BP West Coast Products LLC v. Crossroad Petroleum, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: BP West Coast Products LLC
Defendant: Aly Shakankiry, Ahd Haddad, John Vazirian, Zuma Arc Inc, Matt Cohen, Liliana Monteagudo, Randa Maaytah, Old Town Fuel Company, Cohens Gasoline Inc, Sonal Shah, Payam Sahih, Medhi Behmard, Behzad Kianmahd, Maret Golnazarian, Marie Zorenkelian, Armen Ambartsumyan, Rebecca Zomorodian, Carroll Centre, Inc., Nader Sahih, Young-Westwood Enterprises, Inc., Yogesh Shah, Tarun Maitra, Younes Dobli Bennani, Paul Baskaron, David A Parker, Moshail S. Kamel, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Sahar Kermiz, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Venture Petroleum Company, Inc., United Family LLC, Karamali Pashmforoosh, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Ambartsumyan Corporation, Vache Simonyan, Kotsai Wang, Maria Rai, Cal Coast Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, Sheela Thomas, Soma Prasad, Crossroad Petroleum, Inc., Basel Hassounch, Claude Shamaah, William Kermiz, Salman D. Barbat, Ruchira Sharma, Ani Mirzaian, Silva Hilalian, George Nimeh, Anup Patel, Jennifer Cohen, Tahssen Kaskas, Ibrahim Ghallab, A J Services Inc, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Senan F Naoum, Ruchisys Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Muna Quasqas, S M O Oil Inc, Tracy Tapia, Hartyoon Awanis Hilalian, Dhaliwalsons LLC, Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Gas Depot Inc, Habib Alam, Razmik Golnazarian, Rajesh Arora, Bahman Baktar, Buyrite Gasoline Inc, Joelles Oil Co LP, Saad Y. Attisha, Issa T Demes, Parmjit Randhawa, Hamza Shilleh, Kevin Tapia, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Mohammad Kaskas, Omer Kassa, Anit P.K. Natt, Toros Zorenkelian, Salah Mazloum, A Fine Enterprise & Company Inc., Meng E Sao, Farideh Behmard, Bahman Kianmahd, R P Oil Inc, Battir Oil Inc, Mohammad Bahmani, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Khurana Investments Inc, A Green Fuel Corporation, Sylvia Haddadin, Parviz Shamtoub, Mostafa Rahgozar, Heidi Bahmani, Hy E Sao, Abusham Petro LLC, Manal Alam, Brittany L Torres, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Francois Alvandi, South West Petroleum LLC, MDG Information Analysis Management Group LLC, Kalur S Kishan, Raad Attisha, Perfect Fuel Inc, Rafwant Jafal, Trisha Enterprise Inc, Arbind Rai, K & T Park79, Inc. and Nesrin Barbat
Consolidated Plaintiff: Meetra Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Rahgozar Inc, 3 Star Management, Inc., 2United Oil LLC, Rafael Castillo, Awans Enterprises Inc, Parshotam Kamboj, Nimeh Inc, MDA Fuel Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, Vasaya Oil Co., Inc., Horizon Investment Group Inc, Denise Brown, Susan Shen Chin, Chase Products Inc, Taftan Incorporated, AKM Oil Co Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Hadaf Inc, Khaja Ansari, H&O Inc, NRRM Corp, RP Oil Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, PB Inc, Harsico LLC, Hilalian Corp, Sharina Alloush, Shomers Group LLC, Gagan Natt, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Westminster Mini Market Inc, I and M Oil Inc, Southland Petroleum Inc, Ghallab Brothers Inc, MJS Engel No 1 Inc, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, HRMP Corp, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Rasna LLC and Shamaah Inc
Counter Defendant: Thrifty Oil Co. and Does 1 through 10, Inclusive
Case Number: 3:2012cv00665
Filed: March 18, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:2801
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 755 Abstract of Judgment by BP West Coast Products LLC, entered against Sharina Alloush. (jpp)
October 16, 2019 Filing 754 PRAECIPE for Abstract of Judgment as to Sharina Alloush, by BP West Coast Products LLC (jpp)
October 16, 2019 Filing 753 Abstract of Judgment by BP West Coast Products LLC, entered against Payam Sahih. (jpp)
October 16, 2019 Filing 752 PRAECIPE for Abstract of Judgment as to Payam Sahih, by BP West Coast Products LLC (jpp)
October 3, 2019 Filing 751 Writ of Execution by BP West Coast Products LLC, entered against Nader Sahih. (jpp)
October 3, 2019 Filing 750 Application for Writ of Execution by BP West Coast Products LLC. (jpp)
October 3, 2019 Filing 749 Writ of Execution by BP West Coast Products LLC, entered against Khaja Ansari. (jpp)
October 3, 2019 Filing 748 Application for Writ of Execution by BP West Coast Products LLC. (jpp)
October 3, 2019 Filing 747 Writ of Execution by BP West Coast Products LLC, entered against Rajesh Arora. (jpp)
October 3, 2019 Filing 746 Application for Writ of Execution by BP West Coast Products LLC. (jpp)
October 3, 2019 Filing 745 Writ of Execution by BP West Coast Products LLC, entered against Sharina Alloush. (jpp)
October 3, 2019 Filing 744 Application for Writ of Execution by BP West Coast Products LLC. (jpp)
October 3, 2019 Filing 743 Writ of Execution by BP West Coast Products LLC, entered against Anup Patel. (jpp)
October 3, 2019 Filing 742 Application for Writ of Execution by BP West Coast Products LLC. (jpp)
October 3, 2019 Filing 741 Writ of Execution by BP West Coast Products LLC, entered against Nader Smith. (jpp)
October 3, 2019 Filing 740 Application for Writ of Execution by BP West Coast Products LLC. (jpp)
October 3, 2019 Filing 739 Writ of Execution by BP West Coast Products LLC, entered against Hadaf, Inc.. (jpp)
October 3, 2019 Filing 738 Application for Writ of Execution by BP West Coast Products LLC. (jpp)
October 3, 2019 Filing 737 Writ of Execution by BP West Coast Products LLC, entered against Daisie Enterprises, Inc.. (jpp)
October 3, 2019 Filing 736 Application for Writ of Execution by BP West Coast Products LLC. (jpp)
October 3, 2019 Filing 735 Abstract of Judgment by BP West Coast Products LLC, entered against Khaja Ansari. (jpp)
October 3, 2019 Filing 734 PRAECIPE for Abstract of Judgment as to Khaja Ansari, by BP West Coast Products LLC (jpp)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 733 ORDER Granting #732 Joint Motion to Dismiss. This concludes the litigation in this matter. The Clerk shall close the file for this matter, (12-cv-665-JLS-JLB), and all related matters, (12-cv-886-JLS-JLB; 12-cv-887-JLS-JLB; and 12-cv-888-JLS-JLB). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/27/2018. Medhi Behmard,and Farideh Behmard terminated(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
March 27, 2018 Filing 732 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party (Meetra Defendants) by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby)(mpl).
March 23, 2018 Filing 731 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Telephonic Settlement Disposition Conference held on 3/23/2018. Counsel for BP West Coast Products LLC and Meetra Inc., Medhi Behmard, and Farideh Behmard agreed to file a Joint Motion for Dismissal and Proposed Order for Dismissal by Tuesday, 3/27/2018. (Plaintiff Attorney Abby L. Risner).(Defendant Attorney Martin R. Fox). (no document attached) (smm)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 730 ORDER Granting #729 Joint Motion to Dismiss. David A Parker, Chase Products Inc terminated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/22/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
March 20, 2018 Filing 729 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Chase Products & David Parker by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby)(mpl).
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 728 ORDER Granting #726 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Ani Mirzaian, Vache Simonyan terminated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/19/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 727 ORDER Granting #723 Joint Motion to Dismiss. K&T Park79 Inc, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia terminated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/19/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
March 15, 2018 Filing 726 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Vayasa Oil Co by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (mpl).
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 725 Order Scheduling Settlement Disposition Conference. The Joint Motion for Dismissal is due: 3/22/2018. If a Joint Motion for Dismissal and Proposed Order for Dismissal are not submitted by 3/22/2018, then a Settlement Disposition Conference shall be held. The Settlement Disposition Conference is set for 3/23/2018 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 3/14/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
March 13, 2018 Filing 723 Joint MOTION to Dismiss K&T Park79, Inc. by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (mpl).
March 9, 2018 Filing 724 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Mandatory Settlement Conference held on 3/9/2018. Settlements were reached between BP West Coast Products LLC and Chase Products, Inc., David Parker, K&T Park79, Inc., Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Vayasa Oil Co., Inc., Ani Mirzaian, and Vache Simonyan. (Plaintiff Attorney Abby L. Risner). (Defendant Attorney Pamela G Lacey). (no document attached) (smm)
March 8, 2018 Filing 722 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: A Mandatory Settlement Conference was held on 3/8/2018. No settlement was reached between BP West Coast Products LLC and Meetra Inc., Medhi Behmard, and Farideh Behmard. (Plaintiff Attorney Abby L. Risner). (Defendant Attorney Martin Fox). (no document attached) (smm)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 721 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. It is ordered, on or before 3/2/2018, David A. Schiller shall either: (1) Bring himself into compliance with the court's orders by paying the $500.00 monetary sanction to the Miscellaneous Fines, Penalties and Forfeitures, Not Otherwise Classified, fund of the United States Treasury and filing a Notice of Payment in this case; or (2) File a declaration showing cause why additional monetary sanctions and/or civil contempt proceedings are not warranted for his failures to comply with court orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 2/13/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(Copies of order Mailed/Emailed) (mpl)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 720 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt re ECF No. #716 Order setting mandatory settlement conferences: Settlement statements were due to the Court by 2/8/2018. The Court is in receipt of a settlement statement from Plaintiff BPWCP only. By Thursday, 2/15/2018, the following defendants shall LODGE a settlement statement via email at efile_burkhardt@casd.uscourts.gov and SHALL ADDRESS why the statement is being lodged after the court-ordered deadline: Meetra Inc., Medhi Behmard, Farideh Behmard, Chase Products Inc., David Parker, K&T Park79 Inc., Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Vayasa Oil Co. Inc., Ani Mirzaian, and Vache Simonyanare. Further, the parties are directed to consult and ensure their settlement statements comply with both Chambers Rules and the Court's 1/19/2018 Order (ECF No. #716 ). (no document attached) (smm)
February 6, 2018 Filing 719 SANCTIONS PAYMENT RECEIVED re #718 Notice of Payment. A payment against a Court issued sanction has been made. A copy of the receipt is attached. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
February 5, 2018 Filing 718 NOTICE of Payment by Abusham Petro LLC, Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Francois Alvandi, Armen Ambartsumyan, Ambartsumyan Corporation, Rajesh Arora, Raad Attisha, Saad Y. Attisha, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Battir Oil Inc, Farideh Behmard, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Buyrite Gasoline Inc, Cal Coast Inc, Carroll Centre, Inc., Jennifer Cohen, Matt Cohen, Cohens Gasoline Inc, Crossroad Petroleum, Inc., Issa T Demes, Dhaliwalsons LLC, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, Ahd Haddad, Sylvia Haddadin, Basel Hassounch, Hartyoon Awanis Hilalian, Silva Hilalian, Rafwant Jafal, Joelles Oil Co LP, K & T Park79, Inc., Moshail S. Kamel, Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Khurana Investments Inc, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDG Information Analysis Management Group LLC, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, George Nimeh, Old Town Fuel Company, David A Parker, Karamali Pashmforoosh, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Arbind Rai, Maria Rai, Parmjit Randhawa, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Parviz Shamtoub, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Trisha Enterprise Inc, United Family LLC, John Vazirian, A Fine Enterprise & Company Inc., A Green Fuel Corporation, Venture Petroleum Company, Inc., Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Young-Westwood Enterprises, Inc., Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Zuma Arc Inc (Lacey, Pamela) (mpl).
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 717 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Accordingly, on or before 2/16/2018, Pamela G. Lacey shall either: (1) Bring herself into compliance with the court's orders by paying the $500.00 monetary sanction to the Miscellaneous Fines, Penalties and Forfeitures, Not Otherwise Classified, fund of the United States Treasury and filing a Notice of Payment in this case; or (2) File a declaration showing cause why additional monetary sanctions and/or civil contempt proceedings are not warranted for her failures to comply with court orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 1/31/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 716 ORDER Resetting Mandatory Settlement Conference. The Court hereby vacates and resets the two Mandatory Settlement Conference's previously scheduled for March 1-2, 2018. It is hereby ordered: The Mandatory Settlement Conference as to BP West Coast Products LLC, Meetra Inc., Medhi Behmard, and Farideh Behmardan is continued to 3/8/2018 at 1:45 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Second, the Mandatory Settlement Conference as to BP West Coast Products LLC, Meetra Inc., Medhi Behmard, and Farideh Behmardan is continued to 3/9/2018 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 1/19/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 715 ORDER Granting #710 Joint Motion to Stay. The Court Grants the Joint Motion and stays the pretrial proceedings. Thus, the Court vacates (1) the pretrial conference set for 1/25/2018; (2) the hearing on motions in limine set for 3/8/2018; and (3) the trial set to begin 4/2/2018. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/11/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 714 ORDER Setting Mandatory Settlement Conference. Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant BP West Coast Products LLC; Meetra Inc., Medhi Behmard, and Farideh Behmardan are ordered to appear for a MSC that will commence on 3/1/2018 at 1:45 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Second, BP West Coast Products LLC, Chase Products, Inc., David Parker, K&T Park79, Inc., Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Vayasa Oil Co., Inc., Ani Mirzaian, and Vache Simonyan are ordered to appear for a MSC that will commence on 3/2/2018 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 1/10/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
January 10, 2018 Filing 713 RESPONSE in Opposition re #710 MOTION to Stay Pretrial Deadlines and Hearings filed by Meetra Inc. (Baker, Edward) (mpl).
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 712 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt granting ECF No. #709 : The Court hereby GRANTS the parties' Joint Stipulation Requesting Mandatory Settlement Conference. Order to follow setting a Mandatory Settlement Conference. (no document attached) (smm)
January 10, 2018 Filing 711 NOTICE of Appearance of Martin R. Fox on behalf of Meetra Inc., Medhi Behmard, and Farideh Behmard by Martin R. Fox on behalf of Meetra Inc (Fox, Martin)Attorney Martin R. Fox added to party Meetra Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Martin R. Fox added to party Meetra Inc. (pty:cc) (mpl).
January 9, 2018 Filing 710 MOTION to Stay Pretrial Deadlines and Hearings by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (mpl).
January 9, 2018 Filing 709 Joint MOTION for Hearing Requesting Mandatory Settlement Conference by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (mpl).
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 708 ORDER Re #705 Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/3/2018. (mpl)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 707 AMENDED ORDER re: ECF No. #706 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. The present Order amends the prior Order only as to the judgment for Daisie Enterprises Inc., Rajesh Arora, and Anup Patel. The remainder of the Order stands. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/2/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 706 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part #685 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court grants BP's Motion for Summary Judgment as to BP's Third Claim for Relief in its Fifth Amended and Consolidated Complaint against Defendants Khaja Ansari, NP Petroleum Corp., Sharina Alloush, Daisie Enterprises, Inc., and Hadaf Inc. for damages resulting from breach of franchise agreements for the failure to pay for motor fuel. The Court grants BP's Motion for Summary Judgment as to BP's Fifth Claim for Relief as to Guarantor Defendants Payam Sahih and Anup Patel for breach of franchise guarantees for the failure to pay the amounts owed for motor fuel. The Court denies BPs Motion for Summary Judgment as to BPs Fifth Claim for Relief as to Guarantor Defendant Khaja Ansari and Soma Prasad. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/2/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
December 27, 2017 Filing 705 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Certain Pretrial Deadlines by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (mpl).
December 22, 2017 Filing 704 MEMORANDUM OF FACTS AND CONTENTIONS OF LAW by Meetra Inc. (Baker, Edward) (mpl).
December 22, 2017 Filing 703 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward D. Baker on behalf of Meetra, Inc., Medhi Behmard, Farideh Behmard by Edward Davis Baker on behalf of Meetra Inc (Baker, Edward)Attorney Edward Davis Baker added to party Meetra Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Edward Davis Baker added to party Meetra Inc(pty:cc)(mpl).
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 702 ORDER Vacating Hearing and Taking Motion Under Submission Without Oral Argument re #685 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/6/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
December 5, 2017 Filing 701 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Defendants A J Services Inc, Abusham Petro LLC, Habib Alam, Francois Alvandi, Armen Ambartsumyan, Ambartsumyan Corporation, Rajesh Arora, Raad Attisha, Saad Y. Attisha, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Farideh Behmard, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Buyrite Gasoline Inc, Carroll Centre, Inc., Jennifer Cohen, Matt Cohen, Cohens Gasoline Inc, Crossroad Petroleum, Inc., Issa T Demes, Dhaliwalsons LLC, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Gas Depot Inc, Ibrahim Ghallab, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, Ahd Haddad, Sylvia Haddadin, Basel Hassounch, Silva Hilalian, Rafwant Jafal, Joelles Oil Co LP, K & T Park79, Inc., Moshail S. Kamel, Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Khurana Investments Inc, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDG Information Analysis Management Group LLC, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Salah Mazloum, Ani Mirzaian, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, George Nimeh, Old Town Fuel Company, David A Parker, Karamali Pashmforoosh, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Arbind Rai, Maria Rai, Parmjit Randhawa, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Parviz Shamtoub, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Brittany L Torres, Trisha Enterprise Inc, United Family LLC, John Vazirian, A Fine Enterprise & Company Inc., Venture Petroleum Company, Inc., Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Young-Westwood Enterprises, Inc., Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Zuma Arc Inc . (Lacey, Pamela) (mpl).
December 5, 2017 Filing 700 REPLY to Response to Motion re #685 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Supplemental per Court Order No. 698) filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Suppl Declaration of A. Risner, #2 Exhibit 1 to Suppl Declaration of A. Risner, #3 Exhibit 2 to Suppl Declaration of A. Risner, #4 Exhibit 3 to Suppl Declaration of A. Risner, #5 Exhibit 4 to Suppl Declaration of A. Risner, #6 Exhibit 5 to Suppl Declaration of A. Risner, #7 Exhibit 6 to Suppl Declaration of A. Risner, #8 Exhibit 7 to Suppl Declaration of A. Risner, #9 Exhibit 8 to Suppl Declaration of A. Risner, #10 Exhibit 9 to Suppl Declaration of A. Risner, #11 Exhibit 10 to Suppl Declaration of A. Risner, #12 Exhibit 11 to Suppl Declaration of A. Risner, #13 Exhibit 12 to Suppl Declaration of A. Risner)(Risner, Abby) (mpl).
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 699 ORDER Adopting #688 Report and Recommendation. The Court hereby: (1) Adopts Magistrate Judge Burkhardt's Report and Recommendation with respect to the four remaining Defendants; and (2) Enters Judgment against Defendants (1) Behzad Kianmahd; (2) Nader Sahih; (3) Rajesh Arora; and (4) Parshotam S. Kamboj and dismisses with prejudice any counterclaims asserted by these Defendants. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/29/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 698 ORDER Requesting Additional Briefing. It is ordered, each Party shall file a supplemental brief (one per side) regarding the validity of the guarantee agreements on or before 12/5/2017. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/28/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
November 14, 2017 Filing 697 REPLY to Response to Motion re #685 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (mpl).
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 696 ORDER Granting #695 Joint Motion to Dismiss. The Court grants the Joint Motion and dismisses with prejudice these parties' claims against one another. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/13/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl)
November 10, 2017 Filing 695 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party BHRC, Castillo, Hassounch by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (mpl).
November 10, 2017 Filing 694 RESPONSE re #693 Order, #690 Declaration,,,, filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (mpl).
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 693 ORDER Requesting From BP its Position Regarding Recently Filed #690 Declaration. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/9/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl) (jao).
November 7, 2017 Filing 692 DECLARATION of Pamela G. Lacey in Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants A J Services Inc, Abusham Petro LLC, Manal Alam, Ambartsumyan Corporation, Rajesh Arora, Raad Attisha, Saad Y. Attisha, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Farideh Behmard, Medhi Behmard, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Buyrite Gasoline Inc, Cal Coast Inc, Carroll Centre, Inc., Jennifer Cohen, Matt Cohen, Cohens Gasoline Inc, Crossroad Petroleum, Inc., Issa T Demes, Dhaliwalsons LLC, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Gas Depot Inc, Ibrahim Ghallab, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, Ahd Haddad, Sylvia Haddadin, Basel Hassounch, Hartyoon Awanis Hilalian, Silva Hilalian, Rafwant Jafal, Joelles Oil Co LP, K & T Park79, Inc., Moshail S. Kamel, Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Khurana Investments Inc, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDG Information Analysis Management Group LLC, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, George Nimeh, Old Town Fuel Company, Karamali Pashmforoosh, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Arbind Rai, Parmjit Randhawa, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Yogesh Shah, Claude Shamaah, Parviz Shamtoub, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, South West Petroleum LLC, Kevin Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Brittany L Torres, Trisha Enterprise Inc, United Family LLC, John Vazirian, A Green Fuel Corporation, Venture Petroleum Company, Inc., Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Young-Westwood Enterprises, Inc., Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Zuma Arc Inc, Consol Plaintiff Daisie Enterprises Inc. (Lacey, Pamela) (mpl).
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 691 ORDER Granting #686 Motion to Dismiss Parties. The Court dismisses with prejudice Gagan Natt, Anit P.K. Natt, H&O Inc., Omer Kassa, Salman D. Barbat, Nesrin Barbat, Shomers Group LLC, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, PB Inc., and Paul Baskaron from BPWCs Fifth Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/25/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl) (jao).
October 23, 2017 Filing 690 DECLARATION OF PAMELA G. LACEY IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO SANCTION ORDER DATED 10/13/17 by Consol Plaintiffs Sharina Alloush, Khaja Ansari, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Gagan Natt, Rasna LLC, Shomers Group LLC, Taftan Incorporated, Vasaya Oil Co., Inc., 2United Oil LLC, Defendants Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Cal Coast Inc, Carroll Centre, Inc., Jennifer Cohen, Matt Cohen, Cohens Gasoline Inc, Crossroad Petroleum, Inc., Issa T Demes, Dhaliwalsons LLC, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Gas Depot Inc, Ibrahim Ghallab, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, Ahd Haddad, Sylvia Haddadin, Basel Hassounch, Hartyoon Awanis Hilalian, Silva Hilalian, Rafwant Jafal, Joelles Oil Co LP, K & T Park79, Inc., Moshail S. Kamel, Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Khurana Investments Inc, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDG Information Analysis Management Group LLC, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Ani Mirzaian, R P Oil Inc, Brittany L Torres. (Lacey, Pamela) (mpl).
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 689 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule for: (1) Motion for Summary Judgment and (2) Motion to Dismiss Party. Presently before the Court is Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant BP West Coast Products LLC's (BPWC) Motion for Summary Judgment. (ECF No. #685 .) Defendants shall file their response to this Motion on or before 11/7/2017. BPWC shall file its reply, if any, on or before 11/14/2017. Also before the Court is BPWC's Motion to Dismiss Party pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2). (ECF No. #686 .) The Defendants listed in BPWC's Motion (the Dismissed Defendants) (see ECF No. #686 , at 2) shall file an opposition to this Motion, if any, on or before 10/23/2017. BPWC shall file a reply in support of its Motion, if any, on or before 10/30/2017. The Court will decide this motion without a hearing pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/16/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl) (jao).
October 13, 2017 Filing 688 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The Court recommends that judgment be entered against Defendants Behzad Kianmahd, Nader Sahih, Rajesh Arora, Basel Hassounch, and Parshotam S. Kamboj and any counterclaim of Defendants Behzad Kianmahd, Nader Sahih, Rajesh Arora, Basel Hassounch, and Parshotam S. Kamboj be dismissed. Any written objections to this Report and Recommendation must be filed with the Court and served on all parties no later than 10/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 10/13/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mpl) (jao).
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 687 ORDER for Monetary Sanctions re #631 Order to Show Cause. The Court hereby orders that monetary sanctions be paid by the following four defendants for failure to appear at the Mandatory Settlement Conference held on October 18 and 19, 2016: (1) NP Petroleum Corp.; (2) Payam Sahih; (3) William Kirmiz; and (4) Sahar Kirmiz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 10/13/2017.(mpl) (jao).
September 29, 2017 Filing 686 MOTION to Dismiss Party (Voluntarily) by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (mpl).
September 29, 2017 Filing 685 MOTION for Summary Judgment by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Declaration Allison Swinson, #4 Exhibit 1 - Swinson Dec, #5 Exhibit 2 - Swinson Dec, #6 Exhibit 3- Swinson Dec, #7 Exhibit 4 - Swinson Dec, #8 Exhibit 5 - Swinson Dec, #9 Exhibit 6 - Swinson Dec, #10 Exhibit 7 - Swinson Dec, #11 Declaration 8 - Swinson Dec, #12 Exhibit 9 - Swinson Dec, #13 Exhibit 10 - Swinson Dec, #14 Exhibit 11 - Swinson Dec, #15 Exhibit 12 - Swinson Dec, #16 Exhibit 13 - Swinson Dec, #17 Exhibit 14 - Swinson Dec, #18 Exhibit 15 - Swinson Dec, #19 Exhibit 16 - Swinson Dec, #20 Exhibit 17 - Swinson Dec, #21 Exhibit 18 - Swinson Dec, #22 Exhibit 19 - Swinson Dec, #23 Exhibit 20 - Swinson Dec, #24 Exhibit 21 - Swinson Dec, #25 Exhibit 22 - Swinson Dec, #26 Exhibit 23 - Swinson Dec, #27 Exhibit 24 - Swinson Dec, #28 Exhibit 25 - Swinson Dec, #29 Exhibit 26 - Swinson Dec, #30 Exhibit 27 - Swinson Dec, #31 Exhibit 28 - Swinson Dec, #32 Exhibit 29 - Swinson Dec, #33 Exhibit 30 - Swinson Dec, #34 Exhibit 31 - Swinson Dec, #35 Exhibit 32 - Swinson Dec, #36 Exhibit 33 - Swinson Dec, #37 Exhibit 34 - Swinson Dec, #38 Exhibit 35 - Swinson Dec, #39 Exhibit 36 - Swinson Dec, #40 Exhibit 37 - Swinson Dec, #41 Exhibit 38 - Swinson Dec, #42 Exhibit 39 - Swinson Dec, #43 Exhibit 40 - Swinson Dec, #44 Exhibit 41 - Swinson Dec, #45 Exhibit Abby Risner, #46 Exhibit A - Risner Dec, #47 Exhibit B - Risner Dec, #48 Exhibit C - Risner Dec, #49 Exhibit D - Risner Dec, #50 Exhibit E - Risner Dec, #51 Exhibit F - Risner Dec, #52 Exhibit G - Risner Dec, #53 Exhibit H - Risner Dec, #54 Exhibit I - Risner Dec, #55 Exhibit J - Risner Dec, #56 Exhibit K - Risner Dec, #57 Exhibit L - Risner Dec)(Risner, Abby)(mpl).
September 29, 2017 Filing 684 NOTICE of Withdrawal of ECF No. 683 by BP West Coast Products LLC (Risner, Abby) QC Mailer re wrong event used (mpl).
September 29, 2017 Filing 683 ***DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER ECF #684 *** MOTION to Dismiss Voluntary by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Harris, David) (mpl).
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 682 ORDER Approving Stipulation and Granting #681 Joint Motion to Dismiss Party. Brittany L Torres terminated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/22/2017. (mpl) (jao).
August 18, 2017 Filing 681 Joint Motion to Dismiss Party by BP West Coast Products LLC Stipulated re Defendant Brittany Torres (Risner, Abby) QC Mailer sent re wrong event used (mpl).
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 680 ORDER Granting #679 Joint Motion to Dismiss Party. It is ordered that the Court grants the Parties join motion and dismisses with prejudice the Rasna Parties claims against BP and BPs claims against the Rasna Parties. As stipulated in the Joint Motion each party shall bear its own attorney fees and costs. The clerk shall terminate the Rasna Parties from the docket in this matter. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/14/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxj)
July 12, 2017 Filing 679 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Rasna by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (dxj).
June 15, 2017 Filing 678 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motions by BP West Coast Products LLC re #651 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntary, #662 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) on it Fuel Claims (Risner, Abby) (dxj).
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 677 ORDER Confirming Schedule set Forth at 6/1/2017 Status Conference. It is ordered that a Motion hearing is set for 12/14/2017 at 1:30 p.m. The Pretrial Conference is set for 1/25/2018 at 1:30 p.m. before District Judge Janis L. Sammartino in courtroom 4D. Motions in limine and jointly file proposed instructions are due on or before 2/8/2018. Oppositions to the motions in limine are due on or before 2/22/2018. A motion in limine hearing is set for 3/8/2018. The trial shall begin on 4/2/2018. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/1/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxj)
June 1, 2017 Filing 676 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janis L. Sammartino: Plaintiff's counsel to efile voluntary withdrawal of motion to dismiss #651 and motion for summary judgment #662 . Parties to re-file / efile Motions by 9/29/2017; Opposition to Motions by 10/30/2017; Reply to Oppositions by 11/13/2017; Motions Hearing set for 12/14/2017 at 1:30 PM before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Pretrial Conference set for 1/25/2018 at 1:30 PM before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Partieis to efile proposed voir dire, witness list and exhibit list by 1/25/2018. Exhibits shall be numbered where plaintiffs number their exhibits from 1 through 1000 and defendants number their exhibits 1001 to 2000. Parties to meet, confer and agree on 1 set of proposed jury instructions. Proposed jury instructions and motions in limine by 2/8/2018; Oppositions to Motions In Limine by 2/22/2018; Review of Proposed Jury Instructions and Motions In Limine Hearing set for 3/8/2018 at 1:30 PM before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Jury Trial (12-14 days) set to begin on 4/2/2018 at 9:00 AM before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Trial shall take place 4 days out of the week from Monday to Thursday. Court to pre-screen jury for length of jury trial by 2/26/2018 (Court Reporter/ECR Frank Rangus / CRD A Ramos / Plaintiff Attorney Abby L. Risner & Deborah Jones / Defendant Attorney Thomas Bleau & Pamela Lacey)(no document attached) (acr)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 675 ORDER Vacating Hearing Date and Taking Order to Show Cause Under Submission without Oral Argument (ECF Nos. #631 , #673 .) It is ordered that the 10/21/2016 Order to Show Cause is taken under submission without oral argument, and the hearing date set for 6/1/2017, at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt (see ECF No. 673), is vacated. The Court will issue an order in due course. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 5/26/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxj)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 674 ORDER Granting Leave to Appear Telephonically re #672 Response - Other filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. It is ordered that the Court grants BP leave to appear telephonically at the 6/1/2017 hearing. BP and Ms. Lacey shall first confer and then contact the Courtroom Deputy to organize a single telephone call to the Court on the day of the hearing. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/26/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxj)
May 24, 2017 Filing 673 MINUTE ORDER: Presently before the Court is the Declaration of Pamela G. Lacey. (ECF No. 670.) An Order to Show Cause Hearing is currently set for 6/1/2017 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 5C, before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. (See ECF No. 669.) Only counsel for Defendants Behzad Kianmahd, NP Petroleum Corp., Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Rajesh Arora, Parshotam S. Kamboj, William Kirmiz, Sahar Kirmiz, and Basel Hassounch need appear at the 6/1/2017 hearing. In her declaration, Ms. Lacey represents that she cannot drive to attend a different court hearing scheduled in this case before Judge Janis L. Sammartino, which is also set for 6/1/2017. Therefore, the Court grants Ms. Lacey leave to appear telephonically at the 6/1/2017 Order to Show Cause Hearing before Judge Burkhardt. Judge Burkhardt's chambers will initiate the call to Ms. Lacey for purposes of the Order to Show Cause Hearing. Accordingly, by 5/31/2017, Ms. Lacey shall contact Judge Burkhardt's chambers and, upon reaching a law clerk or the Courts voicemail, leave a message providing the Court with the telephone number where Ms. Lacey can be reached on 6/1/2017 at 10:30 a.m.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxj)
May 24, 2017 Filing 672 RESPONSE re #671 Order,,, #670 Declaration, filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (dxj).
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 671 ORDER (1) Granting Leave to Appear Telephonically And (2) Requesting from BP its Position Regarding Recently Filed Declaration re #670 Declaration, filed by Salman D. Barbat, Behzad Kianmahd, Anit P.K. Natt, Basel Hassounch, Mohammad Bahmani, Rafael Castillo, Taftan Incorporated, H&O Inc, Nesrin Barbat, Gagan Natt, HRMP Corp, Omer Kassa, NRRM Corp. It is ordered that the Court grants Ms. Lacey leave to appear telephonically at the 6/1/2017 Status Conference. Additionally, and given the foregoing, the Court orders plaintiff and counter defendant BP West Coast Products, LLC within five days to file a brief statement outlining its position as to how this case should proceed. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/22/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxj)
May 17, 2017 Filing 670 DECLARATION of Pamela G. Lacey by Defendants Mohammad Bahmani, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch, Omer Kassa, Behzad Kianmahd, Anit P.K. Natt, Counter Claimants Rafael Castillo, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, NRRM Corp, Gagan Natt, Taftan Incorporated. (Lacey, Pamela) (dxj).
