel Operating Company, Marriott International, Inc.,., Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., The Ritz Carlton Hotel Company, LLC . (Saros, Nick) (aef).
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 856 NOTICE of Partial Withdrawal Without Prejudice by Ticketfly, Inc. re #830 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions (Saulsbury, Timothy) (aef).
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 855 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Hyatt Corporation re #801 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions (Schneeweis, Gerald) (aef).
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 854 MOTION to Amend/Correct #781 Joint Hearing Statement, (Joint Claim Construction Chart and Worksheet) by Hyatt Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Declaration of James M. Oehler, #8 Proof of Service)(Schneeweis, Gerald)(aef).
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 853 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10501473.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Dunham, David)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 852 *DOCKETED IN ERROR* (kcm).
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 851 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10499503.) (Taylor, Natalie) (kcm).
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 850 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10499503.) (Taylor, Natalie) (QC mailer sent re: Missing Signature) (kcm).
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 849 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Document by Pizza Hut of America, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., QuikOrder, Inc. re #835 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions (Yu, George) (aef).
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 848 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Best Western International, Inc. re #804 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions filed by Best Western International, Inc. . (Squier, Erikson) (aef).
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 847 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10485966.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Toler, Jeffrey) (kcm).
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 846 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M. Lobbin on behalf of ATX Innovation, Inc. (Lobbin, Stephen)Attorney Stephen M. Lobbin added to party ATX Innovation, Inc.(pty:dft) (aef).
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 845 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Oracle Corporation re #820 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Infringement Contentions filed by Oracle Corporation . (Bobrow, Jared) (aef).
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 844 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence J Hilton on behalf of ATX Innovation, Inc. (Hilton, Lawrence)Attorney Lawrence J Hilton added to party ATX Innovation, Inc.(pty:dft) (aef).
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 843 ORDER Granting #839 Joint Motion to Extend Time to Initiate Discovery Conference Regarding the Production of Source Code. A 30-day extension of time is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/25/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 842 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #841 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 841 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 840 MOTION for Summary Adjudication of '449 Patent for Inequitable Conduct In Its Prosecution by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration John Osborne, #3 Notice of Lodgment, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 839 Joint MOTION to Extend Time to Initiate Discovery Conference Regarding the Production of Source Code by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 838 ORDER Denying the DLA Defendants' Motion to Strike Ameranth's Amended Infringement Contentions. The DLA Defendants' motion to strike Ameranth's amended infringement contentions is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/20/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 837 ORDER Granting #831 Ameranth's Ex Parte Motion for Order Re-Setting Hearing Date on Motions to Strike. Ameranth's Ex Parte Motion is granted. The hearing date on these motions is continued to November 17, 2017, at 1:30 p.m. Ameranth shall file its oppositions to the motions on or before October 27, 2017. Ameranth may file all of its opposition briefs on that date, or may file its opposition briefs at any time before that date. Similarly, Defendants shall file their respective reply briefs on or before November 9, 2017. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/20/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 836 NON Opposition re #810 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Infringement Contentions, #801 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions, #820 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Infringement Contentions, #807 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions, #787 Joint MOTION to Strike #786 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal Joint Motion to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions, #830 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions, #804 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions, #835 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions filed by Grubhub, Inc., Seamless North America, LLC. (Faragi, Eric) (aef).
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 835 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions by Pizza Hut of America, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., QuikOrder, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Christine W. Feller in Support of Motion, #3 Exhibit 1 (Lodged Under Seal), #4 Exhibit 2 (Lodged Under Seal))(Feller, Christine) (aef).
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 834 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #833 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Feller, Christine)(aef).
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 833 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Feller, Christine) (aef).
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 832 ORDER Re: Oral Argument. The DLA Defendants' motion to strike Ameranth's amended infringement contentions is currently scheduled for hearing on September 22, 2017. The Court has reviewed the parties' briefs and finds this matter suitable for decision without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). Accordingly, the September 22, 2017 hearing is vacated. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/18/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 831 Ex Parte MOTION Re-Setting Hearing Date On Motions to Strike Filed By Defendants Mobo Systems, Inc., Oracle Corporation, Hyatt Corporation, Best Western International, Inc., Marriott Hotel Services, Inc. & Ticketfly, Inc. by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Brandon Witkow, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 830 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions by Ticketfly, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Sonali D. Maitra (and Index to Exhibits), #3 Exhibit 1 (Lodged Under Seal), #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4)(Saulsbury, Timothy) (aef).
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 829 ***DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEALED ON 9/10/2018*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #828 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Saulsbury, Timothy) (aef). Modified on 9/10/2018 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 828 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Saulsbury, Timothy)(aef).
