Apple Inc. et al v. Motorola Mobility, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Apple Inc. and Apple Sales International
Defendant: Motorola Mobility, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00355
Filed: February 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2014 Filing 279 REPORT of Patent and Trademark Closing, regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 6,359,898, re 278 Order on Motion to Dismiss. cc:USPTO (ag)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER Granting 277 Joint Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 05/16/2014. (ag)(jrd)
May 16, 2014 Filing 277 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International. (Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (ag).
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER Granting 273 Motorola's Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Documents Under Seal Related To Its Third Amended Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(3). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/12/2014. (srm)
May 8, 2014 Filing 274 (Filed as Sealed Document 276 on 5/12/2014) SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 273 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Chassman, Peter) (sjt). (Main Document 274 replaced on 5/12/2014) (sjt). Modified to add filing date of lodgement on 5/12/2014 (sjt).
May 8, 2014 Filing 273 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Chassman, Peter) (sjt).
May 8, 2014 Filing 272 Pretrial Disclosures by Motorola Mobility LLC (Third Amended) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Motorola's Third Amended Pretrial Disclosures)(Chassman, Peter) (srm).
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER Granting 261 Motorola's Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Documents Under Seal Related To Its Second Amended Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(3). The clerk is ordered to file the following document under seal: Exhibit 1 to Motorola's Second Amended Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(3) (Motorola's Trial Exhibit List). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/8/2014. (srm)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER Granting 265 Apple's Application to File Fourth Amended Exhibit List Under Seal. The clerk is ordered to file Fourth Amended Rule 26(a)(3) Pretrial Disclosures and Attachment A thereto under seal. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/8/2014. (srm)
May 5, 2014 Filing 267 Amended Redacted Pretrial Disclosures by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International (Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (srm).
May 5, 2014 Filing 266 (Filed as Sealed Document 271 on 5/8/2014) SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 265 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (sjt). (Main Document 266 replaced on 5/8/2014) (sjt). Modified to add filing date of lodgement on 5/8/2014 (sjt).
May 5, 2014 Filing 265 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (sjt).
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER Granting 263 Joint Motion To Modify Case Management Conference Order. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/23/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/30/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/22/2014. (srm)(jrd)
April 22, 2014 Filing 263 Joint MOTION Joint Motion to Modify Case Management Conference re 252 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International. (Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (srm).
April 22, 2014 Filing 262 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 261 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Chassman, Peter) (sjt).
April 22, 2014 Filing 261 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Chassman, Peter)(sjt).
April 22, 2014 Filing 260 Pretrial Disclosures by Motorola Mobility LLC (Second Amended) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Motorola's Second Amended Pretrial Disclosures)(Chassman, Peter) (srm).
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER Granting 253 Plaintiff's Application to File Exhibit List Under Seal; Denying as Moot 235 , 238 , 245 Motions to File Documents Under Seal (prior versions of the pretrial disclosures and exhibit lists). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/10/2014. (srm)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER Granting 242 Motorola's Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Documents Under Seal Related To Its Amended Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(3); Denying as moot 233 Motion to File Documents Under Seal (prior version of the pretrial disclosures). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/10/2014. (srm)
April 10, 2014 Filing 255 Pretrial Disclosures by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International (Redacted Version) Plaintiffs Apple Inc.'s and Apple Sales International's Third Amended Rule 26(A)(3) Disclosures (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Slipsheet)(Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (srm).
April 9, 2014 Filing 254 (Filed as Sealed Document 259 on 4/11/2014) SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 253 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Hsin, Yu-Cheih)(sjt). (Main Document 254 replaced on 4/11/2014) (sjt). Modified to add filing date of lodgement on 4/11/2014 (sjt).
April 9, 2014 Filing 253 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (sjt).
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 252 AMENDED ORDER Granting 247 Joint MOTION to Modify Case Management Conference Order. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/9/2014. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 5/16/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/9/2014.(srm)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 251 REDACTED ORDER: (1) Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's Motions for Summary Judgment and Motion to Exclude Testimony of Charles R. Donohoe; (2) Denying Defendant's Motions for Summary Judgement and Motion to Exclude Opinions of Michael Kelly. (Dkt. Nos. 125 , 128 , 131 , 136 , 141 , 150 ). The Court Denies 229 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Motion to Strike; The Court Grants 227 Plaintiff's Motion to File Document under seal. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/9/2014. (srm)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Modify Case Management Conference Order 247 . The Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/2/2014. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 5/9/2014 at 1:30 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/4/2014. (vam)(jrd)
April 4, 2014 Filing 247 Joint MOTION to Modify Case Management Conference Order re 99 Scheduling Order, Terminate Hearings, by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Chassman, Peter) (ag).
April 3, 2014 Filing 246 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 245 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (sjt).
April 3, 2014 Filing 245 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (sjt).
April 3, 2014 Filing 244 Pretrial Disclosures by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International (Amended) (Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (srm).
April 3, 2014 Filing 243 (Filed as Sealed Document 258 on 4/11/2014) SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 242 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Chassman, Peter) (sjt). (Main Document 243 replaced on 4/11/2014) (sjt). Modified to add filing date of lodgement on 4/11/2014 (sjt).
April 3, 2014 Filing 242 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Chassman, Peter) (sjt).
April 3, 2014 Filing 241 Pretrial Disclosures by Motorola Mobility LLC (Amended) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Motorola's Amended Pretrial Disclosures (Redacted))(Chassman, Peter) (srm).
March 26, 2014 Filing 240 Pretrial Disclosures by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International Amended - Public Version (Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (srm).
March 26, 2014 Filing 239 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 238 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (sjt).
March 26, 2014 Filing 238 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (sjt).
March 21, 2014 Filing 237 Pretrial Disclosures by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International Public Redacted Version (Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (ag).
March 21, 2014 Filing 236 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 235 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (sjt).
March 21, 2014 Filing 235 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (sjt).
March 21, 2014 Filing 234 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 233 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Chassman, Peter) (sjt).
March 21, 2014 Filing 233 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Chassman, Peter) (sjt).