May 11, 2017 Filing 669 MINUTE ORDER: It is ordered that the time for the 6/1/2017 in person Order to Show Cause Hearing is reset to 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 5C. Edward J. Schwartz U.S. Courthouse, 221 West Broadway, San Diego, California 92101, before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Only counsel for Defendants Behzad Kianmahd, NP Petroleum Corp., Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Rajesh Arora, Parshotam S. Kamboj, William Kirmiz, Sahar Kirmiz, and Basel Hassounch need appear at the 6/1/2017 hearing.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxj)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 668 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt re ECF No. #631 , 643, 658, and #663 : Having reviewed the Declaration of Pamela G. Lacey (ECF No. #663 ), the Court hereby RESETS the in-person Order to Show Cause Hearing from 3/30/2017 to 6/1/2017 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 5C, Edward J. Schwartz U.S. Courthouse, 221 West Broadway, San Diego, California 92101, before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Only counsel for Defendants Behzad Kianmahd, NP Petroleum Corp., Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Rajesh Arora, Parshotam S. Kamboj, William Kirmiz, Sahar Kirmiz, and Basel Hassounch need appear at the 6/1/2017 hearing. Accordingly, no appearances should be made before Judge Burkhardt on 3/30/2017. (no document attached) (smm)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 667 ORDER (1) Continuing March 16, 2017 Status Conference And (2) Setting Revised Briefing Schedule re #662 . MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) on it Fuel Claims It is ordered that the Court continues the status conference currently set for 3/16/2017 to 6/1/2017 at 01:30 p.m. Further, defendants and counter-claimants shall file their opposition to plaintiffs and counter-defendants' motion for summary judgment on or before 6/15/2017; plaintiffs and counter-defendants shall file their reply, if any, on or before 6/29/2017. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/13/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxj)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 666 ORDER Granting #665 Joint Motion to Dismiss. It is ordered that the Court grants the parties' joint motion and dismisses with prejudice the Crossroad Petroleum Parties' claims against BP and BP's claims against the Crossroad Petroleum Parties. As stipulated in the Joint Motion, each party shall bear its own attorney fees and costs. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/13/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxj)
March 10, 2017 Filing 665 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party CROSSROAD PETROLEUM, INC AND AHD HADDAD by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (dxj).
March 8, 2017 Filing 664 RESPONSE in Opposition re #651 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntary filed by Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, H&O Inc, Basel Hassounch, Omer Kassa, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, NRRM Corp, Gagan Natt. (Lacey, Pamela) (dxj).
March 8, 2017 Filing 663 DECLARATION of Pamela G. Lacey by Defendants Mohammad Bahmani, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Basel Hassounch, Omer Kassa, Behzad Kianmahd, Anit P.K. Natt, Consol Plaintiffs H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, NRRM Corp, Gagan Natt, Taftan Incorporated. (Lacey, Pamela) (dxj).
February 28, 2017 Filing 662 **WITHDRAWN PER DOCKET ENTRY #678 ** MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) on it Fuel Claims by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Declaration A. Risner, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Declaration A. Swinson, #17 Declaration 1, #18 Exhibit 2, #19 Exhibit 3, #20 Exhibit 4, #21 Exhibit 5, #22 Exhibit 6, #23 Exhibit 7, #24 Exhibit 8, #25 Exhibit 9, #26 Exhibit 10, #27 Exhibit 11, #28 Exhibit 12, #29 Exhibit 13, #30 Exhibit 14, #31 Exhibit 15, #32 Exhibit 16, #33 Exhibit 17, #34 Exhibit 18, #35 Exhibit 19, #36 Exhibit 20, #37 Exhibit 21, #38 Exhibit 22, #39 Exhibit 23, #40 Exhibit 24, #41 Exhibit 25, #42 Exhibit 26, #43 Exhibit 27, #44 Exhibit 28, #45 Exhibit 29, #46 Exhibit 30, #47 Exhibit 31, #48 Exhibit 32, #49 Exhibit 33, #50 Exhibit 34, #51 Exhibit 35, #52 Exhibit 36, #53 Exhibit 37, #54 Exhibit 38, #55 Exhibit 39, #56 Exhibit 40, #57 Exhibit 41)(Risner, Abby) QC Mailer re: Missing table of contents (dxj). Modified on 6/16/2017 TO WITHDRAW DOC(dxj).
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 661 ORDER granting #654 Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment. BP shall file its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and supporting memorandum on or before February 28, 2017. The Lacey Defendants shall file their Opposition on or before March 30, 2017. BP shall file its response, if any, on or before April 17, 2017. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/19/2016. (kcm)
December 16, 2016 Filing 660 RESPONSE re #657 Declaration, of Pamela Lacey filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 659 ORDER (1) Setting Deadline for BP to Respond to #657 Declaration; (2) Vacating Status Conference; and (3) Continuing Deadline for Written Objections to #651 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntary filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Accordingly, the Court orders Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant BP West Coast Products LLC ("BP") to file a response to Ms. Lacey's declaration indicating BP's preferred course of action. BP shall file its response on or before December 16, 2016. In the interim, the Court grants Ms. Lacey's request and continues the status conference currently set for 1:30 p.m. December 14, 2016 to Thursday, March 16, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. Further, the Court sua sponte continues the deadline by which Defendants may submit an objection, if any, to BP's currently pending Motion for Voluntary Dismissal (ECF No. 651) to Thursday, March 9, 2017. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/9/2016.(kcm)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 658 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt re ECF No. #631 , 643, and #657 : Having reviewed the Declaration of Pamela G. Lacey (ECF No. #657 ), the Court hereby RESETS the Order to Show Cause Hearing from 12/15/2016 to 3/30/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1D before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Only counsel for Defendants Behzad Kianmahd, NP Petroleum Corp., Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Rajesh Arora, Parshotam S. Kamboj, William Kirmiz, Sahar Kirmiz, and Basel Hassounch need appear at the March 30, 2017 hearing. Accordingly, no appearances should be made before Judge Burkhardt on December 15, 2016. (no document attached) (smm)
December 8, 2016 Filing 657 DECLARATION of Pamela G. Lacey by Defendants Habib Alam, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Issa T Demes, Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Counter Claimants Chase Products Inc, PB Inc, 2United Oil LLC. (Lacey, Pamela) (kcm).
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 656 ORDER granting #653 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/2/2016. (kcm)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 655 ORDER Setting Written Objection Deadline for #651 MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal: Accordingly, if Defendants desire to object in writing to the Dismissal Motion, Defendants shall file any such objection on or before December 12, 2016. With or without written objection, the Court will be prepared to discuss the Dismissal Motion at the December 14, 2016 status conference and will entertain any oral objections at that time. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/2/2016.(kcm)
December 1, 2016 Filing 654 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
December 1, 2016 Filing 653 MOTION to Withdraw #650 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
December 1, 2016 Filing 652 NOTICE of Non-Compliance with Court Orders Regarding Payment of Sanctions by Lacey Defendants by BP West Coast Products LLC (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
December 1, 2016 Filing 651 **WITHDRAWN PER DOCKET ENTRY #678 ** MOTION to Dismiss Voluntary by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm). Modified on 6/16/2017 to withdraw doc (dxj).
December 1, 2016 Filing 650 ***DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ECF DOC #656 ***MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm) (kcm).
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 649 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #552 Appeal of Sanctions Recommendation. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/29/2016. (kcm)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 648 ORDER granting #640 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Good cause appearing, the Court hereby grants the parties' Joint Motion and dismisses with prejudice Susan Shen Chin's claims against BP and BP's claims against Susan Shen Chin. Susan Shen Chin (Individually and) terminated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/10/2016. (kcm)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 647 ORDER granting #639 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Good cause appearing, the Court hereby grants the parties' Joint Motion and dismisses with prejudice the RP Oil Inc. Parties' claims against BP and BP's claims against the RP Oil Inc. Parties. As stipulated in the Joint Motion, each party shall bear its own attorney fees and costs. Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, and R P Oil Inc terminated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/10/2016. (kcm)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 646 ORDER granting #638 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Good cause appearing, the Court hereby grants the parties' Joint Motion and dismisses with prejudice the Monteagudo Enterprises Parties' claims against BP and BP's claims against the Monteagudo Enterprises Parties. As stipulated in the Joint Motion, each party shall bear its own attorney fees and costs. Monteagudo Enterprise Inc and Liliana Monteagudo terminated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/10/2016. (kcm)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 645 ORDER granting #637 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Good cause appearing, the Court hereby grants the parties' Joint Motion and dismisses with prejudice Denise M. Brown d/b/a DMB Enterprises' claims against BP and BP's claims against Denise M. Brown d/b/a DMB Enterprises. As stipulated in the Joint Motion, each party shall bear its own attorney fees and costs. Denise Brown (Individually and) terminated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/10/2016. (kcm)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 644 ORDER granting #636 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Good cause appearing, the Court hereby grants the parties' Joint Motion and dismisses with prejudice the 2 United Oil Parties' claims against BP and BP's claims against the 2 United Oil Parties. As stipulated in the Joint Motion, each party shall bear its own attorney fees and costs. 2United Oil LLC, Habib Alam, Habib Alam, and Manal Alam terminated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/10/2016. (kcm)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 643 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt re ECF No. #631 , Order to Show Cause: The Court hereby RESETS the Order to Show Cause Hearing for 12/15/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1D before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Only counsel for Defendants Behzad Kianmahd, NP Petroleum Corp., Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Rajesh Arora, Parshotam S. Kamboj, William Kirmiz, Sahar Kirmiz, and Basel Hassounch need appear at the December 15, 2016 hearing. Accordingly, no appearances should be made before Judge Burkhardt on November 10. 2016. (no document attached) (smm)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 642 ORDER Continuing November 10, 2016 Status Conference. Good cause appearing, the Court continues the status conference until Wednesday, December 14, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/8/2016.(kcm)
November 8, 2016 Filing 641 STATUS REPORT Joint by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
November 7, 2016 Filing 640 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant Susan Shen Chin by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
November 7, 2016 Filing 639 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendants RP Oil Inc., Yogesh Shah, and Sonal Shah by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
November 7, 2016 Filing 638 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendants Monteagudo Enterprises, Inc. and Liliana Monteagudo by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
November 7, 2016 Filing 637 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant Denise M. Brown d/b/a DMB Enterprises by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
November 7, 2016 Filing 636 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendants 2 United Oil, LLC, Manal Alam, and Habib Alam by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 635 ORDER Directing Parties to File Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/4/2016.(fth)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 634 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: On 10/27/2016, Plaintiff filed a document titled, "BP West Coast Products LLC's Objections to Order Granting Oral Motion Seeking Plaintiff's Reproduction of Certain Electronic Discovery." (ECF No. #633 .) The document was filed on the docket as a "Response" to this Court's 10/24/2016 Order. Within the document, Plaintiff expands the record with respect to its objections to reproducing certain electronic discovery. Plaintiff also states that "BPWCP submits this filing to preserve its objections to the reproduction of discovery materials as required by the Court's October 24th Order." Plaintiff further states, "Notwithstanding these objections, BPWCP has timely complied with the Court's order by producing 8 CDs to Ms. Lacey." Plaintiff does not request a court ruling, and no hearing date before the assigned district judge appears in the document's caption. Thus, the Court concludes that Plaintiff is not asking for relief pursuant to CivLR 7.1 and/or Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a). Therefore, there is nothing presently before the court on which to rule. (no document attached) (smm)
October 27, 2016 Filing 633 RESPONSE re #632 Order re BPWCP's reproduction of certain electronic discovery filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 632 ORDER granting Oral Motion Seeking Plaintiff's Reproduction of Certain Electronic Discovery re 630 Minute Entry. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 10/24/2016.(kcm)
October 24, 2016 Filing 630 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 10/24/2016 concerning the contemplated reproduction of electronic discovery by plaintiff's counsel to Pamela G. Lacey, Esq. Oral motion made and granted. Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Abby L. Risner). (Defendant Attorney Pamela G. Lacey). (no document attached) (smm)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 631 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/10/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1D before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Order to Show Cause Brief due by 11/4/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 10/21/2016.(kcm)
October 21, 2016 Filing 629 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/21/2016. (Plaintiff Attorney Deborah Yoon Jones; Abby L. Risner). (Defendant Attorney Pamela G. Lacey). (no document attached) (smm)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 626 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: A telephonic, counsel-only, Discovery Hearing concerning the contemplated reproduction of electronic discovery by plaintiff's counsel to Pamela G. Lacey, Esq. is SET for Monday, 10/24/2016, at 09:15 AM before Judge Burkhardt. For purposes of the hearing, only Pamela G. Lacey, Esq. AND Deborah Yoon Jones, Esq. and/or Abby Risner, Esq. are ordered to appear. Counsel are directed place a joint call to Judge Burkhardt's chambers with all participating counsel already on the line at the time set for the Hearing. (no document attached) (smm)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 625 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Having received confirmation of counsel's availability, a telephonic, counsel-only, Status Conference with Pamela G. Lacey, Esq. (attorney for all defendants and counter-plaintiffs except for Crossroad Petroleum, Inc., Ahd Haddad, Meetra Inc., Medhi Behmard, and Farideh Behmard) AND with Deborah Yoon Jones, Esq. and/or Abby Risner, Esq. (attorneys for plaintiff and counter-defendant BP West Coast Products LLC) is HEREBY SET for today, 10/21/2016, at 1:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. For purposes of the conference, counsel shall place a joint call to Judge Burkhardt's chambers with all participating counsel already on the line. (no document attached) (smm)
October 19, 2016 Filing 628 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Mandatory Settlement Conference held on 10/19/2016 with BP West Coast Products LLC and certain defendants. The following defendants failed to appear as ordered (see ECF Nos. #582 , #611 ): Rajesh Arora, Parshotam S. Kamboj, William Kirmiz, Sahar Kirmiz, and Basel Hassounch. Settlements were not reached on 10/19/2016. (Plaintiff Attorney Deborah Yoon Jones; Abby L. Risner). (Defendant Attorney Michael G Kerbs; Mark S Sabbah; Pamela G. Lacey). (no document attached) (smm)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 624 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt re ECF No. #623 , Notice of Settlement filed by BP West Coast Products LLC: In light of the Notice of Settlement, the Court EXCUSES the following defendants from the Mandatory Settlement Conference: Defendants Monteagudo Enterprise Inc., Liliana Monteagudo, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Francois Alvandi and Natalie Alvandi. (no document attached) (smm)
October 18, 2016 Filing 627 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Mandatory Settlement Conference held on 10/18/2016 with BP West Coast Products LLC and certain defendants. The following defendants failed to appear as ordered (see ECF Nos. #582 , #611 ): Behzad Kianmahd, NP Petroleum Corp., Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, and Soma Prasad. Settlements were reached on 10/18/2016 between BP West Coast Products LLC and the following defendants: Issa T. Demes, Cal Coast Inc., Bahman Baktar, Denise M. Brown, 2 United Oil LLC, Manal Alam, Habib W. Alam, Rasna, LLC, Himanshu D. Sarvaiya, RP Oil, Inc., Yogesh Shah, and Sonal Shah. (Plaintiff Attorney Deborah Yoon Jones; Abby L. Risner). (Defendant Attorney Troy Martin Mueller; Pamela G. Lacey). (no document attached) (smm)
October 17, 2016 Filing 623 NOTICE of Settlement with Defendants Monteagudo Enterprise Inc., Liliana Monteagudo, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Francois Alvandi and Natalie Alvandi by BP West Coast Products LLC (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 622 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Janis L. Sammartino Rejecting re #610 Supplemental Document, from Sharina Alloush, Khaja Ansari, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Denise Brown, Cal Coast Inc, Susan Shen Chin, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Gagan Natt, PB Inc, R P Oil Inc, Rasna LLC, Shomers Group LLC, Taftan Incorporated, Brittany L Torres, Vasaya Oil Co., Inc., 2United Oil LLC. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Pursuant to Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt's Civil Chambers Rules and orders concerning the Mandatory Settlement Conference, settlement statements should not be filed on the docket. Counsel is directed to consult Judge Burkhardt's Chambers Rules and orders concerning the MSC for instructions on both lodging settlement statements and providing courtesy copies to chambers (see ECF Nos. 582 (para. 4) and 590). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 10/14/2016.(kcm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2016: #1 Rejected Document) (kcm).
October 14, 2016 Filing 621 Minute ORDER: With respect to any settlements reached prior to next week's Conferences, the Court hereby directs that only those defendants who file notices of settlement via the Court's CM/ECF filing system, and who are thereafter excused from appearing at the Mandatory Settlement Conferences via a written Court order, are excused from attending the Conferences. The Court shall diligently monitor the docket in this case and shall promptly address any notices of settlement filed on or before October 19, 2016.(kcm)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 620 ORDER granting #608 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Good cause appearing, the Court hereby grants the parties' Joint Motion and dismisses with prejudice the West Coast Petroleum Services, Inc. Parties' claims against BP and BP's claims against the West Coast Petroleum Services, Inc. Parties. As stipulated in the Joint Motion, each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Younes Dobli Bennani and West Coast Petroleum Services LLC terminated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/12/2016. (kcm)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 619 ORDER granting #607 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Good cause appearing, the Court hereby grants the parties' Joint Motion and dismisses with prejudice the Toros AM-PM Mini Market Parties' claims against BP and BP's claims against the Toros AM-PM Mini Market Parties. As stipulated in the Joint Motion, each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Marie Zorenkelian, and Toros Zorenkelian terminated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/12/2016. (kcm)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 618 ORDER granting #606 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Good cause appearing, the Court hereby grants the parties' Joint Motion and dismisses with prejudice the Southwest Petroleum LLC Parties' claims against BP and BP's claims against the Southwest Petroleum LLC Parties. As stipulated in the Joint Motion, each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Aly Shakankiry, Hamza Shilleh, and South West Petroleum LLC, terminated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/12/2016. (kcm)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 617 ORDER granting #605 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Good cause appearing, the Court hereby grants the parties' Joint Motion and dismisses with prejudice the S.M.O. Oil, Inc. Parties' claims against BP and BP's claims against the S.M.O. Oil, Inc. Parties. As stipulated in the Joint Motion, each party shall bear its own attorneys fees and costs. S. M. O. Oil Inc terminated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/12/2016. (kcm)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 616 ORDER granting #604 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Good cause appearing, the Court hereby grants the parties' Joint Motion and dismisses with prejudice the Ruchisys, Inc. Parties' claims against BP and BP's claims against the Ruchisys, Inc. Parties. As stipulated in the Joint Motion, each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Ruchisys Inc, Ruchira Sharma and Kalur S Kishan terminated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/12/2016. (kcm)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 615 ORDER granting #603 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Good cause appearing, the Court hereby grants the parties' Joint Motion and dismisses with prejudice the MDA Fuel Inc. Parties' claims against BP and BP's claims against the MDA Fuel Inc. Parties. As stipulated in the Joint Motion, each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Sayed Majid Tavabi and MDA Fuel Inc terminated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/12/2016. (kcm)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 614 ORDER granting #602 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Good cause appearing, the Court hereby grants the parties' Joint Motion and dismisses with prejudice the G&K Gas Station Parties' claims against BP and BP's claims against the G&K Gas Station Parties. Rafwant Jafal and Kulwant Singh Jafal (Individually and) terminated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/12/2016. (kcm)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 613 ORDER granting #601 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Good cause appearing, the Court hereby grants the parties' Joint Motion and dismisses with prejudice the Ghallab Brothers Inc. Parties' claims against BP and BP's claims against the Ghallab Brothers Inc. Parties. As stipulated in the Joint Motion, each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Ghallab Brothers Inc and Ibrahim Ghallab terminated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/12/2016. (kcm)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 612 ORDER granting #600 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Good cause appearing, the Court hereby grants the parties' Joint Motion and dismisses with prejudice the Dream Parties' claims against BP and BP's claims against the Dream Parties. As stipulated in the Joint Motion, each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Senan F Naoum and Dream Petroleum, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/12/2016. (kcm)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 611 ORDER Excusing Certain Defendants from Mandatory Settlement Conference in Light of Pending Stipulations to Dismiss re 599 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear, #597 Order on Motion, #591 Joint MOTION Proposing Mandatory Settlement Conference Schedule re #582 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 10/12/2016.(kcm)
October 11, 2016 Filing 610 ***DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER #622 ORDER***SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Khaja Ansari(Individually and ), Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Cal Coast Inc, Susan Shen Chin(Individually and ), Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj(Individually and ), Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), PB Inc, R P Oil Inc, Rasna LLC, Shomers Group LLC, Taftan Incorporated, Brittany L Torres, Vasaya Oil Co., Inc., 2United Oil LLC . (Lacey, Pamela) (kcm). Discrepancy prepared(acc). (Main Document 610 replaced on 10/17/2016) (kcm).
October 7, 2016 Filing 609 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/7/2016 re: MSC preparations. (Plaintiff Attorney Deborah Yoon Jones; Abby L. Risner). (Defendant Attorney Michael G Kerbs; Troy Martin Mueller; Pamela G Lacey). (no document attached) (smm)
October 7, 2016 Filing 608 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendants West Coast Petroleum Services, Inc. and Younes Dobli Bennani by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
October 7, 2016 Filing 607 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendants Toros Zorenkelian d/b/a Toros AM-PM Mini Market, Toros Zorenkelian and Marie Zorenkelian by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
October 7, 2016 Filing 606 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendants Southwest Petroleum LLC, Hamza Shilleh and Aly Shakankiry by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
October 7, 2016 Filing 605 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendants S.M.O. Oil, Inc., William Kirmiz and Sahar Kirmiz by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
October 7, 2016 Filing 604 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendants Ruchisys, Inc., Kalur Kishan and Ruchira Sharma by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
October 7, 2016 Filing 603 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendants MDA Fuel Inc. and Sayed Majid Tavabi by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
October 7, 2016 Filing 602 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendants Kulwant Singh Jafal d/b/a G&K Gas Station, Rafwant Jafal and Kulwant Singh Jafal by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
October 7, 2016 Filing 601 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendants Ghallab Brothers Inc, Ammar Maaytah and Ibrahim Ghallab by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
October 7, 2016 Filing 600 MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendants Dream Petroleum Inc. and Senan F. Naoum by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 599 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt granting in part and denying in part ECF No. #595 : The ex parte Motion seeking to excuse certain defendants from attending the upcoming MSC is GRANTED IN PART to the extent that the Court excuses the personal appearances of Defendants Chase Products, Inc., David A. Parker, Hadaf Inc., Tarun Maitra, and Fazilath Ansari. With respect to Ms. Ansari, Defendant Khaja Ansari shall personally attend with full settlement authority. (See ECF No. #597 ). The ex parte Motion (ECF No. #595 ) is otherwise DENIED. (no document attached) (smm)
October 6, 2016 Filing 598 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/6/2016 at 03:00 PM with Pamela G. Lacey, Esq. (see ECF No. 596). (Defendant Attorney Pamela G. Lacey). (no document attached) (smm)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 597 ORDER: (1) denying #591 Joint Motion Proposing Mandatory Settlement Conference Schedule; (2) Setting Arrival Schedule for Mandatory Settlement Conference; and(3) Setting 10/7/2016 Telephonic Status Conference. It is hereby ordered that a telephonic, counsel-only Status Conference is SET for Friday, October 7, 2016, at 4:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 10/6/2016. (kcm)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 596 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt re ECF No. #595 , Request for Relief from Attendance at MSC: A telephonic, counsel-only, Status Conference with Pamela G. Lacey, Esq. (attorney for all defendants and counter-plaintiffs except for Crossroad Petroleum, Inc., Ahd Haddad, Meetra Inc., Medhi Behmard, and Farideh Behmard) is HEREBY SET for Thursday, 10/6/2016, at 10:30 AM. For purposes of the Conference, Ms. Lacey shall place a call to Judge Burkhardt's chambers. (no document attached) (smm)
October 4, 2016 Filing 595 Ex Parte Motion for Relief from Attendance at Mandatory Settlement Conference by A J Services Inc, Abusham Petro LLC, Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Francois Alvandi, Armen Ambartsumyan, Ambartsumyan Corporation, Rajesh Arora, Raad Attisha, Saad Y. Attisha, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Farideh Behmard, Medhi Behmard, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Buyrite Gasoline Inc, Carroll Centre, Inc., Jennifer Cohen, Matt Cohen, Cohens Gasoline Inc, Crossroad Petroleum, Inc., Issa T Demes, Dhaliwalsons LLC, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Gas Depot Inc, Ibrahim Ghallab, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, Ahd Haddad, Sylvia Haddadin, Basel Hassounch, Hartyoon Awanis Hilalian, Silva Hilalian, Rafwant Jafal, Joelles Oil Co LP, K & T Park79, Inc., Moshail S. Kamel, Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Khurana Investments Inc, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDG Information Analysis Management Group LLC, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, George Nimeh, Old Town Fuel Company, David A Parker, Karamali Pashmforoosh, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Arbind Rai, Maria Rai, Parmjit Randhawa, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Parviz Shamtoub, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Brittany L Torres, Trisha Enterprise Inc, United Family LLC, John Vazirian, 2United Oil LLC, A Fine Enterprise & Company Inc., A Green Fuel Corporation, Venture Petroleum Company, Inc., Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Young-Westwood Enterprises, Inc., Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Zuma Arc Inc (Lacey, Pamela)Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party A J Services Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party A J Services Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Abusham Petro LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Abusham Petro LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Armen Ambartsumyan(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Armen Ambartsumyan(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Ambartsumyan Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Ambartsumyan Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Raad Attisha(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Raad Attisha(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Saad Y. Attisha(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Saad Y. Attisha(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Farideh Behmard(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Farideh Behmard(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Medhi Behmard(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Medhi Behmard(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Buyrite Gasoline Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Buyrite Gasoline Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Carroll Centre, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Carroll Centre, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Jennifer Cohen(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Jennifer Cohen(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Matt Cohen(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Matt Cohen(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Cohens Gasoline Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Cohens Gasoline Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Crossroad Petroleum, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Crossroad Petroleum, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Dhaliwalsons LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Dhaliwalsons LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Gas Depot Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Gas Depot Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Ahd Haddad(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Ahd Haddad(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Hartyoon Awanis Hilalian(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Hartyoon Awanis Hilalian(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Silva Hilalian(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Silva Hilalian(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Joelles Oil Co LP(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Joelles Oil Co LP(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Moshail S. Kamel(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Moshail S. Kamel(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Khurana Investments Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Khurana Investments Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party MDG Information Analysis Management Group LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party MDG Information Analysis Management Group LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party George Nimeh(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party George Nimeh(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Old Town Fuel Company(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Old Town Fuel Company(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Karamali Pashmforoosh(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Karamali Pashmforoosh(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Arbind Rai(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Arbind Rai(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Maria Rai(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Maria Rai(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Parmjit Randhawa(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Parmjit Randhawa(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Parviz Shamtoub(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Parviz Shamtoub(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Trisha Enterprise Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Trisha Enterprise Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party John Vazirian(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party John Vazirian(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party A Fine Enterprise & Company Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party A Fine Enterprise & Company Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party A Green Fuel Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party A Green Fuel Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Venture Petroleum Company, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Venture Petroleum Company, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Young-Westwood Enterprises, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Young-Westwood Enterprises, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Zuma Arc Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Pamela G. Lacey added to party Zuma Arc Inc(pty:dft) Modified to Motion on 10/5/2016 (kcm).
September 26, 2016 Filing 594 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Telephonic Status Hearing re Schedule for October 18-19, 2016 MSC held on 9/26/2016. The Court requested follow-up telephone messages from counsel for Meetra and BP West regarding availability to participate in an MSC on 10/17/2016, starting at 3:00PM. The Court requested a lodgment from BP West concerning the pending joint motion proposing mandatory settlement conference schedule. (Plaintiff Attorney Deborah Yoon Jones; Abby L. Risner). (Defendant Attorney Michael G Kerbs; Troy Martin Mueller). (no document attached) (smm)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 593 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt re ECF No. 592 Minute Order: On 9/23/2016, the Court received an ex parte voicemail message from attorney Pamela G. Lacey representing that she would be in trial on 9/26/2016. The Court expects Ms. Lacey to make every effort to participate in the telephonic Hearing set for today, 9/26/2016. However, if Ms. Lacey is unable to participate because of her trial conflict, then she is excused by Judge Burkhardt from participating. (no document attached) (smm)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 592 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt re ECF No. #591 Joint Motion Proposing Mandatory Settlement Conference Schedule: The Court hereby SETS a telephonic, counsel-only Status Hearing for Monday, 9/26/2016, at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. For purposes of the Hearing, counsel shall place a joint call to Judge Burkhardt's chambers with all participating counsel already on the line. (no document attached) (smm)
September 22, 2016 Filing 591 Joint MOTION Proposing Mandatory Settlement Conference Schedule re #582 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 590 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: The parties' Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Supplemental Settlement Statements (ECF No. #588 ) is hereby GRANTED. The deadline for lodging the supplemental settlement statements required for the 10/18-19/2016 MSC (see ECF No. #582 ) is extended as follows. The parties SHALL lodge supplemental settlement statements NO LATER THAN 1:00 PM on 10/11/2016. The Court requests a courtesy hard copy of each supplemental statement and any exhibits attached thereto. Courtesy copies shall be delivered directly to Judge Burkhardt's Chambers within 24 hours of the lodgment deadline, c/o the Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, Southern District of California, 333 West Broadway, Suite 420, San Diego, CA 92101. This Order does not otherwise alter the Court's 9/12/2016 Order (ECF No. #582 ). (no document attached) (smm)
September 19, 2016 Filing 588 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Settlement Statements by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
September 16, 2016 Filing 589 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/16/2016 re MSC preparation with counsel for defendant and counter-plaintiff Meetra Inc., and for Medhi Behmard and Farideh Behmard, as well as counsel for defendant and counter-plaintiff Crossroad Petroleum, Inc. and Defendant Ahd Haddad. (See ECF No. #583 ). (Defendant Attorney Thomas P Bleau; Michael G Kerbs). (no document attached) (smm)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 587 ORDER granting #584 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Good cause appearing, the Court hereby grants the parties' Joint Motion and dismisses with prejudice the Perfect Fuel Parties' claims against BP and BP's claims against the Perfect Fuel Parties. As indicated in the Joint Motion, each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/15/2016. (kcm)
September 14, 2016 Filing 586 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Telephonic Status Conference re MSC preparation held on 9/14/2016 with counsel for plaintiff and counter-defendant BP West Coast Products LLC. (Plaintiff Attorney Deborah Yoon Jones; Abby L. Risner). (no document attached) (smm)
September 13, 2016 Filing 585 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Telephonic Status Conference re MSC preparation held on 9/13/2016 with counsel for all defendants and counter-plaintiffs except for Crossroad Petroleum, Inc., Ahd Haddad, Meetra Inc., Medhi Behmard, and Farideh Behmard. (Defendant Attorney Pamela G Lacey). (no document attached) (smm)
September 13, 2016 Filing 584 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Perfect Fuel Inc., Razmik Golnarzarian and Maret Golnazarian by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
September 12, 2016 Filing 583 Minute Order: In preparation for the parties' two day in-person Mandatory Settlement Conference set for October 18-19, 2016 (ECF No. 582), the Court hereby sets the following telephonic Status Conferences in order for the Court to caucus with counsel for each party or group of parties: (Telephonic, Counsel-Only Status Conference set for 9/13/2016 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt.; Telephonic, Counsel-Only Status Conference set for 9/14/2016 8:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt.; Telephonic, Counsel-Only Status Conference set for 9/16/2016 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt.)(kcm) Modified to correct on 9/12/2016 (kcm).