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 827 REPLY to Response to Motion re #825 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal, #787 Joint MOTION to Strike #786 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal Joint Motion to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions filed by Apple, Inc., Eventbrite, Inc., Hilton International Co., Hilton Resorts Corporation, Hilton Worldwide, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jacob Anderson, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2 (under seal), #4 Exhibit 3 (under seal))(Guaragna, John) (aef).
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 826 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #825 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Guaragna, John) (lrf).
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 825 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Guaragna, John) (lrf).
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 824 NOTICE of Joinder by Usablenet, Inc. re #810 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Infringement Contentions, #801 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions, #820 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Infringement Contentions, #787 Joint MOTION to Strike #786 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal Joint Motion to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions, #804 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions (Vanderhoof, Brian) (aef).
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 823 NOTICE OF NONOPPOSITION TO AND STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS TO STRIKE AMERANTH'S DEFICIENT INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC re #810 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Infringement Contentions, #801 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions, #820 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Infringement Contentions, #807 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions, #787 Joint MOTION to Strike #786 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal Joint Motion to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions, #804 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions (Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 822 NOTICE of Joinder by ATX Innovation, Inc. re #810 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Infringement Contentions, #801 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions, #820 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Infringement Contentions, #807 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions, #787 Joint MOTION to Strike #786 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal Joint Motion to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions, #804 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions (Tache, Joseph) (knb).
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 821 NOTICE of Joinder by Ticketbiscuit, LLC re #810 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Infringement Contentions, #801 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions, #807 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions, #787 Joint MOTION to Strike #786 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal Joint Motion to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions, #804 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions (Karish, Marc) (aef).
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Order by Judge Dana M. Sabraw: RE [783-1] MOTION for Summary Adjudication of Unenforceability of '449 Patent Based On Inequitable Conduct In Prosecution of '739 Patent and '645 Application by Ameranth, Inc. The Court finds this matter suitable for decision without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). Accordingly, the September 15, 2017 hearing is vacated. (Written order entered in 14cv1303-DMS). (no document attached) (jak)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 820 ***DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER ECF #845 *** - MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Infringement Contentions by Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Brian Chang, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(Bobrow, Jared) Modified on 9/28/2017 to term motion (aef).
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 819 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #818 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Bobrow, Jared) (aef).
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 818 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Bobrow, Jared) (aef).
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 817 ORDER Re: Expert Depositions for Claim Construction. (Re ECF #797 ) Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/12/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 816 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Chen Saulsbury on behalf of Ticketfly, Inc. (Saulsbury, Timothy)Attorney Timothy Chen Saulsbury added to party Ticketfly, Inc.(pty:dft)(aef).
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 815 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #814 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 814 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 813 RESPONSE in Opposition re #787 Joint MOTION to Strike #786 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal Joint Motion to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ethan Watts, #2 Declaration of Michel Cardinal, #3 Notice of Lodgment, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 812 RESPONSE in Support re #783 MOTION for Summary Adjudication of Unenforceability of '449 Patent Based On Inequitable Conduct In Prosecution of '739 Patent and '645 Application filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 811 NOTICE of Joinder by Expedia, Inc., Fandango, Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotels.com, LP, Hotwire, Inc., Kayak Software Corporation, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Opentable, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Papa John's USA, Inc., Stubhub, Inc., Ticketmaster, LLC, Travelocity.com, LP re #810 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Infringement Contentions, #801 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions, #807 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions, #787 Joint MOTION to Strike #786 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal Joint Motion to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions, #804 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions (Davison, Dan) (aef)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 810 ***DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER ECF #857 *** - MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Infringement Contentions by Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., Marriott International, Inc., Renaissance Hotel Operating Company, The Ritz Carlton Hotel Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Nick Saros (Exhibits 1-3 Filed Under Seal))(Saros, Nick) (aef). Modified on 10/10/2017 to term motion (aef).
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 809 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #808 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Saros, Nick) (aef).
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 808 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Saros, Nick) (aef).
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 807 ***DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER ECF #858 *** - MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions by Mobo Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Declaration of Lowell D. Mead, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C (under seal), #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E (under seal))(Mead, Lowell) Modified on 10/12/2017-to withdraw document; motion termed (aef).
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 806 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #805 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Mead, Lowell) (aef).
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 805 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Mead, Lowell) (aef).
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 804 MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions by Best Western International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Erikson C. Squier, #3 Table of Exhibits, #4 Exhibit 1 (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit 2 (Redacted))(Squier, Erikson) (aef).
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 803 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 9/10/2018*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #802 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Squier, Erikson) (aef). Modified on 9/10/2018 to add file date of lodgment (aef).
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 802 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Squier, Erikson) (aef).