March 21, 2014 Filing 232 Pretrial Disclosures by Motorola Mobility LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Motorola's Redacted Trial Exhibit List)(Chassman, Peter) (ag).
February 24, 2014 Filing 231 RESPONSE in Opposition re 229 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Strike Inadmissible Evidence filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Chassman, Peter)
February 24, 2014 Filing 230 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility LLC re 229 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Strike Inadmissible Evidence -Motorola's Notice That It Will File an Opposition to Apple's Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File a Motion to Strike [Allegedly] Inadmissible Evidence under Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 (c)(2) (Chassman, Peter) (srm).
February 21, 2014 Filing 229 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Strike Inadmissible Evidence by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration S. Rosenberg, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (ag).
February 21, 2014 Filing 228 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 227 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Hsin, Yu-Cheih). (jah).
February 21, 2014 Filing 227 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Hsin, Yu-Cheih). (jah).
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER Granting 224 Joint Motion to Modify Case Management Conference Order. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2014 01:30 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/11/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 2/21/2014. (srm)
February 21, 2014 Filing 225 NOTICE Joint Submission of Redacted Transcript by Motorola Mobility LLC re 216 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Proposed Redacted Transcript))(Chassman, Peter) (ag).
February 20, 2014 Filing 224 Joint MOTION to Modify Case Management Order re 99 Scheduling Order, by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Chassman, Peter) (srm).
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 223 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Rejecting Documents, from Plaintiffs Apple Inc., Apple Sales International, re 220 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal, 222 MOTION to Strike Inadmissible Evidence, 221 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Failure to obtain motion hearing date from chambers prior to filing moving papers. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The documents are rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the documents from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/20/2014.(srm)
February 19, 2014 Filing 222 ***DOCUMENT STRICKEN BY ORDER OF COURT (DOC. 223 )*** MOTION to Strike Inadmissible Evidence by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration E. Hsin, # 3 Exhibit 1-4)(Hsin, Yu-Cheih) Modified text on 2/20/2014 (srm). (Main Document 222 replaced on 2/20/2014) (srm).
February 19, 2014 Filing 221 ***DOCUMENT STRICKEN BY ORDER OF COURT (DOC. 223 )*** SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 220 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Hsin, Yu-Cheih). (jah). Modified text on 2/20/2014 (srm). (Main Document 221 replaced on 2/20/2014) (srm).
February 19, 2014 Filing 220 ***DOCUMENT STRICKEN BY ORDER OF COURT (DOC. 223 )*** MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Hsin, Yu-Cheih). (jah). Modified text on 2/20/2014 (srm). (Main Document 220 replaced on 2/20/2014) (srm).
February 7, 2014 Filing 218 Minute Order for Closed Court proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Motion Hearing held on 2/7/2014. Motions Are Submitted: 131 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Motorola's Patents as Applied to Certain Technology, 141 MOTION to Appoint Expert MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Charles R. Donohoe, 125 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Michael Keeley Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 702, 136 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count Two of Apple's Second Amended Complaint, 150 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Corrected] Notice of Motion and Memorandum In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment on Motorola Affirmative Defenses Nos. 1-6 and 11, 128 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Count I of Apple's Second Amended Complaint.The Court will prepare a written order. (Court Reporter/ECR Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Paul Kremer, Yu-Cheih Hsin, Stuart Rosenberg, Jeffrey Thomas, Shawn Liu).(Defendant Attorney Peter Chassman, James Hurst, Phillip Price). (no document attached) (lsf) Modified on 2/10/2014 Added text (lsf).
February 7, 2014 Filing 217 PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Phillip D. Price appearing for Defendant Motorola Mobility LLC, Receipt # 59343. (jao)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER Granting 214 Joint Motion to Close Courtroom During February 7, 2014 Hearing and to Seal Transcripts and Orders on the Parties' Summary Judgment and Expert Exclusion Motion Arguments. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/6/2014. (srm)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER Granting 213 Joint Motion to Allow the Use of Electrical Equipment in the Courtroom for February 7, 2014 Hearing. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/6/2014. (srm) (Main Document 215 replaced on 2/6/2014) (srm).
February 6, 2014 Filing 214 Joint MOTION to Seal Courtroom During Summary Judgment and Daubert Motion Arguments on February 7, 2014 by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International. (Hsin, Yu-Cheih)
February 6, 2014 Filing 213 Joint MOTION to Allow the Use of Electrical Equipment in the Courtroom for Motion Hearings on February 7, 2014 by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International. (Hsin, Yu-Cheih)
February 5, 2014 Filing 212 NOTICE of Time Change for Hearing on Motions [25,128,131,136,141,150]. Court reschedules the time to hear Motions to 02:00 PM on 2/7/2014 in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. (no document attached) (lsf)
January 29, 2014 Filing 211 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn Liu on behalf of Apple Inc., Apple Sales International (Liu, Shawn)Attorney Shawn Liu added to party Apple Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Shawn Liu added to party Apple Sales International(pty:pla) (srm).
January 29, 2014 Filing 210 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Todd Thomas on behalf of Apple Inc., Apple Sales International (Thomas, Jeffrey)Attorney Jeffrey Todd Thomas added to party Apple Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey Todd Thomas added to party Apple Sales International(pty:pla) (srm).