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 582 ORDER: (1) granting #581 Joint Motion Proposing Amended Mandatory Settlement Conference Schedule; and (2) Resetting Mandatory Settlement Conference. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 10/18/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 10/19/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 9/12/2016. (kcm)
September 9, 2016 Filing 581 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #577 Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. #578 .) The Court hereby grants the parties' Joint Motion and dismisses with prejudice the Relevant Defendants and Counter-Claimants' claims against BP and BP's claims against the Relevant Defendants and Counter-Claimants. As indicated in the Joint Motion, each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. The clerk shall terminate the Relevant Defendants and Counter-Claimants from the docket in this matter. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/2/2016. (nbp)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 579 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt re ECF No. #564 Order Scheduling Settlement Disposition Conference: In light of the pending joint motion to dismiss concerning the remaining Settling Defendants (identified as 9-23 in ECF No. #564 ), which was filed by the parties on 9/1/2016 (see ECF No. #578 ), the Court confirms that the 9/6/2016 Settlement Disposition Conference is VACATED. No appearances should be made before Judge Burkhardt on 9/6/2016. (no document attached) (smm)
September 1, 2016 Filing 578 MOTION to Dismiss Party Battir Oil Inc., MK Oil Inc.-Kaskas Enterprises Inc., Southland Petroleum Inc., United Family, LLC, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart, Inc., Mohammad Kaskas, Francois Alvandi, Salah Mazloum, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Kotsai Wang, Tahssen Kaskas, Muna Quasqas, Kurian Abraham, and Sheela Thomas by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (nbp)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 577 ORDER Setting Mandatory Settlement Conference re #576 Order Following August 30, 2016 Status Conference. It is hereby ordered that a two day Mandatory Settlement Conference ("MSC") of your case will be held on October 24, 2016 and October 25, 2016, commencing at 9:00 AM each day, in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt, Edward J. Schwartz U.S. Courthouse, 221 West Broadway, Suite 5140, San Diego, California 92101. On or before September 22, 2016, the parties shall file a joint motion proposing a schedule for their personal participation in the two day MSC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 9/1/2016.(kcm)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 576 Order Following August 30, 2016 Status Conference. Following the August 30, 2016 status conference, the Court hereby orders: (1) All outstanding sanctions against defendants from the Court's May 2, 2016 Order Approving Sanctions (ECF No. 498) shall be paid within thirty days of August 31, 2016. (2) All pretrial deadlines set forth in the Court's August 11, 2016 Order Granting Joint Motion and Amending Pretrial Deadlines (ECF No. 553) are suspended until further notice. (3) The Court sets a status conference for 2:00 p.m. on November 10, 2016. (4) The parties shall by all means practicable attend, prior to theaforementioned status conference, a two day settlement conference withMagistrate Judge Jill Burkhardt. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/31/2016.(kcm)
August 30, 2016 Filing 575 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janis L. Sammartino: Deadlines set forth in the 8/11/2016 Order #553 are suspended until further notice/order by the court. Status Hearing set for 11/10/2016 02:00 PM before Judge Janis L. Sammartino (Court Reporter/ECR Frank Rangus / CRD A Ramos / Plaintiff Attorney Abby L. Risner & Deborah Yoon Jones / Defendant Attorney Troy Martin Mueller, Pamela G. Lacey and Michael G. Kerbs-telephonic)(no document attached) (acr)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 574 ORDER granting #562 Motion to Dismiss Party. Westminster Mini Market Inc, Robert Alvandi and Anita Alvandi terminated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/19/2016. (kcm)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 573 ORDER granting #561 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Claude Shamaah and Shamaah Inc, terminated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/19/2016. (kcm)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 572 ORDER granting #559 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Hamlet Enterprises Inc and Tigran Pogosyan terminated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/19/2016. (kcm)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 571 ORDER granting #560 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Mostafa Rahgozar and Rahgozar, Inc terminated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/19/2016. (kcm)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 570 ORDER granting #558 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Crestview Consolidated Inc, and Sylvia Haddadin terminated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/19/2016. (kcm)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 569 ORDER granting #557 Joint Motion to Dismiss. California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, and Rebecca Zomorodian terminated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/19/2016. (kcm)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 568 ORDER granting #556 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc and Robert Alvandi terminated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/19/2016. (kcm)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 567 ORDER granting #555 Joint Motion to Dismiss. 3 Star Management, Inc., Hy E Sao, and Meng E Sao terminated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/19/2016. (kcm)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 566 ORDER granting #554 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Awans Enterprises Inc and Ara Wansikehian terminated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/19/2016. (kcm)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 565 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #552 MOTION for Reconsideration re #550 Order : Any party who wishes to file a response to this appeal may do so on or before September 8, 2016. The Moving Defendants/Counter-Plaintiffs may file a reply, if any, on or before September 22, 2016. The Court anticipates that this matter will be suitable for resolution without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1), and therefore declines to set a hearing date at this time. However, if the Court later deems one necessary, it will set a hearing date sua sponte. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/19/2016.(kcm)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 564 Order Scheduling Continued Settlement Disposition Conference. Joint Motion for Dismissal due: 9/1/2016. If a Joint Motion for Dismissal and Proposed Order for Dismissal are not submitted by 9/1/2016, then a Settlement Disposition Conference shall be held. Settlement Disposition Conference set for 9/6/2016 02:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 8/17/2016.(kcm)
August 16, 2016 Filing 563 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: A telephonic Settlement Disposition Conference held on 8/16/2016. Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Abby L. Risner; Adriene Plescia Lynch). (Defendant Attorney Pamela G Lacey). (no document attached) (smm)
August 12, 2016 Filing 562 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Westminster Mini Market Inc., Robert Alvandi and Anita Alvandi by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
August 12, 2016 Filing 561 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Shamaah Inc. and Claude Shamaah by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
August 12, 2016 Filing 560 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Rahgozar Inc. and Mostafa Rahgozar by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
August 12, 2016 Filing 559 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Hamlet Enterprizes Inc. and Tigran Pogosyan by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
August 12, 2016 Filing 558 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Crestview Consolidated Inc. and Sylvia Haddadin by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
August 12, 2016 Filing 557 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party California Fuel Dispensing Inc., Jerry Zomorodian and Rebecca Zomorodian by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
August 12, 2016 Filing 556 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Big Daddy's Oil 15 Inc. and Robert Alvandi by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
August 12, 2016 Filing 555 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party 3 Star Management Inc., Hy Sao and Meng Sao by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
August 12, 2016 Filing 554 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Awans Enterprises Inc. and Ara Wansikehian by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 553 ORDER granting #549 Joint Motion and Amending Pretrial Deadlines. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2017 01:30 PM before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Status Hearing set for 8/30/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 11/11/2016. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/9/2017. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/11/2016. (kcm)
August 11, 2016 Filing 552 MOTION for Reconsideration re #550 Order by Rajesh Arora, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, Sylvia Haddadin, Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), Ruchisys Inc, Nader Sahih, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Southland Petroleum Inc, Kotsai Wang, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian. (Schiller, David) (kcm).
August 11, 2016 Filing 551 NOTICE of Change of Address by David A. Schiller (Schiller, David) (QC mailer sent re: CM/ECF account & signature discrepancy; Attorney Pamela Lacey info updated) (kcm).
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 550 ORDER re: Monetary Sanctions Issued and Terminating Sanctions Recommended re #531 Order to Show Cause, #532 Order to Show Cause, and #548 Transcript. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 8/8/2016.(kcm)
August 3, 2016 Filing 549 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Pretrial Deadlines by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
August 3, 2016 Filing 548 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Motion Hearing) for date of 7/28/2016, before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Dana Peabody. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 8/24/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/6/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/1/2016. (akr)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 547 ORDER approving #543 Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial Format Status Hearing. A second Trial Format Status Hearing is currently scheduled for 2:30 p.m. on August 11, 2016. The Court hereby approves the parties' Joint Stipulation and continues this hearing to 1:30 p.m. on August 30, 2016 before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/29/2016. (kcm)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 546 ORDER Revoking Pro Hac Vice Status re #544 Declaration, filed by 3 Star Management, Inc., 2United Oil LLC, Liliana Monteagudo, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Shomers Group LLC, Rafwant Jafal, Shamaah Inc, United Family LLC, Tarun Maitra, Sonal Shah, Ruchisys Inc, Rajesh Arora, Yogesh Shah, Vasaya Oil Co., Inc., Ruchira Sharma, Muna Quasqas, MDA Fuel Inc, HRMP Corp, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, K & T Park79, Inc., Kalur S Kishan, Sylvia Haddadin, Payam Sahih, Nader Sahih, Tahssen Kaskas, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Bahman Baktar, Chase Products Inc, Brittany L Torres, Awans Enterprises Inc, Salman D. Barbat, Rasna LLC, South West Petroleum LLC, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Khaja Ansari, Basel Hassounch, Claude Shamaah, S M O Oil Inc, Rebecca Zomorodian, Paul Baskaron, William Kermiz, Soma Prasad, Tigran Pogosyan, Ammar Maaytah, Mohammad Kaskas, Salah Mazloum, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Vache Simonyan, Mostafa Rahgozar, Issa T Demes, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Mohammad Bahmani, Toros Zorenkelian, I and M Oil Inc, Kevin Tapia, Bahman Kianmahd, Sharina Alloush, Hy E Sao, Heidi Bahmani, Younes Dobli Bennani, Parshotam Kamboj, Southland Petroleum Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, Anup Patel, Manal Alam, Habib Alam, Ibrahim Ghallab, Rafael Castillo, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Nesrin Barbat, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Gagan Natt, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Ara Wansikehian, R P Oil Inc, Randa Maaytah, Behzad Kianmahd, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Rahgozar Inc, Marie Zorenkelian, Taftan Incorporated, Battir Oil Inc, Sahar Kermiz, Sheela Thomas, Francois Alvandi, Susan Shen Chin, Tracy Tapia, NRRM Corp, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Kotsai Wang, Anit P.K. Natt, Cal Coast Inc, PB Inc, Senan F Naoum, Jerry Zomorodian, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Sayed Majid Tavabi, RP Oil Inc, Meng E Sao, Aly Shakankiry, Omer Kassa, Hadaf Inc, Denise Brown, Maret Golnazarian, H&O Inc, Razmik Golnazarian, Perfect Fuel Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Hamza Shilleh, Westminster Mini Market Inc, David A Parker, AKM Oil Co Inc. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/29/2016.(kcm)
July 28, 2016 Filing 545 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Order to Show Cause Hearing held on 7/28/2016. Sanctions issued and terminating sanctions recommended for the reasons stated on the record. (CD# 7/28/2016 JLB16: 10:39-11:17). (Defendant Attorney Pamela G. Lacey). (no document attached) (smm)
July 28, 2016 Filing 544 DECLARATION by Counter Claimants AKM Oil Co Inc, AKM Oil Co Inc, AKM Oil Co Inc, AKM Oil Co Inc, AKM Oil Co Inc, Habib Alam, Habib Alam, Habib Alam, Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Manal Alam, Manal Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush, Sharina Alloush, Sharina Alloush, Sharina Alloush, Sharina Alloush, Francois Alvandi, Francois Alvandi, Francois Alvandi, Francois Alvandi, Khaja Ansari, Khaja Ansari, Khaja Ansari, Khaja Ansari, Khaja Ansari, Rajesh Arora, Rajesh Arora, Rajesh Arora, Awans Enterprises Inc, Awans Enterprises Inc, Awans Enterprises Inc, Awans Enterprises Inc, Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Heidi Bahmani, Heidi Bahmani, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Bahman Baktar, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Nesrin Barbat, Nesrin Barbat, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Paul Baskaron, Paul Baskaron, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Battir Oil Inc, Battir Oil Inc, Battir Oil Inc, Battir Oil Inc, Younes Dobli Bennani, Younes Dobli Bennani, Younes Dobli Bennani, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown, Denise Brown, Denise Brown, Denise Brown, Denise Brown, Cal Coast Inc, Cal Coast Inc, Cal Coast Inc, Cal Coast Inc, Cal Coast Inc, Rafael Castillo, Rafael Castillo, Rafael Castillo, Rafael Castillo, Rafael Castillo, Chase Products Inc, Chase Products Inc, Chase Products Inc, Chase Products Inc, Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin, Susan Shen Chin, Susan Shen Chin, Susan Shen Chin, Susan Shen Chin, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Issa T Demes, Issa T Demes, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Dream Petroleum, Inc., Dream Petroleum, Inc., Dream Petroleum, Inc., Dream Petroleum, Inc., Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Ibrahim Ghallab, Ibrahim Ghallab, Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Maret Golnazarian, Maret Golnazarian, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, H&O Inc, H&O Inc, H&O Inc, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, HRMP Corp, HRMP Corp, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Hadaf Inc, Hadaf Inc, Hadaf Inc, Hadaf Inc, Sylvia Haddadin, Sylvia Haddadin, Sylvia Haddadin, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Basel Hassounch, Basel Hassounch, Basel Hassounch, I and M Oil Inc, I and M Oil Inc, I and M Oil Inc, I and M Oil Inc, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Rafwant Jafal, Rafwant Jafal, Rafwant Jafal, Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., K & T Park79, Inc., K & T Park79, Inc., K & T Park79, Inc., K & T Park79, Inc., K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj, Parshotam Kamboj, Parshotam Kamboj, Parshotam Kamboj, Parshotam Kamboj, Mohammad Kaskas, Mohammad Kaskas, Mohammad Kaskas, Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Omer Kassa, Omer Kassa, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, Sahar Kermiz, Sahar Kermiz, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, William Kermiz, William Kermiz, William Kermiz, Bahman Kianmahd, Bahman Kianmahd, Bahman Kianmahd, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, Kalur S Kishan, Kalur S Kishan, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, MDA Fuel Inc, MDA Fuel Inc, MDA Fuel Inc, MDA Fuel Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Ammar Maaytah, Ammar Maaytah, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Tarun Maitra, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Salah Mazloum, Salah Mazloum, Salah Mazloum, Liliana Monteagudo, Liliana Monteagudo, Liliana Monteagudo, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NP Petroleum Corp, NP Petroleum Corp, NP Petroleum Corp, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, NRRM Corp, NRRM Corp, NRRM Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Senan F Naoum, Senan F Naoum, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Anit P.K. Natt, Anit P.K. Natt, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt, Gagan Natt, Gagan Natt, Gagan Natt, Gagan Natt, Gagan Natt, PB Inc, PB Inc, PB Inc, PB Inc, PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, David A Parker, David A Parker, David A Parker, David A Parker, Anup Patel, Anup Patel, Anup Patel, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Perfect Fuel Inc, Perfect Fuel Inc, Perfect Fuel Inc, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Tigran Pogosyan, Tigran Pogosyan, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Soma Prasad, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, Muna Quasqas, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, R P Oil Inc, R P Oil Inc, R P Oil Inc, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Mostafa Rahgozar, Mostafa Rahgozar, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Rahgozar Inc, Rahgozar Inc, Rahgozar Inc, Rahgozar Inc, Rasna LLC, Rasna LLC, Rasna LLC, Rasna LLC, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, Ruchisys Inc, Ruchisys Inc, Ruchisys Inc, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, S M O Oil Inc, S M O Oil Inc, S M O Oil Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Nader Sahih, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Payam Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Hy E Sao, Hy E Sao, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Meng E Sao, Meng E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Sonal Shah, Sonal Shah, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Yogesh Shah, Yogesh Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Aly Shakankiry, Aly Shakankiry, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Claude Shamaah, Claude Shamaah, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Shamaah Inc, Shamaah Inc, Shamaah Inc, Shamaah Inc, Ruchira Sharma, Ruchira Sharma, Ruchira Sharma, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Hamza Shilleh, Hamza Shilleh, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Shomers Group LLC, Shomers Group LLC, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, Vache Simonyan, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, South West Petroleum LLC, South West Petroleum LLC, South West Petroleum LLC, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Southland Petroleum Inc, Southland Petroleum Inc, Southland Petroleum Inc, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Taftan Incorporated, Taftan Incorporated, Taftan Incorporated, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Kevin Tapia, Kevin Tapia, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Sheela Thomas, Sheela Thomas, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, Brittany L Torres, Brittany L Torres, Brittany L Torres, United Family LLC, United Family LLC, United Family LLC, United Family LLC, United Family LLC, Vasaya Oil Co., Inc., Vasaya Oil Co., Inc., Vasaya Oil Co., Inc., Vasaya Oil Co., Inc., 2United Oil LLC, 2United Oil LLC, 2United Oil LLC, 2United Oil LLC, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., 3 Star Management, Inc., 3 Star Management, Inc., 3 Star Management, Inc., 3 Star Management, Inc., 3 Star Management, Inc., Kotsai Wang, Kotsai Wang, Kotsai Wang, Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, Ara Wansikehian, Ara Wansikehian, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, Jerry Zomorodian, Jerry Zomorodian, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Marie Zorenkelian, Marie Zorenkelian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Consol Plaintiffs AKM Oil Co Inc, Sharina Alloush, Khaja Ansari, Awans Enterprises Inc, Denise Brown, Rafael Castillo, Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Ghallab Brothers Inc, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Parshotam Kamboj, MDA Fuel Inc, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Gagan Natt, PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, RP Oil Inc, Rahgozar Inc, Rasna LLC, Shamaah Inc, Shomers Group LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Vasaya Oil Co., Inc., 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., Westminster Mini Market Inc, Defendants Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Francois Alvandi, Rajesh Arora, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Cal Coast Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, Sylvia Haddadin, Basel Hassounch, Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan
July 28, 2016 Filing 543 MOTION Stipulation by AKM Oil Co Inc, Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Francois Alvandi, Khaja Ansari(Individually and ), Rajesh Arora, Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Cal Coast Inc, Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin(Individually and ), Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Basel Hassounch, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj(Individually and ), Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, David A Parker, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, United Family LLC, Vasaya Oil Co., Inc., 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian. (Schiller, David) (kcm).
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER (1) Setting Additional Trial Format Status Hearing; (2) Directing Attorney Lacey to Appear at Trial Format Status Hearing; (3) Directing Parties to File a Proposed Amended Scheduling Order; and (4) Directing Attorney Schiller to Show Cause. (Order to Show Cause Response due by 7/28/2016., Trial Format Status Hearing set for 8/11/2016 02:30 PM before Judge Janis L. Sammartino.) Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/21/2016.(kcm)
July 21, 2016 Filing 541 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janis L. Sammartino: Status Hearing re David A. Schiller's representation of defendants set for 8/11/2016 at 2:30 PM before Judge Janis L. Sammartino (Court Reporter/ECR Gayle Wakefield / CRD A Ramos / Plaintiff Attorney Deborah Yoon Jones & Abby L. Risner / Defendant Attorney Troy Martin Mueller & Michael G. Kerbs)(no document attached) (acr)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 540 ORDER (1) granting #492 BP's PMPA Motion for Summary Judgment; (2) denying #493 BP's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot #494 BP's Motion for Summary Judgment Against Pacific Expotech; denying #518 BP's Motion to Strike Untimely Filings; and (5) denying as moot #519 Motion to Strike Document. The Court: 1. grants BP's PMPA MSJ; 2. denies BP's Indemnity MSJ with Prejudice as to the Thrifty legal costs and without Prejudice as to the site condition and holdover costs; 3. denies as moot BP's Pacific Expotech MSJ; 4. denies BP's Motion to Strike re Timeliness; and 5. denies as moot BP's Motion to Strike Schiller Oppositions. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/18/2016. (kcm)
July 11, 2016 Filing 539 DECLARATION re #538 Response - Other,, by Counter Claimants Kalur S Kishan, Kalur S Kishan, Kalur S Kishan, Kalur S Kishan, Defendant Kalur S Kishan. (Schiller, David) (kcm).
July 7, 2016 Filing 538 RESPONSE re #531 Order to Show Cause,,,,, filed by Francois Alvandi, Rajesh Arora, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Chase Products Inc, Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, Sylvia Haddadin, Basel Hassounch, Parshotam Kamboj(Individually and ), Tahssen Kaskas, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, Anit P.K. Natt, PB Inc, David A Parker, Muna Quasqas, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, Nader Sahih, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Kotsai Wang, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian. (Schiller, David) (rlu).
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 537 ORDER Continuing Trial Format Status Hearing re #486 Order on Motion. On its own motion, due to a scheduling conflict, the Court hereby continues the Trial Format Status Hearing to 9:00 a.m. on Thursday, July 21, 2016 in Courtroom 4A. (Status Hearing set for 7/21/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Janis L. Sammartino.) Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/1/2016.(kcm)
June 29, 2016 Filing 536 Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Janis L. Sammartino: Hearing on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment #492 & #493 , Motion for Summary Judgment #494 , Motion to Strike #518 & #519 held and taken under submission; Court to issue written order (Court Reporter/ECR Gayle Wakefield / CRD A Ramos / Plaintiff Attorney Abby Risner & Deborah Yoon Jones / Defendant Attorney Troy Martin, Michael Kerbs & David Schiller) (no document attached) (acr)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 535 Order Scheduling Settlement Disposition Conference. Joint Motion for Dismissal due: 8/12/2016. If a Joint Motion for Dismissal and Proposed Order for Dismissal are not submitted by 8/12/2016, then a Settlement Disposition Conference shall be held. Settlement Disposition Conference set for 8/16/2016 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 6/27/2016.(kcm)
June 21, 2016 Filing 534 NOTICE of Settlement (Re Specific Defendants) and Request Re Hearing on BP West Coast Products LLC's Motions for Partial Summary Judgment and Motion for Summary Judgment by BP West Coast Products LLC (Jones, Deborah) (kcm).
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 533 ORDER Advancing Hearing on Motions for Summary Judgment re #493 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re Indemnity Claims filed by BP West Coast Products LLC, #492 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by BP West Coast Products LLC, #494 MOTION for Summary Judgment against Pacific Expotech filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. The hearing for these Motions is currently set for 1:30 p.m. on Thursday, June 30, 2016. On its own motion, due to a scheduling conflict, the Court hereby advances the hearing date to 9:30 a.m. on Wednesday, June 29, 2016. (Motion Hearing advanced to 6/29/2016 09:30 AM before Judge Janis L. Sammartino.). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/17/2016.Modified on 6/20/2016 (kcm).
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 532 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. 1. By July 7, 2016, Defendants Aly Shakankiry, Bahman Kianmahd, Denise M. Brown, and Younes Dobli Bennani shall each show cause in writing through a declaration why the Court should not sanction for violating this Court's order by arriving more than an hour late to the June 8, 2016 Mandatory Settlement Conference. 2. Alternatively, by July 7, 2016, Defendants Aly Shakankiry, Bahman Kianmahd, Denise M. Brown, and Younes Dobli Bennani may each pay a monetary sanction of $100.00, with any check made payable to the Miscellaneous Fines, Penalties and Forfeitures, Not Otherwise Classified, fund of the United States Treasury, and file a Notice of Payment verifying the monetary sanction was paid. For any of the aforementioned defendants who pays the monetary sanction of $100.00 by July 7, 2016, that defendant (and that defendant only) shall be excused from having to show cause in writing through a declaration without further court order. Order to Show Cause Brief due by 7/7/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 6/14/2016.(kcm)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 531 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. At the hearing, attorneys David A. Schiller and Pamela G. Lacey shall show cause why monetary or other sanctions, including dispositive sanctions, should not issue against each of the 32 aforementioned defendants for their failure to appear for the court-ordered Mandatory Settlement Conference on June 8, 2016. Only attorneys David A. Schiller and Pamela G. Lacey need appear for the July 28, 2016 hearing. It is further ordered that, on or before July 7, 2016, each of the 32 aforementioned defendants shall file a declaration informing the Court why he/she failed to appear in person at the Mandatory Settlement Conference as required by the Court's MSC Order (ECF No. 487), other orders and Chambers Rules and why monetary or other sanctions, including dispositive sanctions, should not be imposed or recommended for their failure to appear. Also on or before July 7, 2016, attorneys David A. Schiller and Pamela G. Lacey shall file a separate declaration addressing why sanctions should not be imposed upon counsel for counsel appearing for the June 8, 2016 Mandatory Settlement Conference without the 32 aforementioned defendants. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/28/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1D before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Order to Show Cause Brief due by 7/7/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 6/14/2016.(kcm)
June 8, 2016 Filing 530 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Mandatory Settlement Conference held on 6/8/2016 with BP West Coast Products LLC and some, but not all, Schiller Defendants in attendance. Settlements were reached on 6/8/2016 between BP West Coast Products LLC and the following parties: Battir Oil Inc.; MK Oil Inc./Kaskas Enterprises Inc.; Southland Petroleum Inc.; United Family LLC; Pacific Expotech Petro Mart; Mohammad Kaskas (as guarantor for Battir, MK Oil, Southland, United, and Pacific Expotech); Francois Alvandi (as guarantor for Battir only); Shamaah, Inc.; Claude Shamaah (solely in his capacity as guarantor of Shamaah, Inc.); 3 Star Management, Inc.; Hy E. Sao (solely in his/her capacity as guarantor of 3 Star); Meng E. Sao (solely in his/her capacity as guarantor of 3 Star); Crestview Consolidated, Inc. and Sylvia Haddadin; Hamlet Enterprises, Inc. and Tigran Pogosyan; Rahgozar, Inc. and Mostafa Rahgozar; Westminster Mini Market Inc.; Robert Alvandi (solely in his capacity as guarantor of Westminster Mini Market Inc.); Anita Alvandi (solely in her capacity as guarantor of Westminster Mini Market Inc.); Big Daddys Oil 15, Inc.; and Robert Alvandi (solely in his capacity as guarantor for Big Daddys Oil 15, Inc.). Orders to show cause will issue regarding non-compliance with the Court's order(s) setting the mandatory settlement conference. (Plaintiff Attorney Deborah Yoon Jones; Abby L. Risner). (Defendant Attorney David A. Schiller; Pamela G. Lacey). (no document attached) (smm)
June 7, 2016 Filing 528 RESPONSE in Opposition re #519 MOTION to Strike Document #510 Response in Opposition to Motion, #511 Response in Opposition to Motion, #509 Response in Opposition to Motion to Strike filed by Crossroad Petroleum, Inc.(a California Corporation), Crossroad Petroleum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Michael G. Kerbs, #2 Declaration Declaration of Tamara M. Sosa)(Kerbs, Michael) (kcm).
June 6, 2016 Filing 529 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Mandatory Settlement Conference held on 6/6/2016 with party representatives present for BP West Coast Products LLC, Meetra & Crossroad Defendants, and Defendant Pacific Expotech. No settlements were reached on 6/6/2016. (Plaintiff Attorney Deborah Yoon Jones; Abby L. Risner). (Defendant Attorney Troy Martin Mueller; Michael G Kerbs; Mark S Sabbah; David A. Schiller; Pamela G. Lacey). (no document attached) (smm)
June 3, 2016 Filing 527 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/3/2016 regarding the Mandatory Settlement Conferences. (Plaintiff Attorney Deborah Yoon Jones; Abby L. Risner). (Defendant Attorney Michael G Kerbs; Mark S Sabbah; David A. Schiller; Martin Fox). (no document attached) (smm)
June 3, 2016 Filing 526 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BP West Coast Products LLC re #519 MOTION to Strike Document #510 Response in Opposition to Motion, #511 Response in Opposition to Motion, #509 Response in Opposition to Motion , #518 MOTION to Strike #507 Response in Opposition to Motion, #506 Response in Opposition to Motion, and Evidentiary Objections, #516 Objection, #515 Reply to Response to Motion, #517 Objection (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 525 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: In preparation for the Mandatory Settlement Conferences, the Court SETS a telephonic, counsel-only Status Conference for Friday, 6/3/2016, at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. For purposes of the Status Conference, counsel for Plaintiff shall coordinate placing a joint call with all other participating counsel already on the line to Judge Burkhardt's chambers. (no document attached) (smm)
June 2, 2016 Filing 524 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BP West Coast Products LLC re #520 Reply to Response to Motion, #521 Reply to Response to Motion, #522 Reply to Response to Motion, #523 Reply to Response to Motion, (Jones, Deborah) (kcm).
June 2, 2016 Filing 523 REPLY to Response to Motion re #493 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re Indemnity Claims filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Reply and Evidentiary Objections to Meetra Defendants' Response to BPWCP's Statement of Uncontroverted Facts Re Indemnity Obligations and Declaration of Medhi Behmard)(Jones, Deborah) (kcm).
June 2, 2016 Filing 522 REPLY to Response to Motion re #493 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re Indemnity Claims filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Reply and Evidentiary Objections to Crossroad Defendants' Uncontroverted Facts in Support of Opposition to Partial Summary Judgment Re Indemnity Obligations and Declaration of Ahd Haddad)(Jones, Deborah) (kcm).
June 2, 2016 Filing 521 REPLY to Response to Motion re #493 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re Indemnity Claims filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Jones, Deborah) (kcm).
June 2, 2016 Filing 520 REPLY to Response to Motion re #494 MOTION for Summary Judgment against Pacific Expotech filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Jones, Deborah) (kcm).
June 2, 2016 Filing 519 MOTION to Strike Document #510 Response in Opposition to Motion, #511 Response in Opposition to Motion, #509 Response in Opposition to Motion by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Risner, Abby) (kcm).
June 2, 2016 Filing 518 MOTION to Strike #507 Response in Opposition to Motion, #506 Response in Opposition to Motion, and Evidentiary Objections by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Risner, Abby) (kcm).
June 2, 2016 Filing 517 OBJECTION by BP West Coast Products LLC re #509 Response in Opposition to Motion re #492 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
June 2, 2016 Filing 516 OBJECTION by BP West Coast Products LLC re #504 Response in Opposition to Motion,, re #492 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
June 2, 2016 Filing 515 REPLY to Response to Motion re #492 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration A. Risner, #2 Exhibit 140)(Risner, Abby) (kcm).
June 2, 2016 Filing 514 NOTICE of Errata RE: Behmard Declaration Exhibit 2 by Farideh Behmard, Medhi Behmard, Meetra Inc re #505 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, #504 Response in Opposition to Motion,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proof of Service by ECF, #3 Proof of Service by Mail)(Mueller, Troy) (kcm).
May 31, 2016 Filing 513 Pursuant to the Court's February 22, 2016 Order (ECF No. #487 ) setting the in-person Mandatory Settlement Conferences for this case, the parties were ordered to lodge supplemental confidential settlement statements by May 27, 2016. The Court is in receipt of supplemental settlement statements from BP West Coast Products LLC only. Accordingly, the Court directs the Schiller Defendants, the Meetra Defendants, and the Crossroad Defendants to lodge their supplemental statements email with efile_burkhardt@casd.uscourts.gov no later than tomorrow, June 1, 2016, at 10:00 AM. These defendants SHALL ADDRESS why their supplemental statements are being lodged after the court-ordered deadline. Further, the parties are reminded that their supplemental statements shall also list all attorney and non-attorney attendees for the Conference, including person(s) and their title(s) or position(s) with the party who will attend and have settlement authority at the Conference. (no document attached) (smm)
May 26, 2016 Filing 512 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Farideh Behmard, Medhi Behmard, Meetra Inc re #504 Response in Opposition to Motion, #505 Response in Opposition to Motion (Bleau, Thomas) (kcm).
May 25, 2016 Filing 511 RESPONSE in Opposition re #493 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re Indemnity Claims filed by Crossroad Petroleum, Inc.(a California Corporation), Crossroad Petroleum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A to Kerbs Decl, #2 Exhibit Exh B Part 1 to Kerbs Decl, #3 Exhibit Exh B 2 to Kerbs Decl, #4 Exhibit Exh C to Kerbs Decl)(Kerbs, Michael) (kcm).
May 25, 2016 Filing 510 RESPONSE in Opposition re #493 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re Indemnity Claims filed by Crossroad Petroleum, Inc.(a California Corporation), Crossroad Petroleum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Declaration Ahd Haddad)(Kerbs, Michael) (kcm).
May 25, 2016 Filing 509 RESPONSE in Opposition re #492 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on the PMPA Claims filed by Crossroad Petroleum, Inc.(a California Corporation). (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts)(Kerbs, Michael) (kcm).
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 508 ORDER granting #503 Joint Motion Concerning Mandatory Settlement Conferences. Pursuant to the Parties' Joint Motion Concerning Mandatory Settlement Conferences, set by the Court's Order docketed at ECF No. 487, the Court hereby grants the Parties' Joint Motion (ECF No. 503) and requires the attendance at the Mandatory Settlement Conferences of: (1) June 6, 2016: Meetra & Crossroad Defendants; Defendant Pacific Expotech; and (2) June 8, 2016: The Schiller Defendants (other than Pacific Expotech, unless additional time is required). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 5/24/2016. (kcm)
May 24, 2016 Filing 507 RESPONSE in Opposition re #493 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re Indemnity Claims, #492 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , #494 MOTION for Summary Judgment against Pacific Expotech filed by AKM Oil Co Inc, Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Francois Alvandi, Khaja Ansari(Individually and ), Rajesh Arora, Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin(Individually and ), Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Basel Hassounch, Horizon Investment Group Inc, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj(Individually and ), Moshail S. Kamel, Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, David A Parker, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, United Family LLC, Vasaya Oil Co., Inc., 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian. (Schiller, David) (kcm).
May 24, 2016 Filing 506 RESPONSE in Opposition re #493 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re Indemnity Claims, #492 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , #494 MOTION for Summary Judgment against Pacific Expotech filed by Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Basel Hassounch, Horizon Investment Group Inc, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj(Individually and ), Moshail S. Kamel, Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, David A Parker, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, United Family LLC, Vasaya Oil Co., Inc., Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1, #2 Exhibit A2, #3 Exhibit A3, #4 Exhibit A4, #5 Exhibit B1, #6 Exhibit B2, #7 Exhibit B3, #8 Exhibit B4, #9 Exhibit C)(Schiller, David) (kcm).
May 24, 2016 Filing 505 RESPONSE in Opposition re #493 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re Indemnity Claims filed by Farideh Behmard, Medhi Behmard, Meetra Inc. (Attachments: #1 Response to BP's Statement of Uncontroverted Fact, #2 Declaration of Mehdi Behmard in Support of Opposition, #3 Exhibit 1 to Behmard Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2.1 to Behmard Declaration, #5 Exhibit 2.2 to Behmard Declaration, #6 Declaration of Troy M. Mueller in Support of Opposition, #7 Exhibit 1 to Mueller Declaration, #8 Exhibit 2 to Mueller Declaration, #9 Exhibit 3 to Mueller Declaration, #10 Proof of Service of Indemnity MSJ Opposition Documents, #11 Proof of Service of PMPA MSJ Opposition Documents)(Mueller, Troy) (kcm).
May 24, 2016 Filing 504 RESPONSE in Opposition re #492 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re PMPA Claims filed by Farideh Behmard, Medhi Behmard, Meetra Inc. (Attachments: #1 Response to BP's Statement of Uncontroverted Fact, #2 Declaration of Mehdi Behmard in Support of Opposition, #3 Exhibit 1 to Behmard Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2.1 to Behmard Declaration, #5 Exhibit 2.2 to Behmard Declaration, #6 Declaration of Troy M. Mueller in Support of Opposition, #7 Exhibit 1 to Mueller Declaration, #8 Exhibit 2 to Mueller Declaration, #9 Exhibit 3 to Mueller Declaration)(Mueller, Troy) (kcm).
May 23, 2016 Filing 503 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #487 Order,, concerning Mandatory Settlement Conferences by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 502 ORDER Continuing Hearing on Motions for Summary Judgment. The hearing for these Motions is currently set for 1:30 p.m. on Thursday, June 16, 2016. On its own motion, due to a scheduling conflict, the Court hereby continues the hearing on these Motions to 1:30 p.m. on Thursday, June 30, 2016. The briefing schedule shall remain as set. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #492 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , #494 MOTION for Summary Judgment against Pacific Expotech, #493 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re Indemnity Claims.(Motion Hearing set for 6/30/2016 01:30 PM before Judge Janis L. Sammartino.). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/20/2016.(kcm)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 501 ORDER granting #500 Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule. Responses due by 5/24/2016 Replies due by 6/2/2016. Good cause appearing, the Court hereby grants the moving parties' Joint Motion. Defendants and Counter-Claimants shall file their responses to these motions on or before May 24, 2016. BP shall file its replies, if any, on or before June 2, 2016. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/19/2016. (kcm)
May 12, 2016 Filing 500 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Deadline for Oppositions to Motions for Summary Judgment by Crossroad Petroleum, Inc.. (Kerbs, Michael) (kcm).