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 801 ***DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER ECF #855 *** - MOTION to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions by Hyatt Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE AMERANTHS DEFICIENT INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS, #2 Declaration OF DAVID P. LINDNER IN SUPPORT OF HYATT CORPORATIONS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE AMERANTHS DEFICIENT INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS, #3 Exhibit 1-2, #4 Exhibit 3 (Contains Redactions), #5 Exhibit 4-8 (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit 9-12, #7 Exhibit 13-17 (Filed Under Seal), #8 Exhibit 18-20)(Schneeweis, Gerald) (aef). Modified on 10/5/2017 to withdraw document; motion termed (aef).
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 800 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #799 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Schneeweis, Gerald) (aef).
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 799 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Schneeweis, Gerald) (aef).
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 798 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Jesse Hindman by Apple, Inc., Eventbrite, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, Inc. (Gibson, Erin) (aef).
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 797 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Re: Expert Depositions for Claim Construction by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 796 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #795 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Warnecke, Andrew) (aef).
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 795 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Warnecke, Andrew) (aef).
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 794 RESPONSE in Opposition re #783 MOTION for Summary Adjudication of Unenforceability of '449 Patent Based On Inequitable Conduct In Prosecution of '739 Patent and '645 Application filed by IPDEV Co.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Opposition to Ameranth's Motion for Summary Adjudication, #2 Declaration Warnecke Declaration in Support of Opposition Motion, #3 Notice of Lodgment in Support of IPDEV Opposition, #4 Exhibit ACW 1, #5 Exhibit ACW 2, #6 Exhibit ACW 3, #7 Exhibit ACW 4 (Under Seal), #8 Exhibit ACW 5 (Under Seal), #9 Exhibit ACW 6 (Under Seal), #10 Exhibit ACW 7, #11 Exhibit ACW 8- Part 1of2, #12 Exhibit ACW 8 - Part 2of2, #13 Exhibit ACW 9- Part 1 of 2, #14 Exhibit ACW 9-Part 2 of 2, #15 Exhibit ACW 10, #16 Exhibit ACW 11, #17 Proof of Service)(Warnecke, Andrew) (aef).
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 793 PRO HAC APPROVED: Brian Robert Orr appearing for Defendant and Counter Defendant IPDEV Co.(no document attached) (kcm)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 792 PRO HAC APPROVED: Andrew C Warnecke appearing for Defendant and Counter Defendant IPDEV Co. (no document attached) (kcm)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 791 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10109159.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Orr, Brian) (kcm).
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 790 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-8138074.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Warnecke, Andrew) (kcm).
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 789 NOTICE of Appearance for IPDEV, Inc. by Gino D Serpe on behalf of IPDEV Co. (Serpe, Gino)Attorney Gino D Serpe added to party IPDEV Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Gino D Serpe added to party IPDEV Co.(pty:cd) Modified on 8/28/2017 QC mailer sent re wrong event (aef).
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 788 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 1/29/2018*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #786 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Guaragna, John) (aef). (Main Document 788 replaced on 1/30/2018) (aef). Modified on 1/30/2018 to add lodgment file date (aef).
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 787 Joint MOTION to Strike #786 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal Joint Motion to Strike Ameranth's Deficient Infringement Contentions by Apple, Inc., Eventbrite, Inc., Hilton International Co., Hilton Resorts Corporation, Hilton Worldwide, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Jacob Anderson, #3 Exhibit 1 (filed under seal), #4 Exhibit 2 (filed under seal), #5 Exhibit 3 (filed under seal), #6 Exhibit 4 (filed under seal), #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9)(Guaragna, John) (aef).
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 786 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Guaragna, John) (aef).
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 785 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #784 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 784 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 783 MOTION for Summary Adjudication of Unenforceability of '449 Patent Based On Inequitable Conduct In Prosecution of '739 Patent and '645 Application by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of John Osborne, #3 Notice Of Lodgment, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18a, #22 Exhibit 18b, #23 Exhibit 19, #24 Exhibit 20, #25 Exhibit 21, #26 Exhibit 22, #27 Exhibit 23, #28 Exhibit 24, #29 Exhibit 25, #30 Exhibit 26, #31 Exhibit 27, #32 Exhibit 28, #33 Exhibit 29, #34 Exhibit 30, #35 Exhibit 31, #36 Exhibit 32, #37 Exhibit 33, #38 Exhibit 34, #39 Exhibit 35, #40 Exhibit 36, #41 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 782 ORDER. The Court finds as follows: Any expert testimony on claim construction should be submitted via declaration rather than live testimony at the Markman hearing. The Court will consider the parties' grouping of claim terms in numbers (2), (6) and (7). The Court will not consider at this time whether the additional claim terms/phrases identified on page 11 of the Joint Statement are indefinite. Rather, the Court will address that issue at the summary judgment stage. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/16/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 781 JOINT HEARING STATEMENT by Ameranth, Inc., Electronic Frontier Foundation, IPDEV Co., QuikOrder, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Joint Claim Construction Chart, #2 Joint Claim Construction Worksheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 780 ORDER Granting #779 Joint Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiff shall serve amended infringement contentions for each of the moving defendants, Fandango, Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotwire, Inc., OpenTable, Inc., Papa John's USA, Inc., StubHub, Inc., and Travelocity.com LP ("Moving Defendants") on August 7, 2017, as provided by the Court's Order of July 6, 2017 [Dkt. No. 775]. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/3/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 779 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Infringement Contentions by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William)(aef).
