Martin v. Midland Funding, LLC
Plaintiff: Nicholas Martin
Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv02368
Filed: October 12, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael M Anello
Referring Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Filing 73 Pursuant to United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Rule 10.4(b), the designated records of this case are being transferred electronically to the Northern District of Illinois as to case No. 1:11-cv-03104 per the Conditional Remand Order of MDL 2286 (ECF 1085) dated 12/15/2020 (Doc. No. #70 ). The parties in this case also stipulated or designated the contents of the remanded record of 11md2286 as directed in the order dated 1/21/2021 (Docket No. #72 ). Those stipulated records are being transmitted via email. (Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation served electronically.) (no document attached) (jdt)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Setting Deadline to Comply With JPML Rule 10.4(a) and Order Closing the Case. The Court order that the parties subject to the Panel's remand orders furnish the Clerk for the Southern District of California with a stipulation or designation of the contents of the record to be remanded on or before 2/12/2021. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 1/20/2021.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD et al. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) CC: MDL Panel (jdt)
January 6, 2021 Filing 71 NOTICE of MDL Filing: Order Lifting Stay of Conditional Remand Order and Vacating the January 28, 2021 Hearing Session Order. (MDL 2286, ECF 1093.) Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD et al. CC: MDL Panel (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jdt)
December 15, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE of MDL Filing: Conditional Remand Order MDL 2286 (ECF 1085). Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD et al. CC: MDL Panel(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (Duplicate filing of ECF No. 834 in 11md2286 to spread Conditional Remand Order to all associated cases.)(jdt)
March 27, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE of Change of Address by Alexander H. Burke (Burke, Alexander) (tcf).
August 5, 2019 Filing 68 STATUS REPORT by Nicholas Martin. (Burke, Alexander) (rmc).
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Approval of Cy Pres Beneficiaries of Residual Settlement Funds. In sum, the Court grants the parties' joint motion for approval of cy pres distribution as set forth above, and further orders that: 1. University of Santa Clara Law School's Privacy Law Certificate and High Tech Law Institute, and Jump$tart Coalition for Personal Financial Literacy are designated the cy pres beneficiaries of the remaining balance of the Cash Component of the Settlement Fund and must share equally in the cy pres award; and 2. Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC, the claims administrator, must promptly distribute the cy pres award to University of Santa Clara Law School's Privacy Law Certificate and High Tech Law Institute, and Jump$tart Coalition for Personal Financial Literacy in equal amounts. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 10/10/2018.(rmc)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Re: Submission of Applications for Appointment of New Lead and Liaison Counsel. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 3/22/2017.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Vacating and Resetting Status Hearing. The Court vacates and resets the Status Hearing for 12/7/2016 at 4:00 PM before Judge Michael M. Anello. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 11/30/2016.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER VACATING AND RESETTING STATUS HEARING. Status Hearing set for 11/18/2016 at 9:00 AM is hereby vacated and reset for 12/5/2016 at 3:00 PM before Judge Michael M. Anello. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 10/26/2016.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(fth) Modified on 10/26/2016 (amk).