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 499 ORDER Concerning Unauthorized Communications with the Court. Counsel are reminded of their obligations under Magistrate Judge Burkhardt's Civil Chambers Rules. Parties are not permitted to communicate with Judge Burkhardt's chambers via letter or e-mail "except as authorized by court order or by the Court's local or chambers rules." Counsel should thoroughly review and comply with Magistrate Judge Burkhardt's Civil Chambers Rules before involving the Court. Counsel are further reminded that, notwithstanding the pendency of any motion, the Court's February 22, 2016 Order outlining the requirements for the mandatory settlement conferences in this case (ECF No. 487) remains binding on all parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 5/10/2016.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kcm)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 498 ORDER Approving Sanctions re #479 Response, #478 Order on Motion for Sanctions, #483 Response in Opposition to Motion. The Motion 1 Defendants are individually liable to BP as follows: Southland Petroleum: $4,024.93; MK Oil: $4,240.03; and Pacific Expotech: $5,078.14. The Motion 1 Defendants are jointly and severally liable to BP for $3,525.00 for fees incurred litigating Motion 1. The Motion 2 Defendants are individually liable to BP as follows: Chase Products: $2,122.07; David Parker: $423.57; Parshotam Kamboj: $4,466.36; Cal Coast: $1,135.62; Vasaya Oil: $5,307.50; and Sharina Alloush: $3,832.13. The Motion 2 Defendants are jointly and severally liable to BP for $270.00 for fees incurred litigating Motion 2. The Motion 3 Defendants are jointly and severally liable to BP for $53,793.10 for fees and costs incurred litigating Motion 3. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/2/2016.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kcm)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule. Presently before the Court are Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant BP West Coast Products LLC's (BP) three Motions for Summary Judgment. (ECF Nos. 492, 493, & 494.) Defendants and Counter-Claimants SHALL FILE their responses to these motions on or before May 19, 2016. BP SHALL FILE its replies, if any, on or before June 2, 2016. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/20/16.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kas)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER granting #490 Motion to File Under Seal. Exhibit A to the Declaration of Tyson Wolfe in Support of Motions for Summary Judgment filed on April 15, 2016, (ECF No. #491 ), shall remain under electronic seal until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/20/16. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kas)
April 15, 2016 Filing 494 MOTION for Summary Judgment against Pacific Expotech by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Declaration of A. Risner, #4 TOC for Risner Exhibits, #5 Exhibit 1 to Risner Dec, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8 Part 1, #13 Exhibit 8 Part 2, #14 Exhibit 8 Part 3, #15 Exhibit 9 Part 1, #16 Exhibit 9 Part 2, #17 Exhibit 9 Part 3, #18 Exhibit 10, #19 Exhibit 11 Part 1, #20 Exhibit 11 Part 2, #21 Exhibit 12, #22 Exhibit 13, #23 Exhibit 14, #24 Exhibit 15, #25 Exhibit 16, #26 Exhibit 17 Part 1, #27 Exhibit 17 Part 2, #28 Exhibit 18, #29 Exhibit 19, #30 Exhibit 20, #31 Exhibit 21, #32 Exhibit 22, #33 Exhibit 23, #34 Exhibit 24 Part 1, #35 Exhibit 24 Part 2, #36 Exhibit 24 Part 3, #37 Exhibit 25, #38 Exhibit 26, #39 Exhibit 27, #40 Exhibit 28, #41 Exhibit 29, #42 Exhibit 30, #43 Exhibit 31, #44 Exhibit 32, #45 Exhibit 33 Part 1, #46 Exhibit 33 Part 2, #47 Exhibit 34, #48 Exhibit 35 Part 1, #49 Exhibit 35 Part 2, #50 Exhibit 35 Part 3, #51 Exhibit 36, #52 Exhibit 37, #53 Exhibit 38, #54 Exhibit 39, #55 Exhibit 40, #56 Exhibit 41, #57 Exhibit 42 Part 1, #58 Exhibit 42 Part 2, #59 Exhibit 43 Part 1, #60 Exhibit 43 Part 2, #61 Exhibit 44, #62 Exhibit 45 Part 1, #63 Exhibit 45 Part 2, #64 Exhibit 45 Part 3, #65 Exhibit 45 Part 4, #66 Exhibit 45 Part 5, #67 Exhibit 46, #68 Exhibit 47, #69 Exhibit 48, #70 Exhibit 49, #71 Exhibit 50 Part 1, #72 Exhibit 50 Part 2, #73 Exhibit 50 Part 3, #74 Exhibit 50 Part 4, #75 Exhibit 50 Part 5, #76 Exhibit 50 Part 6, #77 Exhibit 50 Part 7, #78 Exhibit 50 Part 8, #79 Exhibit 50 Part 9, #80 Exhibit 51, #81 Exhibit 52, #82 Exhibit 53, #83 Exhibit 54, #84 Exhibit 55, #85 Exhibit 56, #86 Exhibit 57, #87 Exhibit 58, #88 Exhibit 59, #89 Exhibit 60, #90 Exhibit 61, #91 Exhibit 62, #92 Exhibit 63, #93 Exhibit 64, #94 Exhibit 65, #95 Exhibit 66, #96 Exhibit 67, #97 Exhibit 68, #98 Exhibit 69, #99 Exhibit 70, #100 Exhibit 71, #101 Exhibit 72, #102 Exhibit 73, #103 Exhibit 74, #104 Exhibit 75, #105 Exhibit 76, #106 Exhibit 77, #107 Exhibit 78, #108 Exhibit 79, #109 Exhibit 80, #110 Exhibit 81, #111 Exhibit 82, #112 Exhibit 83, #113 Exhibit 84, #114 Exhibit 85, #115 Exhibit 86, #116 Exhibit 87, #117 Exhibit 88, #118 Exhibit 89, #119 Exhibit 90, #120 Exhibit 91, #121 Exhibit 92, #122 Exhibit 93, #123 Exhibit 94, #124 Exhibit 95, #125 Exhibit 96, #126 Exhibit 97, #127 Exhibit 98, #128 Exhibit 99, #129 Exhibit 100, #130 Exhibit 101, #131 Exhibit 102, #132 Exhibit 103, #133 Exhibit 104, #134 Exhibit 105, #135 Exhibit 106, #136 Exhibit 107, #137 Exhibit 108, #138 Exhibit 109, #139 Exhibit 110, #140 Exhibit 111, #141 Exhibit 112, #142 Exhibit 113, #143 Exhibit 114, #144 Exhibit 115, #145 Exhibit 116, #146 Exhibit 117, #147 Exhibit 118, #148 Exhibit 119, #149 Exhibit 120, #150 Exhibit 121, #151 Exhibit 122, #152 Exhibit 123, #153 Exhibit 124, #154 Exhibit 125, #155 Exhibit 126, #156 Exhibit 127 Part 1, #157 Exhibit 127 Part 2, #158 Exhibit 127 Part 3, #159 Exhibit 127 Part 4, #160 Exhibit 127 Part 5, #161 Exhibit 127 Part 6, #162 Exhibit 128, #163 Exhibit 129, #164 Exhibit 130, #165 Exhibit 131 Part 1, #166 Exhibit 131 Part 2, #167 Exhibit 131 Part 3, #168 Exhibit 131 Part 4, #169 Exhibit 131 Part 5, #170 Exhibit 132, #171 Exhibit 133, #172 Exhibit 134, #173 Exhibit 135, #174 Exhibit 136, #175 Exhibit 137, #176 Exhibit 138, #177 Exhibit 139, #178 Declaration of A. Risner, #179 TOC for Wolfe Exhibits, #180 Exhibit A to Wolfe Dec, #181 Exhibit B Part 1, #182 Exhibit B Part 2, #183 Exhibit B Part 3, #184 Exhibit B Part 4, #185 Exhibit B Part 5, #186 Exhibit B Part 6, #187 Exhibit B Part 7, #188 Exhibit B Part 8, #189 Exhibit B Part 9, #190 Exhibit B Part 10, #191 Exhibit B Part 11, #192 Exhibit B Part 12, #193 Exhibit B Part 13, #194 Exhibit B Part 14, #195 Exhibit B Part 15, #196 Exhibit B Part 16, #197 Exhibit B Part 17, #198 Exhibit B Part 18, #199 Exhibit B Part 19, #200 Exhibit B Part 20, #201 Exhibit B Part 21, #202 Exhibit B Part 22, #203 Exhibit B Part 23, #204 Exhibit B Part 24, #205 Exhibit B Part 25, #206 Exhibit B Part 26, #207 Exhibit B Part 27, #208 Exhibit B Part 28, #209 Exhibit B Part 29, #210 Exhibit B Part 30, #211 Exhibit B Part 31, #212 Exhibit B Part 32, #213 Exhibit B Part 33, #214 Exhibit B Part 34, #215 Exhibit B Part 35, #216 Exhibit B Part 36, #217 Exhibit B Part 37, #218 Exhibit B Part 38, #219 Exhibit B Part 39, #220 Exhibit B Part 40, #221 Exhibit B Part 41, #222 Exhibit B Part 42, #223 Exhibit B Part 43, #224 Exhibit B Part 44, #225 Exhibit B Part 45, #226 Exhibit B Part 46, #227 Exhibit B Part 47, #228 Exhibit B Part 48, #229 Exhibit B Part 49, #230 Exhibit B Part 50, #231 Exhibit C, #232 Exhibit D, #233 Exhibit E, #234 Exhibit F, #235 Exhibit G, #236 Exhibit H, #237 Exhibit I, #238 Exhibit J, #239 Declaration of L. Freeman, #240 TOC for Freeman Exhibits, #241 Exhibit A to Freeman Dec, #242 Exhibit B to Freeman Dec, #243 Exhibit C to Freeman Dec, #244 Exhibit D to Freeman Dec, #245 Declaration of M. Saenz, #246 TOC for Saenz Exhibits, #247 Exhibit A to Saenz Dec, #248 Exhibit B to Saenz Dec, #249 Exhibit C to Saenz Dec, #250 Exhibit D to Saenz Dec)(Risner, Abby) (kcm).
April 15, 2016 Filing 493 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re Indemnity Claims by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Memo of Points and Authorities, #3 Statement of Facts, #4 Declaration of A. Risner, #5 TOC to Risner Exhibits, #6 Exhibit 1 to Risner Dec, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8 Part 1, #14 Exhibit 8 Part 2, #15 Exhibit 8 Part 3, #16 Exhibit 9 Part 1, #17 Exhibit 9 Part 2, #18 Exhibit 9 Part 3, #19 Exhibit 10, #20 Exhibit 11 Part 1, #21 Exhibit 11 Part 2, #22 Exhibit 12, #23 Exhibit 13, #24 Exhibit 14, #25 Exhibit 15, #26 Exhibit 16, #27 Exhibit 17 Part 1, #28 Exhibit 17 Part 2, #29 Exhibit 18, #30 Exhibit 19, #31 Exhibit 20, #32 Exhibit 21, #33 Exhibit 22, #34 Exhibit 23, #35 Exhibit 24 Part 1, #36 Exhibit 24 Part 2, #37 Exhibit 24 Part 3, #38 Exhibit 25, #39 Exhibit 26, #40 Exhibit 27, #41 Exhibit 28, #42 Exhibit 29, #43 Exhibit 30, #44 Exhibit 31, #45 Exhibit 32, #46 Exhibit 33 Part 1, #47 Exhibit 33 Part 2, #48 Exhibit 34, #49 Exhibit 35 Part 1, #50 Exhibit 35 Part 2, #51 Exhibit 35 Part 3, #52 Exhibit 36, #53 Exhibit 37, #54 Exhibit 38, #55 Exhibit 39, #56 Exhibit 40, #57 Exhibit 41, #58 Exhibit 42 Part 1, #59 Exhibit 42 Part 2, #60 Exhibit 43 Part 1, #61 Exhibit 43 Part 2, #62 Exhibit 44, #63 Exhibit 45 Part 1, #64 Exhibit 45 Part 2, #65 Exhibit 45 Part 3, #66 Exhibit 45 Part 4, #67 Exhibit 45 Part 5, #68 Exhibit 46, #69 Exhibit 47, #70 Exhibit 48, #71 Exhibit 49, #72 Exhibit 50 Part 1, #73 Exhibit 50 Part 2, #74 Exhibit 50 Part 3, #75 Exhibit 50 Part 4, #76 Exhibit 50 Part 5, #77 Exhibit 50 Part 6, #78 Exhibit 50 Part 7, #79 Exhibit 50 Part 8, #80 Exhibit 50 Part 9, #81 Exhibit 51, #82 Exhibit 52, #83 Exhibit 53, #84 Exhibit 54, #85 Exhibit 55, #86 Exhibit 56, #87 Exhibit 57, #88 Exhibit 58, #89 Exhibit 59, #90 Exhibit 60, #91 Exhibit 61, #92 Exhibit 62, #93 Exhibit 63, #94 Exhibit 64, #95 Exhibit 65, #96 Exhibit 66, #97 Exhibit 67, #98 Exhibit 68, #99 Exhibit 69, #100 Exhibit 70, #101 Exhibit 71, #102 Exhibit 72, #103 Exhibit 73, #104 Exhibit 74, #105 Exhibit 75, #106 Exhibit 76, #107 Exhibit 77, #108 Exhibit 78, #109 Exhibit 79, #110 Exhibit 80, #111 Exhibit 81, #112 Exhibit 82, #113 Exhibit 83, #114 Exhibit 84, #115 Exhibit 85, #116 Exhibit 86, #117 Exhibit 87, #118 Exhibit 88, #119 Exhibit 89, #120 Exhibit 90, #121 Exhibit 91, #122 Exhibit 92, #123 Exhibit 93, #124 Exhibit 94, #125 Exhibit 95, #126 Exhibit 96, #127 Exhibit 97, #128 Exhibit 98, #129 Exhibit 99, #130 Exhibit 100, #131 Exhibit 101, #132 Exhibit 102, #133 Exhibit 103, #134 Exhibit 104, #135 Exhibit 105, #136 Exhibit 106, #137 Exhibit 107, #138 Exhibit 108, #139 Exhibit 109, #140 Exhibit 110, #141 Exhibit 111, #142 Exhibit 112, #143 Exhibit 113, #144 Exhibit 114, #145 Exhibit 115, #146 Exhibit 116, #147 Exhibit 117, #148 Exhibit 118, #149 Exhibit 119, #150 Exhibit 120, #151 Exhibit 121, #152 Exhibit 122, #153 Exhibit 123, #154 Exhibit 124, #155 Exhibit 125, #156 Exhibit 126, #157 Exhibit 127 Part 1, #158 Exhibit 127 Part 2, #159 Exhibit 127 Part 3, #160 Exhibit 127 Part 4, #161 Exhibit 127 Part 5, #162 Exhibit 127 Part 6, #163 Exhibit 128, #164 Exhibit 129, #165 Exhibit 130, #166 Exhibit 131 Part 1, #167 Exhibit 131 Part 2, #168 Exhibit 131 Part 3, #169 Exhibit 131 Part 4, #170 Exhibit 131 Part 5, #171 Exhibit 132, #172 Exhibit 133, #173 Exhibit 134, #174 Exhibit 135, #175 Exhibit 136, #176 Exhibit 137, #177 Exhibit 138, #178 Exhibit 139, #179 Declaration of T. Wolfe, #180 TOC to Wolfe Dec Exhibits, #181 Exhibit A, #182 Exhibit B Part 1, #183 Exhibit B Part 2, #184 Exhibit B Part 3, #185 Exhibit B Part 4, #186 Exhibit B Part 5, #187 Exhibit B Part 6, #188 Exhibit B Part 7, #189 Exhibit B Part 8, #190 Exhibit B Part 9, #191 Exhibit B Part 10, #192 Exhibit B Part 11, #193 Exhibit B Part 12, #194 Exhibit B Part 13, #195 Exhibit B Part 14, #196 Exhibit B Part 15, #197 Exhibit B Part 16, #198 Exhibit B Part 17, #199 Exhibit B Part 18, #200 Exhibit B Part 19, #201 Exhibit B Part 20, #202 Exhibit B Part 21, #203 Exhibit B Part 22, #204 Exhibit B Part 23, #205 Exhibit B Part 24, #206 Exhibit B Part 25, #207 Exhibit B Part 26, #208 Exhibit B Part 27, #209 Exhibit B Part 28, #210 Exhibit B Part 29, #211 Exhibit B Part 30, #212 Exhibit B Part 31, #213 Exhibit B Part 32, #214 Exhibit B Part 33, #215 Exhibit B Part 34, #216 Exhibit B Part 35, #217 Exhibit B Part 36, #218 Exhibit B Part 37, #219 Exhibit B Part 38, #220 Exhibit B Part 39, #221 Exhibit B Part 40, #222 Exhibit B Part 41, #223 Exhibit B Part 42, #224 Exhibit B Part 43, #225 Exhibit B Part 44, #226 Exhibit B Part 45, #227 Exhibit B Part 46, #228 Exhibit B Part 47, #229 Exhibit B Part 48, #230 Exhibit B Part 49, #231 Exhibit B Part 50, #232 Exhibit C, #233 Exhibit D, #234 Exhibit E, #235 Exhibit F, #236 Exhibit G, #237 Exhibit H, #238 Exhibit I, #239 Exhibit J, #240 Declaration of L. Freeman, #241 TOC to Freeman Dec Exhibits, #242 Exhibit Exhibit A to Freeman Dec, #243 Exhibit Exhibit B to Freeman Dec, #244 Exhibit Exhibit C to Freeman Dec, #245 Exhibit Exhibit D to Freeman Dec)(Risner, Abby) (kcm).
April 15, 2016 Filing 492 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Memo of Points and Authorities, #3 Statement of Facts, #4 Declaration of A. Risner, #5 TOC to Risner Dec Exhibits, #6 Exhibit 1 to Risner Dec, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8 Part 1, #14 Exhibit 8 Part 2, #15 Exhibit 8 Part 3, #16 Exhibit 9 Part 1, #17 Exhibit 9 Part 2, #18 Exhibit 9 Part 3, #19 Exhibit 10, #20 Exhibit 11 Part 1, #21 Exhibit 11 Part 2, #22 Exhibit 12, #23 Exhibit 13, #24 Exhibit 14, #25 Exhibit 15, #26 Exhibit 16, #27 Exhibit 17 Part 1, #28 Exhibit 17 Part 2, #29 Exhibit 18, #30 Exhibit 19, #31 Exhibit 20, #32 Exhibit 21, #33 Exhibit 22, #34 Exhibit 23, #35 Exhibit 24 Part 1, #36 Exhibit 24 Part 2, #37 Exhibit 24 Part 3, #38 Exhibit 25, #39 Exhibit 26, #40 Exhibit 27, #41 Exhibit 28, #42 Exhibit 29, #43 Exhibit 30, #44 Exhibit 31, #45 Exhibit 32, #46 Exhibit 33 Part 1, #47 Exhibit 33 Part 2, #48 Exhibit 34, #49 Exhibit 35 Part 1, #50 Exhibit 35 Part 2, #51 Exhibit 35 Part 3, #52 Exhibit 36, #53 Exhibit 37, #54 Exhibit 38, #55 Exhibit 39, #56 Exhibit 40, #57 Exhibit 41, #58 Exhibit 42 Part 1, #59 Exhibit 42 Part 2, #60 Exhibit 43 Part 1, #61 Exhibit 43 Part 2, #62 Exhibit 44, #63 Exhibit 45 Part 1, #64 Exhibit 45 Part 2, #65 Exhibit 45 Part 3, #66 Exhibit 45 Part 4, #67 Exhibit 45 Part 5, #68 Exhibit 46, #69 Exhibit 47, #70 Exhibit 48, #71 Exhibit 49, #72 Exhibit 50 Part 1, #73 Exhibit 50 Part 2, #74 Exhibit 50 Part 3, #75 Exhibit 50 Part 4, #76 Exhibit 50 Part 5, #77 Exhibit 50 Part 6, #78 Exhibit 50 Part 7, #79 Exhibit 50 Part 8, #80 Exhibit 50 Part 9, #81 Exhibit 51, #82 Exhibit 52, #83 Exhibit 53, #84 Exhibit 54, #85 Exhibit 55, #86 Exhibit 56, #87 Exhibit 57, #88 Exhibit 58, #89 Exhibit 59, #90 Exhibit 60, #91 Exhibit 61, #92 Exhibit 62, #93 Exhibit 63, #94 Exhibit 64, #95 Exhibit 65, #96 Exhibit 66, #97 Exhibit 67, #98 Exhibit 68, #99 Exhibit 69, #100 Exhibit 70, #101 Exhibit 71, #102 Exhibit 72, #103 Exhibit 73, #104 Exhibit 74, #105 Exhibit 75, #106 Exhibit 76, #107 Exhibit 77, #108 Exhibit 78, #109 Exhibit 79, #110 Exhibit 80, #111 Exhibit 81, #112 Exhibit 82, #113 Exhibit 83, #114 Exhibit 84, #115 Exhibit 85, #116 Exhibit 86, #117 Exhibit 87, #118 Exhibit 88, #119 Exhibit 89, #120 Exhibit 90, #121 Exhibit 91, #122 Exhibit 92, #123 Exhibit 93, #124 Exhibit 94, #125 Exhibit 95, #126 Exhibit 96, #127 Exhibit 97, #128 Exhibit 98, #129 Exhibit 99, #130 Exhibit 100, #131 Exhibit 101, #132 Exhibit 102, #133 Exhibit 103, #134 Exhibit 104, #135 Exhibit 105, #136 Exhibit 106, #137 Exhibit 107, #138 Exhibit 108, #139 Exhibit 109, #140 Exhibit 110, #141 Exhibit 111, #142 Exhibit 112, #143 Exhibit 113, #144 Exhibit 114, #145 Exhibit 115, #146 Exhibit 116, #147 Exhibit 117, #148 Exhibit 118, #149 Exhibit 119, #150 Exhibit 120, #151 Exhibit 121, #152 Exhibit 122, #153 Exhibit 123, #154 Exhibit 124, #155 Exhibit 125, #156 Exhibit 126, #157 Exhibit 127 Part 1, #158 Exhibit 127 Part 2, #159 Exhibit 127 Part 3, #160 Exhibit 127 Part 4, #161 Exhibit 127 Part 5, #162 Exhibit 127 Part 6, #163 Exhibit 128, #164 Exhibit 129, #165 Exhibit 130, #166 Exhibit 131 Part 1, #167 Exhibit 131 Part 2, #168 Exhibit 131 Part 3, #169 Exhibit 131 Part 4, #170 Exhibit 131 Part 5, #171 Exhibit 132, #172 Exhibit 133, #173 Exhibit 134, #174 Exhibit 135, #175 Exhibit 136, #176 Exhibit 137, #177 Exhibit 138, #178 Exhibit 139, #179 Declaration of T. Wolfe, #180 TOC to Wolfe Dec Exhibits, #181 Exhibit A to Wolfe Dec, #182 Exhibit B Part 1, #183 Exhibit B Part 2, #184 Exhibit B Part 3, #185 Exhibit B Part 4, #186 Exhibit B Part 5, #187 Exhibit B Part 6, #188 Exhibit B Part 7, #189 Exhibit B Part 7, #190 Exhibit B Part 9, #191 Exhibit B Part 10, #192 Exhibit B Part 11, #193 Exhibit B Part 12, #194 Exhibit B Part 13, #195 Exhibit B Part 14, #196 Exhibit B Part 15, #197 Exhibit B Part 16, #198 Exhibit B Part 17, #199 Exhibit B Part 18, #200 Exhibit B Part 19, #201 Exhibit B Part 20, #202 Exhibit B Part 21, #203 Exhibit B Part 22, #204 Exhibit B Part 23, #205 Exhibit B Part 24, #206 Exhibit B Part 25, #207 Exhibit B Part 26, #208 Exhibit B Part 27, #209 Exhibit B Part 28, #210 Exhibit B Part 29, #211 Exhibit B Part 30, #212 Exhibit B Part 31, #213 Exhibit B Part 32, #214 Exhibit B Part 33, #215 Exhibit B Part 34, #216 Exhibit B Part 35, #217 Exhibit B Part 36, #218 Exhibit B Part 37, #219 Exhibit B Part 38, #220 Exhibit B Part 39, #221 Exhibit B Part 40, #222 Exhibit B Part 41, #223 Exhibit B Part 42, #224 Exhibit B Part 43, #225 Exhibit B Part 44, #226 Exhibit B Part 45, #227 Exhibit B Part 46, #228 Exhibit B Part 47, #229 Exhibit B Part 48, #230 Exhibit B Part 49, #231 Exhibit B Part 50, #232 Exhibit C, #233 Exhibit D, #234 Exhibit E, #235 Exhibit F, #236 Exhibit G, #237 Exhibit H, #238 Exhibit I, #239 Exhibit J)(Risner, Abby) (kcm).
April 15, 2016 Filing 491 ***DOCUMENT FILED AS A SEALED DOCUMENT OF 4/20/2016***SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #490 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Risner, Abby) (kcm). (Main Document 491 replaced on 4/25/2016) (vam). Modified on 4/25/2016 (vam).
April 15, 2016 Filing 490 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Risner, Abby)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ORDER granting #488 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Good cause appearing, the Court GRANTS BP's Unopposed Motion. (ECF No. 488.) BP may file two motions for summary judgment with supporting memoranda of up to twenty-five pages each, even if the hearing for both motions is on the same date. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/14/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kcm)
March 8, 2016 Filing 488 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 487 ORDER re: Mandatory Settlement Conferences. Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt confirms that the MSCs shall go forward as scheduled on June 6, 2016 (Plaintiff and "Meetra & Crossroad Defendants") and June 8, 2016 (Plaintiff and the "Schiller Defendants"), and that each MSC shall commence at 9:00 AM, in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt, Edward J. Schwartz U.S. Courthouse, 221 West Broadway, Suite 5140, San Diego, California 92101. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 2/22/2016.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kcm)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 486 ORDER granting in part #485 Joint Motion to Set New Pretrial Deadlines. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/6/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Mandatory Settlement Conference (Meetra & Crossroad) set for 6/6/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Mandatory Settlement Conference (Schiller) set for 6/8/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Trial Format Status Hearing set for 7/14/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 9/2/2016. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/29/2016. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/17/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(Time of Mandatory Settlement Conferences confirmed w/ JLB Chambers)(kcm) (sjt).
February 11, 2016 Filing 485 Joint MOTION Proposing New Pretrial Deadlines re #484 Order on Motion to Vacate, by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (kcm).
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 484 ORDER Vacating Pre-Trial Deadlines; granting #482 Motion to Vacate. Counsel for all parties SHALL confer and submit a joint motion on or before February 11, 2016, proposing deadlines for dispositive motions, the settlement conference, and other pretrial deadlines. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/2/2016. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kcm) (sjt).
January 29, 2016 Filing 483 RESPONSE in Opposition re #448 MOTION for Sanctions Against Schiller Defendants, #447 MOTION for Sanctions Against Chase Products, David Parker, Parshotam Kamboj, Cal Coast, Vasaya Oil, and Sharina Alloush filed by AKM Oil Co Inc, Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Francois Alvandi, Khaja Ansari(Individually and ), Rajesh Arora, Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin(Individually and ), Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Basel Hassounch, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj(Individually and ), Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, David A Parker, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, United Family LLC, Vasaya Oil Co., Inc., 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian. (Schiller, David) (kcm).
January 28, 2016 Filing 482 Joint MOTION to Vacate Pretrial Deadlines by AKM Oil Co Inc, Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Francois Alvandi, Khaja Ansari(Individually and ), Rajesh Arora, Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin(Individually and ), Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Basel Hassounch, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj(Individually and ), Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, David A Parker, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, United Family LLC, Vasaya Oil Co., Inc., 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian. (Schiller, David) (kcm).
January 28, 2016 Filing 481 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Farideh Behmard, Medhi Behmard, Meetra Inc re #480 Memorandum of Facts and Contentions of Law by Mail on Pamela G. Lacey (Mueller, Troy) (kcm).
January 28, 2016 Filing 480 MEMORANDUM OF FACTS AND CONTENTIONS OF LAW by Farideh Behmard, Medhi Behmard, Meetra Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proof of Service)(Mueller, Troy) (kcm).
January 15, 2016 Filing 479 RESPONSE re #478 Order on Motion for Sanctions,,,,, Request for Fees and Costs for Motions for Sanctions filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Risner and Exhibits 1-9, #2 Declaration of D. Jones and Exhibit 1)(Risner, Abby) (kcm).
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 478 ORDER (1) Denying Without Prejudice BP's Motions to Dispositive Sanctions; (2) Notifying Defendants of Possibility of Future Entry of Dispositive Sanctions; and (3) Granting in Part and Denying in Part BP's Motions for Monetary Sanctions re #446 #447 #448 . Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/14/2015. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jao) (kcm).
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 477 ORDER Vacating Hearing re #446 MOTION for Sanctions Against Southland, MK Oil, and Pacific Expotech, #448 MOTION for Sanctions Against Schiller Defendants, #447 MOTION for Sanctions Against Chase Products, David Parker, Parshotam Kamboj, Cal Coast, Vasaya Oil, and Sharina Alloush. The motion hearing set for November 12, 2015, is hereby vacated and the matter is taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/10/2015.(jao)
October 29, 2015 Filing 476 REPLY to Response to Motion re #446 MOTION for Sanctions Against Southland, MK Oil, and Pacific Expotech, #448 MOTION for Sanctions Against Schiller Defendants, #447 MOTION for Sanctions Against Chase Products, David Parker, Parshotam Kamboj, Cal Coast, Vasaya Oil, and Sharina Alloush filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration A. Risner, #2 Exhibit 33, #3 Exhibit 34, #4 Exhibit 35)(Risner, Abby) (jao).
October 22, 2015 Filing 475 Supplemental RESPONSE in Opposition re #448 MOTION for Sanctions Against Schiller Defendants, #446 MOTION for Sanctions Against Southland, MK Oil, and Pacific Expotech, #447 MOTION for Sanctions Against Chase Products, David Parker, Parshotam Kamboj, Cal Coast, Vasaya Oil, and Sharina Alloush filed by Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Francois Alvandi, Khaja Ansari(Individually and ), Rajesh Arora, Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin(Individually and ), Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Basel Hassounch, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj(Individually and ), Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, David A Parker, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, United Family LLC, Vasaya Oil Co., Inc., 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit, #51 Exhibit, #52 Exhibit, #53 Exhibit, #54 Exhibit, #55 Exhibit, #56 Exhibit, #57 Exhibit, #58 Exhibit, #59 Exhibit, #60 Exhibit, #61 Exhibit, #62 Exhibit, #63 Exhibit, #64 Exhibit, #65 Exhibit, #66 Exhibit, #67 Exhibit, #68 Exhibit, #69 Exhibit, #70 Exhibit, #71 Exhibit, #72 Exhibit, #73 Exhibit, #74 Exhibit, #75 Exhibit, #76 Exhibit, #77 Exhibit, #78 Exhibit, #79 Exhibit, #80 Exhibit, #81 Exhibit, #82 Exhibit, #83 Exhibit, #84 Exhibit, #85 Exhibit, #86 Exhibit, #87 Exhibit, #88 Exhibit, #89 Exhibit, #90 Exhibit, #91 Exhibit, #92 Exhibit, #93 Exhibit, #94 Exhibit, #95 Exhibit, #96 Exhibit, #97 Exhibit, #98 Exhibit, #99 Exhibit, #100 Exhibit, #101 Exhibit, #102 Exhibit, #103 Exhibit, #104 Exhibit, #105 Exhibit, #106 Exhibit, #107 Exhibit, #108 Exhibit, #109 Exhibit, #110 Exhibit, #111 Exhibit, #112 Exhibit, #113 Exhibit, #114 Exhibit, #115 Exhibit, #116 Exhibit, #117 Exhibit, #118 Exhibit, #119 Exhibit, #120 Exhibit, #121 Exhibit, #122 Exhibit, #123 Exhibit, #124 Exhibit, #125 Exhibit, #126 Exhibit, #127 Exhibit, #128 Exhibit, #129 Exhibit, #130 Exhibit, #131 Exhibit, #132 Exhibit, #133 Exhibit, #134 Exhibit, #135 Exhibit, #136 Exhibit, #137 Exhibit, #138 Exhibit, #139 Exhibit, #140 Exhibit, #141 Exhibit, #142 Exhibit, #143 Exhibit, #144 Exhibit, #145 Exhibit, #146 Exhibit, #147 Exhibit, #148 Exhibit, #149 Exhibit, #150 Exhibit, #151 Exhibit, #152 Exhibit, #153 Exhibit, #154 Exhibit, #155 Exhibit, #156 Exhibit, #157 Exhibit, #158 Exhibit, #159 Exhibit, #160 Exhibit, #161 Exhibit, #162 Exhibit, #163 Exhibit, #164 Exhibit, #165 Exhibit, #166 Exhibit, #167 Exhibit, #168 Exhibit, #169 Exhibit, #170 Exhibit, #171 Exhibit, #172 Exhibit, #173 Exhibit, #174 Exhibit, #175 Exhibit, #176 Exhibit, #177 Exhibit, #178 Exhibit, #179 Exhibit, #180 Exhibit, #181 Exhibit, #182 Exhibit, #183 Exhibit, #184 Exhibit, #185 Exhibit, #186 Exhibit, #187 Exhibit, #188 Exhibit, #189 Exhibit, #190 Exhibit, #191 Exhibit, #192 Exhibit, #193 Exhibit, #194 Exhibit, #195 Exhibit, #196 Exhibit, #197 Exhibit, #198 Exhibit, #199 Exhibit, #200 Exhibit, #201 Exhibit, #202 Exhibit, #203 Exhibit, #204 Exhibit, #205 Exhibit, #206 Exhibit, #207 Exhibit, #208 Exhibit, #209 Exhibit, #210 Exhibit, #211 Exhibit, #212 Exhibit, #213 Exhibit, #214 Exhibit, #215 Exhibit, #216 Exhibit, #217 Exhibit, #218 Exhibit, #219 Exhibit, #220 Exhibit, #221 Exhibit, #222 Exhibit, #223 Exhibit, #224 Exhibit, #225 Exhibit, #226 Exhibit, #227 Exhibit, #228 Exhibit, #229 Exhibit, #230 Exhibit, #231 Exhibit, #232 Exhibit, #233 Exhibit, #234 Exhibit, #235 Exhibit, #236 Exhibit, #237 Exhibit, #238 Exhibit, #239 Exhibit, #240 Exhibit, #241 Exhibit, #242 Exhibit, #243 Exhibit, #244 Exhibit, #245 Exhibit, #246 Exhibit, #247 Exhibit, #248 Exhibit, #249 Exhibit, #250 Exhibit, #251 Exhibit, #252 Exhibit, #253 Exhibit, #254 Exhibit, #255 Exhibit, #256 Exhibit, #257 Exhibit, #258 Exhibit, #259 Exhibit, #260 Exhibit, #261 Exhibit, #262 Exhibit, #263 Exhibit, #264 Exhibit, #265 Exhibit, #266 Exhibit, #267 Exhibit, #268 Exhibit, #269 Exhibit, #270 Exhibit, #271 Exhibit, #272 Exhibit, #273 Exhibit, #274 Exhibit, #275 Exhibit, #276 Exhibit, #277 Exhibit, #278 Exhibit, #279 Exhibit, #280 Exhibit, #281 Exhibit, #282 Exhibit, #283 Exhibit, #284 Exhibit, #285 Exhibit, #286 Exhibit, #287 Exhibit, #288 Exhibit, #289 Exhibit, #290 Exhibit, #291 Exhibit, #292 Exhibit, #293 Exhibit, #294 Exhibit, #295 Exhibit, #296 Exhibit, #297 Exhibit, #298 Exhibit, #299 Exhibit, #300 Exhibit, #301 Exhibit, #302 Exhibit, #303 Exhibit, #304 Exhibit, #305 Exhibit, #306 Exhibit, #307 Exhibit, #308 Exhibit, #309 Exhibit, #310 Exhibit, #311 Exhibit, #312 Exhibit, #313 Exhibit, #314 Exhibit, #315 Exhibit, #316 Exhibit, #317 Exhibit, #318 Exhibit, #319 Exhibit, #320 Exhibit, #321 Exhibit, #322 Exhibit, #323 Exhibit, #324 Exhibit, #325 Exhibit, #326 Exhibit, #327 Exhibit, #328 Exhibit, #329 Exhibit, #330 Exhibit, #331 Exhibit, #332 Exhibit, #333 Exhibit, #334 Exhibit, #335 Exhibit, #336 Exhibit, #337 Exhibit, #338 Exhibit, #339 Exhibit, #340 Exhibit, #341 Exhibit, #342 Exhibit, #343 Exhibit, #344 Exhibit, #345 Exhibit, #346 Exhibit, #347 Exhibit, #348 Exhibit, #349 Exhibit, #350 Exhibit, #351 Exhibit, #352 Exhibit, #353 Exhibit, #354 Exhibit, #355 Exhibit, #356 Exhibit, #357 Exhibit, #358 Exhibit, #359 Exhibit, #360 Exhibit, #361 Exhibit, #362 Exhibit, #363 Exhibit, #364 Exhibit, #365 Exhibit, #366 Exhibit, #367 Exhibit, #368 Exhibit, #369 Exhibit, #370 Exhibit, #371 Exhibit, #372 Exhibit, #373 Exhibit, #374 Exhibit, #375 Exhibit, #376 Exhibit, #377 Exhibit, #378 Exhibit, #379 Exhibit, #380 Exhibit, #381 Exhibit, #382 Exhibit, #383 Exhibit, #384 Exhibit, #385 Exhibit, #386 Exhibit, #387 Exhibit, #388 Exhibit, #389 Exhibit, #390 Exhibit, #391 Exhibit, #392 Exhibit, #393 Exhibit, #394 Exhibit, #395 Exhibit, #396 Exhibit, #397 Exhibit, #398 Exhibit, #399 Exhibit, #400 Exhibit, #401 Exhibit, #402 Exhibit, #403 Exhibit, #404 Exhibit, #405 Exhibit, #406 Exhibit, #407 Exhibit, #408 Exhibit, #409 Exhibit, #410 Exhibit, #411 Exhibit, #412 Exhibit, #413 Exhibit, #414 Exhibit, #415 Exhibit, #416 Exhibit, #417 Exhibit, #418 Exhibit, #419 Exhibit, #420 Exhibit, #421 Exhibit, #422 Exhibit, #423 Exhibit, #424 Exhibit, #425 Exhibit, #426 Exhibit, #427 Exhibit)(Schiller, David) Modified text on 10/23/2015 (jao).