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 778 ORDER Denying #745 Ameranth's Motion to Strike Defendants' Preliminary Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/13/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 777 NOTICE of Appearance by Azadeh Razi Morrison on behalf of Mobo Systems, Inc. (Morrison, Azadeh)Attorney Azadeh Razi Morrison added to party Mobo Systems, Inc.(pty:dft) (fth).
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 776 NOTICE of Compliance of Service of Amended Infringement Contentions and Responsive Statement Re Order On Ex Parte Motion to Continue Deadline to Serve Infringement Contentions and Set Standards for Source Code Productions by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (fth).
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 775 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Ameranth's #764 Ex Parte Motion for Order Continuing Deadline to Serve Amended Infringement Contentions and to Set Standards for Production of Source Code and Technical Documents. On 11/7/2017 at 1:30 p.m. the Court will hold a joint telephonicconference to discuss the parties' intended presentations at the claim construction hearing, including any tutorial and testimony. The Claims Construction Hearing will be held on 12/11/2017 at 9:00 AM before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/6/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(fth)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 774 JOINT HEARING STATEMENT by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Joint Claim Construction Chart, #2 Joint Claim Construction Worksheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (fth).
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 773 PRO HAC APPROVED: Frederick A. Tecce appearing for Defendant Agilysys, Inc. (no document attached) (kcm)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 772 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10221635.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Tecce, Frederick)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 771 RESPONSE in Opposition re #764 Ex Parte MOTION for Order Continuing Deadline to Serve Amended Infringement Contentions and to Set Standards for Production of Source Code and Technical Documents Joinder of Defendants' Opposition to Ameranth's Ex Parte Motion filed by Apple, Inc., Eventbrite, Inc., Hilton International Co., Hilton Resorts Corporation, Hilton Worldwide, Inc., Starwood Hotels and Resorts Worldwide, Inc. (Gibson, Erin) (aef).
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 770 DECLARATION re #768 Response in Opposition to Motion, Declaration of Chris Maxwell in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Ameranth's Ex Parte Motion to Continue the Deadline to Serve Amended Infringement Contentions and to Set Standards for Production of Source Code and Technical Documents by Defendant Ticketfly, Inc. (Tsuei, James) (aef).
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 769 RESPONSE in Opposition re #764 Ex Parte MOTION for Order Continuing Deadline to Serve Amended Infringement Contentions and to Set Standards for Production of Source Code and Technical Documents filed by Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick J. McKeever, #2 Exhibit 1 to Decl. of Patrick J. McKeever, #3 Exhibit 2 to Decl. of Patrick J. McKeever)(McKeever, Patrick) (aef).
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 768 RESPONSE in Opposition re #764 Ex Parte MOTION for Order Continuing Deadline to Serve Amended Infringement Contentions and to Set Standards for Production of Source Code and Technical Documents filed by Expedia, Inc., Fandango, Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotels.com, LP, Hotwire, Inc., Kayak Software Corporation, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Opentable, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Papa John's USA, Inc., Stubhub, Inc., Ticketmaster, LLC, Travelocity.com, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Declaration of Brian Chang, #6 Declaration of Thomas Cunningham, #7 Declaration of Stephanie DeBrow, #8 Declaration of Christine Feller, #9 Declaration of David Lindner, #10 Declaration of Nicholas Merker, #11 Declaration of Erikson Squier, #12 Declaration of James Tsuei, #13 Proof of Service)(Davison, Dan) (aef).
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 767 ORDER Re: Oral Argument. (Re ECF #727 , #745 ) The Court finds these matters suitable for decision without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). Accordingly, the June 30, 2017 hearing is vacated. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/26/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 766 RESPONSE in Support re #727 MOTION to Rely on an Alternative Obviousness Combination filed by Hyatt Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proof of Service)(Schneeweis, Gerald) (aef).