October 17, 2016 Filing 63 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re (410 in 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD) Transcript. Mail sent to Adeline Vales. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD et al.(fth)
September 14, 2016 Final Approval Hearing and Motion Hearing is reset to Friday, September 30, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 3A. (no document attached) (pdc)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Vacating and Resetting Final Approval Hearing. Final Approval Hearing set for 9/19/2016 at 3:00 PM before Judge Michael M. Anello. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 8/16/2016.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD et al.(fth)
August 8, 2016 Filing 61 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Eric B. Neumann re (336 in 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD) Objection. (fth)
January 29, 2015 Filing 60 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin: Status Conference re Settlement held on 1/29/2015. (Plaintiff Attorney Douglas Campion, Francis Greene). (Defendant Attorney William Boggs, Edward Totino). Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD et al.(no document attached) (cap)
January 15, 2015 Filing 59 NOTICE of Teleconference Information Sheet, re (182 in 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD, 182 in 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD, 182 in 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD) ORDER Setting a Telephonic Status Conference for January 29, 2015. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD et al.(cap)
December 22, 2014 Filing 58 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin: Settlement Disposition Conference held on 12/22/2014. (Douglas Campion, Francis Greene, James Latturner, David Schafer for Plaintiffs). (Edward Totino for Defendants). Order to follow. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD et al.(no document attached) (cap)
December 1, 2014 Filing 57 NOTICE of Teleconference Information Sheet, re (15 in 3:14-cv-02767-MMA-MDD, 15 in 3:14-cv-02767-MMA-MDD) Order Amending Case Management Order and Setting Telephonic Status Conference. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD et al.(cap)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Amending Case Management Order and Setting Telephonic Status Conference. A telephonic status conference will be held on 12/22/2014 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 11/25/14. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD et al. (cap)
June 24, 2014 Filing 55 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/24/2014. Order to follow.(Plaintiff Attorney Douglas Campion, Francis Richard Greene, James Latturner, Jenny DeFrancesco, David Schafer). (Defendant Attorney William Boggs, Edward Totino). Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD et al.(no document attached) (mkz)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Amended Case Management Order Re: Discovery Through Filing of Class Certification Motion: Granting (Doc. #63) Joint Motion to Continue Deadlines in case 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD. All fact and expert discovery necessary to support or oppose class certification shall be completed by 3/14/2014. All expert disclosures required by Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(2) shall be served on all parties by 1/10/2014. By 4/11/2014, any motion for class certification shall be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 9/17/2013. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)(jrd)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER in case 3:10-cv-02261-MMA-MDD; granting (61) motion to continue case management order in case 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD. See attached order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 7/16/13. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD et al.(atk)
April 17, 2013 Filing 52 NOTICE of Vacated Hearing(s): The Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2013 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin is vacated. The parties are ordered to contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin within 3 days upon the conclusion of the private mediation. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD et al. CC: MDL Panel(no document attached) (mkz)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting (58) joint motion to extend discovery dates and motion filing cutoff date for class certification motion. See attached order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 4/17/13. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD et al. CC: MDL Panel(atk)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 AMENDED Case Management Order Re: Discovery Through Filing of Class Certification Motion: Granting (56) Joint Motion to Vacate Deadlines and Continue Date in case 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD. The Court will hold a Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2013 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Counsel for Plaintiff is instructed to arrange a conference call and provide to the Court and all parties a dial-in number. Any motion for class certification shall be filed by 8/12/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 3/25/2013. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD, 3:10-cv-02261-MMA-MDD, 3:10-cv-02600-MMA-MDD, 3:11-cv-02368-MMA-MDD, 3:11-cv-02370-MMA-MDD.