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER Granting Motorola's Ex Parte Application For Leave to File Documents Under Seal for its Reply in Support of its Motion to Exclude the opinions of Dr. Michael Keeley Pursuant to Federal Rule or Evidence 702; Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Count I of Apple's Second Amended Complaint; Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Motorola's Patents As Applied To Certain Technology (Docs. 179 , 182 , 185 ). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/21/2014. (srm)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER Granting 187 Apple's Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal for Reply Briefs in Support of (1) Motion for Summary Judgment on Count Two of Apple's Second Amended Complaint; (2) Motion for Summary Judgment on Motorola's Affirmative Defenses No. 1-6 and 11; and (3) Motion to Exclude Testimony of Charles R. Donohoe. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/21/2014. (srm)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER Granting Motorola's Ex Parte Application For Leave to File Documents Under Seal for its Opposition to Plaintiffs Apple Inc.'s and Apple Sales International's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Charles R. Donohoe; its Opposition to Plaintiffs Apple Inc.'s and Apple Sales International's Motion for Summary Judgment on Motorola's Affirmative Defenses No. 1-6 and 11; and its Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment on Count Two of Apple's Second Amended Complaint (Docs. 167 , 173 , 176 ). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/21/2014. (srm)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER Granting 169 Apple's Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal for Oppositions to Motorola's Motions (1) for Partial Summary Judgment on Count I of Apple's Second Amended Complaint, (2) for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Motorola's patents as applied to certain technology, and (3) to Exclude the opinions of Dr. Michael Keeley. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/21/2014. (srm)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER Granting Motorola's Ex Parte Application For Leave to File Documents Under Seal for its Motion to Exclude Opinions of Michael Keeley Pursuant to Federal Rule or Evidence 702; Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Count I of Apple's Second Amended Complaint; Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Motorola's Patents As Applied To Certain Technology (Docs. 126 , 129 , 132 , 143 , 145 , 147 ). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/21/2014. (srm)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs Apple Inc.'s and Apple Sales International's Ex Parte Application to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Their: (1) Motion for Summary Judgment on Count Two of Apple's Second Amended Complaint; (2) Motion for Summary Judgment on Motorola's Affirmative Defenses No. 1-6 and 11; and (3) Motion to Exclude Testimony of Charles R. Donohoe (Docs. 134 , 137 , 139 , 148 ). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/21/2014. (srm)
January 13, 2014 Filing 191 REPLY to Response to Motion re 136 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count Two of Apple's Second Amended Complaint and Motion to Exclude Testimony of Charles R. Donohoe filed by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exs. 56-60)(Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (srm).
January 13, 2014 Filing 190 REPLY to Response to Motion re 136 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count Two of Apple's Second Amended Complaint on Affirmative Defenses filed by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Statement of Facts)(Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (srm).
January 13, 2014 Filing 189 REPLY to Response to Motion re 136 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count Two of Apple's Second Amended Complaint filed by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International. (Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (srm).
January 13, 2014 Filing 188 (Filed as Sealed Document 188 on 1/21/2014) SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 187 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Hsin, Yu-Cheih)(sjt). (Main Document 188 replaced on 1/22/2014) (sjt). Modified to add filing date of lodgement on 1/22/2014 (sjt).
January 13, 2014 Filing 187 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (sjt).
January 13, 2014 Filing 186 (Filed as Sealed Document 209 on 1/21/2014) SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 185 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Chassman, Peter) (sjt). (Main Document 186 replaced on 1/22/2014) (sjt). Modified to add filing date of lodgement on 1/22/2014 (sjt).
January 13, 2014 Filing 185 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Chassman, Peter) (sjt).
January 13, 2014 Filing 184 REPLY to Response to Motion re 125 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Michael Keeley Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 702 filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Peter Chassman in Support, # 2 Exhibit 8 to Chassman Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 9 to Chassman Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 10 to Chassman Declaration)(Chassman, Peter) (srm).
January 13, 2014 Filing 183 (Filed as Sealed Document 208 on 1/21/2014) SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 182 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Chassman, Peter) (sjt). (Main Document 183 replaced on 1/22/2014) (sjt). Modified to add filing date of lodgement on 1/22/2014 (sjt).
January 13, 2014 Filing 182 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Chassman, Peter) (sjt).
January 13, 2014 Filing 181 REPLY to Response to Motion re 128 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Count I of Apple's Second Amended Complaint filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Peter Chassman in Support, # 2 Exhibit 9 to Chassman Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 10 to Chassman Declaration)(Chassman, Peter) (srm).
January 13, 2014 Filing 180 (Filed as Sealed Document 207 on 1/21/2014) SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 179 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Chassman, Peter) (sjt). (Main Document 180 replaced on 1/22/2014) (sjt). Modified to add filing date of lodgement on 1/22/2014 (sjt).
January 13, 2014 Filing 179 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Chassman, Peter) (sjt).
January 13, 2014 Filing 178 REPLY to Response to Motion re 131 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Motorola's Patents as Applied to Certain Technology filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Chassman, Peter) (srm).
January 3, 2014 Filing 177 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 176 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Chassman, Peter) (sjt).
January 3, 2014 Filing 176 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Chassman, Peter) (sjt).
January 3, 2014 Filing 175 RESPONSE in Opposition re 136 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count Two of Apple's Second Amended Complaint filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts (Motorola's Response to Apple's Statement of Facts), # 2 Statement of Facts (Motorola's Statement of Additional Facts), # 3 Declaration of P. Chassman in Support, # 4 Exhibit 1 to Chassman Decl., # 5 Exhibit 2 to Chassman Decl., # 6 Exhibit 3 to Chassman Decl., # 7 Exhibit 4 to Chassman Decl., # 8 Exhibit 5 to Chassman Decl., # 9 Exhibit 6 to Chassman Decl., # 10 Exhibit 7 to Chassman Decl., # 11 Exhibit 8 to Chassman Decl., # 12 Exhibit 9 to Chassman Decl., # 13 Exhibit 10 to Chassman Decl., # 14 Exhibit 11 to Chassman Decl., # 15 Exhibit 12 to Chassman Decl., # 16 Exhibit 13 to Chassman Decl., # 17 Exhibit 14 to Chassman Decl., # 18 Exhibit 15 to Chassman Decl., # 19 Exhibit 16 to Chassman Decl., # 20 Exhibit 17 to Chassman Decl., # 21 Exhibit 18 to Chassman Decl., # 22 Exhibit 19 to Chassman Decl., # 23 Exhibit 20 to Chassman Decl., # 24 Exhibit 21 to Chassman Decl., # 25 Exhibit 22 to Chassman Decl., # 26 Exhibit 23 to Chassman Decl., # 27 Exhibit 24 to Chassman Decl.)(Chassman, Peter) (srm).