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 765 RESPONSE in Support re #745 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Preliminary Invalidity Contentions for U.S. Patent No. 8,146,077 filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 764 Ex Parte MOTION for Order Continuing Deadline to Serve Amended Infringement Contentions and to Set Standards for Production of Source Code and Technical Documents by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of Ex Parte Motion, #2 Declaration of Ethan Watts, #3 Declaration of Ben West, #4 Declaration of Michel Cardinal, #5 Declaration of Victor Ciccarelli, #6 Notice of Lodgment, #7 Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit C, #10 Exhibit D, #11 Exhibit E (1 of 2), #12 Exhibit E (2 of 2), #13 Proof of Service)(West, Ben)Attorney Ben West added to party Ameranth, Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney Ben West added to party Ameranth, Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney Ben West added to party Ameranth, Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney Ben West added to party Ameranth, Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney Ben West added to party Ameranth, Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney Ben West added to party Ameranth, Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney Ben West added to party Ameranth, Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney Ben West added to party Ameranth, Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney Ben West added to party Ameranth, Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney Ben West added to party Ameranth, Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney Ben West added to party Ameranth, Inc.(pty:cd) (aef).
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 763 NOTICE (Defendant Starbucks Corporation's Notice of Parallel USPTO PTAB Proceedings) by Starbucks Corporation (McKeever, Patrick) Mod (fth).
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 762 Minute Order by Judge Dana M. Sabraw: The telephonic Status Conferences scheduled for 6/22/2017 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw is ordered vacated. (no document attached) (jak)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 761 RESPONSE in Opposition re #727 MOTION to Rely on an Alternative Obviousness Combination filed by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 760 RESPONSE in Opposition re #745 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Preliminary Invalidity Contentions for U.S. Patent No. 8,146,077 filed by Expedia, Inc., Fandango, Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotels.com, LP, Hotwire, Inc., Kayak Software Corporation, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Opentable, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Papa John's USA, Inc., Stubhub, Inc., Ticketmaster, LLC, Travelocity.com, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Zembek, Richard) (aef).
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 759 NOTICE of Teleconference Per Court Order by Ameranth, Inc. re #757 Order, Set Hearings, (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 758 ORDER Following Discovery Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 6/13/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 757 ORDER (1) Resolving Joint Motion Re: Infringement Contentions and (2) Setting Further Telephonic Status Conference. A telephonic Status Conference is set for 6/22/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Plaintiff's counsel shall organize and initiate the conference call, and shall provide notice of the call to defense counsel in Case Number 17cv1093 and make arrangements for them to participate. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/13/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 756 ORDER Dismissing All Claims and Counter-Claims Between Ameranth, Inc., and Wanderspot LCC. (Re ECF #726 ) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: All of Ameranth Inc.'s ("Ameranth") claims against Wanderspot LLC ("Wanderspot") set forth in Ameranth's First Amended Complaint against Wanderspot [Doc. No. 479] are dismissed with prejudice as to Wanderspot, only. All of Wanderspot's counterclaims set forth in its Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims against Ameranth regarding Ameranth's '850, '325 and '077 patents are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/13/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 755 Minute Entry for proceedings held on June 9, 2017, in member case 14-CV-1303-DMS(WVG) IPDEV Co. v. Ameranth Inc. before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Conference (re: Ameranth's responses to ROGS (set 1) 1, 3 & 4(b)). Order to follow.(no document attached) (ajf)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 754 ORDER Following Discovery Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 6/7/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (fth)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 752 ORDER granting Plaintiff Ameranth', Inc.'s #714 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. The following document may be filed under seal pursuant to Local Rule 79.2: Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions as to Defendant Usablenet, Inc., served on Defendant Usablenet, Inc. on 3/24/2017, attached as Exhibit A to the Declaration of Brandon J. Witko. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/6/2017. (jah)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 751 Minute Entry for proceedings held on June 6, 2017, in member case 13-CV-353-DMS(WVG) Ameranth, Inc. v. Ticketfly, Inc. before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Conference (re: source code review software). (Attorneys Ethan Watts and James Tsuei.) Order to follow. (no document attached) (ajf)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 750 ORDER Setting Discovery Conference. The Court will convene a discovery teleconference in the above-captioned member case on June 9, 2017 at 2:45 p.m. to discuss disputed responses to three interrogatories. The Court will initiate the call with counsel. On or before June 5, 2017, the parties shall submit a joint statement to efile_Gallo@casd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 6/2/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 748 ORDER Granting #743 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' Motion is GRANTED and that Defendants may file the following document under seal: Exhibit 3, Exhibit 4 and Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Erin P. Gibson in Support of Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Documents under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/1/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 746 ORDER Re Motion to File Document Under Seal in Support of Joint Motion Regarding Case Management Schedule and Infringement Contentions. (Re Doc #739 ) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Ameranth's Motion to File Document Under Seal is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/1/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 745 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Preliminary Invalidity Contentions for U.S. Patent No. 8,146,077 by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of William J. Caldarelli, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Declaration 4, #7 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 744 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 6/1/2017*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #743 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Gibson, Erin) (aef)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 743 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Gibson, Erin) (aef).