October 15, 2015 Filing 474 RESPONSE to Motion re #448 MOTION for Sanctions Against Schiller Defendants, #446 MOTION for Sanctions Against Southland, MK Oil, and Pacific Expotech, #447 MOTION for Sanctions Against Chase Products, David Parker, Parshotam Kamboj, Cal Coast, Vasaya Oil, and Sharina Alloush filed by Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Francois Alvandi, Khaja Ansari(Individually and ), Rajesh Arora, Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin(Individually and ), Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Basel Hassounch, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj(Individually and ), Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, David A Parker, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, United Family LLC, Vasaya Oil Co., Inc., 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Schiller, David) (jao).
October 8, 2015 Filing 473 MINUTE ORDER. The in-person, Mandatory Settlement Conference previously set for 10/28/2015 (ECF No. 460) is vacated. The parties shall lodge confidential Settlement Conference Statements by e-mail to efile_Burkhardt@casd.uscourts.gov and in accordance with Magistrate Judge Burkhardt's Civil Chambers Rules (available on the district court's website), no later than 11/6/2015. Any order resetting a Mandatory Settlement Conference in this case will follow Judge Burkhardt's review of the parties' Statements.(jao)
September 29, 2015 Filing 472 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Order to Show Cause) held on 9/17/2015, before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Gayle Wakefield. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 10/20/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/30/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2015. (akr)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER Granting #452 Motion to Substitute Attorney and denying as moot #428 Alexander S. Gareeb's Previous Motion to Withdraw. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 83.3(f)(2), the Court grants the Motion and approves the substitution. The Clerk of the Court shall update the Court's docket to reflect the substitution as documented in the Motion to Substitute Counsel. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/17/2015. (jao). [Attorney Lacey added to "Schiller Defedants" according to the most recent listing provided in Ex 1 ecf 446]
September 17, 2015 Filing 470 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janis L. Sammartino : Order to Show Cause Hearing continued to 11/12/2015 at 9:30 AM before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. David A. Schiller's substantive response to BP West Coast's Motions for Sanctions is due on 10/15/2015; BP West Coast's Reply to David A. Schiller's response is due on 10/29/2015 (Court Reporter/ECR Gayle Wakefield / CRD A Ramos / Plaintiff Attorney Abby L. Risner & Adriene Lynch / Defendant Attorney David A. Schiller, Alexander Gareeb & Fadi Rasheed) (no document attached) (acr)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 469 ORDER Granting Defendants Request for Additional Time to Respond; Setting Briefing Schedule re #446 MOTION for Sanctions Against Southland, MK Oil, and Pacific Expotech, #447 MOTION for Sanctions Against Chase Products, David Parker, Parshotam Kamboj, Cal Coast, Vasaya Oil, and Sharina Alloush, #448 MOTION for Sanctions Against Schiller Defendants : The Schiller Defendants shall file their responses to BPs motions for sanctions on or before October 15, 2015, regardless of whether Schillers server has been repaired. BP shall file its reply, if any, on or before October 29, 2015. Given the adjusted briefing schedule and the significance of these motions, the dispositive motion deadline of October 27, 2015, and the settlement conference set for October 28, 2015, are hereby vacated. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/17/2015.(jao)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ORDER Confirming Hearing Date and Time for Hearing Re Sanctions. The Court notes that the hearing set for 1:30 PM on September 17, 2015, shall proceed as scheduled. Counsel for both Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant and Defendants/Counter-Claimants SHALL attend the hearing. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/15/2015.(jao)
September 11, 2015 Filing 467 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Schiller on behalf of Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Francois Alvandi, Khaja Ansari(Individually and ), Rajesh Arora, Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin(Individually and ), Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Basel Hassounch, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj(Individually and ), Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, David A Parker, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, United Family LLC, Vasaya Oil Co., Inc., 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian (Schiller, David) Mailer sent on 9/14/2015 ; Pamela Lacey not added to docket(jao).
September 10, 2015 Filing 466 REPLY to Response to Motion re #448 MOTION for Sanctions Against Schiller Defendants, #446 MOTION for Sanctions Against Southland, MK Oil, and Pacific Expotech, #447 MOTION for Sanctions Against Chase Products, David Parker, Parshotam Kamboj, Cal Coast, Vasaya Oil, and Sharina Alloush filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration A. Risner, #2 Declaration A. Lynch, #3 Exhibit 29, #4 Exhibit 30, #5 Exhibit 31, #6 Exhibit 32)(Risner, Abby) (jao).
September 4, 2015 Filing 465 RESPONSE in Opposition re #446 MOTION for Sanctions Against Southland, MK Oil, and Pacific Expotech, #448 MOTION for Sanctions Against Schiller Defendants, #447 MOTION for Sanctions Against Chase Products, David Parker, Parshotam Kamboj, Cal Coast, Vasaya Oil, and Sharina Alloush filed by Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Francois Alvandi, Khaja Ansari, Rajesh Arora, Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown, Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Rafael Castillo, Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Ahd Haddad, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Basel Hassounch, Horizon Investment Group Inc, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj, Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt, PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, David A Parker, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Parmjit Randhawa, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, United Family LLC, Vasaya Oil Co., Inc., 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration)(Schiller, David)
September 4, 2015 Filing 464 RESPONSE in Opposition re #446 MOTION for Sanctions Against Southland, MK Oil, and Pacific Expotech, #448 MOTION for Sanctions Against Schiller Defendants, #447 MOTION for Sanctions Against Chase Products, David Parker, Parshotam Kamboj, Cal Coast, Vasaya Oil, and Sharina Alloush filed by Sharina Alloush(Individually and ). (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Schiller, David)
September 1, 2015 Filing 463 NOTICE by Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc. Defendants' response in opposition to #455 notice of related cases (Gareeb, Alexander) Modified to add link for Notice on 9/2/2015 (jao).
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 462 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #457 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motions for Sanctions. The Schiller Defendants SHALL FILE a response to the motions for sanctions on or before September 4, 2015. BP SHALL FILE any reply on or before September 10, 2015. The Court will hold a hearing on these matters on September 17, 2015 at 1:30 p.m., as previously scheduled. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/1/2015. (jao)
August 31, 2015 Filing 461 RESPONSE in Opposition re #457 MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (jao).
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 460 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt granting in part and denying in part (ECF No. #459 ) Joint Motion to Extend Time for Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Statements as follows: The in-person, Mandatory Settlement Conference previously set for 9/30/2015 is VACATED and RESET for Wednesday, 10/28/2015, at 09:00 AM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt, Edward J. Schwartz U.S. Courthouse, 221 West Broadway, Suite 5140, San Diego, California 92101. Counsel shall lodge confidential settlement statements by e-mail to efile_Burkhardt@casd.uscourts.gov and in accordance with Magistrate Judge Burkhardt's Civil Chambers Rules, no later than 10/16/2015. The parties shall otherwise comply with paragraph 9 of the Case Management Conference Order issued on 9/29/2014 (ECF No. #318 ) and Civil Chambers Rules regarding MSCs. (no document attached) (smm)
August 28, 2015 Filing 459 Joint MOTION to Continue Mandatory Settlement Conference, Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Lodge Confidential Settlement Statements by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby)
August 28, 2015 Filing 458 DECLARATION re #457 MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Counter Claimants Habib Alam, Habib Alam, Habib Alam, Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Manal Alam, Manal Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush, Sharina Alloush, Sharina Alloush, Sharina Alloush, Sharina Alloush, Francois Alvandi, Francois Alvandi, Francois Alvandi, Francois Alvandi, Khaja Ansari, Khaja Ansari, Khaja Ansari, Khaja Ansari, Khaja Ansari, Rajesh Arora, Rajesh Arora, Rajesh Arora, Rajesh Arora, Awans Enterprises Inc, Awans Enterprises Inc, Awans Enterprises Inc, Awans Enterprises Inc, Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Heidi Bahmani, Heidi Bahmani, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Bahman Baktar, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Nesrin Barbat, Nesrin Barbat, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Paul Baskaron, Paul Baskaron, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Battir Oil Inc, Battir Oil Inc, Battir Oil Inc, Battir Oil Inc, Younes Dobli Bennani, Younes Dobli Bennani, Younes Dobli Bennani, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown, Denise Brown, Denise Brown, Denise Brown, Denise Brown, Cal Coast Inc, Cal Coast Inc, Cal Coast Inc, Cal Coast Inc, Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Rafael Castillo, Rafael Castillo, Rafael Castillo, Rafael Castillo, Rafael Castillo, Chase Products Inc, Chase Products Inc, Chase Products Inc, Chase Products Inc, Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin, Susan Shen Chin, Susan Shen Chin, Susan Shen Chin, Susan Shen Chin, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Issa T Demes, Issa T Demes, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Dream Petroleum, Inc., Dream Petroleum, Inc., Dream Petroleum, Inc., Dream Petroleum, Inc., Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Ibrahim Ghallab, Ibrahim Ghallab, Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Maret Golnazarian, Maret Golnazarian, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, H&O Inc, H&O Inc, H&O Inc, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, HRMP Corp, HRMP Corp, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Hadaf Inc, Hadaf Inc, Hadaf Inc, Hadaf Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Basel Hassounch, Basel Hassounch, Basel Hassounch, I and M Oil Inc, I and M Oil Inc, I and M Oil Inc, I and M Oil Inc, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Rafwant Jafal, Rafwant Jafal, Rafwant Jafal, Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., K & T Park79, Inc., K & T Park79, Inc., K & T Park79, Inc., K & T Park79, Inc., K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj, Parshotam Kamboj, Parshotam Kamboj, Parshotam Kamboj, Parshotam Kamboj, Mohammad Kaskas, Mohammad Kaskas, Mohammad Kaskas, Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Omer Kassa, Omer Kassa, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, Sahar Kermiz, Sahar Kermiz, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, William Kermiz, William Kermiz, William Kermiz, Bahman Kianmahd, Bahman Kianmahd, Bahman Kianmahd, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, Kalur S Kishan, Kalur S Kishan, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, MDA Fuel Inc, MDA Fuel Inc, MDA Fuel Inc, MDA Fuel Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Ammar Maaytah, Ammar Maaytah, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Tarun Maitra, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Salah Mazloum, Salah Mazloum, Salah Mazloum, Ani Mirzaian, Ani Mirzaian, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Liliana Monteagudo, Liliana Monteagudo, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NP Petroleum Corp, NP Petroleum Corp, NP Petroleum Corp, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, NRRM Corp, NRRM Corp, NRRM Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Senan F Naoum, Senan F Naoum, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Anit P.K. Natt, Anit P.K. Natt, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt, Gagan Natt, Gagan Natt, Gagan Natt, Gagan Natt, Gagan Natt, PB Inc, PB Inc, PB Inc, PB Inc, PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, David A Parker, David A Parker, David A Parker, David A Parker, Anup Patel, Anup Patel, Anup Patel, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Perfect Fuel Inc, Perfect Fuel Inc, Perfect Fuel Inc, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Tigran Pogosyan, Tigran Pogosyan, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Soma Prasad, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, Muna Quasqas, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, R P Oil Inc, R P Oil Inc, R P Oil Inc, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Mostafa Rahgozar, Mostafa Rahgozar, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Rahgozar Inc, Rahgozar Inc, Rahgozar Inc, Rahgozar Inc, Rasna LLC, Rasna LLC, Rasna LLC, Rasna LLC, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, Ruchisys Inc, Ruchisys Inc, Ruchisys Inc, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, S M O Oil Inc, S M O Oil Inc, S M O Oil Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Nader Sahih, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Payam Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Hy E Sao, Hy E Sao, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Meng E Sao, Meng E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Sonal Shah, Sonal Shah, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Yogesh Shah, Yogesh Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Aly Shakankiry, Aly Shakankiry, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Claude Shamaah, Claude Shamaah, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Shamaah Inc, Shamaah Inc, Shamaah Inc, Shamaah Inc, Ruchira Sharma, Ruchira Sharma, Ruchira Sharma, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Hamza Shilleh, Hamza Shilleh, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Shomers Group LLC, Shomers Group LLC, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, Vache Simonyan, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, South West Petroleum LLC, South West Petroleum LLC, South West Petroleum LLC, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Southland Petroleum Inc, Southland Petroleum Inc, Southland Petroleum Inc, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Taftan Incorporated, Taftan Incorporated, Taftan Incorporated, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Kevin Tapia, Kevin Tapia, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Sheela Thomas, Sheela Thomas, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, Brittany L Torres, Brittany L Torres, Brittany L Torres, United Family LLC, United Family LLC, United Family LLC, United Family LLC, United Family LLC, Vasaya Oil Co., Inc., Vasaya Oil Co., Inc., Vasaya Oil Co., Inc., Vasaya Oil Co., Inc., 2United Oil LLC, 2United Oil LLC, 2United Oil LLC, 2United Oil LLC, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., 3 Star Management, Inc., 3 Star Management, Inc., 3 Star Management, Inc., 3 Star Management, Inc., 3 Star Management, Inc., Kotsai Wang, Kotsai Wang, Kotsai Wang, Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, Ara Wansikehian, Ara Wansikehian, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, Jerry Zomorodian, Jerry Zomorodian, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Marie Zorenkelian, Marie Zorenkelian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Defendants Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Francois Alvandi, Rajesh Arora, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Cal Coast Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, Basel Hassounch, Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, David A Parker, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Brittany L Torres, United Family LLC, Ara Wansikehian, Ara Wansikehian
August 28, 2015 Filing 457 MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Francois Alvandi, Khaja Ansari(Individually and ), Rajesh Arora, Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Farideh Behmard, Medhi Behmard, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin(Individually and ), Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Basel Hassounch, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj(Individually and ), Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, David A Parker, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, United Family LLC, Vasaya Oil Co., Inc., 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian. (Schiller, David)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ORDER Denying Without Prejudice #429 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 8/27/2015. (jao) (kcm).
August 21, 2015 Filing 455 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by BP West Coast Products LLC of case(s) BC583564 filed in Los Angeles Superior Court. (Lynch, Adriene) No LNO prepared, related case in sates court (jao).
August 17, 2015 Filing 454 DECLARATION of Alexander S. Gareeb by Defendant Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc. (Gareeb, Alexander)
August 17, 2015 Filing 453 DECLARATION of Fadi K. Rasheed by Defendant Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc. (Gareeb, Alexander)
August 17, 2015 Filing 452 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Francois Alvandi, Khaja Ansari(Individually and ), Rajesh Arora, Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin(Individually and ), Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Basel Hassounch, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj(Individually and ), Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, David A Parker, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, United Family LLC, Vasaya Oil Co., Inc., 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., A Fine Enterprise & Company Inc., Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian. (Schiller, David)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #446 MOTION for Sanctions Against Southland, MK Oil, and Pacific Expotech, #447 MOTION for Sanctions Against Chase Products, David Parker, Parshotam Kamboj, Cal Coast, Vasaya Oil, and Sharina Alloush, #448 MOTION for Sanctions Against Schiller Defendants : Responses due by 8/27/2015. Replies due by 9/3/2015. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/12/2015.(jao)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/17/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. No later than August 27, 2015, Gareeb and Schiller shall file separate statements of cause why sanctions should not be imposed for (1) Gareeb's failure to appear and (2) Schiller's failure to comply with the Court's July 9, 2015 Order in its entirety. Any reply is to be filed on or before September 3, 2015. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/12/2015.(jao)
August 12, 2015 Filing 449 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janis L. Sammartino : Status Hearing held; No appearances made by defendants; Order to Show Cause Hearing re Sanctions set for 9/17/2015 01:30 PM before Judge Janis L. Sammartino (Court Reporter/ECR Frank Rangus / CRD A Ramos / Plaintiff Attorney Abby L. Risner) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (acr)
August 10, 2015 Filing 448 MOTION for Sanctions Against Schiller Defendants by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration A. Risner, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26)(Risner, Abby) (jao).
August 10, 2015 Filing 447 MOTION for Sanctions Against Chase Products, David Parker, Parshotam Kamboj, Cal Coast, Vasaya Oil, and Sharina Alloush by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration A. Risner, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26)(Risner, Abby) (jao).
August 10, 2015 Filing 446 MOTION for Sanctions Against Southland, MK Oil, and Pacific Expotech by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration A. Risner, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26)(Risner, Abby) (jao).
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #438 Motion to Extend Court's Order Docket 435 and Discovery Deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 7/24/2015. (jao)
July 23, 2015 Filing 444 DECLARATION of Nicole Hajjar by Defendants Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc. (Gareeb, Alexander) (jao).
July 23, 2015 Filing 443 DECLARATION of Alexander Gareeb by Defendants Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc. (Gareeb, Alexander) (jao).
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER Granting #441 Joint Motion to Change Status Hearing Date. Status Hearing reset for 8/12/2015 09:30 AM before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/17/2015. (jao)
July 17, 2015 Filing 441 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #437 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (jao).
July 16, 2015 Filing 440 RESPONSE in Opposition re #438 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Risner, #2 Appendix A)(Risner, Abby) (jao).
July 16, 2015 Filing 439 DECLARATION re #438 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Counter Claimants Habib Alam, Habib Alam, Habib Alam, Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Manal Alam, Manal Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush, Sharina Alloush, Sharina Alloush, Sharina Alloush, Sharina Alloush, Francois Alvandi, Francois Alvandi, Francois Alvandi, Francois Alvandi, Khaja Ansari, Khaja Ansari, Khaja Ansari, Khaja Ansari, Khaja Ansari, Rajesh Arora, Rajesh Arora, Rajesh Arora, Rajesh Arora, Awans Enterprises Inc, Awans Enterprises Inc, Awans Enterprises Inc, Awans Enterprises Inc, Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Heidi Bahmani, Heidi Bahmani, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Bahman Baktar, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Nesrin Barbat, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Paul Baskaron, Paul Baskaron, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Battir Oil Inc, Battir Oil Inc, Battir Oil Inc, Battir Oil Inc, Younes Dobli Bennani, Younes Dobli Bennani, Younes Dobli Bennani, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown, Denise Brown, Denise Brown, Denise Brown, Denise Brown, Cal Coast Inc, Cal Coast Inc, Cal Coast Inc, Cal Coast Inc, Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Rafael Castillo, Rafael Castillo, Rafael Castillo, Rafael Castillo, Rafael Castillo, Chase Products Inc, Chase Products Inc, Chase Products Inc, Chase Products Inc, Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin, Susan Shen Chin, Susan Shen Chin, Susan Shen Chin, Susan Shen Chin, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Issa T Demes, Issa T Demes, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Dream Petroleum, Inc., Dream Petroleum, Inc., Dream Petroleum, Inc., Dream Petroleum, Inc., Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Ibrahim Ghallab, Ibrahim Ghallab, Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Maret Golnazarian, Maret Golnazarian, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, H&O Inc, H&O Inc, H&O Inc, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, HRMP Corp, HRMP Corp, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Hadaf Inc, Hadaf Inc, Hadaf Inc, Hadaf Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Basel Hassounch, Basel Hassounch, Basel Hassounch, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Rafwant Jafal, Rafwant Jafal, Rafwant Jafal, Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., K & T Park79, Inc., K & T Park79, Inc., K & T Park79, Inc., K & T Park79, Inc., K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj, Parshotam Kamboj, Parshotam Kamboj, Parshotam Kamboj, Parshotam Kamboj, Mohammad Kaskas, Mohammad Kaskas, Mohammad Kaskas, Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Omer Kassa, Omer Kassa, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, Sahar Kermiz, Sahar Kermiz, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, William Kermiz, William Kermiz, William Kermiz, Bahman Kianmahd, Bahman Kianmahd, Bahman Kianmahd, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, Kalur S Kishan, Kalur S Kishan, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, MDA Fuel Inc, MDA Fuel Inc, MDA Fuel Inc, MDA Fuel Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Ammar Maaytah, Ammar Maaytah, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Tarun Maitra, Tarun Maitra, Ani Mirzaian, Ani Mirzaian, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Liliana Monteagudo, Liliana Monteagudo, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NP Petroleum Corp, NP Petroleum Corp, NP Petroleum Corp, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, NRRM Corp, NRRM Corp, NRRM Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Senan F Naoum, Senan F Naoum, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Anit P.K. Natt, Anit P.K. Natt, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt, Gagan Natt, Gagan Natt, Gagan Natt, Gagan Natt, Gagan Natt, PB Inc, PB Inc, PB Inc, PB Inc, PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, David A Parker, David A Parker, David A Parker, David A Parker, Anup Patel, Anup Patel, Anup Patel, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Perfect Fuel Inc, Perfect Fuel Inc, Perfect Fuel Inc, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Tigran Pogosyan, Tigran Pogosyan, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Soma Prasad, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, Muna Quasqas, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, R P Oil Inc, R P Oil Inc, R P Oil Inc, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Mostafa Rahgozar, Mostafa Rahgozar, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Rahgozar Inc, Rahgozar Inc, Rahgozar Inc, Rahgozar Inc, Rasna LLC, Rasna LLC, Rasna LLC, Rasna LLC, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, Ruchisys Inc, Ruchisys Inc, Ruchisys Inc, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, S M O Oil Inc, S M O Oil Inc, S M O Oil Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Nader Sahih, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Payam Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Hy E Sao, Hy E Sao, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Meng E Sao, Meng E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Sonal Shah, Sonal Shah, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Yogesh Shah, Yogesh Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Aly Shakankiry, Aly Shakankiry, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Claude Shamaah, Claude Shamaah, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Shamaah Inc, Shamaah Inc, Shamaah Inc, Shamaah Inc, Ruchira Sharma, Ruchira Sharma, Ruchira Sharma, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Hamza Shilleh, Hamza Shilleh, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Shomers Group LLC, Shomers Group LLC, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, Vache Simonyan, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, South West Petroleum LLC, South West Petroleum LLC, South West Petroleum LLC, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Southland Petroleum Inc, Southland Petroleum Inc, Southland Petroleum Inc, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Taftan Incorporated, Taftan Incorporated, Taftan Incorporated, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Kevin Tapia, Kevin Tapia, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Sheela Thomas, Sheela Thomas, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, Brittany L Torres, Brittany L Torres, Brittany L Torres, United Family LLC, United Family LLC, United Family LLC, United Family LLC, United Family LLC, Vasaya Oil Co., Inc., Vasaya Oil Co., Inc., Vasaya Oil Co., Inc., Vasaya Oil Co., Inc., 2United Oil LLC, 2United Oil LLC, 2United Oil LLC, 2United Oil LLC, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., 3 Star Management, Inc., 3 Star Management, Inc., 3 Star Management, Inc., 3 Star Management, Inc., 3 Star Management, Inc., Kotsai Wang, Kotsai Wang, Kotsai Wang, Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, Ara Wansikehian, Ara Wansikehian, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, Jerry Zomorodian, Jerry Zomorodian, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Marie Zorenkelian, Marie Zorenkelian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Defendants Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Francois Alvandi, Rajesh Arora, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Cal Coast Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, Basel Hassounch, Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, David A Parker, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Brittany L Torres, United Family LLC, Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Consol Plaintiffs Sharina Alloush,
July 16, 2015 Filing 438 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Francois Alvandi, Khaja Ansari(Individually and ), Rajesh Arora, Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Farideh Behmard, Medhi Behmard, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin(Individually and ), Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Basel Hassounch, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj(Individually and ), Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, David A Parker, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, United Family LLC, Vasaya Oil Co., Inc., 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian. (Schiller, David)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 437 ORDER Setting Status Hearing. The Court sets this matter for a status hearing on July 27, 2015 at 9:30 A.M. in Courtoom 4A. On or before July 22, 2015, Alexander Gareeb and David Schiller shall file a declaration with respect to the issues in the Order. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/9/2015.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(vam)
July 7, 2015 Filing 436 MINUTE ORDER: On July 7, 2015, Plaintiff BPWCP's counsel contacted the Court to seek the Court's assistance in placing a joint call with counsel for the Schiller Defendants and in resolving discovery disputes between Plaintiff and the Schiller Defendants. BPWCP's counsel requested briefing. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall promptly and thoroughly, and by no later than July 16, 2015, complete in-person meet and confer(s) over the aforementioned discovery disputes. No later than July 10, 2015, BPWCP shall provide Defendants Chase Products, Inc., David Parker, Vasaya Oil Co., Inc., Parshotamharshoda Kamboj, Cal Coast Inc., and Sharina Alloush, the detailed fee and cost invoices supporting BPWCP's reasonable fees and costs incurred for these defendants' non-appearances. By July 17, 2015 at 3:30 PM, counsel for the Schiller Defendants and BPWCP shall place a joint call to chambers to advise the court of the nature of any remaining dispute(s) and the need for Court involvement. The Court tentatively sets August 6, 2015 at 10:00 AM as the date and time for an in-person hearing on any motion(s) then pending before Judge Burkhardt. Signed by the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 7/8/2015.(aef)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part #401 , #402 , #403 Plaintiff BPWCP's Motions Seeking Default, Dismissal, and Other Sanctions Against Defendants Pacific Expotech, Southland Petroleum, and MK Oil. The Court enters the following order GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Plaintiff's Motions (ECF Nos. 401, 402, 403). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. BPWCP's motions, to the extent they seek non-dispositive sanctions under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37, are GRANTED as follows: a. Defendants Pacific Expotech, Southland Petroleum, and MK Oil shall make themselves available for deposition by July 17, 2015 at the offices of Alston & Bird in Los Angeles. b. By July 31, 2015, Defendants Pacific Expotech, Southland Petroleum, and MK Oil, through their counsel, shall reimburse BPWCP for its reasonable fees and costs incurred for their non appearance at their properly noticed depositions. No later than July 9, 2015. BPWCP shall provide Defendants, through their counsel, the detailed fee and cost invoices supporting the amounts set forth in paragraph 52 of the Supplemental Declaration of Abby L. Risner in Support of BPWCP's motions. Further, the parties shall promptly and thoroughly, and by no later than July 16, 2015, complete in-person meet and confer(s) over any disputed fees and costs. If the parties are unable to resolve their disputes through the meet and confer process, parties should place a joint call to chambers to advise the court of the nature of the dispute(s) and the need for Court involvement no later than July 17, 2015. Unless the court directs otherwise, if as of July 31, 2015 the parties have not filed (i) a notice of stipulation concerning the amount owed, or (ii) a timely and properly filed motion seeking court resolution of the amount owed to BPWCP, then the Court's order is that Defendant Pacific Expotech shall reimburse BPWCP in the amount of $4,982.05, Defendant Southland Petroleum shall reimburse BPWCP in the amount of $4,578.30, and Defendant MK Oil shall reimburse BPWCP in the amount of $4,482.13. Finally, Defendants Pacific Expotech, Southland Petroleum, and MK Oil shall each file a Notice of Compliance within three court days of payment to BPWCP. 2. BPWCP's motions are otherwise DENIED to the extent they seek an order, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37, granting a default judgment in favor of BPWCP and against Defendants Pacific Expotech, Southland Petroleum, and MK Oil. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 7/7/2015. (aef)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 434 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt Rejecting re #433 MOTION for Default Judgment against Chase Products Inc. and David Parker , from Plaintiff BP West Coast Products LLC. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Counsel placed a joint call to chambers on 6/26/2015, but did not receive court permission to file a motion before Judge Burkhardt. Please review and comply with Judge Burkhardt's civil chamber rules prior to filing. Counsel shall place a joint call to chambers if the discovery dispute raised on 6/26/2015 remains outstanding. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 7/6/2015.(aef) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/6/2015: #1 Rejected Document) (aef).
June 26, 2015 Filing 433 ****DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ENTRY #434 **** - MOTION for Default Judgment against Chase Products Inc. and David Parker by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of A. Risner, # 3 Appendix A, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9)(Risner, Abby) (jao). Modified on 7/6/2015-to strike document (aef). (Main Document 433 replaced on 7/6/2015) (aef).
June 22, 2015 Filing 432 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of BP West Coast Products LLC against Ambartsumyan Corporation, Armen Ambartsumyan. It is hereby ordered and adjudged that the Court hereby enters default judgment against Defendants Armen Ambartsumyan and Ambartsumyan Corporation on BP's operative fifth amended complaint and awards BP reasonable attorney's fees and costs in bringing this motion and in litigating the claims against Armen Ambartsumyan and Ambartsumyan Corporation.(jao)
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER Granting #342 BP's Motion for Default Judgment and Request for Sanctions. The Court hereby enters default judgment against Defendants Armen Ambartsumyan and Ambartsumyan Corporation on BP's operative fifth amended complaint and awards BP reasonable attorney's fees and costs in bringing this motion and in litigating the claims against Armen Ambartsumyan and Ambartsumyan Corporation. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/22/2015. (jao)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 430 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt Rejecting re #427 Notice (Other), from Plaintiff BP West Coast Products LLC. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Time and date on the motion and/or supporting documentation not authorized as to the documents filed, Please review and comply with Section IV of Magistrate Judge Burkhardts civil chambers rules prior to filing discovery dispute determination papers. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 6/17/2015.(jao)
June 16, 2015 Filing 429 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Associated with Motions to Compel Discovery Against Schiller Defendants by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration A. Risner, #2 Exhibit 1)(Risner, Abby) (jao).
June 16, 2015 Filing 428 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Toros Zorenkelian. (Gareeb, Alexander)
June 11, 2015 Filing 427 **Document Stricken** NOTICE by BP West Coast Products LLC re #411 Order on Motion to Compel, #404 Order on Motion to Compel of Non-Compliance (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Risner, Abby) (aef). (Main Document 427 replaced on 6/17/2015) (jao).
June 5, 2015 Filing 426 REPLY to Response to Motion re #401 MOTION for Default Judgment against Pacific Expotech Petro Mart, Inc. filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration A. Risner, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Risner, Abby) (jao).
June 5, 2015 Filing 425 REPLY to Response to Motion re #402 MOTION for Default Judgment against Southland Petroleum, Inc. filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration A. Risner, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Risner, Abby) (jao).
