Beaver et al v. Tarsadia Hotels et al
Plaintiff: Dean Beaver, Laurie Beaver, Steven Adelman, Abram Aghachi, Dinesh Gauba, Devin Kenna and Veronica Kenna
Defendant: Tarsadia Hotels, Tushar Patel, B.U. Patel, Gregory Casserly, 5th Rock LLC, MKP One, LLC, Gaslamp Holdings, LLC, Playground Destination Properties, Inc., DOES 1-50, Josh Erskine and Shane Erskine
Case Number: 3:2011cv01842
Filed: August 17, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Presiding Judge: Dana M. Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' 326 Motion for Cy Pres Distribution of Residual Settlement Fund. The hearing date set for March 13, 2020 shall be vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/9/20. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER Re Distribution of Residual Settlement Funds. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/7/20.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER Granting 286 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Judgment; Granting 287 Motion for Attorney Fees; Granting Plaintiffs' Request for Service Awards; Granting Joint 309 Motion Regarding Lien. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/28/17. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER Re: 309 Joint MOTION Regarding Lien. The parties shall submit additional information and legal authority, if any, for the Court concerning the parties' joint motion and the issues identified herein above on or before 9/26/2017. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 09/20/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ajs)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed 273 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; Directing Issuance of Notice; and Setting Final Approval Hearing. Class Counsel shall file a Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement n o later than August 9, 2017. Class Counsel shall file an application for attorneys' fees and costs, and for service awards no later than August 9, 2017. Any of the Parties may file a response to objections by September 8, 2017. Fairness Hearing. The Court directs that the final Fairness Hearing shall be held on September 15, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/24/17. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER Denying Defendants' 213 Motion for Leave to Amend Answer to the Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/4/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER Granting Third Party Defendant's 211 Motion to Participate in Defense of Main Action. The hearing set for June 30, 2016 shall be vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/27/16. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER Denying 193 Defendants' Motion for Stay Pending Filing and Disposition of Petition for Writ of Certiorari. The Court sets a status conference on May 13, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. On or before May 6, 2016, the parties shall file a joint stat ement suggesting how the case should proceed after the Ninth Circuit's ruling, and identifying issues the parties wish to raise at the status conference. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/19/16. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER Re Retroactivity of Recent 2014 Amendment to the Interstate Land Sales Act; Sua Sponte Certifying Orders for Interlocutory Appeal; Granting in Part 158 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. The hearing set for October 31, 2014 is vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/29/2014. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part 138 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration; and Granting Tarsadia Defendants' and Playground's Motions for Summary Judgment on the Negligence Cause of Action (Dkt. Nos. 81 , 94 , 98 ). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/1/2014. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER Denying 124 Third Party Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, Denying Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/17/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER Denying 81 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting in part and Denying in part 94 , 98 Tarsadia Defendants and Playground Destination Properties, Inc.'s Motions for Summary Judgment. The parties shall file supplemental briefs as to the negligence cause of action on or before November 5, 2013. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/16/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Denying 62 Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class and Denying 63 Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Co-Lead Class Counsel as Premature. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/24/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting 43 Plaintiffs' Motion to File Third Amended Complaint; and Denying as Moot 40 Defendant Playground Destination Properties, Inc.'s Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiffs' Section 17200 Claim. Plaintiffs shall file a Third Amended Complaint within five (5) days. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/17/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Motion to Dismiss. The motion to dismiss 23 filed by Tarsadia Hotels, Tushar Patel, B.U. Patel, Gregory Casserly, 5th Rock, LLC, MPK One, LLC, and Gaslamp Holdings, LLC is granted in part and denied in par t. The motion to dismiss 22 filed by Playground Destination Properties, Inc. is granted in part and denied in part. The second cause of action for violation of the Subdivided Lands Act is dismissed with prejudice. The first and third causes of acti on for violation of the Interstate Land Sales Full Disclosure Act and common law fraud are dismissed with prejudice as to Defendant Playground Destination Properties, Inc. only. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/2/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' Motions to Dismiss re 6 , 11 , 12 . The motion to dismiss filed by Tarsadia Hotels, Tushar Patel, B.U. Patel, Gregory Casserly, 5th Rock, LLC, MPK One, LLC, and Gaslamp Holdings, LLC is gr anted in part and denied in part; the motion to dismiss filed by Playground Destination Properties, Inc. is Granted in part and denied in part; and the motion to dismiss filed by Josh and Shane Erskine is Granted. The second and third causes of acti on are Dismissed with prejudice. The first, fourth and fifth causes of action are Dismissed with leave to amend. If Plaintiffs choose to amend the Complaint, they must file and serve it no later than December 22, 2011. If Plaintiffs choose not to file an amended complaint, Defendants shall respond within the same period of time calculated from December 22, 2011. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/6/11. (lao)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beaver et al v. Tarsadia Hotels et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Beaver
Represented By: Tyler R. Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Beaver
Represented By: Tyler R. Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Adelman
Represented By: Tyler R. Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abram Aghachi
Represented By: Tyler R. Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dinesh Gauba
Represented By: Tyler R. Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devin Kenna
Represented By: Tyler R. Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Kenna
Represented By: Tyler R. Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarsadia Hotels
Represented By: Alicia Natalie Vaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tushar Patel
Represented By: Alicia Natalie Vaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.U. Patel
Represented By: Alicia Natalie Vaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Casserly
Represented By: Alicia Natalie Vaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5th Rock LLC
Represented By: Alicia Natalie Vaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MKP One, LLC
Represented By: Alicia Natalie Vaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaslamp Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Alicia Natalie Vaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Playground Destination Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel M. Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Erskine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Erskine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?