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 742 DECLARATION re #741 Joint MOTION re #740 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, #739 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal Case Management Schedule and Infringement Contentions Declaration of Erin P. Gibson in Support of Joint Motion Regarding Case Management Schedule and Infringement Contentions by Defendant Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)(Gibson, Erin) (aef).
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 741 Joint MOTION re #740 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, #739 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal Case Management Schedule and Infringement Contentions by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William J. Caldarelli, #2 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 740 ***FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 6/1/2017*** - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #739 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Caldarelli, William) (aef)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 739 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 738 NOTICE of Compliance with Patent L.R. 3.3 and 3.4 and Proof of Service by Domino's Pizza, Inc., Domino's Pizza, LLC (Cunningham, Thomas) (aef).
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 737 NOTICE of Compliance With Patent L.R. 3.3 and 3.4 by Agilysys, Inc. (Pettit, Jonathan) QC mailer sent re Certificate of Service signed by non-registered user (jjg).
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 736 NOTICE of Compliance with Patent L.R. 3.3 and 3.4 by Pizza Hut of America, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., QuikOrder, Inc. (Feller, Christine) (jjg).
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 735 NOTICE of Compliance with Patent Local Rules 3.3 and 3.4 by Ticketbiscuit, LLC (Karish, Marc) (jjg).
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 734 NOTICE of Compliance with Patent L.R. 3.3 and 3.4 by ATX Innovation, Inc., Best Western International, Inc. (Squier, Erikson) (jjg).
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 733 NOTICE of Compliance with Patent Local Rules 3.3 and 3.4 by Usablenet, Inc. (Vanderhoof, Brian) (jjg).
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 732 NOTICE of Compliance with Patent L.R. 3.3 and 3.4 by Hyatt Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Schneeweis, Gerald) (jjg).
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 731 NOTICE of Compliance With Patent L.R. 3.3 and 3.4 by Expedia, Inc., Fandango, Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotels.com, LP, Hotwire, Inc., Kayak Software Corporation, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Opentable, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Papa John's USA, Inc., Stubhub, Inc., Ticketmaster, LLC, Travelocity.com, LP, Wanderspot LLC (Davison, Dan) (jjg).
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 730 ORDER Requesting Joint Statement. The Court orders the parties to submit a Joint Statement on this dispute on or before May 30, 2017. The Statement shall set forth each side's position, and shall be no more than ten (10) pages, evenly divided between Plaintiff on one side and Defendants on the other. Unless the Court orders otherwise, the matter will be decided on the papers and without oral argument. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/23/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 729 ORDER following discovery conference in member case 12CV742 (Pizza Hut Inc.). Pizza Hut shall produce responsive documents no later than May 30, 2017 as further detailed in the attached Order. Dated May 19, 2017.(ajf) Modified to correct due date on 5/30/2017 (sjt).
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 728 ORDER on Motions for Extension of Time to Present Discovery Disputes. (Doc. Nos. 682-701, 703-713 & 717) The following motions are DENIED as moot: Doc. Nos. 688 through 701. The following motions are GRANTED: Doc. Nos. 682-687, 703-713, 717. The Court grants the affected parties a total of 60 days to bring source code-related disputes to the Court's attention. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/17/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 727 MOTION to Rely on an Alternative Obviousness Combination by Hyatt Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Schneeweis, Gerald) Modified on 5/17/2017-QC mailer sent re proposed orders (aef).
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 726 Joint MOTION to Dismiss of All Claims and Counter-Claims Between Ameranth, Inc., and Wanderspott, LLC, Only by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William)(aef).
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 725 ORDER Granting #724 Joint Motion for Protective Order. The Protective Order applies to Ticketfly and the Ticketfly Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/15/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 724 Joint MOTION and Stipulation requesting Protective Order apply to Ticketfly re #323 Order (Protective Order) by Ticketfly, Inc. (Tsuei, James) (aef).
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 723 ORDER Re: Oral Argument. (Re Doc #647 ) Usablenet's motion for judgment on the pleadings is currently scheduled for hearing on May 19, 2017. The Court finds this matter suitable for decision without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). Accordingly, the May 19, 2017 hearing is vacated. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/15/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 722 REPLY to Response to Motion re #647 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Regarding Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, or, in the Alternative, to Stay This Lawsuit filed by Usablenet, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian C. Vanderhoof in Support of Reply, #2 Notice of Lodgment in Support of Reply, #3 Exhibit A to Notice of Lodgment, #4 Proof of Service)(Vanderhoof, Brian) (aef).