(CC: MDL Panel)(leh)(jrd)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: Discovery Through Filing of Class Certification Motion - Granting (47) Joint Motion to Continue Dates in case 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD. Within 3 days following the parties participation in private mediation, the parties must contact the court to arrange a further case management conference. Within 5 days of a ruling on a motion for class certification, the parties must contact the Court to arrange a further case management conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 1/30/2013.(cc: MDL Panel)(leh)(jrd)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting (37) Joint Motion for Protective Order in case 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 12/11/2012. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD, 3:10-cv-02261-MMA-MDD, 3:10-cv-02600-MMA-MDD, 3:11-cv-02368-MMA-MDD, 3:11-cv-02370-MMA-MDD (CC: MDL Panel)(leh)(jrd)
December 19, 2012 Filing 47 NOTICE of MDL Filing: Separation of Claims and Conditional Remand Order. It Is Ordered that the claims in Count II regarding alleged violations of the Fair Debt Collection Practices Act be separated and remanded to the Northern District of Illinois (Attachments: #1 Order)(kaj)
September 7, 2012 Filing 46 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin: Case Management Conference held on 9/7/2012. The Court will issue a scheduling order as discussed during the case management conference. (CD# 9/7/2012 n/a). (Plaintiff Attorneys James Latturner, Cassandra Miller, Alexander Burke, Douglas Campion). (Defendant Attorneys Amy Gallegos, Sandra Levine). Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD, 3:10-cv-02261-MMA-MDD, 3:10-cv-02600-MMA-MDD, 3:11-cv-02368-MMA-MDD, 3:11-cv-02370-MMA-MDD CC: MDL Panel(no document attached) (atk)
July 13, 2012 Filing 45 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 7/13/2012. Order to follow. (CD# 7/13/2012 n/a). (Plaintiff Attorneys James Latturner, Curtis Warner, Alexander Holmes Burke). (Defendant Attorneys Amy Gallegos, Tim Vanden Heuvel). Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD, 3:10-cv-02261-MMA-MDD, 3:10-cv-02600-MMA-MDD, 3:11-cv-02368-MMA-MDD, 3:11-cv-02370-MMA-MDD CC: MDL Panel(no document attached) (atk)
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting (17) Joint Motion for Appointment of Lead and Liaison Counsel in case 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD. The Court Grant Plaintiffs' Joint Motion [Doc. No. 17] and hereby Appoints: Counsel 1) for Christopher Robinson, Douglas J. Campion of the Law Offices of Douglas J. Campion, and 2) for David Scardina, Daniel A. Edelman and James O. Latturner of Edelman, Combs, Latturner & Goodwin, as Co-Lead Interim Class Counsel;3 and Counsel for Eduardo Tovar, David P. Schafer and Joseph Darrell Palmer, as Liaison Counsel. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 3/13/2012. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD, 3:10-cv-02261-MMA-MDD, 3:10-cv-02600-MMA-MDD, 3:11-cv-02368-MMA-MDD, 3:11-cv-02370-MMA-MDD(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) CC: MDL Panel(leh)(jrd)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Minute Order Resetting Hearing on Calendar of Judge Anello: The Plaintiffs' Joint Motion for Appointment of Lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel is hereby RESET on the calendar of Judge Anello for March 19, 2012 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 5. So Ordered on 2/23/2012 by Judge Michael M. Anello. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD, 3:10-cv-02261-MMA-MDD, 3:10-cv-02600-MMA-MDD, 3:11-cv-02368-MMA-MDD, 3:11-cv-02370-MMA-MDD(amk)
February 22, 2012 Filing 43 Minute Order: Case transferred in error. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo is no longer assigned to the case and the case is transferred back to Judge Michael M. Anello. The new case number is 11md2286-MMA-MDD. Member cases are as follows 10cv2261-MMA-MDD, 10cv2600-MMA-MDD, 11cv2368-MMA-MDD, and 11cv2370-MMA-MDD. CC: MDL Panel (tel)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER OF TRANSFER. The case is transferred to the calendar of United State District Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo. All pending motion hearing and pretrial conference dates on the calendar of Judge Anello are hereby Vacated. All other terms and conditions of any current scheduling order(s) remain in full force and effect. All hearings calendared before the assigned magistrate judge remain set. The new case number is 11MD2286-CAB-MDD. Member cases are as follows 10cv2261-CAB-MDD, 10cv2600-CAB-MDD, 11cv2368-CAB-MDD, and 11cv2370-CAB-MDD. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 2/16/12.(CC: MDL Panel)(ecs)(jrd)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Minute Order Setting Deadline to File Joint Status Report: On October 28, 2011, Plaintiffs Scardina and Robinson filed a #6 Motion for the Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel. On October 29, 2011, Plaintiff Eduardo Tovar filed a competing #8 Motion for the Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel. On November 14, 2011, Plaintiff Tovar filed a #13 Notice of Withdrawal of his motion, and therein stated that "Plaintiffs in all member cases will also be submitting a stipulation regarding agreement as to lead counsel and liaison counsel." To date, a stipulation has not been filed and Plaintiffs Scardina and Robinson's motion remains pending. Accordingly, the Court hereby ORDERS the parties to file a joint status report on or before February 8, 2012, advising the Court regarding the status of any such stipulation. So Ordered by Judge Michael M. Anello on 1/24/2012. Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD, 3:10-cv-02261-MMA -MDD, 3:10-cv-02600-MMA -MDD, 3:11-cv-02368-MMA-MDD, 3:11-cv-02370-MMA-MDD(amk)
