Villa v. Cate et al
Plaintiff: |
Robert Villa |
Defendant: |
DOES 1-10, S. Sandoval, J. Burgos, Steven Epperson, James Moreno, R. Tovar, Domingo Uribe, Jr., D. Paramo, D.J. DeGues and James S. Hill |
Case Number: |
3:2011cv02426 |
Filed: |
October 17, 2011 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Jan M. Adler |
Presiding Judge: |
Irma E. Gonzalez |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 13, 2013 |
Filing
59
ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part 54 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application: Denying Motion to Appoint Expert; Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline for Plaintiff to serve a list of experts he expects to call at trial is continued to March 22, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 3/13/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
|
August 13, 2012 |
Filing
36
ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part Defendants' 32 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). Court grants Dfts' motion to dismiss Pla's claims for money damages against them in thei r official capacities with prejudice, denies Dfts' motion to dismiss Pla's 14th Amendment due process claims pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6), and grants Dfts' Degues, Epperson, and Moreno's motion to dismiss Pla's retaliation claim s against them pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). Clerk directed to terminate these Dfts from the docket. Dfts Paramo, Hill, Burgos, Tovar, Uribe and Sandoval shall serve and file an Answer to Pla's First Amended Complaint w/in time prescribed by FRCP 12(a)(4)(B). Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 8/10/2012. (All non-registered users served vis U.S. Mail Service)(jah)(jrd)
|
December 1, 2011 |
Filing
12
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Pla's Complaint is dismissed w/o prejudice for failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B) and 1915A(b). Pla is granted 45 days leave from the date this Order is filed to file a First Amended Amended Complaint. Dfts not name and all claims not re-alleged in the Amended Complaint will be considered waived. Pla is cautioned that should he elect not to amend, or if Amended Complaint still fails to state a claim upon which re lief may be granted, dismissal of this action may be counted as a "strike" against him pursuant to 28 USC 1915(g). Signed by Judge Irma E. Gonzalez on 12/1/2011. (Blank First Amended Complaint Form t/w copy of this Order mailed to Plaintiff) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
|
October 17, 2011 |
Filing
9
SCREENING ORDER Dismissing Claims Against Defendants Steadman and Gonzales for Failure to State a Claim; ORDER, CASE TRANSFERRED to Southern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/17/2011. (Flores, E)[Transferred from California Eastern on 10/18/2011.]
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?