January 3, 2014 Filing 174 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 173 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Chassman, Peter)
January 3, 2014 Filing 173 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Chassman, Peter) (sjt).
January 3, 2014 Filing 172 RESPONSE in Opposition re 150 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Corrected] Notice of Motion and Memorandum In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment on Motorola Affirmative Defenses Nos. 1-6 and 11 filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts (Motorola's Response to Apple's Statement of Undisputed Facts), # 2 Statement of Facts (Motorola's Statement of Additional Facts), # 3 Declaration of P. Chassman in Support, # 4 Exhibit 1 to Chassman Decl., # 5 Exhibit 2 to Chassman Decl., # 6 Exhibit 3 to Chassman Decl., # 7 Exhibit 4 to Chassman Decl., # 8 Exhibit 5 to Chassman Decl., # 9 Exhibit 6 to Chassman Decl., # 10 Exhibit 7 to Chassman Decl., # 11 Exhibit 8 to Chassman Decl., # 12 Exhibit 9 to Chassman Decl., # 13 Exhibit 10 to Chassman Decl., # 14 Exhibit 11 to Chassman Decl., # 15 Exhibit 12 to Chassman Decl., # 16 Exhibit 13 to Chassman Decl., # 17 Exhibit 14 to Chassman Decl., # 18 Exhibit 15 to Chassman Decl., # 19 Exhibit 16 to Chassman Decl., # 20 Exhibit 17 to Chassman Decl., # 21 Exhibit 18 to Chassman Decl., # 22 Exhibit 19 to Chassman Decl., # 23 Exhibit 20 to Chassman Decl., # 24 Exhibit 21 to Chassman Decl., # 25 Exhibit 22 to Chassman Decl., # 26 Exhibit 23 to Chassman Decl., # 27 Exhibit 24 to Chassman Decl., # 28 Exhibit 25 to Chassman Decl., # 29 Exhibit 26 to Chassman Decl., # 30 Exhibit 27 to Chassman Decl., # 31 Exhibit 28 to Chassman Decl., # 32 Exhibit 29 to Chassman Decl.)(Chassman, Peter) (srm).
January 3, 2014 Filing 171 RESPONSE in Opposition re 128 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Count I of Apple's Second Amended Complaint, 131 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Motorola's Patents as Applied to Certain Technology, 125 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Michael Keeley Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 702 filed by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 3 Statement of Facts, # 4 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 5 Declaration, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit)(Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (srm).
January 3, 2014 Filing 170 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 169 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (sjt).
January 3, 2014 Filing 169 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (sjt).
January 3, 2014 Filing 168 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 167 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Chassman, Peter) (sjt).
January 3, 2014 Filing 167 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Chassman, Peter) (sjt).
January 3, 2014 Filing 166 RESPONSE in Opposition re 141 MOTION to Appoint Expert MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Charles R. Donohoe filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of P. Chassman in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Chassman Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Chassman Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Chassman Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Chassman Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Chassman Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Chassman Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 7 to Chassman Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 8 to Chassman Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 9 to Chassman Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 10 to Chassman Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 11 to Chassman Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 12 to Chassman Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 13 to Chassman Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 14 to Chassman Declaration)(Chassman, Peter) (srm).
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER Denying Defendant's 151 Motion for Exception from Protective Order; Granting 152 154 158 Motions to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 12/23/2013. (rlu) (jrl).
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule (Re: Doc. No. 125 , 128 , 131 , 136 , 141 , 150 ): Responses due by 1/3/2014, Replies due by 1/13/2014. Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/3/2013.(srm)(jrd)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER Granting 156 Joint Motion Regarding Deposition of Derek Aberle. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 11/26/2013. (srm)(jrd)
November 20, 2013 Filing 159 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 158 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Chassman, Peter) (sjt).
November 20, 2013 Filing 158 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Chassman, Peter) (sjt).
November 20, 2013 Filing 157 REPLY to Response to Motion re 151 MOTION for Exception from Protective Order (Redacted Public Version) filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration (Supplemental) of Peter Chassman in Support, # 2 Exhibit 15 to Chassman Supplemental Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 16 to Chassman Supplemental Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 17 to Chassman Supplemental Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 18 to Chassman Supplemental Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 19 to Chassman Supplemental Declaration)(Chassman, Peter) (srm).
November 15, 2013 Filing 156 Joint MOTION Regarding Deposition of Derek Aberle by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Peter J. Chassman in Support, # 2 Exhibit A to Chassman Declaration)(Chassman, Peter) (ag).
November 13, 2013 Filing 155 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 154 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (sjt).
November 13, 2013 Filing 154 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (sjt).
October 29, 2013 Filing 153 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 152 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Chassman, Peter) (sjt).
October 29, 2013 Filing 152 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Chassman, Peter) (sjt).
October 29, 2013 Filing 151 MOTION for Exception from Protective Order by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities (redacted), # 2 Declaration of P. Chassman in Support, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Chassman Declaration (under seal), # 4 Exhibit 2 to Chassman Declaration (under seal), # 5 Exhibit 3 to Chassman Declaration (under seal), # 6 Exhibit 4 to Chassman Declaration (under seal), # 7 Exhibit 5 to Chassman Declaration (under seal), # 8 Exhibit 6 to Chassman Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 7 to Chassman Declaration (under seal), # 10 Exhibit 8 to Chassman Declaration (under seal), # 11 Exhibit 9 to Chassman Declaration (under seal), # 12 Exhibit 10 to Chassman Declaration (under seal), # 13 Exhibit 11 to Chassman Declaration (under seal), # 14 Exhibit 12 to Chassman Declaration (under seal), # 15 Exhibit 13 to Chassman Declaration (under seal), # 16 Exhibit 14 to Chassman Declaration (under seal))(Chassman, Peter) (srm).
October 29, 2013 Filing 150 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Corrected] Notice of Motion and Memorandum In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment on Motorola Affirmative Defenses Nos. 1-6 and 11 by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International. (Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (srm).