June 5, 2015 Filing 424 REPLY to Response to Motion re #403 MOTION for Default Judgment against MK Oil Inc. filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration A. Risner, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Risner, Abby) (jao).
June 4, 2015 Filing 423 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/4/2015. (Plaintiff Attorney Abby L. Risner; Juliane M. Rodriguez). (Defendant Attorney David A. Schiller; Troy Martin Mueller). (no document attached) (smm)
June 3, 2015 Filing 422 DECLARATION re #421 Order on Motion to Compel by Counter Claimants Habib Alam, Habib Alam, Habib Alam, Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Manal Alam, Manal Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush, Sharina Alloush, Sharina Alloush, Sharina Alloush, Sharina Alloush, Francois Alvandi, Francois Alvandi, Francois Alvandi, Francois Alvandi, Khaja Ansari, Khaja Ansari, Khaja Ansari, Khaja Ansari, Khaja Ansari, Rajesh Arora, Rajesh Arora, Rajesh Arora, Rajesh Arora, Awans Enterprises Inc, Awans Enterprises Inc, Awans Enterprises Inc, Awans Enterprises Inc, Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Heidi Bahmani, Heidi Bahmani, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Bahman Baktar, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Nesrin Barbat, Nesrin Barbat, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Paul Baskaron, Paul Baskaron, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Battir Oil Inc, Battir Oil Inc, Battir Oil Inc, Battir Oil Inc, Younes Dobli Bennani, Younes Dobli Bennani, Younes Dobli Bennani, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown, Denise Brown, Denise Brown, Denise Brown, Denise Brown, Cal Coast Inc, Cal Coast Inc, Cal Coast Inc, Cal Coast Inc, Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Rafael Castillo, Rafael Castillo, Rafael Castillo, Rafael Castillo, Rafael Castillo, Chase Products Inc, Chase Products Inc, Chase Products Inc, Chase Products Inc, Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin, Susan Shen Chin, Susan Shen Chin, Susan Shen Chin, Susan Shen Chin, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Issa T Demes, Issa T Demes, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Dream Petroleum, Inc., Dream Petroleum, Inc., Dream Petroleum, Inc., Dream Petroleum, Inc., Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Ibrahim Ghallab, Ibrahim Ghallab, Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Maret Golnazarian, Maret Golnazarian, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, H&O Inc, H&O Inc, H&O Inc, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, HRMP Corp, HRMP Corp, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Hadaf Inc, Hadaf Inc, Hadaf Inc, Hadaf Inc, Sylvia Haddadin, Sylvia Haddadin, Sylvia Haddadin, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Basel Hassounch, Basel Hassounch, Basel Hassounch, I and M Oil Inc, I and M Oil Inc, I and M Oil Inc, I and M Oil Inc, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Rafwant Jafal, Rafwant Jafal, Rafwant Jafal, Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., K & T Park79, Inc., K & T Park79, Inc., K & T Park79, Inc., K & T Park79, Inc., K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj, Parshotam Kamboj, Parshotam Kamboj, Parshotam Kamboj, Parshotam Kamboj, Mohammad Kaskas, Mohammad Kaskas, Mohammad Kaskas, Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Omer Kassa, Omer Kassa, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, Sahar Kermiz, Sahar Kermiz, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, William Kermiz, William Kermiz, William Kermiz, Bahman Kianmahd, Bahman Kianmahd, Bahman Kianmahd, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, Kalur S Kishan, Kalur S Kishan, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, MDA Fuel Inc, MDA Fuel Inc, MDA Fuel Inc, MDA Fuel Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Ammar Maaytah, Ammar Maaytah, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Tarun Maitra, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Salah Mazloum, Salah Mazloum, Salah Mazloum, Ani Mirzaian, Ani Mirzaian, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Liliana Monteagudo, Liliana Monteagudo, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NP Petroleum Corp, NP Petroleum Corp, NP Petroleum Corp, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, NRRM Corp, NRRM Corp, NRRM Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Senan F Naoum, Senan F Naoum, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Anit P.K. Natt, Anit P.K. Natt, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt, Gagan Natt, Gagan Natt, Gagan Natt, Gagan Natt, Gagan Natt, PB Inc, PB Inc, PB Inc, PB Inc, PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, David A Parker, David A Parker, David A Parker, David A Parker, Anup Patel, Anup Patel, Anup Patel, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Perfect Fuel Inc, Perfect Fuel Inc, Perfect Fuel Inc, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Tigran Pogosyan, Tigran Pogosyan, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Soma Prasad, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, Muna Quasqas, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, R P Oil Inc, R P Oil Inc, R P Oil Inc, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Mostafa Rahgozar, Mostafa Rahgozar, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Rahgozar Inc, Rahgozar Inc, Rahgozar Inc, Rahgozar Inc, Rasna LLC, Rasna LLC, Rasna LLC, Rasna LLC, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, Ruchisys Inc, Ruchisys Inc, Ruchisys Inc, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, S M O Oil Inc, S M O Oil Inc, S M O Oil Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Nader Sahih, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Payam Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Hy E Sao, Hy E Sao, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Meng E Sao, Meng E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Sonal Shah, Sonal Shah, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Yogesh Shah, Yogesh Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Aly Shakankiry, Aly Shakankiry, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Claude Shamaah, Claude Shamaah, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Shamaah Inc, Shamaah Inc, Shamaah Inc, Shamaah Inc, Ruchira Sharma, Ruchira Sharma, Ruchira Sharma, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Hamza Shilleh, Hamza Shilleh, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Shomers Group LLC, Shomers Group LLC, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, Vache Simonyan, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, South West Petroleum LLC, South West Petroleum LLC, South West Petroleum LLC, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Southland Petroleum Inc, Southland Petroleum Inc, Southland Petroleum Inc, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Taftan Incorporated, Taftan Incorporated, Taftan Incorporated, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Kevin Tapia, Kevin Tapia, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Sheela Thomas, Sheela Thomas, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, Brittany L Torres, Brittany L Torres, Brittany L Torres, United Family LLC, United Family LLC, United Family LLC, United Family LLC, United Family LLC, Vasaya Oil Co., Inc., Vasaya Oil Co., Inc., Vasaya Oil Co., Inc., Vasaya Oil Co., Inc., 2United Oil LLC, 2United Oil LLC, 2United Oil LLC, 2United Oil LLC, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., 3 Star Management, Inc., 3 Star Management, Inc., 3 Star Management, Inc., 3 Star Management, Inc., 3 Star Management, Inc., Kotsai Wang, Kotsai Wang, Kotsai Wang, Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, Ara Wansikehian, Ara Wansikehian, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, Jerry Zomorodian, Jerry Zomorodian, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Marie Zorenkelian, Marie Zorenkelian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Defendants Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Francois Alvandi, Rajesh Arora, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Cal Coast Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, Sylvia Haddadin, Basel Hassounch, Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, David A Parker, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thom
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER Granting #382 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to Discovery Set Nos. 2 and 3 Against Schiller Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 6/2/2015. (jao)
June 1, 2015 Filing 420 DECLARATION re #419 Objection, by Counter Claimants Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Southland Petroleum Inc, Southland Petroleum Inc, Southland Petroleum Inc, Southland Petroleum Inc, Southland Petroleum Inc, Consol Plaintiffs Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Southland Petroleum Inc. (Schiller, David) (jao).
June 1, 2015 Filing 419 OBJECTION by Southland Petroleum Inc re #402 MOTION for Default Judgment against Southland Petroleum, Inc. , #401 MOTION for Default Judgment against Pacific Expotech Petro Mart, Inc. , #403 MOTION for Default Judgment against MK Oil Inc. . (Schiller, David) (jao).
June 1, 2015 Filing 418 DECLARATION re #416 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Consol Plaintiff Southland Petroleum Inc, Counter Claimants Southland Petroleum Inc, Southland Petroleum Inc, Southland Petroleum Inc, Southland Petroleum Inc, Southland Petroleum Inc. (Schiller, David) (jao).
June 1, 2015 Filing 417 DECLARATION re #416 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Consol Plaintiff Southland Petroleum Inc, Counter Claimants Southland Petroleum Inc, Southland Petroleum Inc, Southland Petroleum Inc, Southland Petroleum Inc, Southland Petroleum Inc. (Schiller, David) (jao).
June 1, 2015 Filing 416 RESPONSE in Opposition re #402 MOTION for Default Judgment against Southland Petroleum, Inc. , #401 MOTION for Default Judgment against Pacific Expotech Petro Mart, Inc. , #403 MOTION for Default Judgment against MK Oil Inc. filed by Southland Petroleum Inc. (Schiller, David) (jao).
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER granting in part #341 #383 Motions to Compel Against Defendants Meetra, Inc., Mehdi Behmard, and Farideh Behmard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 6/1/2015. (jao)
May 29, 2015 Filing 414 MINUTE ORDER Granting #413 Motion to Amend. The Court hereby grants Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant BP West Coast Products LLC's Motion to Correct Discovery Orders (ECF No. 413), filed pursuant to Rule 60(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Court's discovery orders entered at ECF. Nos. 404, 411, and 412 on the docket for this case are hereby corrected to reflect the complete list of the Schiller Group Defendants subject to those orders. Accordingly, footnote 1 of ECF Nos. 404, 411, and 412 are amended. (jao)
May 29, 2015 Filing 413 MOTION to Amend/Correct #411 Order on Motion to Compel, #412 Order on Motion to Compel, #404 Order on Motion to Compel by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Risner, Abby) (jao).
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER granting #340 Motion to Compel Responses to Request for Admissions Against Schiller Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 5/28/2015. (jao)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #339 Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Sanctions Against Schiller Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 5/28/2015. (jao)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt granting (Doc. No. #408 ) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #402 MOTION for Default Judgment against Southland Petroleum, Inc. , #401 MOTION for Default Judgment against Pacific Expotech Petro Mart, Inc. , #403 MOTION for Default Judgment against MK Oil Inc. Responses due by 6/1/2015 Replies due by 6/5/2015. Motions Hearing date RESET from 6/4/2015 to 6/18/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1D before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing.However, unless the Court directs otherwise in advance of the hearing date, pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.d.1., this matter will be resolved without oral argument and no personal appearances on the hearing date should be made. This order does not otherwise alter the requirements of the Court's 5/12/2015 order (Doc. No. #398 ). (no document attached) (smm)
May 27, 2015 Filing 409 NON Opposition re #342 MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Ambartsumyan Corp. and Armen Ambartsumyan filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (jao).
May 26, 2015 Filing 408 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #402 MOTION for Default Judgment against Southland Petroleum, Inc. , #401 MOTION for Default Judgment against Pacific Expotech Petro Mart, Inc. , #403 MOTION for Default Judgment against MK Oil Inc. by Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Southland Petroleum Inc. (Schiller, David) (jao).
May 21, 2015 Filing 407 NON Opposition re #403 MOTION for Default Judgment against MK Oil Inc. filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (jao).
May 21, 2015 Filing 406 NON Opposition re #402 MOTION for Default Judgment against Southland Petroleum, Inc. filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (jao).
May 21, 2015 Filing 405 NON Opposition re #401 MOTION for Default Judgment against Pacific Expotech Petro Mart, Inc. filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (jao).
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #338 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions and to Compel Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 5/19/2015. (jao)
May 15, 2015 Filing 403 MOTION for Default Judgment against MK Oil Inc. by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of A. Risner)(Risner, Abby) (jao).
May 15, 2015 Filing 402 MOTION for Default Judgment against Southland Petroleum, Inc. by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of A. Risner)(Risner, Abby) (jao).
May 15, 2015 Filing 401 MOTION for Default Judgment against Pacific Expotech Petro Mart, Inc. by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of A. Risner)(Risner, Abby) (jao).
May 15, 2015 Filing 400 SANCTIONS PAYMENT RECEIVED. A payment against a Court issued sanction has been made. A copy of the receipt is attached. (sxr)
May 13, 2015 Filing 399 REPLY to Response to Motion re #382 MOTION to Compel Responses to Discovery Set Nos. 2 and 3 Against Schiller Defendants filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of A. Risner)(Risner, Abby) Mailer sent on 5/14/2015 re signature(jao).
May 12, 2015 Filing 398 MINUTE ORDER. On March 11, 2015, counsel for Plaintiff (Abby L. Risner, Esq.) and the Schiller Group Defendants (Alexander S. Gareeb, Esq.) jointly contacted Magistrate Judge Burkhardt's chambers regarding the need for court resolution of certain discovery disputes. Having been advised of the nature of the discovery disputes, the Court will accept a motion concerning the discovery disputes pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure without first requiring an informal discovery conference. This order sets out a briefing schedule and hearing date for a motion seeking to resolve the discovery disputes: The deadline for Plaintiff to file its motion is May 15, 2015 at 5PM. The motion shall be no more than five pages, exclusive of exhibits. Defendants shall file a single opposition to any motion brought against them on or before May 20, 2015 at 5PM. The opposition shall be no more than five pages, exclusive of exhibits. Counsel should not attach copies of any meet and confer correspondence. Plaintiff shall file its reply to the opposition on or before May 22, 2015 at 5PM. The reply brief shall be no more than two pages, exclusive of exhibits. Counsel should not attach copies of any meet and confer correspondence. For purposes of complying with CivLR 5.1.j.4., a hearing date of June 4, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. is assigned. Counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing. However, unless the Court directs otherwise in advance of the hearing date, pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.d.1., this matter will be resolved without oral argument and no personal appearances on the hearing date should be made. If oral argument is requested by the Court, then it will be held in Courtroom 1D, on the first floor of the Edward J. Schwartz U.S. Courthouse.(jao)
May 11, 2015 Filing 397 RESPONSE in Opposition re #382 MOTION to Compel Responses to Discovery Set Nos. 2 and 3 Against Schiller Defendants filed by Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Francois Alvandi, Khaja Ansari(Individually and ), Rajesh Arora, Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Farideh Behmard, Medhi Behmard, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin(Individually and ), Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Basel Hassounch, Silva Hilalian, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj(Individually and ), Moshail S. Kamel, Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, David A Parker, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian. (Schiller, David) (jao).
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER granting (Doc. No. #387 ) Named Guarantors/Dealer Defendants' Motion to Extend Time to Respond to BP's 2nd Motion to Compel. The deadline to respond is RESET to 5/11/2015. (no document attached) (smm)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER Granting #394 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael C. Schroeder terminated as Counsel of Record for BP West Coast Products LLC. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/28/2015. (jao)
April 24, 2015 Filing 394 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration M. Schroeder)(Schroeder, Michael) (jao).
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER Granting #390 Motion to Substitute Attorney and Denying as Moot Attorney Timothy J. Ryan's Previous Motion to Withdraw re #363 #379 #388 . Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/20/2015. (jao)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER (1) Adopting Judge Burkhardt's Sanctions, (2) Reserving on BP's Motion for Default and Request fro Sanctions #342 , (3) Allowing Ambbartsumyan Defendants 30 Days to Find Counsel and Oppose the Motion for Default, and (4) Denying #362 Lim's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Court affirms Judge Burkhardt's sanctions against Lim. Accordingly, Julie C. Lim is hereby ordered to pay $1,000 to the Clerk of Court on or before May 11, 2015. Lim shall file a Notice of Payment by May 15, 2015 verifying that the sanction was paid. Additionally, the Court reserves on BP's Motion for Default and Sanctions and orders Ambartsumyan to retain counsel and respond to BP's Motion within 30 days from which this Order is electronically docketed. Ambartsumyan is hereby warned that failure to respond could result in sanctions, including the Court granting Default Judgment against them in this matter. Lastly, the Court denies Lim's Motion to Withdraw absent evidence of service of the Motion to Ambartsumyan. The Court orders Attorney Lim to provide a copy of this Order to Ambartsumyan and to furnish Ambartsumyan's contact information to the Court. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/20/2015. (jao)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 391 Order by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: There will be no oral argument on 4/16/2015. The motions to compel are taken under submission. Motions Submitted: #383 MOTION to Compel Meetra, Inc., Mehdi Behmard and Farideh Behmard to Produce Documents Responsive to BPWCP's Requests for Documents Set No. 2, #382 MOTION to Compel Responses to Discovery Set Nos. 2 and 3 Against Schiller Defendants (no document attached) (smm)
April 13, 2015 Filing 390 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Abusham Petro LLC, Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Francois Alvandi, Rajesh Arora, Saad Y. Attisha, Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Susan Shen Chin(Individually and ), Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Basel Hassounch, Horizon Investment Group Inc, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj(Individually and ), Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, MDG Information Analysis Management Group LLC, MJS Engel No 1 Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, R P Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ryan, Timothy) (jao).
April 10, 2015 Filing 389 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Schiller on behalf of Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Francois Alvandi, Khaja Ansari(Individually and ), Rajesh Arora, Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Farideh Behmard, Medhi Behmard, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin(Individually and ), Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Basel Hassounch, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj(Individually and ), Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, David A Parker, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian (Schiller, David) (jao).
April 9, 2015 Filing 388 MOTION to Amend/Correct #363 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #379 MOTION to Amend/Correct #363 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Francois Alvandi, Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Susan Shen Chin(Individually and ), Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Basel Hassounch, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj(Individually and ), Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Omer Kassa, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, R P Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ryan, Timothy) (jao).
April 8, 2015 Filing 387 MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Francois Alvandi, Khaja Ansari(Individually and ), Rajesh Arora, Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Farideh Behmard, Medhi Behmard, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin(Individually and ), Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Basel Hassounch, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj(Individually and ), Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, David A Parker, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian. (Schiller, David)Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Habib Alam(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Habib Alam(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Habib Alam(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Habib Alam(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Habib Alam(pty:dft), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Habib Alam(pty:dft), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Habib Alam(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Habib Alam(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Habib Alam(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Habib Alam(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Manal Alam(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Manal Alam(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Manal Alam(pty:dft), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Manal Alam(pty:dft), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Manal Alam(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Manal Alam(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Manal Alam(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Manal Alam(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Manal Alam(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Manal Alam(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Francois Alvandi(pty:dft), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Francois Alvandi(pty:dft), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Francois Alvandi(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Francois Alvandi(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Francois Alvandi(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Francois Alvandi(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Francois Alvandi(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Francois Alvandi(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Francois Alvandi(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Francois Alvandi(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Rajesh Arora(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Rajesh Arora(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Rajesh Arora(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Rajesh Arora(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Rajesh Arora(pty:dft), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Rajesh Arora(pty:dft), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Rajesh Arora(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Rajesh Arora(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Rajesh Arora(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Rajesh Arora(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Heidi Bahmani(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Heidi Bahmani(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Heidi Bahmani(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Heidi Bahmani(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Heidi Bahmani(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Heidi Bahmani(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Heidi Bahmani(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Heidi Bahmani(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Heidi Bahmani(pty:dft), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Heidi Bahmani(pty:dft), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Mohammad Bahmani(pty:dft), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Mohammad Bahmani(pty:dft), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Mohammad Bahmani(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Mohammad Bahmani(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Mohammad Bahmani(pty:dft), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Mohammad Bahmani(pty:dft), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Mohammad Bahmani(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Mohammad Bahmani(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Mohammad Bahmani(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Mohammad Bahmani(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Mohammad Bahmani(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Mohammad Bahmani(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Bahman Baktar(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Bahman Baktar(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Bahman Baktar(pty:dft), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Bahman Baktar(pty:dft), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Bahman Baktar(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Bahman Baktar(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Bahman Baktar(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Bahman Baktar(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Nesrin Barbat(pty:dft), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Nesrin Barbat(pty:dft), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Nesrin Barbat(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Nesrin Barbat(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Nesrin Barbat(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Nesrin Barbat(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Nesrin Barbat(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Nesrin Barbat(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Nesrin Barbat(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Nesrin Barbat(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Salman D. Barbat(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Salman D. Barbat(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Paul Baskaron(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Paul Baskaron(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Paul Baskaron(pty:dft), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Paul Baskaron(pty:dft), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Paul Baskaron(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Paul Baskaron(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Paul Baskaron(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Paul Baskaron(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Paul Baskaron(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Paul Baskaron(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Battir Oil Inc(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Battir Oil Inc(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Farideh Behmard(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Farideh Behmard(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Farideh Behmard(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Farideh Behmard(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Farideh Behmard(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Farideh Behmard(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Farideh Behmard(pty:dft), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Farideh Behmard(pty:dft), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Farideh Behmard(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Farideh Behmard(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Medhi Behmard(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Medhi Behmard(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Medhi Behmard(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Medhi Behmard(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Medhi Behmard(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Medhi Behmard(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Medhi Behmard(pty:dft), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Medhi Behmard(pty:dft), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Medhi Behmard(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Medhi Behmard(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Younes Dobli Bennani(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Younes Dobli Bennani(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Younes Dobli Bennani(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Younes Dobli Bennani(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to
April 7, 2015 Filing 386 NON Opposition re #382 MOTION to Compel Responses to Discovery Set Nos. 2 and 3 Against Schiller Defendants filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Rodriguez, Juliane)(jao).
April 7, 2015 Filing 385 REPLY to Response to Motion re #383 MOTION to Compel Meetra, Inc., Mehdi Behmard and Farideh Behmard to Produce Documents Responsive to BPWCP's Requests for Documents Set No. 2 filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration A Risner)(Rodriguez, Juliane) (jao).
April 1, 2015 Filing 384 RESPONSE in Opposition re #383 MOTION to Compel Meetra, Inc., Mehdi Behmard and Farideh Behmard to Produce Documents Responsive to BPWCP's Requests for Documents Set No. 2 filed by Farideh Behmard, Medhi Behmard, Meetra Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Mueller, Troy) (jao).
March 31, 2015 Filing 383 MOTION to Compel Meetra, Inc., Mehdi Behmard and Farideh Behmard to Produce Documents Responsive to BPWCP's Requests for Documents Set No. 2 by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Abby L. Risner, #3 Exhibit No. 1, #4 Exhibit No. 2, #5 Exhibit No. 3)(Schroeder, Michael) (jao).
March 27, 2015 Filing 382 MOTION to Compel Responses to Discovery Set Nos. 2 and 3 Against Schiller Defendants by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Declaration A. Risner)(Schroeder, Michael) (jao).
March 26, 2015 Filing 381 MINUTE ORDER. On March 25, 2015, counsel for Plaintiff (Michael C. Schroeder, Esq.) and Defendants Meetra, Inc., Mehdi Behmard and Farideh Behmard (Troy Martin Mueller, Esq.) jointly contacted Magistrate Judge Burkhardts chambers regarding the need for court resolution of certain discovery disputes. The parties are directed to comply with Judge Burkhardt's Civil Chambers Rules regarding the meet and confer requirements. Having been advised of the nature of the discovery disputes, the Court will accept a motion concerning the discovery disputes pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure without first requiring an informal discovery conference. This order sets out a briefing schedule and hearing date for a motion seeking to resolve the discovery disputes. (jao)
March 24, 2015 Filing 380 REPLY to Response to Motion re #363 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , #379 MOTION to Amend/Correct #363 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Francois Alvandi, Khaja Ansari(Individually and ), Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin(Individually and ), Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Basel Hassounch, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj(Individually and ), Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, David A Parker, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian. (Ryan, Timothy)
March 24, 2015 Filing 379 MOTION to Amend/Correct #363 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Francois Alvandi, Khaja Ansari(Individually and ), Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin(Individually and ), Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Basel Hassounch, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj(Individually and ), Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, David A Parker, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ryan, Timothy)Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Denise Brown(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Denise Brown(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Cal Coast Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Cal Coast Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party K & T Park79, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party K & T Park79, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Parshotam Kamboj(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Parshotam Kamboj(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party R P Oil Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party R P Oil Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Rahgozar Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Rahgozar Inc(pty:cc)
March 19, 2015 Filing 378 MINUTE ORDER. On March 18, 2015, counsel for Plaintiff and the "Schiller Defendants" (see Ex. 1 to Joint Proposed Discovery Plan) jointly contacted Magistrate Judge Burkhardt's chambers to schedule an informal discovery conference to resolve discovery disputes. The parties are directed to comply with Judge Burkhardt's Civil Chambers Rules regarding the meet and confer requirements. Having been advised of the nature of the discovery disputes, the Court will accept a motion concerning the discovery disputes pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure without first requiring an informal discovery conference. This order sets out a briefing schedule and hearing date for a motion seeking to resolve the discovery disputes.(jao)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER granting (Doc. No. #373 ) Motion for Extension of Time for BPWCP to file discovery motions related to discovery propounded on or received from Defendants Meetra, Inc., Mehdi Behmard and Farideh Behmard. (no document attached) (smm)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt granting (Doc. No. #372 ) Motion for Extension of Time for BPWCP to file discovery motions related to discovery propounded or received from the Schiller Defendants. (no document attached) (smm)
March 18, 2015 Filing 375 NOTICE of Change of Address by David A. Schiller (Schiller, David) (jao).
March 18, 2015 Filing 374 NOTICE by Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian (Schiller, David)Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Jerry Zomorodian(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Jerry Zomorodian(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Jerry Zomorodian(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Jerry Zomorodian(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Jerry Zomorodian(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Jerry Zomorodian(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Jerry Zomorodian(pty:dft), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Jerry Zomorodian(pty:dft), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Jerry Zomorodian(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Jerry Zomorodian(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Rebecca Zomorodian(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Rebecca Zomorodian(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Rebecca Zomorodian(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Rebecca Zomorodian(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Rebecca Zomorodian(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Rebecca Zomorodian(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Rebecca Zomorodian(pty:dft), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Rebecca Zomorodian(pty:dft), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Rebecca Zomorodian(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Rebecca Zomorodian(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Marie Zorenkelian(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Marie Zorenkelian(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Marie Zorenkelian(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Marie Zorenkelian(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Marie Zorenkelian(pty:dft), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Marie Zorenkelian(pty:dft), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Marie Zorenkelian(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Marie Zorenkelian(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Marie Zorenkelian(pty:cc), Attorney David A. Schiller added to party Marie Zorenkelian(pty:cc) (jao).
March 17, 2015 Filing 373 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Motions Against Meetra, Inc., Mehdi Behmard and Farideh Behmard by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Schroeder, Michael) (jao).
March 13, 2015 Filing 372 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Motions Against Schiller Defendants by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (jao).
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 371 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt Rejecting re #368 MOTION to Compel Meetra, Inc., Mehdi Behmard and Farideh Behmard to Produce Documents in Response to BPWCP's Requests for Production of Documents Set No. 2, from Plaintiff BP West Coast Products LLC. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, Please review and comply with Section IV of Magistrate Judge Burkhardt's civil chambers rules prior to filing discovery dispute determination papers. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 3/13/2015.(jao)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER Approving Pro Hac Vice: Added attorney Juliane M. Rodriguez. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 03/10/2015.(ag)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER Approving Pro Hac Vice: Added attorney Michael C. Schroeder. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 03/10/2015.(ag)
March 9, 2015 Filing 368 **Document Stricken** MOTION to Compel Meetra, Inc., Mehdi Behmard and Farideh Behmard to Produce Documents in Response to BPWCP's Requests for Production of Documents Set No. 2 by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Declaration A. Risner)(Risner, Abby) (jao). (Main Document 368 replaced on 3/13/2015) (jao).
March 6, 2015 Filing 367 RESPONSE in Opposition re #363 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Risner in Opposition to Ryan's Motion to Withdraw)(Risner, Abby) (jao).
March 4, 2015 Filing 366 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-7860646.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Rodriguez, Juliane) (vam).
March 4, 2015 Filing 365 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-7860608.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Schroeder, Michael) (vam).
February 27, 2015 Filing 364 REPLY to Response to Motion re #342 MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Ambartsumyan Corp. and Armen Ambartsumyan filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration A. Risner)(Risner, Abby) (jao).
February 26, 2015 Filing 363 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Francois Alvandi, Khaja Ansari(Individually and ), Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Susan Shen Chin, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Basel Hassounch, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj, Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, R P Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian. (Ryan, Timothy)Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Battir Oil Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Battir Oil Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party California Fuel Dispensing Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party California Fuel Dispensing Inc(pty:cc) (jao).
February 24, 2015 Filing 362 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Armen Ambartsumyan, Ambartsumyan Corporation. (Lim, Julie)(jao).
February 24, 2015 Filing 361 REPLY re #342 MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Ambartsumyan Corp. and Armen Ambartsumyan filed by Armen Ambartsumyan, Ambartsumyan Corporation. (Lim, Julie) (jao).
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: There will be no oral argument on 2/24/2015. The motions to compel are taken under submission. Motions Submitted: MOTION to Compel Schiller Defendants' Requests for Production (Doc. No. #338 ), MOTION to Compel Schiller Defendants' Interrogatories (Doc. No. #339 ), MOTION to Compel Schiller Defendants' Requests for Admission (Doc. No. #340 ), MOTION to Compel Against Meetra, inc. (Requests for Production and Interrogatories) (Doc. No. #341 ). (no document attached) (smm)
February 13, 2015 Filing 359 REPLY to Response to Motion re #338 MOTION to Compel Schiller Defendants' Requests for Production filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration A. Risner)(Risner, Abby) (jao).
February 13, 2015 Filing 358 REPLY to Response to Motion re #341 MOTION to Compel Against Meetra, inc. (Requests for Production and Interrogatories) filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (jao).
February 13, 2015 Filing 357 REPLY to Response to Motion re #339 MOTION to Compel Schiller Defendants' Interrogatories filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration A. Risner)(Risner, Abby) (jao).
February 13, 2015 Filing 356 REPLY to Response to Motion re #340 MOTION to Compel Schiller Defendants' Requests for Admission filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration A. Risner)(Risner, Abby) (jao).
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: The Unopposed Motion to Grant Plaintiff Leave to Respond to Defendants' Mehdi Behmard, Farideh Behmed, and Meetra Inc.'s Interrogatories is GRANTED (Doc. No. #345 ). (no document attached) (smm)
February 10, 2015 Filing 354 RESPONSE in Opposition re #339 MOTION to Compel Schiller Defendants' Interrogatories filed by Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Francois Alvandi, Khaja Ansari(Individually and ), Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Susan Shen Chin(Individually and ), Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Basel Hassounch, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj(Individually and ), Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, R P Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Ryan, Timothy) (jao).
February 10, 2015 Filing 353 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Francois Alvandi, Khaja Ansari(Individually and ), Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., Battir Oil Inc, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Susan Shen Chin(Individually and ), Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Basel Hassounch, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj(Individually and ), Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, R P Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, AKM Oil Co Inc, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian re #348 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,, filed by 3 Star Management, Inc., 2United Oil LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, Liliana Monteagudo, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Shomers Group LLC, Rafwant Jafal, Shamaah Inc, United Family LLC, Tarun Maitra, Sonal Shah, Ruchisys Inc, Yogesh Shah, MDA Fuel Inc, HRMP Corp, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, K & T Park79, Inc., Kalur S Kishan, Sylvia Haddadin, Tahssen Kaskas, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Bahman Baktar, Brittany L Torres, Awans Enterprises Inc, Salman D. Barbat, Rasna LLC, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Khaja Ansari, Basel Hassounch, Claude Shamaah, S M O Oil Inc, Rebecca Zomorodian, Paul Baskaron, William Kermiz, Tigran Pogosyan, Ammar Maaytah, Mohammad Kaskas, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Vache Simonyan, Mostafa Rahgozar, Issa T Demes, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Mohammad Bahmani, Toros Zorenkelian, I and M Oil Inc, Kevin Tapia, Bahman Kianmahd, Sharina Alloush, Hy E Sao, Heidi Bahmani, Younes Dobli Bennani, Parshotam Kamboj, Southland Petroleum Inc, Anup Patel, Manal Alam, Habib Alam, Ibrahim Ghallab, Rafael Castillo, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Nesrin Barbat, Gagan Natt, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Ara Wansikehian, R P Oil Inc, Randa Maaytah, Behzad Kianmahd, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Rahgozar Inc, Marie Zorenkelian, Taftan Incorporated, Battir Oil Inc, Sahar Kermiz, Francois Alvandi, Susan Shen Chin, Tracy Tapia, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, NRRM Corp, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Anit P.K. Natt, Cal Coast Inc, PB Inc, Senan F Naoum, Jerry Zomorodian, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Meng E Sao, Aly Shakankiry, Omer Kassa, Hadaf Inc, Denise Brown, Maret Golnazarian, H&O Inc, Razmik Golnazarian, Perfect Fuel Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Westminster Mini Market Inc, AKM Oil Co Inc . (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Ryan, Timothy) (jao).
February 10, 2015 Filing 352 RESPONSE in Opposition re #340 MOTION to Compel Schiller Defendants' Requests for Admission filed by Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Francois Alvandi, Khaja Ansari(Individually and ), Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Susan Shen Chin(Individually and ), Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Basel Hassounch, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj(Individually and ), Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, R P Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Ryan, Timothy) (jao).
February 10, 2015 Filing 351 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Habib Alam, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Francois Alvandi, Khaja Ansari(Individually and ), Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., Battir Oil Inc, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Susan Shen Chin(Individually and ), Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Basel Hassounch, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj(Individually and ), Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, AKM Oil Co Inc, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian re #346 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,, filed by 3 Star Management, Inc., 2United Oil LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, Liliana Monteagudo, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Shomers Group LLC, Rafwant Jafal, Shamaah Inc, United Family LLC, Tarun Maitra, Sonal Shah, Ruchisys Inc, Yogesh Shah, MDA Fuel Inc, HRMP Corp, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, K & T Park79, Inc., Kalur S Kishan, Sylvia Haddadin, Tahssen Kaskas, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Bahman Baktar, Brittany L Torres, Awans Enterprises Inc, Salman D. Barbat, Rasna LLC, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Khaja Ansari, Basel Hassounch, Claude Shamaah, S M O Oil Inc, Rebecca Zomorodian, Paul Baskaron, Tigran Pogosyan, Ammar Maaytah, Mohammad Kaskas, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Vache Simonyan, Mostafa Rahgozar, Issa T Demes, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Mohammad Bahmani, Toros Zorenkelian, I and M Oil Inc, Kevin Tapia, Bahman Kianmahd, Sharina Alloush, Hy E Sao, Heidi Bahmani, Younes Dobli Bennani, Parshotam Kamboj, Southland Petroleum Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, Anup Patel, Habib Alam, Ibrahim Ghallab, Rafael Castillo, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Nesrin Barbat, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Gagan Natt, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Ara Wansikehian, R P Oil Inc, Randa Maaytah, Behzad Kianmahd, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Rahgozar Inc, Marie Zorenkelian, Taftan Incorporated, Battir Oil Inc, Francois Alvandi, Susan Shen Chin, Tracy Tapia, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Anit P.K. Natt, Cal Coast Inc, PB Inc, Senan F Naoum, Jerry Zomorodian, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Sayed Majid Tavabi, RP Oil Inc, Meng E Sao, Omer Kassa, Hadaf Inc, Denise Brown, Maret Golnazarian, H&O Inc, Razmik Golnazarian, Perfect Fuel Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Westminster Mini Market Inc, AKM Oil Co Inc . (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Ryan, Timothy) (jao).