November 2, 2011 Filing 40 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael M. Anello: Status Hearing re Scheduling held on 11/2/2011. (Court Reporter Elizabeth Cesena).(Plaintiff Attorney Alexander H. Burke, Douglas Campion, James Latturner, Darrell Palmer, Curtis C. Warner). (Defendant Attorney Amy Gallegos). Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD, 3:10-cv-02261-MMA -MDD, 3:10-cv-02600-MMA -MDD, 3:11-cv-02368-MMA-MDD, 3:11-cv-02370-MMA-MDD(amk)
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Re: Deadline for Filing Preliminary Reports: The Court hereby amends the 10/13/2011 Order to reflect the correct deadline for filing preliminary reports. Counsel will submit to the Court by 10/31/2011 their preliminary reports. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 10/19/2011.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD, 3:10-cv-02261-MMA -MDD, 3:10-cv-02600-MMA -MDD, 3:11-cv-02368-MMA-MDD, 3:11-cv-02370-MMA-MDD (CC: MDL Panel)(leh)(jrd)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Setting Initial Telephonic Conference: The Court orders an Initial Telephonic Conference set for 11/2/2011 at 1:00 PM before Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 10/13/2011.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD, 3:10-cv-02261-MMA -MDD, 3:10-cv-02600-MMA -MDD, 3:11-cv-02368-MMA-MDD, 3:11-cv-02370-MMA-MDD(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) CC: MDL Panel (leh)(jrd)
October 13, 2011 Filing 36 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:11-cv-03104. Original file received electronically (kaj) (jpm).
October 12, 2011 Filing 37 Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin assigned to transfer case from Northern District of Illinois. (kaj)
October 12, 2011 Filing 35 TRANSFERRED to the California Southern District Court the Electronic Record (ca, ). [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/13/2011.]
October 12, 2011 Filing 34 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to USDC California Southern District (ca, ). [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/13/2011.]
September 14, 2011 Filing 33 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on July 20, 2011 before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Court Reporter Contact Information: Ms. Joene Hanhardt, Official Court Reporter, 219 S. Dearborn St., Suite 1744-A, Chicago, Illinois 60604, 312-435-6874.
September 7, 2011 Filing 32 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Midland Funding, LLC by Brett J Natarelli (Natarelli, Brett) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/13/2011.]
August 31, 2011 Filing 31 WRITTEN ORDER signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 8/31/2011.Mailed notice(sct, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/13/2011.]
August 31, 2011 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras:Ruling held on 8/31/2011. ENTER ORDER: The Court denies Midland's motion (Doc #18 ) to reassign and consolidate Scardina with Martin. Status hearing set for 10/27/2011 at 9:30 a.m. (For further details see separate order.)Mailed notice (sct, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/13/2011.]
August 11, 2011 Filing 29 ANSWER to amended complaint , with Affirmative Defenses, by Midland Funding, LLC(Zipprich, Renee) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/13/2011.]
August 9, 2011 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras:Defendant's agreed motion (Doc #23 ) for an extension of time to 8/11/2011 to respond to plaintiff's amended complaint is granted. Hearing on said motion, set for 8/10/2011, is stricken. Mailed notice (sct, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/13/2011.]
August 3, 2011 Filing 27 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Nicholas Martin to Brief regarding reassignment #18 (Burke, Alexander) (Docket text Modified by clerk's office on 8/4/2011 (ca, ). [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/13/2011.]
August 3, 2011 Filing 26 REPLY by Defendant Midland Funding, LLC in Support of Defendant's Motion for reassignment of related action #18 (Zipprich, Renee) (Docket text Modified by clerk's office on 8/4/2011 (ca, ). [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/13/2011.]
July 28, 2011 Filing 25 AMENDED NOTICE of Motion by Renee Lynn Zipprich for presentment of extension of time #23 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 8/10/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Zipprich, Renee) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/13/2011.]
July 28, 2011 Filing 24 NOTICE of Motion by Renee Lynn Zipprich for presentment of extension of time #23 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 8/2/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Zipprich, Renee) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/13/2011.]
July 28, 2011 Filing 23 MOTION by Defendant Midland Funding, LLC for extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint [AGREED] (Zipprich, Renee) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/13/2011.]
July 26, 2011 Filing 22 OBJECTIONS by Dave Scardina to MOTION by Defendant Midland Funding, LLC to reassign case (Motion for Reassignment of Related Action) #18 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Miller, Cassandra) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/13/2011.]