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule Regarding Discovery Dispute: Motorola must file its motion on or before October 30, 2013. Apple must file its opposition on or before November 13, 2013. Motorola must file its reply, if any, on or before November 20, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 10/28/2013.(srm)(jrd)
October 28, 2013 Filing 148 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (sjt). Modified on 10/29/2013 (sjt).
October 28, 2013 Filing 147 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Chassman, Peter) (QC mailer sent re: missing sealed lodged proposed document) (sjt).
October 28, 2013 Filing 146 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Motorola Mobility LLC re 131 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Motorola's Patents as Applied to Certain Technology Memorandum of Points and Authorities (redacted). (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts (redacted), # 2 Declaration of P. Chassman in Support (redacted))(Chassman, Peter) (srm).
October 28, 2013 Filing 145 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Chassman, Peter) (QC mailer sent re: missing sealed lodged proposed document) (sjt).
October 28, 2013 Filing 144 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Motorola Mobility LLC re 128 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Count I of Apple's Second Amended Complaint Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support (redacted). (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts (redacted), # 2 Declaration of P. Chassman in Support (redacted))(Chassman, Peter) (srm).
October 28, 2013 Filing 143 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Chassman, Peter) (QC mailer sent re: missing sealed lodged proposed document) (sjt).
October 28, 2013 Filing 142 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Motorola Mobility LLC re 125 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Michael Keeley Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 702 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support (redacted). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Chassman in Support (redacted))(Chassman, Peter) (srm).
October 24, 2013 Filing 141 MOTION to Appoint Expert , MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Charles R. Donohoe by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International. (Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (srm).
October 24, 2013 Filing 140 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 139 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (sjt).
October 24, 2013 Filing 139 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (sjt).
October 24, 2013 Filing 138 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 137 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (sjt).
October 24, 2013 Filing 137 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (sjt).
October 24, 2013 Filing 136 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count Two of Apple's Second Amended Complaint by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Y. Ernest Hsin In Support of Apple's (1) Motion for Summary Judgment on Count Two of Apple's Second Amended Complaint, (2) Motion for Summary Judgment On Motorola's Affirmative Defenses Nos. 1-6 and 11, and (3) Motion to Exclude Testimony of Charles R. Donohoe, # 2 Exhibit Hsin Dec Ex 1-39 (Public), # 3 Exhibit Hsin Dec Ex 40, # 4 Exhibit Hsin Dec Ex 41, # 5 Exhibit Hsin Dec Ex 42-51 (Public), # 6 Exhibit Hsin Dec Ex 52, # 7 Exhibit Hsin Dec Ex 53, # 8 Exhibit Hsin Dec Ex 54-55 (Public))(Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (srm).
October 24, 2013 Filing 135 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 134 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (sjt).
October 23, 2013 Filing 134 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (sjt).
October 23, 2013 Filing 133 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 147 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Chassman, Peter) (sjt).
October 23, 2013 Filing 132 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Chassman, Peter) (sjt).
October 23, 2013 Filing 131 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Motorola's Patents as Applied to Certain Technology by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities (Sealed), # 2 Statement of Facts (Sealed), # 3 Declaration of P. Chassman in Support (Sealed), # 4 Exhibit 1 to Chassman Declaration (Sealed), # 5 Exhibit 2 to Chassman Declaration (Sealed), # 6 Exhibit 3 to Chassman Declaration (Sealed), # 7 Exhibit 4 to Chassman Declaration (Sealed), # 8 Exhibit 5 to Chassman Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 6 to Chassman Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 7 to Chassman Declaration (Sealed), # 11 Exhibit 8 to Chassman Declaration (Sealed), # 12 Exhibit 9 to Chassman Declaration (Sealed), # 13 Exhibit 10 to Chassman Declaration (Sealed), # 14 Exhibit 11 to Chassman Declaration (Sealed), # 15 Exhibit 12 to Chassman Declaration (Sealed), # 16 Exhibit 13 to Chassman Declaration (Sealed), # 17 Exhibit 14 to Chassman Declaration (Sealed))(Chassman, Peter) (srm).
October 23, 2013 Filing 130 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 145 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Chassman, Peter) (sjt).
October 23, 2013 Filing 129 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Chassman, Peter) (sjt).
October 23, 2013 Filing 128 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Count I of Apple's Second Amended Complaint by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities (Sealed), # 2 Statement of Facts (Sealed), # 3 Declaration of P. Chassman in Support (Sealed), # 4 Exhibit 1 to Chassman Declaration (Sealed), # 5 Exhibit 2 to Chassman Declaration (Sealed), # 6 Exhibit 3 to Chassman Declaration (Sealed), # 7 Exhibit 4 to Chassman Declaration (Sealed), # 8 Exhibit 5 to Chassman Declaration (Sealed), # 9 Exhibit 6 to Chassman Declaration (Sealed), # 10 Exhibit 7 to Chassman Declaration (Sealed), # 11 Exhibit 8 to Chassman Declaration (Sealed))(Chassman, Peter) (srm).
October 23, 2013 Filing 127 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 143 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Chassman, Peter) (sjt).
October 23, 2013 Filing 126 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Chassman, Peter) (sjt).
October 23, 2013 Filing 125 MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Michael Keeley Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 702 by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities (Sealed), # 2 Declaration of P. Chassman in Support (Sealed), # 3 Exhibit 1 (Sealed), # 4 Exhibit 2 (Sealed), # 5 Exhibit 3 (Sealed), # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6 (Sealed), # 9 Exhibit 7 (Sealed))(Chassman, Peter) (srm).
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER Granting 123 Joint Motion to Vacate Mandatory Settlement Conference. The Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 11/8/2013 at 9:30 AM is vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 10/21/2013. (ag)(jrd)
October 18, 2013 Filing 123 Joint MOTION to Vacate or, MOTION to Continue Mandatory Settlement Conference by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International. (Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (ag).