February 10, 2015 Filing 350 RESPONSE in Opposition re #338 MOTION to Compel Schiller Defendants' Requests for Production filed by Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Francois Alvandi, Khaja Ansari(Individually and ), Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Susan Shen Chin(Individually and ), Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Basel Hassounch, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj(Individually and ), Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, R P Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Ryan, Timothy) (jao).
February 10, 2015 Filing 349 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Francois Alvandi, Khaja Ansari(Individually and ), Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., Battir Oil Inc, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Susan Shen Chin(Individually and ), Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Basel Hassounch, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj(Individually and ), Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, R P Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, AKM Oil Co Inc, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian re #347 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,, filed by 3 Star Management, Inc., 2United Oil LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, Liliana Monteagudo, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Shomers Group LLC, Rafwant Jafal, Shamaah Inc, United Family LLC, Tarun Maitra, Sonal Shah, Ruchisys Inc, Yogesh Shah, MDA Fuel Inc, HRMP Corp, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, K & T Park79, Inc., Kalur S Kishan, Sylvia Haddadin, Tahssen Kaskas, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Bahman Baktar, Brittany L Torres, Awans Enterprises Inc, Salman D. Barbat, Rasna LLC, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Khaja Ansari, Basel Hassounch, Claude Shamaah, S M O Oil Inc, Rebecca Zomorodian, Paul Baskaron, Tigran Pogosyan, Ammar Maaytah, Mohammad Kaskas, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Vache Simonyan, Mostafa Rahgozar, Issa T Demes, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Mohammad Bahmani, Toros Zorenkelian, I and M Oil Inc, Kevin Tapia, Bahman Kianmahd, Sharina Alloush, Hy E Sao, Heidi Bahmani, Younes Dobli Bennani, Parshotam Kamboj, Southland Petroleum Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, Anup Patel, Manal Alam, Habib Alam, Ibrahim Ghallab, Rafael Castillo, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Nesrin Barbat, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Gagan Natt, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Ara Wansikehian, R P Oil Inc, Randa Maaytah, Behzad Kianmahd, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Rahgozar Inc, Marie Zorenkelian, Taftan Incorporated, Battir Oil Inc, Francois Alvandi, Susan Shen Chin, Tracy Tapia, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, NRRM Corp, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Anit P.K. Natt, Cal Coast Inc, PB Inc, Senan F Naoum, Jerry Zomorodian, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Meng E Sao, Omer Kassa, Hadaf Inc, Denise Brown, Maret Golnazarian, H&O Inc, Razmik Golnazarian, Perfect Fuel Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Westminster Mini Market Inc, AKM Oil Co Inc . (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Ryan, Timothy) (jao).
February 9, 2015 Filing 348 **Document Withdrawn** RESPONSE in Opposition re #339 MOTION to Compel Schiller Defendants' Interrogatories filed by AKM Oil Co Inc, Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Francois Alvandi, Khaja Ansari(Individually and ), Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Susan Shen Chin(Individually and ), Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Basel Hassounch, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj(Individually and ), Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, R P Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Ryan, Timothy) (jao).
February 9, 2015 Filing 347 **Document Withdrawn** RESPONSE in Opposition re #338 MOTION to Compel Schiller Defendants' Requests for Production filed by AKM Oil Co Inc, Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Francois Alvandi, Khaja Ansari(Individually and ), Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Susan Shen Chin(Individually and ), Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Basel Hassounch, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj(Individually and ), Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, R P Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Ryan, Timothy) (jao).
February 9, 2015 Filing 346 **Document Withdrawn** RESPONSE in Opposition re #340 MOTION to Compel Schiller Defendants' Requests for Admission filed by AKM Oil Co Inc, Habib Alam, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Francois Alvandi, Khaja Ansari(Individually and ), Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Susan Shen Chin(Individually and ), Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Basel Hassounch, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj(Individually and ), Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Ryan, Timothy) (jao).
February 9, 2015 Filing 345 MOTION for Discovery to Grant Plaintiff Leave to Answer Bleau Defendants' Interrogatories by Farideh Behmard, Medhi Behmard, Meetra Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mueller, Troy) Mailer sent re proposed order on 2/10/2015 (jao).
February 9, 2015 Filing 344 RESPONSE in Opposition re #341 MOTION to Compel Against Meetra, inc. (Requests for Production and Interrogatories) filed by Meetra Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bleau, Thomas) (jao).
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #342 MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Ambartsumyan Corp. and Armen Ambartsumyan : Ambartsumyan SHALL FILE an opposition on or before February 20, 2015. BPWCP SHALL FILE a reply, if it wishes, on or before February 27, 2015. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/5/2015.(jao)
February 2, 2015 Filing 342 MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Ambartsumyan Corp. and Armen Ambartsumyan by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration)(Risner, Abby) (jao).
February 2, 2015 Filing 341 MOTION to Compel Against Meetra, inc. (Requests for Production and Interrogatories) by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Declaration of Abby L. Risner)(Risner, Abby) (jao).
February 2, 2015 Filing 340 MOTION to Compel Schiller Defendants' Requests for Admission by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Declaration of Abby L. Risner)(Risner, Abby) (jao).
February 2, 2015 Filing 339 MOTION to Compel Schiller Defendants' Interrogatories by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Declaration of Abby L. Risner)(Risner, Abby) (jao).
February 2, 2015 Filing 338 MOTION to Compel Schiller Defendants' Requests for Production by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Declaration of Abby L. Risner)(Risner, Abby) (jao).
February 2, 2015 Filing 337 NOTICE by BP West Coast Products LLC of Motion to Compel for Schiller Defendants' Requests for Production (Risner, Abby) (jao).
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER Granting #335 Joint Motion to Dismiss. The AKM parties are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from BPWCP's operative complaint, including all amendments to the same, each party to bear its own attorney fees and costs. BPWCP is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from the AKM parties' operative counterclaims, including all amendments to the same, each party to bear its own attorney fees and costs. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the implementation of or disputes arising out of the settlement of this action. Each of the parties has the right to enforce the Settlement Agreement and seek equitable relief and damages as set forth therein. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/23/2015. (jao)
January 21, 2015 Filing 335 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant and Counter-Claimants AKM Oil Co., Inc., Arbind Rai, and Maria Rai, by BP West Coast Products LLC of Stipulation of Dismissal (Jones, Deborah) Modified to correct text/event on 1/22/2015 (jao).
January 16, 2015 Filing 334 MINUTE ORDER. On January 9, 2015 and thereafter, counsel for Plaintiff contacted Magistrate Judge Burkhardt's chambers to schedule discovery conferences to resolve discovery disputes with the four groups of defendants in this case (see Ex. 1 to Joint Proposed Discovery Plan for Case Management Conference dated August 12, 2014). The parties are directed to comply with Judge Burkhardt's Civil Chambers Rules regarding the meet and confer requirements. The Court will accept motions concerning the discovery disputes pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure without first requiring discovery conferences. This order sets out a briefing schedule and hearing date for motions seeking to resolve the discovery disputes. (jao)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER: Plaintiff's counsel contacted Magistrate Judge Burkhardt's chambers, notifying the court of upcoming deadlines to file certain motions to compel and the need for assistance in scheduling a joint call to the court with counsel for the Dealer Defendants. The Court hereby sets a 1/21/2015 deadline for the parties to file any discovery motions with respect to: (1) BP West Coast Products LLC's Requests for Production of Documents Set 1 to the Dealer Defendants; (2) BP West Coast Products LLC's Requests for Admission Set 1 to the Dealer Defendants; and (3) BP West Coast Products LLC's Special Interrogatories Set 1 to the Dealer Defendants. However, this Order does not relieve the parties of their obligation to diligently complete the meet and confer process and to make themselves available to place a joint call to Judge Burkhardt's chambers in advance of 1/21/2015 to request either a telephonic discovery conference and/or leave to file a motion should any discovery disputes remain outstanding at that time. (no document attached) (smm)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER Imposing Sanctions re #327 Order to Show Cause. The Court concludes that sanctions for Ms. Lim's failure to attend the court-ordered Status Conference on December 5, 2014 are appropriate pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(f) and Civil Local Rule 16.1.b. Accordingly, Julie C. Lim is ORDERED to pay $1,000.00 to the Clerk of Court on or before February 2, 2015. Further, Ms. Lim shall file a Notice of Payment by February 9, 2015 verifying that the sanction was paid. Ms. Lim is hereby cautioned that failure to comply with this Order may result in the imposition of additional sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 1/5/2015.(jao)
December 18, 2014 Filing 331 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Show Cause Hearing held on 12/18/2014. Julia C. Lim n/a. Court takes the matter under submission. (CD# 12/18/2014 JLB14-11:39-11:40). (Plaintiff Attorney n/a). (Defendant Attorney n/a). (no document attached) (rab)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER granting #329 Joint Motion to Enter Stipulated Orders. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Protective Order, #2 Exhibit Order Establishing Electronic Document Production Protocol) (smm)
December 15, 2014 Filing 329 Joint MOTION for Order Entry of Stipulated Orders by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (knb).
December 5, 2014 Filing 328 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Status Conference held on 12/5/2014. (Plaintiff Attorney David M. Harris, Adriene Plescia Lynch, and Abby L. Risner). (Defendant Attorney Michael G Kerbs, Troy Martin Mueller, and David A. Schiller). (no document attached) (smm) (knb).
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. A hearing shall be held on December 18, 2014, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1D, Edward J. Schwartz U.S. Courthouse, 221 West Broadway, San Diego, California 92101. Julie C. Lim, shall show cause why sanctions shall not be imposed for failure to attend a court-ordered telephonic status conference on December 5, 2014, at 2:00 p.m. On or before December 16, 2014, Julie C. Lim shall file a declaration informing the Court why she did not attend the status conference and why sanctions should not be imposed for her failure to appear. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 12/5/2014.(jao)
December 5, 2014 Filing 326 DECLARATION of Abby L. Risner Regarding Court's Order Dated November 25, 2014 by Plaintiff BP West Coast Products LLC. (Risner, Abby) (jao).
November 25, 2014 Filing 325 MINUTE ORDER Denying Without Prejudice #324 Request for Approval of Proposed Protective Order and Proposed Order Establishing Electronic Document Production Protocol. All counsel for all parties shall meet and confer on or before December 4, 2014 regarding the Proposed Protective Order and Proposed Order Establishing Electronic Document Production Protocol. The Court sets a Status Conference for 12/5/2014 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jao)
November 17, 2014 Filing 324 MOTION Request for Approval of Proposed Protective Order and Proposed Order Establishing Electronic Document Production Protocol by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deborah Yoon Jones)(Jones, Deborah) (jao).
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER Approving Pro Hac Vice as to Abby Risner. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/12/2014.(vam)
November 4, 2014 Filing 322 NOTICE of Payment of Sanctions by Julie Lim re #319 Order Imposing Sanctions. (jao)
November 3, 2014 Filing 321 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Risner, Abby) (ag).
October 30, 2014 Filing 320 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-7515825.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Risner, Abby) Modified on 10/31/2014-QC amiler sent to attorney because of missing signature. Suggested to scan black and white rather than in color. (vam).
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER Imposing Sanctions. On September 9, 2014, the Court held the Order to Show Cause Hearing at 12:10 p.m. Ms. Lim failed to appear. (ECF No. 317.) Nearly a month has passed since the Order to Show Cause Hearing and Ms. Lim has not filed a declaration or otherwise contacted the Court. The Court finds that sanctions are appropriate pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(f) and Civil Local Rule 16.1.b. Accordingly, Julie C. Lim is ORDERED to pay $500.00 to the Clerk of Court on or before October 24, 2014. Ms. Lim must file a Notice of Payment by October 31, 2014 verifying that the sanction was paid. Ms. Lim is hereby warned that failure to comply with this Order may result in the imposition of additional sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 10/6/2014.(jao)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 318 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings. A Case Management Conference was held on 8/19/2014. A Mandatory Settlement Conference is set for 9/30/2015 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. The Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law are due by 1/28/2016. The Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order is due by 2/18/2016. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 2/25/2016 at 01:30 PM before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 9/29/2014.(aef)
September 9, 2014 Filing 317 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Show Cause Hearing held on 9/9/2014. Attorney Julie C. Lim representing defendant Ambartsumyan Corporation failed to appear. The court takes the matter under submission. (CD# 9/9/2014 JLB14-12:10-12:12). (Plaintiff Attorney n/a). (Defendant Attorney n/a). (no document attached) (rab)
August 27, 2014 Filing 316 NOTICE of Appearance by Troy Martin Mueller on behalf of AKM Oil Co Inc, Farideh Behmard, Medhi Behmard, Meetra Inc, Arbind Rai, Maria Rai (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Mueller, Troy)Attorney Troy Martin Mueller added to party AKM Oil Co Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Troy Martin Mueller added to party AKM Oil Co Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Troy Martin Mueller added to party Farideh Behmard(pty:dft), Attorney Troy Martin Mueller added to party Farideh Behmard(pty:dft), Attorney Troy Martin Mueller added to party Medhi Behmard(pty:dft), Attorney Troy Martin Mueller added to party Medhi Behmard(pty:dft), Attorney Troy Martin Mueller added to party Meetra Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Troy Martin Mueller added to party Meetra Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Troy Martin Mueller added to party Arbind Rai(pty:dft), Attorney Troy Martin Mueller added to party Arbind Rai(pty:dft), Attorney Troy Martin Mueller added to party Maria Rai(pty:dft), Attorney Troy Martin Mueller added to party Maria Rai(pty:dft) (jao).
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/9/2014 11:30 AM in Courtroom 1D before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Julie C. Lim, shall show cause why sanctions shall not be imposed for failure to attend a court-ordered telephonic case management conference on August 19, 2014, at 8:45 a.m. On or before September 4, 2014, Julie C. Lim shall file a declaration informing the Court why she did not attend the case management conference and why sanctions should not be imposed for her failure to appear. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 8/26/2014.(jao)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER: (1) Granting #309 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer to Fifth Amended Complaint; (2) Denying as Moot #282 Motion to Strike Portions of Amended Supplemental Fourth Amended Answer; (3) Granting #280 Motion to Dismiss; (4) Granting #283 Application for Default Judgment; and, (5) Declining to Impose Sanctions. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/22/2014. (knb)
August 19, 2014 Filing 314 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 8/19/2014. Case management issues discussed and are under consideration.Attorney Troy M. Mueller is directed to enter his appearance in the case through the CM/ECF system.(Plaintiff Attorney David M. Harris and Deborah Yoon Jones). (Defendant Attorney Michael G Kerbs, Troy M. Mueller, and David A. Schiller). (no document attached) (smm)
July 22, 2014 Filing 312 NOTICE by Crossroad Petroleum, Inc.(a California Corporation) re #306 Order Following ENE, Initial Disclosures Regarding Damages (Kerbs, Michael) (jao).
June 11, 2014 Filing 311 NON Opposition re #309 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer to 5th Amended Complaint filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Lynch, Adriene) (jao).
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER Resetting Time for Telephonic Case Management Conference. The Court hereby and resets the TIME for the telephonic Case Management Conference already set for August 19, 2014 from 8:00 a.m. to 8:45 a.m. Counsel shall consult Magistrate Judge Burkhardt's Civil Chambers Rules and lodge a revised Joint Discovery Plan accordingly. Parties shall not appear on the telephonic conference - Counsel only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 6/2/2014.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jao)(jrd)
May 28, 2014 Filing 309 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer to 5th Amended Complaint by Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Francois Alvandi, Khaja Ansari(Individually and ), Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Younes Dobli Bennani, Chase Products Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, Sylvia Haddadin, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), Rafwant Jafal, Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Liliana Monteagudo, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), David A Parker, Anup Patel, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, Mostafa Rahgozar, Arbind Rai, Maria Rai, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, 3 Star Management, Inc., Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ryan, Timothy) (jao).
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER OF TRANSFER. It is hereby ordered that the following listed cases are transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Ruben B. Brooks, to the calendar of the Honorable Jill L. Burkhardt, for all further proceedings. All pending dates including discovery deadlines, hearings, and conferences before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks, if any, remain unchanged until further order and are now set before Magistrate Judge Burkhardt. For cases with conferences or hearing dates set to occur in June of 2014, counsel shall call Judge Burkhardt's chambers within seven calendar days of this transfer order to confirm those conferences or hearing dates are going forward as scheduled. Any dates set before any district judge remain unchanged. The new case number is 12cv665-JLS-JLB. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 5/23/2014.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(vam)
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 306 Order Following Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, Setting Rule 26 Compliance. Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 5/21/2014. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 5/22/2014.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jao)(jrd)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 307 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks: An attorneys-only continued early neutral evaluation conference was held.Julie Lim did not attend. A telephonic attorneys-only case management conference is set for August 19, 2014, at 8:00 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiff is to initiate the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 5/21/2014(Plaintiff Attorney Deborah Jones, David Harris).(Defendant Attorney Troy Mueller, David A. Schiller, Mark Sabbah). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jao)
May 20, 2014 Filing 305 ANSWER to Complaint AKM Oil Co. Inc.'s Third Amended Counterclaim by BP West Coast Products LLC.(Jones, Deborah) (jao).
May 15, 2014 Filing 304 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by AKM Oil Co Inc, Farideh Behmard, Medhi Behmard, Meetra Inc, Arbind Rai, Maria Rai. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bleau, Thomas) (jao).
May 15, 2014 Filing 303 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Fifth Amended Complaint by Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Francois Alvandi, Khaja Ansari(Individually and ), Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Younes Dobli Bennani, Chase Products Inc, Ibrahim Ghallab, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, Sylvia Haddadin, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), Rafwant Jafal, Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Liliana Monteagudo, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), David A Parker, Anup Patel, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, Mostafa Rahgozar, Arbind Rai, Maria Rai, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, 3 Star Management, Inc., Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian.(Ryan, Timothy)Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Salman D. Barbat(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Salman D. Barbat(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Paul Baskaron(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Paul Baskaron(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Younes Dobli Bennani(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Younes Dobli Bennani(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Rafwant Jafal(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Rafwant Jafal(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Mohammad Kaskas(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Mohammad Kaskas(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Tahssen Kaskas(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Tahssen Kaskas(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party David A Parker(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party David A Parker(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party David A Parker(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party David A Parker(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party David A Parker(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party David A Parker(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party David A Parker(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party David A Parker(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party David A Parker(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party David A Parker(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Tigran Pogosyan(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Tigran Pogosyan(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Soma Prasad(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Soma Prasad(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Muna Quasqas(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Muna Quasqas(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Mostafa Rahgozar(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Mostafa Rahgozar(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Hy E Sao(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Hy E Sao(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Hy E Sao(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Hy E Sao(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Hy E Sao(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Hy E Sao(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Hy E Sao(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Hy E Sao(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Hy E Sao(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Hy E Sao(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Meng E Sao(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Meng E Sao(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Meng E Sao(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Meng E Sao(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Meng E Sao(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Meng E Sao(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Meng E Sao(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Meng E Sao(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Meng E Sao(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Meng E Sao(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party 3 Star Management, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party 3 Star Management, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Kotsai Wang(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Kotsai Wang(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Ara Wansikehian(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Ara Wansikehian(pty:cc), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Ara Wansikehian(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy J Ryan added to party Ara Wansikehian(pty:dft) (jao).
May 14, 2014 Filing 302 ANSWER to Complaint Fifth Amended Complaint by Crossroad Petroleum, Inc..(Kerbs, Michael) (jao).
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER Granting Cross Motion for Leave To File AKM Oil CO., Inc's Third Amended Counterclaim re #297 filed by AKM Oil Co Inc. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT AKM's Proposed Third Amended Counterclaim shall be deemed filed as of the date that this Order is entered. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Plaintiff BP West Coast Products, LLC ("BPWCP") shall file an Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses to AKMs Third Amended Counterclaim on or before May 20, 2014. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/6/2014.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jao)
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER Granting #296 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint. It is hereby ordered BPWCP's Proposed Fifth Amended and Consolidated Complaint shall be deemed filed as of the date that this Order is entered. It is further ordered that Defendants shall file an Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses to BPWCPs Fifth Amended Complaint on or before May 16, 2014. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/2/2014. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jao)
April 28, 2014 Filing 299 NON Opposition re #296 MOTION for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Lynch, Adriene) (jao).
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 298 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Janis L. Sammartino: Rejecting Proposed Order, from Consol Plaintiff AKM Oil Co Inc, re #297 Non Opposition to Motion. Non-compliance with local rule(s), ECF 2(h): Includes a proposed order or requires judges signature. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the proposed order from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/23/2014.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jao)
April 22, 2014 Filing 297 NON Opposition re #296 MOTION for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint and Cross Motion for Leave to File AKM's Third Amended Counterclaim filed by AKM Oil Co Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proof of Service)(Bleau, Thomas) (jao). (Attachment 3 replaced on 4/23/2014) (jao).
April 1, 2014 Filing 296 MOTION for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Deborah Yoon Jones, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Jones, Deborah) (jao).
March 21, 2014 Filing 295 NOTICE by BP West Coast Products LLC re #282 MOTION to Strike #276 Notice (Other), Portions of Named Guarantors/Dealer Defendants' Amended Supplemental Fourth Amended Answer, #283 MOTION for Default Judgment against Cohen's Gasoline, Inc., Matt Cohen, and Jennifer Cohen Re Order Vacating Hearing (Sperling, Elizabeth) (jao).
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER Vacating Hearings (ECF Nos. #282 , #283 ). The motion hearings set for March 27, 2014 are hereby vacated and the matters are taken under submission. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/21/2014.(knb)(jrd)
March 20, 2014 Filing 293 NON Opposition re #283 MOTION for Default Judgment against Cohen's Gasoline, Inc., Matt Cohen, and Jennifer Cohen filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Jones, Deborah) (knb).
March 20, 2014 Filing 292 REPLY to Response to Motion re #282 MOTION to Strike #276 Notice (Other), Portions of Named Guarantors/Dealer Defendants' Amended Supplemental Fourth Amended Answer filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Jones, Deborah)(knb).
March 19, 2014 Filing 291 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Armen Ambartsumyan(an individual) of Cross-Defendant BP West Coast Products, LLC (Lim, Julie) (jao).
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 290 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. On March 17, 2014, these Court consolidated cases were assigned to this Court. A Joint Discovery Plan shall be lodged with Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on or before March 28, 2014. An attorneys-only early neutral evaluation conference will be held on May 21, 2014, at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Brooks. This order supersedes the order signed by Judge Crawford on March 14, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 3/19/2014.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jao)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 289 Order Following ENE. Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 3/12/2014. Further Early Neutral Evaluation set for 5/19/2014 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford with plaintiff and the dealer or franchisee defendants who are represented by Timothy J. Ryan & Associates. Further Early Neutral Evaluation set for 5/20/2014 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford with plaintiff and all remaining dealer or franchisee defendants: Crossroad Petroleum, Inc.; Meetra, Inc.; Medhi Behmard; Farideh Behmard; Arbind Rai; Maria Rai; and AKM Oil Co. Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 3/14/2014.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jao)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER OF TRANSFER: Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford recuses and is no longer assigned to this case. Case randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks for all further proceedings. The new case number is 12-cv-00665-JLS-RBB.(no document attached)(cxl)(jrd)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER Vacating Hearing re #280 MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Sanctions. The motion hearing set for March 20, 2014 is hereby vacated and the matter taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/17/2014.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jao)(jrd)
March 13, 2014 Filing 285 RESPONSE in Opposition re #282 MOTION to Strike #276 Notice (Other), Portions of Named Guarantors/Dealer Defendants' Amended Supplemental Fourth Amended Answer filed by AKM Oil Co Inc, Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Francois Alvandi, Khaja Ansari(Individually and ), Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Younes Dobli Bennani, Chase Products Inc, Ibrahim Ghallab, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, Sylvia Haddadin, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), Rafwant Jafal, Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Liliana Monteagudo, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), David A Parker, Anup Patel, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, Mostafa Rahgozar, Arbind Rai, Maria Rai, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, 3 Star Management, Inc., Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian. (Ryan, Timothy) (jao).
March 12, 2014 Filing 287 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: An Early Neutral Evaluation Conference was held on 3/12/2014. The case did not settle. Scheduling order to follow.(no document attached) (plh)
March 7, 2014 Filing 284 NON Opposition re #280 MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Sanctions filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Sperling, Elizabeth) (jao).
February 26, 2014 Filing 283 MOTION for Default Judgment against Cohen's Gasoline, Inc., Matt Cohen, and Jennifer Cohen by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Deborah Yoon Jones, #3 Declaration of Allison Swinson)(Jones, Deborah) (jao).
February 20, 2014 Filing 282 MOTION to Strike #276 Notice (Other), Portions of Named Guarantors/Dealer Defendants' Amended Supplemental Fourth Amended Answer by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Deborah Yoon Jones, #3 Exhibits A through D)(Jones, Deborah) (jao).
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER (1) Granting #262 Motion to Substitute Attorney; and (2) Granting #279 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/20/2014. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jao)(jrd)
February 18, 2014 Filing 280 MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Sanctions by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Sperling, Elizabeth) (jao).
February 17, 2014 Filing 279 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Sandra B. Gallani in Support of her Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for BP West Coast Products LLC)(Gallini, Sandra) (jao).
February 14, 2014 Filing 278 ANSWER to Complaint "Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant BP West Coast Products LLC to Dealer Defendants' Amended Supplemental Fourth Amended Counterclaim" by BP West Coast Products LLC.(Jones, Deborah) (jao).
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 277 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation set for 3/12/2014 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 1/31/2014.(jao)
January 31, 2014 Filing 276 NOTICE by Arbind Rai, Maria Rai re #257 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,,,,,,,, Notice of Errata (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Supplemental 4th Amended Answer and 4th Amended Counterclaim to Fourth Amended and Consolidated Complaint of BP West Coast Products, LLC)(Ryan, Timothy) (jao).
January 30, 2014 Filing 275 ANSWER to Amended Counterclaim of Meetra Inc. by BP West Coast Products LLC.(Jones, Deborah) (jao).
January 29, 2014 Filing 274 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Ambartsumyan Corporation as to BP West Coast Products LLC. (Lim, Julie) (jao).
January 29, 2014 Filing 273 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against BP West Coast Products LLC by Ambartsumyan Corporation.(Lim, Julie)Attorney Julie C. Lim added to party Ambartsumyan Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Julie C. Lim added to party Ambartsumyan Corporation(pty:dft) (jao).
January 28, 2014 Filing 272 NOTICE by BP West Coast Products LLC re #271 Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendants Matt Cohen, Jennifer Cohen and Cohen's Gasoline (Sperling, Elizabeth) (jao).
January 27, 2014 Filing 271 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jennifer Cohen, Matt Cohen, Cohens Gasoline Inc. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jao)
January 27, 2014 Filing 270 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Armen Ambartsumyan as to BP West Coast Products LLC. (Lim, Julie) (jao).
January 27, 2014 Filing 269 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against BP West Coast Products LLC by Armen Ambartsumyan.(Lim, Julie)Attorney Julie C. Lim added to party Armen Ambartsumyan(pty:dft), Attorney Julie C. Lim added to party Armen Ambartsumyan(pty:dft) (jao).
January 24, 2014 Filing 268 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by BP West Coast Products LLC re #264 Request for Entry of Clerk Default, . (Sperling, Elizabeth) (jao).
January 23, 2014 Filing 267 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against Matt Cohen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth Sperling in Support of Requests for Entry of Default)(Sperling, Elizabeth) (jao).
January 23, 2014 Filing 266 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against Jennifer Cohen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth Sperling in Support of Requests for Entry of Default)(Sperling, Elizabeth) (jao).
January 23, 2014 Filing 265 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against Cohen's Gasoline. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth Sperling in Support of Requests for Entry of Default)(Sperling, Elizabeth) (jao).
January 23, 2014 Filing 264 **Document Withdrawn** Request for Entry of Clerk Default against Cohen's Gasoline. (Attachments: #1 Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant Jennifer Cohen, #2 Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant Matt Cohen, #3 Declaration of Elizabeth Sperling in Support of Requests for Entry of Default)(Sperling, Elizabeth(jao).
January 22, 2014 Filing 263 AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM Third against BP West Coast Products LLC, filed by Meetra Inc. (Bleau, Thomas) (jao).
January 22, 2014 Filing 262 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by AKM Oil Co Inc, Arbind Rai, Maria Rai. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Substitution of Attorney, #2 Declaration of Thomas Bleau, #3 Proof of Service)(Bleau, Thomas) (jao).
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 261 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Janis L. Sammartino: Rejecting Document, from Consol Plaintiff AKM Oil Co Inc, Defendants Arbind Rai, Maria Rai, re #260 MOTION to Substitute Attorney , #259 MOTION to Substitute Attorney , #258 MOTION to Substitute Attorney . Non-compliance with local rule(s), ECF 2(h): Includes a proposed order or requires judges signature, OTHER: AO 154 form not to be filed on the docket. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/21/2014.(jao)
January 21, 2014 Filing 260 **Document Stricken** MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Maria Rai. (Bleau, Thomas)Attorney Thomas P Bleau added to party Maria Rai(pty:cc), Attorney Thomas P Bleau added to party Maria Rai(pty:cc) (Main Document 260 replaced on 1/21/2014) (jao).
January 21, 2014 Filing 259 **Document Stricken** MOTION to Substitute Attorney by AKM Oil Co Inc. (Bleau, Thomas)Attorney Thomas P Bleau added to party AKM Oil Co Inc(pty:cc), Attorney Thomas P Bleau added to party AKM Oil Co Inc(pty:cc) (Main Document 259 replaced on 1/21/2014) (jao).
January 21, 2014 Filing 258 **Document Stricken** MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Arbind Rai. (Bleau, Thomas)Attorney Thomas P Bleau added to party Arbind Rai(pty:cc), Attorney Thomas P Bleau added to party Arbind Rai(pty:cc) (Main Document 258 replaced on 1/21/2014) (jao).
January 17, 2014 Filing 257 AMENDED ANSWER to #251 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,,,,,,,,,, , COUNTERCLAIM against BP West Coast Products LLC by AKM Oil Co Inc, Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Francois Alvandi, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Younes Dobli Bennani, Chase Products Inc, Ibrahim Ghallab, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, Sylvia Haddadin, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), Rafwant Jafal, Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Salah Mazloum, Liliana Monteagudo, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), David A Parker, Anup Patel, Tigran Pogosyan, Mostafa Rahgozar, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Kotsai Wang, 3 Star Management, Inc., Ara Wansikehian, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian. (Ryan, Timothy) (jao).
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER Granting #254 Motion to File Third Amended Counter-Claim. The pleading attached as Exhibit A to the parties' stipulation shall be filed as a separate entry on the docket. Nonetheless, the Court declines to accept the parties' stipulation that BPWCP shall have 21 days to file a response to the amended pleading. BPWCP shall file its response to Meetra's amended pleading on or before January 31, 2014. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/17/2014. (jao)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 255 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Janis L. Sammartino: Rejecting Document, from Consol Plaintiff Meetra Inc, re #254 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #245 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim . Non-compliance with local rule(s), ECF 2(h): Includes a proposed order or requires judges signature. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE only the proposed order from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/17/2014.(jao)
January 15, 2014 Filing 254 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #245 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,,,, by Meetra Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit [Proposed] Third Amended Counter-Claim, #2 [Proposed] Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Bleau, Thomas) (jao). (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/17/2014) (jao).
December 31, 2013 Filing 253 ANSWER to #251 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Named Defendants by BP West Coast Products LLC.(Gallini, Sandra) (jao).
December 31, 2013 Filing 252 ANSWER to #245 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,,,, of Meetra, Inc. by BP West Coast Products LLC.(Gallini, Sandra)
December 17, 2013 Filing 251 AMENDED ANSWER to Fourth Amended and Consolidated Complaint of BP West Coast Products LLC , Amended COUNTERCLAIM against BP West Coast Products LLC by AKM Oil Co Inc, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Khaja Ansari(Individually and ), Rajesh Arora, Awans Enterprises Inc, Battir Oil Inc, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Susan Shen Chin, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ghallab Brothers Inc, H&O Inc, Hadaf Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj(Individually and ), Kaskas Enterprises Inc, MDA Fuel Inc, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Perfect Fuel Inc, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Rahgozar Inc, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Shamaah Inc, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, 2United Oil LLC, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc. (Ryan, Timothy) (jao).