July 20, 2011 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras:Status and motion hearing held on 7/20/2011. Answer to defendant's motion (Doc #18 ) for reassignment of related cases is due 7/27/2011. Replies due 8/3/2011. Ruling set for 8/31/2011 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (sct, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/13/2011.]
July 15, 2011 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Renee Lynn Zipprich for presentment of motion to reassign case #18 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 7/20/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Zipprich, Renee) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/13/2011.]
July 15, 2011 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM by Midland Funding, LLC in support of motion for reassignment of related action #18 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through Exhibit C)(Zipprich, Renee) (Docket text Modified by clerk's office on 7/18/2011 (ca, ). [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/13/2011.]
July 15, 2011 Filing 18 MOTION by Defendant Midland Funding, LLC for Reassignment of Related Action (Zipprich, Renee)(Docket text Modified by clerk's office on 7/18/2011 (ca, ). [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/13/2011.]
July 14, 2011 Filing 17 AMENDED complaint by Nicholas Martin against Midland Funding, LLC (Burke, Alexander) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/13/2011.]
July 13, 2011 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras:Defendant's agreed motion (Doc #14 ) for an extension of time to 7/20/2011 to answer or otherwise plead is granted. Hearing on said motion, set for 7/14/2011, is stricken. Status hearing set for 7/20/2011 to stand.Mailed notice (sct, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/13/2011.]
July 6, 2011 Filing 15 AGREED NOTICE of Motion by Renee Lynn Zipprich for presentment of extension of time #14 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 7/14/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Zipprich, Renee) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/13/2011.]
July 6, 2011 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant Midland Funding, LLC for extension of time (Agreed) (Zipprich, Renee) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/13/2011.]
June 7, 2011 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras:Defendant's motion (Doc #10 ) for an extension of time to 7/6/2011 to answer or otherwise plead is granted. Hearing on said motion, set for 6/9/2011, is stricken. Status hearing is reset from 6/21/2011 to 7/20/2011 at 9:30 a.m.Mailed notice (sct, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/13/2011.]
June 6, 2011 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Midland Funding, LLC by James Michael Golden (Golden, James) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/13/2011.]
June 6, 2011 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Renee Lynn Zipprich for presentment of extension of time #10 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 6/9/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Zipprich, Renee) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/13/2011.]
June 6, 2011 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant Midland Funding, LLC for extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint [AGREED] (Zipprich, Renee) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/13/2011.]
June 6, 2011 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Midland Funding, LLC by Renee Lynn Zipprich (Zipprich, Renee) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/13/2011.]
June 6, 2011 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Midland Funding, LLC by Theodore Wilson Seitz (Seitz, Theodore) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/13/2011.]
May 16, 2011 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicholas Martin as to Midland Funding, LLC on 5/11/2011, answer due 6/1/2011. (Burke, Alexander) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/13/2011.]
May 13, 2011 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing set for 6/21/2011 at 09:30 AM. At the initial hearing, parties to report on the following: 1. Possibility of settlement. 2. If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to prepare the case for resolution. Plaintiff is directed to advise all other parties of the Court's action herein. Lead counsel for each party is required to attend the initial hearing. The Court directs counsel's attention to its Motion Schedule and Case Management Procedures located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (sct, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/13/2011.]
May 10, 2011 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued, one original as to Defendant Midland Funding, LLC (ca, ). [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/13/2011.]
May 10, 2011 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Burke, Alexander) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/13/2011.]
May 10, 2011 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Nicholas Martin by Alexander Holmes Burke (Burke, Alexander) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/13/2011.]
May 10, 2011 Filing 2 MOTION by Plaintiff Nicholas Martin to certify class (Burke, Alexander) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/13/2011.]
May 10, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Nicholas Martin; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-5985738.(Burke, Alexander) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/13/2011.]
May 10, 2011 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Morton Denlow. (mh, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 10/13/2011.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Midland Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Martin
Represented By: Alexander H. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC
Represented By: Theodore W. Seitz
Represented By: Brett J Natarelli
Represented By: James Michael Golden
Represented By: Renee Lynn Zipprich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?