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER Granting 121 Joint Motion for Extension of Fact and Expert Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 10/8/2013. (srm)(jrd)
October 2, 2013 Filing 121 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Limited Fact Discovery and Expert Discovery by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International. (Rosenberg, Stuart)Attorney Stuart M. Rosenberg added to party Apple Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Stuart M. Rosenberg added to party Apple Sales International(pty:pla) (srm).
September 24, 2013 Filing 120 PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Paul J. Kremer appearing for Plaintiffs Apple Inc., Apple Sales International, Receipt # 54701. (cge)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER Granting 118 Joint Motion to Modify Case Management Conference Order. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/14/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/21/2014 01:30 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 7/23/2013. (srm)(jrd)
July 19, 2013 Filing 118 Joint MOTION To Modify Case Management Order re 99 Scheduling Order, by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International, Motorola Mobility LLC. (Chassman, Peter) (knb).
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER Granting 116 Joint Motion to Continue Mandatory Settlement Conference. Mandatory Settlement Conference Continued to 11/8/2013 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 7/2/2013. (srm)
July 1, 2013 Filing 116 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 112 Order, Set Hearings, Terminate Hearings Joint Motion to Continue Mandatory Settlement Conference by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International, Motorola Mobility LLC. (Chassman, Peter) (srm).
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Granting 113 Joint To Continue Case Schedule. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/7/2014 01:30 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/17/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 5/7/2013. (srm)
May 6, 2013 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by Yu-Cheih E. Hsin on behalf of Apple Inc., Apple Sales International (Hsin, Yu-Cheih) (srm).
May 6, 2013 Filing 113 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 99 Scheduling Order , 109 Order, Joint Motion to Modify Case Management Order by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International, Motorola Mobility LLC. (Chassman, Peter) Modified text on 5/6/2013 (srm).
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER Rescheduling Mandatory Settlement Conference. Mandatory Settlement Conference Rescheduled for 7/12/2013 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 4/5/2013. (srm)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER Granting 108 Joint Motion For Extension of Case Management Dates. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/6/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/13/2013 01:30 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. All other guidelines and requirements remain in effect. See ECF No. 99 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 3/8/2013. (srm)(jrd)
March 7, 2013 Filing 108 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 99 Case Management Order - Joint Motion to Modify Case Management Order Relating to Certain Dates for Expert Reports, Discovery, and Pretrial Motions by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International. (Young, Meryl) (srm).
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER Granting 106 Joint Motion for Extension For Defendant to File Discovery Motion. Defendant may file a discovery motion concerning Plaintiffs' responses to Defendant's first set of interrogatories and requests for production of documents no later than March 1, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 2/22/2013. (srm) (jrl).
February 19, 2013 Filing 106 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for Extension of Deadline for Motorola to Bring Discovery Motion by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International, Motorola Mobility LLC. (Chassman, Peter) (srm).
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Granting 104 Joint Motion For Extension For Plaintiff to Designate Replacement Expert and for Defendant to Designate Rebuttal Expert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 2/14/2013. (srm)(jrd)
February 13, 2013 Filing 104 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 99 Scheduling Order - Joint Motion to Modify Case Management Order Relating to Certain Dates for Expert Designations by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International, Motorola Mobility LLC. (Chassman, Peter) (srm).
February 13, 2013 Filing 103 PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Gregory A. Duffey appearing for Defendant Motorola Mobility LLC.(vam)(jrd)
December 5, 2012 Filing 102 JOINT AGREEMENT Regarding the Format of Document Productions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 12/5/2012. (srm)(jrl).
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 JOINT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 12/5/2012. (srm) (jrl).
November 26, 2012 Filing 100 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Entry of Proposed Protective Order and Proposed Agreement Regarding the Format of Document Productions by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International. (Young, Meryl) (srm).
November 5, 2012 Filing 99 Case Management Conference Order. Telephonic Case Management Conference was held on 10/31/2012. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 7/15/2013 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major, chambers located at 333 West Broadway, Suite 1110, San Diego, CA 92101. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/11/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/18/2013 01:30 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 11/5/2012. (srm) (jrl).
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Granting 94 Joint Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 10/25/2012. (leh)
October 24, 2012 Filing 96 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Young, Meryl) (srm).
October 24, 2012 Filing 95 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 10/25/2012] - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 94 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Young, Meryl)(leh) Modified on 10/26/2012 to add file date to lodgment (leh).
October 24, 2012 Filing 94 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Young, Meryl) (leh).
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Granting 92 Joint Motion For Extension of Time for Initial Disclosures and Joint Discovery Plan and for Continuance of Case Management Conference. The telephonic Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/24/2012 at 9:00 AM is Continued to 10/31/2012 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 10/18/2012. (srm)(jrd)
October 17, 2012 Filing 92 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Initial Disclosures and Joint Discovery Plan and for Rescheduling of Case Management Conference re 90 Order by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International. (Young, Meryl) (srm).
October 10, 2012 Filing 91 Order of Transfer. This civil case is hereby transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Roger T. Benitez to the calendar of the Honorable GONZALO P. CURIEL. The assigned Magistrate Judge will remain the same. This change should be made on all future filings to ensure that all documents are properly routed to Judge Curiel. All pending motion dates and pretrial conference dates currently scheduled before Judge Benitez are VACATED to be re-set by Judge Curiel. The new case number is 12cv0355-GPC-BLM. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 10/9/2012.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jao) (jrl).
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Directing Rule 26 Compliance and Setting Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2012 09:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 9/26/2012.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)(jrd)
September 20, 2012 Filing 89 Minute Order: Judge Dana M. Sabraw recuses from this case and requests another judge be drawn and assigned. Judge Roger T. Benitez randomly assigned to the case. The new case number is 12-CV-00355-BEN-BLM. (no document attached) (kcm)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting 87 Joint Motion for Substitution of Counsel for Plaintiffs Apple Inc. and Apple Sales Internantional. Ms. Young has previously entered her appearance as counsel of record on behalf of Apple and is authorized to receive service of all correspondence, pleadings, notices, orders, and other papers in the above captioned matter on behalf of Apple. Mr. Krevitt and Mr. Leslie have been admitted pro hac vice as counsel of record on behalf of Apple in this action, and are also authorized to receive service of all correspondence, pleadings, notices, orders, and other papers in the above captioned matter on behalf of Apple. Attorney Danielle Luce Goldstein; Robert T Haslam; Matthew D Powers; Samuel F. Ernst and Robert D. Fram terminated. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/18/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
September 14, 2012 Filing 87 Joint MOTION to Substitute Attorney for Plaintiffs Apple Inc. and Apple Sales International by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International. (Young, Meryl)(aef).