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 721 ORDER Granting #676 Motion to Substitute Counsel. The Court GRANTS defendants' motion. Eliot Williams is substituted as local counsel for Richard Clegg for named defendants GrubHub, Inc. and Seamless North America, LLC, in Case Nos. 11-cv-1810, 12-cv-737, and 12-cv-739. The clerk is directed to remove Richard Clegg from the ECF service list for these cases. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/11/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 720 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/17/2017, before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Court Reporter/Transcriber: James C. Pence-Aviles. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 6/1/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/12/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. Notice of electronic filing only.) (akr)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 719 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Anderson on behalf of Hilton International Co., Hilton Resorts Corporation, Hilton Worldwide, Inc. (Anderson, Jacob)Attorney Jacob Anderson added to party Hilton International Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Anderson added to party Hilton Resorts Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Jacob Anderson added to party Hilton Worldwide, Inc.(pty:dft) (aef).
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 718 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Chen Williams on behalf of Hilton International Co., Hilton Resorts Corporation, Hilton Worldwide, Inc. (Williams, Robert)Attorney Robert Chen Williams added to party Hilton International Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Chen Williams added to party Hilton Resorts Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Chen Williams added to party Hilton Worldwide, Inc.(pty:dft) (aef).
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 717 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Conference Regarding the Production of Source Code by O-Web by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 716 RESPONSE in Opposition re #647 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Regarding Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, or, in the Alternative, to Stay This Lawsuit filed by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brandon J. Witkow, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 715 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 6/6/2017] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #714 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Caldarelli, William) (aef). (Main Document 715 replaced on 6/6/2017) (jah). Modified on 6/6/2017- Added file date of lodgment (jah).
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 714 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 713 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Conference Regarding the Production of Source Code by Best Western by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William)(acc).
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 712 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Conference Regarding the Production of Source Code by ATX by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William)(acc).
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 711 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Conference Regarding the Production of Source Code by Mobo by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 710 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Conference Regarding the Production of Source Code by Starbucks by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 709 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Conference Regarding the Production of Source Code by Agilysys by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 708 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Conference Regarding the Production of Source Code by Hilton by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 707 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Conference Regarding the Production of Source Code by Eventbrite by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 706 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Conference Regarding the Production of Source Code by Oracle by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 705 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Conference Regarding the Production of Source Code by Starwood by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 704 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Conference Regarding the Production of Source Code by Pizza Hut by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 703 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Conference Regarding the Production of Source Code by Marriott by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 702 NOTICE of DISASSOCIATION of NOUSHAN NOUREDDINI as COUNSEL for by Hyatt Corporation (Noureddini, Noushan)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 701 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Conference Regarding the Production of Source Code by Travelocity by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 700 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Conference Regarding the Production of Source Code by Ticketmaster by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 699 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Conference Regarding the Production of Source Code by StubHub by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 698 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Conference Regarding the Production of Source Code by Papa John's by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 697 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Conference Regarding the Production of Source Code by Orbitz by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 696 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Conference Regarding the Production of Source Code by Opentable by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 695 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Conference Regarding the Production of Source Code by Live Nation by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 694 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Conference Regarding the Production of Source Code by Kayak by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 693 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Conference Regarding the Production of Source Code by Hotwire by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 692 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Conference Regarding the Production of Source Code by Hotels.com by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 691 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Conference Regarding the Production of Source Code by Hotel Tonight by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 690 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Conference Regarding the Production of Source Code by Fandango by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 689 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Conference Regarding the Production of Source Code by Expedia by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 688 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Conference Regarding the Production of Source Code by Dominos by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 687 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Conference Regarding the Production of Source Code by GrubHub by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 686 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Conference Regarding the Production of Source Code by Ticketfly by Ameranth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 685 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Initiate Discovery Conference Regarding the Production of Source Code by QuikOrder by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 684 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Initiate Discovery Conference Regarding the Production of Source Code by Hyatt by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 683 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Initiate Discovery Conference Regarding the Production of Source Code by Usablenet, Inc. by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) Modified on 5/3/2017 (aef).
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 682 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Initiate Discovery Conference Regarding the Production of Source Code by Ticketbiscuit, LLC by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 681 ORDER Denying #629 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Plaintiff's motion for disqualification of Mr. Warriner is denied as moot, and its motion for disqualification of Norton Rose is denied on the merits. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 4/26/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 680 PRO HAC APPROVED: Michael James Hopkins appearing for Defendant Agilysys, Inc. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (jrd)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 679 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10025172.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.)(Hopkins, Michael)(jrd)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 678 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Telephonic Status Conference) held on 4/7/2017, before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 5/12/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/22/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/20/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service. Notice of Filing of Official Transcript only.) (akr)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 677 ORDER Approving Pro Hac Vice Application of Christine W. Feller (Re: Doc. No. #673 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 4/17/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrd)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 676 MOTION to Substitute Attorney /Local Counsel by Ameranth, Inc., Grubhub, Inc. (Williams, Eliot)Attorney Eliot D. Williams added to party Ameranth, Inc.(pty:cc) (aef).
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 675 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Status Conference re Setting ENEs held on 4/17/2017(no document attached) (ajf)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 674 JOINT HEARING STATEMENT by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(West, Ben) (aef).