September 14, 2012 Filing 86 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International re 83 Notice (Other) filed by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International . (Young, Meryl) (aef).
September 11, 2012 Filing 85 PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Scott A. Leslie appearing for Plaintiffs Apple Inc., Apple Sales International. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag)(jrd)
September 11, 2012 Filing 84 PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Josh A. Krevitt appearing for Plaintiffs Apple Inc., Apple Sales International. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag)(jrd)
September 6, 2012 Filing 83 NOTICE by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International Notice of Substitution of Counsel for Plaintiffs Apple Inc. and Apple Sales International (Young, Meryl) Modified on 9/7/2012-QC mailer sent to atty re using wrong event (aef).
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. A telephonic, attorneys-only Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 9/26/2012 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 9/5/2012.(aef)
September 5, 2012 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Meryl L. Young on behalf of Apple Inc., Apple Sales International (Young, Meryl)(aef).
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Granting 77 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/28/2012. (leh)
August 27, 2012 Filing 78 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 8/28/2012] - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 77 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Perkowski, Peter) (leh). Modified on 8/28/2012 to add file date to lodgment(leh).
August 27, 2012 Filing 77 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Perkowski, Peter) (leh).
August 27, 2012 Filing 76 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Motorola Mobility LLC identifying Corporate Parent Google, Inc. for Motorola Mobility LLC.. (Perkowski, Peter)(aef).
August 27, 2012 Filing 75 ANSWER to 69 Amended Complaint, Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Second Amended Complaint (Public Version - Redacted) by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Perkowski, Peter) (aef).
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 73 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. No later than August 27, 2012, Defendant shall file and serve a response to the second amended complaint. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/13/2012. (aef)
August 10, 2012 Filing 73 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Apple's Second Amended Complaint by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Perkowski, Peter)(aef).
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Granting 67 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 8/7/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
August 3, 2012 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International re 68 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (Fram, Robert) (aef).
August 3, 2012 Filing 69 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Public/Redacted Version of Second Amended Complaint against Motorola Mobility LLC, filed by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) (Fram, Robert)(aef). Modified on 8/6/2012-to add 'second' to reflect text (aef).
August 3, 2012 Filing 68 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 8/7/2012] - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 67 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Fram, Robert)(leh). Modified on 8/7/2012 to add file date to lodgment(leh).
August 3, 2012 Filing 67 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Fram, Robert) (leh).
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss with leave to Amend. No later than August 3, 2012, Plaintiff must file either a second amended complaint or a notice of election not to file an amended complaint. Defendant's response to the second amended complaint, if any, must be filed and served within the time set forth in Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(3). Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/17/2012. (aef) (jrl).
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Re: Calendar. Pending before the Court is Defendant's motion to dismiss under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and (6). The motion is set for hearing on Friday, July 6, 2012. Because it is suitable for submission without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1), no appearances are required at this time. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/2/2012.(aef)(jrd)
June 13, 2012 Filing 63 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Motorola Mobility, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Google, Inc. for Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Perkowski, Peter)(aef).
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Granting Motions to File Documents Under Seal as to Documents 53 , 56 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/6/2012. (leh)
June 5, 2012 Filing 59 AMENDED Corporate Disclosure Statement by Motorola Mobility, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Google, Inc., Corporate Parent Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc. for Motorola Mobility, Inc... (Perkowski, Peter)(aef) Modified on 6/6/2012-to add 'amended' to docket text (aef).
May 25, 2012 Filing 58 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Motorola Mobility, Inc. re 55 Reply to Response to Motion, (Perkowski, Peter)(aef).
May 24, 2012 Filing 57 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 6/6/2012] - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 56 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Perkowski, Peter)(leh) Modified on 6/6/2012 to add file date to lodgment (leh).
May 24, 2012 Filing 56 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Perkowski, Peter) (leh).
May 24, 2012 Filing 55 REPLY to Response to Motion re 37 MOTION to Dismiss Apple's First Amended Complaint [Redacted/Public Version of Motorola's Reply Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss] filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Perkowski, Peter)(aef). Modified on 5/25/2012-missing certificate of service (aef).
May 24, 2012 Filing 54 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 6/6/2012] - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 53 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Fram, Robert) (leh). Modified on 6/6/2012 to add file date to lodgment (leh).
May 24, 2012 Filing 53 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Fram, Robert) (leh).
May 24, 2012 Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition re 37 MOTION to Dismiss Apple's First Amended Complaint ; Public/Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Their Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Apple's First Amended Complaint filed by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International. (Fram, Robert)(aef). Modified on 5/25/2012-document not timely (aef).
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Denying 47 Ex Parte Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Denial is Without Prejudice to filing a new motion with an appropriate showing. The memorandum, which was lodged under seal, will not be considered. If Plaintiffs wish their memorandum to be considered, it must be filed by 5/24/2012. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/21/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
May 21, 2012 Filing 50 DECLARATION re 48 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document Declaration of Samuel F. Ernst in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Apple's First Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Apple Inc., Apple Sales International. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1, # 2 Ex. 2)(Ernst, Samuel)(aef).
May 17, 2012 Filing 49 DECLARATION re 48 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document Declaration of Samuel F. Ernst in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Apple's First Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Apple Inc., Apple Sales International. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1, # 2 Ex. 2)(Fram, Robert)(aef).
May 17, 2012 Filing 48 [Denied, Per Order on 5/21/2012] - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 47 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Fram, Robert) (kaj). (leh)
May 17, 2012 Filing 47 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Fram, Robert) (kaj).
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Continuing Hearing. The hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint scheduled for July 5, 2012, is continued to July 6, 2012 at 1:30 p.m. Courtroom 10 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. In all other respects, the Order Setting Briefing Schedule, filed April 23, 2012, shall remain in effect. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/3/2012.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
April 25, 2012 Filing 45 PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Elizabeth Papez appearing for Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ldp)
April 25, 2012 Filing 44 Minute Order: Judge Michael M. Anello has declined assignment pursuant to General Order 598. Judge Dana M. Sabraw has been randomly assigned. The new case number is 12cv355-DMS(BLM) (tel)
April 25, 2012 Filing 43 Minute Order: Judge Janis L. Sammartino recuses from the case. Judge Michael M. Anello is now assigned to the case. The new case number is 12cv355-MMA(BLM) (tel)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 38 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/23/2012. (leh)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule as to 37 MOTION to Dismiss Apple's First Amended Complaint: Opposition due by 5/17/2012 and Reply due by 5/24/2012. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/23/12.(lmt)
April 19, 2012 Filing 39 FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 4/23/2012 - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 38 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Perkowski, Peter)(leh). Modified on 4/23/2012 to add file date to lodgment(leh).
April 19, 2012 Filing 38 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Perkowski, Peter) (leh).
April 19, 2012 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss Apple's First Amended Complaint by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Peter Perkowski, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Perkowski, Peter) (lmt).
April 10, 2012 Filing 36 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Motorola Mobility, Inc. re 17 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay filed by Motorola Mobility, Inc. . (Perkowski, Peter) (lmt).
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 32 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/3/2012. (leh)
April 2, 2012 Filing 33 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 4/3/2012] - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 32 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Fram, Robert)(leh). Modified on 4/3/2012 to add file date to lodgment (leh).
April 2, 2012 Filing 32 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Fram, Robert) (leh).
April 2, 2012 Filing 31 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Public/Redacted Version of First Amended Complaint against Motorola Mobility, Inc., filed by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International. (Fram, Robert) (lmt).
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 28 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File an Amended Complaint: the time for Plaintiffs Apple Inc. and Apple Sales International to file an amended complaint in this matter is extended to and includes 4/2/12. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/28/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)
March 26, 2012 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D Powers on behalf of Apple Inc., Apple Sales International (Powers, Matthew) (lmt).
March 26, 2012 Filing 28 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Joint Motion to Extend the Time for Plaintiffs Apple Inc. and Apple Sales International to File an Amended Complaint by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International. (Ernst, Samuel) (lmt).
March 14, 2012 Filing 27 PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: James F. Hurst appearing for Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ldp)
March 14, 2012 Filing 26 PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Peter J. Chassman appearing for Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ldp)
March 14, 2012 Filing 25 PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Michael L Brody appearing for Defendant Motorola Mobility, Inc. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ldp)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 18 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/12/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule as to 17 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay: Opposition due by 4/12/2012 and Reply due by 4/19/2012. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/12/12.(lmt)
March 8, 2012 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Motorola Mobility, Inc. re 20 Notice of Party With Financial Interest (Perkowski, Peter) (lmt).
March 7, 2012 Filing 20 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Perkowski, Peter) (atty contacted re cert of service) (lmt).
March 7, 2012 Filing 19 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 3/12/2012] - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 18 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Perkowski, Peter)(leh) Modified on 3/12/2012 to add file date to lodgment(leh).
March 7, 2012 Filing 18 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Perkowski, Peter)(leh).
March 7, 2012 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities (Redacted Version), # 2 Declaration of Peter Perkowski, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B)(Perkowski, Peter) (lmt).
March 1, 2012 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel F. Ernst on behalf of Apple Inc., Apple Sales International (Ernst, Samuel) (lmt).
March 1, 2012 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Luce Goldstein on behalf of Apple Inc., Apple Sales International (Goldstein, Danielle) (lmt).
March 1, 2012 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Fram on behalf of Apple Inc., Apple Sales International (Fram, Robert) (lmt).
March 1, 2012 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International. Motorola Mobility, Inc. served. (Fram, Robert) (lmt).
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 11 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Motorola Mobility, Inc. answer due 3/7/2012. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/1/12. (lmt)
February 29, 2012 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Motorola Mobility, Inc.. (Perkowski, Peter) (lmt).
February 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 5 Ex Parte Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/15/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
February 15, 2012 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International re 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Haslam, Robert) (lmt).
February 15, 2012 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International. (Haslam, Robert) (lmt).
February 13, 2012 Filing 6 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 2/15/2012] - SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 5 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Haslam, Robert)(leh). Modified on 2/15/2012 to add file date to lodgment(leh).
February 13, 2012 Filing 5 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Haslam, Robert)(leh).
February 10, 2012 Filing 4 Notice of Document Discrepancies by Judge Janis L. Sammartino Rejecting Document: Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief from Apple Inc., Apple Sales International. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Case opened by electronic submission; this is the unredacted version of the complaint, filed under seal, without a motion and order to seal. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is NOT to be filed, but instead REJECTED and it is ORDERED that the Clerk serve a copy of this order on all parties. Counsel is advised that any further failure to comply with the Local Rules may lead to penalties pursuant to Local Rule 83.1.(lmt)
February 10, 2012 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number *6,359,898* cc:USPTO (jmd)(av1).
February 10, 2012 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmd) (av1).
February 10, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Motorola Mobility, Inc. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 0974-4433696.) Filed by Apple Inc., Apple Sales International.The new case number is 3:12-cv-355-JLS-BLM. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Haslam, Robert)(jmd) (av1).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apple Inc. et al v. Motorola Mobility, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Samuel F. Ernst
Represented By: Robert D. Fram
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Represented By: Robert T Haslam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apple Sales International
Represented By: Samuel F. Ernst
Represented By: Robert D. Fram
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Represented By: Robert T Haslam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Mobility, Inc.
Represented By: Peter E. Perkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?