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 673 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-9976587).(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Feller, Christine)(jrd)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 672 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-9976587.)(Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Feller, Christine)(QC Mailer sent; missing signature.)(jrd)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 671 NOTICE of Compliance Re Source Code by Hyatt Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service of Compliance Re Source COde)(Schneeweis, Gerald) (aef).
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 670 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Guaragna on behalf of Hilton International Co., Hilton Resorts Corporation, Hilton Worldwide, Inc. (Guaragna, John)Attorney John M. Guaragna added to party Hilton International Co.(pty:dft), Attorney John M. Guaragna added to party Hilton Resorts Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney John M. Guaragna added to party Hilton Worldwide, Inc.(pty:dft) (aef).
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 669 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Motion Hearing held on 4/7/2017. Parties appeared telephonically. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney William Caldarelli). (Defendant Attorney Dan Davison, Stephanie DeBrow, Gilbert Greene, Richard Zembek). (no document attached) (jak)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 668 NOTICE of Compliance re Source Code by Pizza Hut of America, Inc., Pizza Hut, Inc., QuikOrder, Inc. (Yu, George) (aef).
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 667 NOTICE of Compliance re Source Code by Usablenet, Inc. (Vanderhoof, Brian) (aef).
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 666 NOTICE of Compliance re Source Code by ATX Innovation, Inc., Best Western International, Inc. (Squier, Erikson) (aef).
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 665 NOTICE of Compliance re Source Code by Expedia, Inc., Fandango, Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotels.com, LP, Hotwire, Inc., Kayak Software Corporation, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Opentable, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Papa John's USA, Inc., Stubhub, Inc., Ticketmaster, LLC, Travelocity.com, LP, Wanderspot LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Zembek, Richard) (aef).
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 664 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Lee Pettit on behalf of Agilysys, Inc. (Pettit, Jonathan)Attorney Jonathan Lee Pettit added to party Agilysys, Inc.(pty:dft) (aef).
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 663 Notice of Withdrawal of Document filed as - MOTION to Withdraw #630 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel (David Stein) by Ameranth, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) Modified on 8/15/2017 to term motion (aef).
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 662 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Beth A. Goodman by Hyatt Corporation (Attachments: #1 Declaration Certificate of Service)(Schneeweis, Gerald) (aef).
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 661 PRO HAC APPROVED: James Matthew Oehler appearing for Defendant Hyatt Corporation (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (jrd)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 660 ORDER Overruling Objection. Plaintiff's objection to the motion #647 is overruled. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 4/6/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 659 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-9963534.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Oehler, James)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 658 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion. #630 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel (David Stein), #629 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel (Fulbright Firm) : Motion Hearing reset for 4/7/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 13A before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Parties may appear telephonically. (no document attached) (jak)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 656 OBJECTION by Ameranth, Inc. re #647 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Regarding Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, or, in the Alternative, to Stay This Lawsuit (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William J. Caldarelli, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proof of Service)(Caldarelli, William) (aef).
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 655 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Chih-Kaung Chang on behalf of Oracle Corporation (Chang, Brian)Attorney Brian Chih-Kaung Chang added to party Oracle Corporation(pty:dft) (aef).
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 657 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Stephanie DeBrow re #646 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 4/3/2017.(kcm)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 654 ORDER Granting #650 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 4/4/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 653 SUR-REPLY Re #629 Ameranth's Motion to Disqualify Counsel filed by Expedia, Inc., Fandango, Inc., Hotel Tonight, Inc., Hotels.com, LP, Hotwire, Inc., Kayak Software Corporation, Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Opentable, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Papa John's USA, Inc., Stubhub, Inc., Ticketmaster, LLC, Travelocity.com, LP, Wanderspot LLC. (aef)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 652 ORDER Granting #644 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply to Ameranth's Motion to Disqualify Counsel. The Motion for Leave is hereby GRANTED and the clerk is instructed to file the document attached as Exhibit A to the Motion for Leave as Defendants' Sur-Reply to Ameranth's Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 4/4/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 651 ORDER Re: Oral Argument. (Re Doc #629 , #630 ) Plaintiff's motions to disqualify counsel are currently scheduled for hearing on April 7, 2017. The Court has reviewed the parties' briefs, and finds these matters suitable for decision without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). Accordingly, the April 7, 2017 hearing is vacated. In light of Hilton's response to the motion to disqualify Mr. Stein, Ameranth indicated it would withdraw that motion, and should do so. The Court will issue an order in due course on the motion to disqualify the Fulbright firm. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 4/4/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 650 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Hilton International Co., Hilton Resorts Corporation, Hilton Worldwide, Inc.. (Stein, David) (aef).
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 649 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Usablenet, Inc. re #647 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Regarding Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, or, in the Alternative, to Stay Thi