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER Granting #222 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Denying #230 Motion for Sanctions; Granting #239 Motion to Dismiss; Granting #246 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Court (1) GRANTS BPWCP's partial motion to dismiss Crossroad's second amended counterclaims. Crossroad's claims for common law fraud, breach of fiduciary duty, constructive fraud, violation of California's FIL, violation of California's UCL, breach of the implied duty of good faith and fair dealing, and unjust enrichment are dismissed with prejudice. (2) GRANTS BPWCPs motion to dismiss Dealer's third amended counterclaim. Dealers' claim for breach of the implied duty of good faith and fair dealing is dismissed with prejudice. The remainder of Dealers' pleading is dismissed without prejudice. Dealers shall file an amended pleading that cures the deficiencies identified above within 14 days of the date that this Order is electronically docketed. (3) GRANTS BPWCP's partial motion to dismiss Meetra's counterclaim. Meetra's claims for breach of the implied duty of good faith and fair dealing, money had and received, conversion, breach of fiduciary duty, violation of California's FRA, and unjust enrichment are dismissed with prejudice. (4) DENIES BPWCP's motion for sanctions. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/3/2013. (jao)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER Vacating Hearing re #246 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The motion hearing currently set for October 24, 2013 is hereby vacated and the matter is taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/18/2013.(jao)(jrd)
October 17, 2013 Filing 248 REPLY to Response to Motion re #246 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Gallini, Sandra) (jao).
October 9, 2013 Filing 247 RESPONSE in Opposition re #239 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Dealers' Third Amended Counterclaim filed by Meetra Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service by Electronic Submission, #2 Exhibit A)(Bleau, Thomas) (jao).
September 20, 2013 Filing 246 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Gallini, Sandra) (jao).
September 6, 2013 Filing 245 Meetra, Inc., Medhi Behmard, and Farideh Behmard's ANSWER to #171 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,, Fourth, COUNTERCLAIM against BP West Coast Products LLC by Farideh Behmard, Medhi Behmard, Meetra Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service by Electronic Submission)(Bleau, Thomas)Attorney Thomas P Bleau added to party Farideh Behmard(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas P Bleau added to party Farideh Behmard(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas P Bleau added to party Medhi Behmard(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas P Bleau added to party Medhi Behmard(pty:dft) (jao).
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER Vacating Hearing re #239 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Dealers' Third Amended Counterclaim. The motion hearing currently set for August 8, 2013 is hereby vacated and the matter is taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/5/2013.(jao) (jcj).
July 25, 2013 Filing 243 REPLY to Response to Motion re #239 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Dealers' Third Amended Counterclaim filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Gallini, Sandra) (jao).
July 18, 2013 Filing 242 RESPONSE in Opposition re #239 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Dealers' Third Amended Counterclaim filed by A J Services Inc, Abusham Petro LLC, Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Armen Ambartsumyan(an individual), Ambartsumyan Corporation, Khaja Ansari(Individually and ), Rajesh Arora, Raad Attisha, Saad Y. Attisha, Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Buyrite Gasoline Inc, Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Carroll Centre, Inc., Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin, Jennifer Cohen, Matt Cohen, Cohens Gasoline Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dhaliwalsons LLC, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Gas Depot Inc, Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Ahd Haddad, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Basel Hassounch, Horizon Investment Group Inc, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), Rafwant Jafal, Joelles Oil Co LP, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj(Individually and ), Moshail S. Kamel, Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Khurana Investments Inc, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, MDG Information Analysis Management Group LLC, MJS Engel No 1 Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), Old Town Fuel Company, PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, David A Parker, Karamali Pashmforoosh, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Parmjit Randhawa, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Parviz Shamtoub, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Brittany L Torres, Trisha Enterprise Inc, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, John Vazirian, Venture Petroleum Company, Inc., Kotsai Wang, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., A Fine Enterprise & Company Inc., A Green Fuel Corporation, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Young-Westwood Enterprises, Inc., Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Zuma Arc Inc. (Ryan, Timothy) (srm).
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #239 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Dealers' Third Amended Counterclaim : Responses due by 7/18/2013. Replies due by 7/25/2013. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/24/2013.(jao) (jrl).
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER (1) Denying #238 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply; and (2) Vacating Hearing. The Court finds that Defendants' counsel has already had an adequate opportunity to address the issues raised by the motion for sanctions and therefore a sur-reply is unwarranted under the circumstances. Accordingly, the Court denies the motion. The hearing currently set for June 20, 2013 on the motion for sanctions is hereby vacated and the matter is taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/14/2013. (jao)
June 13, 2013 Filing 239 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Dealers' Third Amended Counterclaim by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss Defendant Dealers' Third Amended Counterclaim, #2 Exhibit 1)(Harris, David) (jao).
June 13, 2013 Filing 238 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by A J Services Inc, Abusham Petro LLC, Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Francois Alvandi, Armen Ambartsumyan(an individual), Ambartsumyan Corporation, Khaja Ansari(Individually and ), Rajesh Arora, Raad Attisha, Saad Y. Attisha, Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Farideh Behmard, Medhi Behmard, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Buyrite Gasoline Inc, Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Carroll Centre, Inc., Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin, Jennifer Cohen, Matt Cohen, Cohens Gasoline Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dhaliwalsons LLC, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Gas Depot Inc, Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Ahd Haddad, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Basel Hassounch, Horizon Investment Group Inc, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), Rafwant Jafal, Joelles Oil Co LP, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj(Individually and ), Moshail S. Kamel, Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Khurana Investments Inc, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, MDG Information Analysis Management Group LLC, MJS Engel No 1 Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), Old Town Fuel Company, PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, David A Parker, Karamali Pashmforoosh, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Arbind Rai, Maria Rai, Parmjit Randhawa, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Parviz Shamtoub, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, Trisha Enterprise Inc, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, John Vazirian, Venture Petroleum Company, Inc., Kotsai Wang, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., A Fine Enterprise & Company Inc., A Green Fuel Corporation, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Young-Westwood Enterprises, Inc., Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Zuma Arc Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ryan, Timothy) (jao).
June 6, 2013 Filing 237 REPLY to Response to Motion re #230 MOTION for Sanctions Against Attorneys Schiller and Ryan filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Harris, David) (jao).
May 30, 2013 Filing 236 AMENDED ANSWER to Fourth Amended Complaint , Amended COUNTERCLAIM against BP West Coast Products LLC by Abusham Petro LLC, Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Francois Alvandi, Armen Ambartsumyan(an individual), Ambartsumyan Corporation, Khaja Ansari, Rajesh Arora, Raad Attisha, Saad Y. Attisha, Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Farideh Behmard, Medhi Behmard, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Buyrite Gasoline Inc, Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Carroll Centre, Inc., Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin, Jennifer Cohen, Matt Cohen, Cohens Gasoline Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dhaliwalsons LLC, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Gas Depot Inc, Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Ahd Haddad, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Basel Hassounch, Hartyoon Awanis Hilalian, Silva Hilalian, Horizon Investment Group Inc, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), Rafwant Jafal, Joelles Oil Co LP, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj(Individually and ), Moshail S. Kamel, Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Khurana Investments Inc, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, MDG Information Analysis Management Group LLC, MJS Engel No 1 Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), Old Town Fuel Company, PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, David A Parker, Karamali Pashmforoosh, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Arbind Rai, Maria Rai, Parmjit Randhawa, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Parviz Shamtoub, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Brittany L Torres, Trisha Enterprise Inc, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, John Vazirian, Venture Petroleum Company, Inc., 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., A Fine Enterprise & Company Inc., A Green Fuel Corporation, A J Services Inc, Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Young-Westwood Enterprises, Inc., Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Zuma Arc Inc. (Ryan, Timothy) (jao).
May 30, 2013 Filing 235 RESPONSE in Opposition re #230 MOTION for Sanctions Against Attorneys Schiller and Ryan filed by AKM Oil Co Inc, Abusham Petro LLC, Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Francois Alvandi, Armen Ambartsumyan(an individual), Ambartsumyan Corporation, Khaja Ansari, Rajesh Arora, Raad Attisha, Saad Y. Attisha, Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Farideh Behmard, Medhi Behmard, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Buyrite Gasoline Inc, Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Carroll Centre, Inc., Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin, Jennifer Cohen, Matt Cohen, Cohens Gasoline Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dhaliwalsons LLC, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Gas Depot Inc, Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Ahd Haddad, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Harsico LLC, Basel Hassounch, Hartyoon Awanis Hilalian, Silva Hilalian, Hilalian Corp, Horizon Investment Group Inc, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal(Individually and ), Rafwant Jafal, Joelles Oil Co LP, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj(Individually and ), Moshail S. Kamel, Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Khurana Investments Inc, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, MDG Information Analysis Management Group LLC, MJS Engel No 1 Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Meetra Inc, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), George Nimeh, Nimeh Inc, Old Town Fuel Company, PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, David A Parker, Karamali Pashmforoosh, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Arbind Rai, Maria Rai, Parmjit Randhawa, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Parviz Shamtoub, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, Trisha Enterprise Inc, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, John Vazirian, Venture Petroleum Company, Inc., 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., A Fine Enterprise & Company Inc., A Green Fuel Corporation, A J Services Inc, Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Young-Westwood Enterprises, Inc., Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Zuma Arc Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Declaration)(Ryan, Timothy) (jao).
May 30, 2013 Filing 234 ANSWER to Complaint Fourth Amended Complaint by Crossroad Petroleum, Inc..(Kerbs, Michael) (jao).
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER (1) Granting #210 Motion for Leave to Amend; (2) Denying as Moot #219 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Dealers' Counterclaim; (3) Denying as Moot #231 Agreed Motion to Amend Defendant Dealers' Counterclaim; (4) Setting Deadline for Defendants to Respond to Fourth Amended Complaint; (5) Granting #228 Motion for Substitution of Counsel; and (6) Setting Briefing Schedule re #230 . As BPWCP's Third Amended Complaint is no longer the operative pleading, the Court denies as moot both motions #219 #231 . The Defendant Dealers shall respond to BPWCP's operative Fourth Amended Complaint within 7 days of the date that this order is electronically docketed. Defendant Crossroad Petroleum, Inc. has also filed an answer to BPWCP's Third Amended Complaint. As this pleading is no longer operative, Crossroad shall file an answer to BPWCP's Fourth Amended Complaint within 7 days of the date that this order is electronically docketed. Meetra seeks to substitute Thomas P. Bleau as attorney of record in this action in place of David Schiller of Schiller Exline, PLLC. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 83.3(g)(2), the Court grants Meetra's motion. Finally, before the Court is BPWCP's Motion for Sanctions Against Attorneys Schiller and Ryan. A hearing on the motion is currently set for June 20, 2013. Attorneys Schiller and Ryan shall file an opposition, on, or before, May 30, 2013; BPWCP shall file a reply, if it wishes, on, or before, June 6, 2013. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/23/2013. (jao)
May 9, 2013 Filing 232 AMENDED ANSWER to Third #173 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,, , Amended COUNTERCLAIM against BP West Coast Products LLC by Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Francois Alvandi, Armen Ambartsumyan, Ambartsumyan Corporation, Khaja Ansari, Rajesh Arora, Raad Attisha, Saad Y. Attisha, Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Farideh Behmard, Medhi Behmard, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Buyrite Gasoline Inc, Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Carroll Centre, Inc., Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin(Individually and ), Jennifer Cohen, Matt Cohen, Cohens Gasoline Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dhaliwalsons LLC, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Gas Depot Inc, Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Ahd Haddad, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Harsico LLC, Basel Hassounch, Hartyoon Awanis Hilalian, Silva Hilalian, Hilalian Corp, Horizon Investment Group Inc, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Rafwant Jafal, Joelles Oil Co LP, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj, Moshail S. Kamel, Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Khurana Investments Inc, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, MDG Information Analysis Management Group LLC, MJS Engel No 1 Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Meetra Inc, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), George Nimeh, Nimeh Inc, Old Town Fuel Company, PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, David A Parker, Karamali Pashmforoosh, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Arbind Rai, Maria Rai, Parmjit Randhawa, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Parviz Shamtoub, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, Trisha Enterprise Inc, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, John Vazirian, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., A Fine Enterprise & Company Inc., A Green Fuel Corporation, A J Services Inc, AKM Oil Co Inc, Abusham Petro LLC, Venture Petroleum Company, Inc., Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Young-Westwood Enterprises, Inc., Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Zuma Arc Inc. (Ryan, Timothy) (sjt).
May 9, 2013 Filing 231 MOTION for Order Allowing Defendant to Amend by Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Francois Alvandi, Armen Ambartsumyan, Ambartsumyan Corporation, Khaja Ansari, Rajesh Arora, Raad Attisha, Saad Y. Attisha, Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Farideh Behmard, Medhi Behmard, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Buyrite Gasoline Inc, Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Carroll Centre, Inc., Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin(Individually and ), Jennifer Cohen, Matt Cohen, Cohens Gasoline Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dhaliwalsons LLC, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Gas Depot Inc, Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Ahd Haddad, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Harsico LLC, Basel Hassounch, Hartyoon Awanis Hilalian, Silva Hilalian, Hilalian Corp, Horizon Investment Group Inc, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Rafwant Jafal, Joelles Oil Co LP, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj, Moshail S. Kamel, Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Khurana Investments Inc, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, MDG Information Analysis Management Group LLC, MJS Engel No 1 Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Meetra Inc, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), George Nimeh, Nimeh Inc, Old Town Fuel Company, PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, David A Parker, Karamali Pashmforoosh, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Arbind Rai, Maria Rai, Parmjit Randhawa, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Parviz Shamtoub, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, Trisha Enterprise Inc, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, John Vazirian, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., A Fine Enterprise & Company Inc., A Green Fuel Corporation, A J Services Inc, AKM Oil Co Inc, Abusham Petro LLC, Venture Petroleum Company, Inc., Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Young-Westwood Enterprises, Inc., Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Zuma Arc Inc. (Ryan, Timothy) (jao).
May 8, 2013 Filing 230 MOTION for Sanctions Against Attorneys Schiller and Ryan by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration David M. Harris, #3 Exhibit A)(Gallini, Sandra) (jao).
May 3, 2013 Filing 229 NOTICE of Non-Compliance with Local Rule 5.4(a) Mandatory Electronic Filing re #228 MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by Meetra Inc. (jao)
May 3, 2013 Filing 228 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Meetra Inc. (jao)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER Vacating Hearings re #222 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Crossroad's Second Amended Counterclaim, #219 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . The motion hearings currently set for May 2, 2013 are hereby vacated and the matters are taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/26/2013.(jao)
April 25, 2013 Filing 226 REPLY to Response to Motion re #222 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Crossroad's Second Amended Counterclaim filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Gallini, Sandra) (jao).
April 19, 2013 Filing 225 NOTICE by Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Francois Alvandi, Armen Ambartsumyan, Ambartsumyan Corporation, Khaja Ansari, Rajesh Arora, Raad Attisha, Saad Y. Attisha, Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Farideh Behmard, Medhi Behmard, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Buyrite Gasoline Inc, Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Carroll Centre, Inc., Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin(Individually and ), Jennifer Cohen, Matt Cohen, Cohens Gasoline Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dhaliwalsons LLC, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Gas Depot Inc, Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Ahd Haddad, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Harsico LLC, Basel Hassounch, Hartyoon Awanis Hilalian, Silva Hilalian, Hilalian Corp, Horizon Investment Group Inc, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Rafwant Jafal, Joelles Oil Co LP, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj, Moshail S. Kamel, Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Khurana Investments Inc, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, MDG Information Analysis Management Group LLC, MJS Engel No 1 Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Meetra Inc, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), George Nimeh, Nimeh Inc, Old Town Fuel Company, PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, David A Parker, Karamali Pashmforoosh, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Arbind Rai, Maria Rai, Parmjit Randhawa, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Parviz Shamtoub, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, Trisha Enterprise Inc, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, John Vazirian, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., A Fine Enterprise & Company Inc., A Green Fuel Corporation, A J Services Inc, AKM Oil Co Inc, Abusham Petro LLC, Venture Petroleum Company, Inc., Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Young-Westwood Enterprises, Inc., Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Zuma Arc Inc re #219 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim STIPULATION TO ALLOW FOR DEFENDANTS DEALERS TO AMEND THEIR COUNTERCLAIM (Ryan, Timothy) Mailer sent on 4/19/2013 (jao).
April 5, 2013 Filing 224 RESPONSE in Opposition re #222 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Crossroad's Second Amended Counterclaim filed by Crossroad Petroleum, Inc.(a California Corporation). (Kerbs, Michael) (jao).
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER Vacating Hearing re #210 MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint. The motion hearing set for March 28, 2013 is hereby vacated and the matter is taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/22/2013.(jao)
March 21, 2013 Filing 222 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Crossroad's Second Amended Counterclaim by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Declaration)(Gallini, Sandra) (jao).
March 21, 2013 Filing 221 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by BP West Coast Products LLC re #220 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Crossroad's Second Amended Counterclaim filed by BP West Coast Products LLC . (Gallini, Sandra) (jao).
March 21, 2013 Filing 220 **Document Withdrawn** MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Crossroad's Second Amended Counterclaim by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Declaration)(Gallini, Sandra) . Modified on 3/22/2013 (jao).
March 21, 2013 Filing 219 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gallini, Sandra) (jao).
March 14, 2013 Filing 218 REPLY to Response to Motion re #210 MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Gallini, Sandra) (jao).
March 13, 2013 Filing 217 NOTICE by BP West Coast Products LLC of Change In Counsel (Counsel From Same Firm) (Lynch, Adriene) (jao).
March 8, 2013 Filing 216 NOTICE of Joinder by Crossroad Petroleum, Inc.(A California Corporation), Crossroad Petroleum, Inc., Ahd Haddad re #215 Response in Opposition to Motion (Razo, Michael) (jao).
March 8, 2013 Filing 215 RESPONSE in Opposition re #210 MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Francois Alvandi, Armen Ambartsumyan, Ambartsumyan Corporation, Khaja Ansari, Rajesh Arora, Raad Attisha, Saad Y. Attisha, Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Farideh Behmard, Medhi Behmard, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Buyrite Gasoline Inc, Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Carroll Centre, Inc., Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin(Individually and ), Jennifer Cohen, Matt Cohen, Cohens Gasoline Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dhaliwalsons LLC, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Gas Depot Inc, Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Ahd Haddad, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Harsico LLC, Basel Hassounch, Hartyoon Awanis Hilalian, Silva Hilalian, Hilalian Corp, Horizon Investment Group Inc, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Rafwant Jafal, Joelles Oil Co LP, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj, Moshail S. Kamel, Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Khurana Investments Inc, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, MDG Information Analysis Management Group LLC, MJS Engel No 1 Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Meetra Inc, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), George Nimeh, Nimeh Inc, Old Town Fuel Company, PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, David A Parker, Karamali Pashmforoosh, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Arbind Rai, Maria Rai, Parmjit Randhawa, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Parviz Shamtoub, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, Trisha Enterprise Inc, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, John Vazirian, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., A Fine Enterprise & Company Inc., A Green Fuel Corporation, A J Services Inc, AKM Oil Co Inc, Abusham Petro LLC, Venture Petroleum Company, Inc., Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Young-Westwood Enterprises, Inc., Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Zuma Arc Inc. (Ryan, Timothy) (jao).
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER Granting in Part #212 Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to File. The Court grants in part BPWCP's request. BPWCP shall respond to the operative counterclaims on, or before, March 21, 2013. BPWCP also requests that the Court allow 14 days for BPWCP to file its answer to any counterclaims remaining after the Court has had an opportunity to rule on the contemplated motion. Good cause appearing, the Court grants this request. Furthermore, in their opposition, Defendants request that the Court set a Rule 26 scheduling conference and allow discovery to begin. The Court declines to do so. An early neutral evaluation and/or case management conference will be set in this matter by the Magistrate Judge once the pleadings have been finalized. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/1/2013. (jao)
March 1, 2013 Filing 213 RESPONSE in Opposition re #212 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Notice Of Ex Parte Application By BP West Coast Products LLC For Extension Of Time To Respond To Defendants Pleadings) filed by Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush(Individually and ), Francois Alvandi, Armen Ambartsumyan, Ambartsumyan Corporation, Khaja Ansari, Rajesh Arora, Raad Attisha, Saad Y. Attisha, Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Farideh Behmard, Medhi Behmard, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown(Individually and ), Buyrite Gasoline Inc, Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Carroll Centre, Inc., Rafael Castillo(Individually and BHRC Petro), Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin(Individually and ), Jennifer Cohen, Matt Cohen, Cohens Gasoline Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dhaliwalsons LLC, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Gas Depot Inc, Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Ahd Haddad, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Harsico LLC, Basel Hassounch, Hartyoon Awanis Hilalian, Silva Hilalian, Hilalian Corp, Horizon Investment Group Inc, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Rafwant Jafal, Joelles Oil Co LP, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj, Moshail S. Kamel, Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Khurana Investments Inc, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, MDG Information Analysis Management Group LLC, MJS Engel No 1 Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Meetra Inc, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt(A California Resident Individually and), George Nimeh, Nimeh Inc, Old Town Fuel Company, PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, David A Parker, Karamali Pashmforoosh, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Arbind Rai, Maria Rai, Parmjit Randhawa, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Parviz Shamtoub, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, Trisha Enterprise Inc, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, John Vazirian, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., A Fine Enterprise & Company Inc., A Green Fuel Corporation, A J Services Inc, AKM Oil Co Inc, Abusham Petro LLC, Venture Petroleum Company, Inc., Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Young-Westwood Enterprises, Inc., Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Zuma Arc Inc. (Ryan, Timothy) (jao).
February 28, 2013 Filing 212 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Notice Of Ex Parte Application By BP West Coast Products LLC For Extension Of Time To Respond To Defendants Pleadings) by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities to Ex Parte Motion, #2 Declaration of David M. Harris In Support of Ex Parte Motion, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration Of David M. Harris)(Lynch, Adriene) (jao).
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #210 MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint : A hearing on the motion is currently set for March 28, 2013. Defendants shall file an opposition on, or before, March 8, 2013. BPWCP shall file a reply, if it wishes, on, or before, March 15, 2013. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/26/2013.(jao) (jrl).
February 22, 2013 Filing 210 MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit B)(Gallini, Sandra) (jao).
February 20, 2013 Filing 209 NOTICE of Non-Compliance with Local Rule 5.1(a) Legibility, re #207 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Crossroad Petroleum, Inc., Ahd Haddad, #206 Amended Counterclaim filed by Crossroad Petroleum, Inc. (jao)
February 19, 2013 Filing 208 ANSWER to #173 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,, , COUNTERCLAIM against BP West Coast Products LLC, Does 1 through 10, Inclusive by Khaja Ansari, Rajesh Arora, Raad Attisha, Saad Y. Attisha, Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Farideh Behmard, Medhi Behmard, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown, Buyrite Gasoline Inc, Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Carroll Centre, Inc., Rafael Castillo, Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin, Jennifer Cohen, Matt Cohen, Cohens Gasoline Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dhaliwalsons LLC, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Gas Depot Inc, Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Harsico LLC, Basel Hassounch, Hartyoon Awanis Hilalian, Silva Hilalian, Hilalian Corp, Horizon Investment Group Inc, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Rafwant Jafal, Joelles Oil Co LP, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj, Moshail S. Kamel, Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Khurana Investments Inc, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, MDG Information Analysis Management Group LLC, MJS Engel No 1 Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Meetra Inc, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt, George Nimeh, Nimeh Inc, Old Town Fuel Company, PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, David A Parker, Karamali Pashmforoosh, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Arbind Rai, Maria Rai, Parmjit Randhawa, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Parviz Shamtoub, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, Trisha Enterprise Inc, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., A Fine Enterprise & Company Inc., A Green Fuel Corporation, A J Services Inc, AKM Oil Co Inc, Abusham Petro LLC, Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush, Francois Alvandi, Armen Ambartsumyan, Ambartsumyan Corporation, John Vazirian, Venture Petroleum Company, Inc., Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Young-Westwood Enterprises, Inc., Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Zuma Arc Inc.(Ryan, Timothy) (jao).
February 19, 2013 Filing 207 ANSWER to #173 Amended Complaint, by Crossroad Petroleum, Inc.(A California Corporation), Crossroad Petroleum, Inc., Ahd Haddad.(Razo, Michael) (jao).
February 19, 2013 Filing 206 AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM Second against BP West Coast Products LLC, filed by Crossroad Petroleum, Inc.(A California Corporation), Crossroad Petroleum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Razo, Michael) (jao).
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER (1) Granting in Part and Denying in Part #187 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Paintiff's Third Amended Complaint; and (2) Granting #149 Plaintiff's Partial Motion to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims; (3) Denying as Moot #186 Defendants' Motion for a More Definitive Statement; (4) Denying as Moot #104 Franchisees' Pending Motion to Dismiss Non-Operative Complaint; and (5) Setting Deadline for Defendants to Answer Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint. The Court (1) denies Defendants' motion to dismiss BPWCP's claims under the PMPA. (2) Grants Defendants' motion to dismiss BPWCP's express contractual indemnity claim. The dismissal is without prejudice. BPWCP may re- file or move to amend the complaint, as appropriate, when the express indemnity cause of action accrues. (3) Grants BPWCP's motion to dismiss Crossroad's counterclaims for fraud and breach of contract. The dismissal is without prejudice. Crossroad may file an amended counterclaim within 14 days of the date that this order is electronically docketed. (4) Denies as moot Defendant's motion for a more definite statement. (5) Denies as moot Franchisees' still-pending motion to dismiss BPWCP's nonoperative complaint. (6) Orders Defendants to file an answer to the TAC within 14 days of the date that this order is electronically docketed. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/4/2013. (jao)
February 1, 2013 Filing 204 NOTICE of Vacation by Attorney David A. Schiller. Nunc Pro Tunc 1/28/2013. (jao)
February 1, 2013 Filing 203 Notice of Document Discrepancies by Judge Janis L. Sammartino Accepting Document: Vacation Letter by David A. Schiller. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.4: Document not filed electronically. Notice of Noncompliance already issued. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is to be filed nunc pro tunc to date received. Signed by the chambers of Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/31/2013.(jao)(jrd)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER Vacating Hearings re #186 MOTION for More Definite Statement , #149 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #187 MOTION to Dismiss . The motion hearings set for January 31, 2013 are hereby vacated, and the matters are taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/25/2013.(jao)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER Granting Joint Stipulation of Dismissal re #198 Notice filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Based on the stipulation of the parties and good cause appearing therefor, it is hereby ordered that Nimeh, Inc. and George Nimeh shall be, and hereby are, dismissed with prejudice from BPWCP's Third Amended Complaint, each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. it is further ordered that BPWCP shall be, and hereby is, dismissed with prejudice from the operative Complaint and Counterclaims, including all amendments to the same, filed by Nimeh, Inc. in this action, each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over the implementation of or disputes arising out of the settlement of this action. Each of the parties hereto has the right to enforce the Settlement Agreement and seek equitable relief and damages as set forth therein.. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/21/2012.(jao)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER Granting Joint Stipulation of Dismissal re #197 Notice filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Based on the stipulation of the parties and good cause appearing therefor, it is hereby ordered that Hilalian, Harsico, Hartyoon Hilalian, solely in his capacity as Guarantor of Hilalian and Harsico's Franchise Agreements with BPWCP, and Silva Hilalian, solely in her capacity as Guarantor of Harsico's Franchise Agreement with BPWCP, shall be, and hereby are, dismissed with prejudice from BPWCP's Third Amended Complaint, each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/21/2012.(jao)
December 20, 2012 Filing 199 REPLY to Response to Motion re #187 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Crossroad Petroleum, Inc.(a California Corporation), Crossroad Petroleum, Inc.(A California Corporation), Crossroad Petroleum, Inc., Ahd Haddad. (Razo, Michael) (jao).
December 18, 2012 Filing 198 NOTICE by BP West Coast Products LLC of Joint Stipulation of Dismissal (Gallini, Sandra) (jao).
December 18, 2012 Filing 197 NOTICE by BP West Coast Products LLC of Joint Stipulation of Dismissal (Gallini, Sandra) (jao).
December 13, 2012 Filing 196 RESPONSE in Opposition re #187 MOTION to Dismiss filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gallini, Sandra) (jao).
December 13, 2012 Filing 195 RESPONSE in Opposition re #186 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Gallini, Sandra) (jao).
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER Granting #191 Joint Motion to Dismiss Crossroad's Counterclaims for Breach of Fiduciary Duty and Constructive Fraud. Crossroad's amended counterclaims for breach of fiduciary duty and constructive fraud are dismissed without prejudice; Both parties shall bear their own attorney's fees and costs with respect to the dismissal of Crossroads counterclaims for breach of fiduciary duty and constructive fraud; Both parties shall reserve their respective rights to seek attorney's fees and costs as to all remaining claims and counterclaims. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/21/2012. (jao)(jrd)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER (1) Resetting Hearings and (2) Setting Briefing Schedule as to #149 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #186 MOTION for More Definite Statement , #187 MOTION to Dismiss . The Court on its own motion resets the hearing for Thursday, January 31, 2013, at 1:30 p.m. Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant BP West Coast Products, LLC (BP) shall file an opposition to Defendants' motions on, or before, December 13, 2012. Defendants, if they wish, shall file a reply on, or before, December 20, 2012. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/21/2012.(jao)(jrd)
November 15, 2012 Filing 192 REPLY to Response to Motion re #149 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Gallini, Sandra) (jao).
November 14, 2012 Filing 191 JOINT STIPULATION to Dismiss Crossroad's Counterclaims for Breach of Fiduciary Duty and Constructive Fraud by Crossroad Petroleum, Inc.((Razo, Michael) Mailer sent, Text/Event modified on 11/15/2012 (jao).
November 1, 2012 Filing 190 NOTICE of Joinder by Crossroad Petroleum, Inc.(A California Corporation), Crossroad Petroleum, Inc., Ahd Haddad re #187 MOTION to Dismiss (Razo, Michael) (jao).
November 1, 2012 Filing 189 NOTICE of Joinder by Crossroad Petroleum, Inc.(A California Corporation), Crossroad Petroleum, Inc., Ahd Haddad re #186 MOTION for More Definite Statement (Razo, Michael) (jao).
November 1, 2012 Filing 188 RESPONSE in Opposition re #149 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Crossroad Petroleum, Inc.(a California Corporation). (Razo, Michael) (jao).
November 1, 2012 Filing 187 MOTION to Dismiss by Rajesh Arora, Raad Attisha, Saad Y. Attisha, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Farideh Behmard, Medhi Behmard, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Buyrite Gasoline Inc, Cal Coast Inc, Carroll Centre, Inc., Issa T Demes, Dhaliwalsons LLC, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Gas Depot Inc, Ibrahim Ghallab, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, Sylvia Haddadin, Basel Hassounch, Hartyoon Awanis Hilalian, Silva Hilalian, Rafwant Jafal, Joelles Oil Co LP, K & T Park79, Inc., Moshail S. Kamel, Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Khurana Investments Inc, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDG Information Analysis Management Group LLC, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, George Nimeh, Old Town Fuel Company, David A Parker, Karamali Pashmforoosh, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Arbind Rai, Maria Rai, Parmjit Randhawa, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Parviz Shamtoub, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, South West Petroleum LLC, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Brittany L Torres, Trisha Enterprise Inc, United Family LLC, A Fine Enterprise & Company Inc., A Green Fuel Corporation, A J Services Inc, Abusham Petro LLC, Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Francois Alvandi, Armen Ambartsumyan, John Vazirian, Venture Petroleum Company, Inc., Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Young-Westwood Enterprises, Inc., Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Zuma Arc Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Ryan, Timothy) (jao).
November 1, 2012 Filing 186 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Rajesh Arora, Raad Attisha, Saad Y. Attisha, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Farideh Behmard, Medhi Behmard, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Buyrite Gasoline Inc, Cal Coast Inc, Carroll Centre, Inc., Jennifer Cohen, Matt Cohen, Cohens Gasoline Inc, Crossroad Petroleum, Inc., Issa T Demes, Dhaliwalsons LLC, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Gas Depot Inc, Ibrahim Ghallab, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, Ahd Haddad, Sylvia Haddadin, Basel Hassounch, Hartyoon Awanis Hilalian, Silva Hilalian, Rafwant Jafal, Joelles Oil Co LP, K & T Park79, Inc., Moshail S. Kamel, Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Khurana Investments Inc, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDG Information Analysis Management Group LLC, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, George Nimeh, Old Town Fuel Company, David A Parker, Karamali Pashmforoosh, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Arbind Rai, Maria Rai, Parmjit Randhawa, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Parviz Shamtoub, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Brittany L Torres, Trisha Enterprise Inc, United Family LLC, A Fine Enterprise & Company Inc., A Green Fuel Corporation, A J Services Inc, Abusham Petro LLC, Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Francois Alvandi, Armen Ambartsumyan, Ambartsumyan Corporation, John Vazirian, Venture Petroleum Company, Inc., Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Young-Westwood Enterprises, Inc., Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Zuma Arc Inc. (Ryan, Timothy) (jao).
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER Setting Deadlines re #182 Status Report filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. All Represented Defendants in this action shall file any responsive pleadings to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint on, or before November 1, 2012. All Unrepresented Defendants in this action shall file any responsive pleadings to BP's Third Amended Complaint within 30 days from the date this order is electronically docketed. Defendant Crossroad Petroleum, Inc. shall file any opposition to BP's Partial Motion to Dismiss Crossroad's Amended Counterclaims on, or before, November 1, 2012. BP shall file a reply to Crossroad's opposition, if it wishes, on or before November 15, 2012. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/15/2012.(jao) (jrl).
October 4, 2012 Filing 184 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael Anthony Razo (Razo, Michael) (jao).
October 2, 2012 Filing 183 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Jennifer Cohen served. (Jones, Deborah) (jao).
September 27, 2012 Filing 182 STATUS REPORT Joint Submission of Proposed Dates for All Relevant Deadlines by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Gallini, Sandra) (jao).
September 27, 2012 Filing 181 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Ambartsumyan Corporation served. (Jones, Deborah) (jao).
September 27, 2012 Filing 180 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Armen Ambartsumyan served. (Jones, Deborah) (jao).
September 25, 2012 Filing 179 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Matt Cohen served. (Sperling, Elizabeth) (jao).
September 25, 2012 Filing 178 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Cohens Gasoline Inc served. (Sperling, Elizabeth) (jao).
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER 1) granting #169 Request to Life Stay in Light of Dismissal and Appeal and 2) Requiring the Parties to File Jointly Proposed Dates for all Relevant Deadlines. The Court grants the Franchisees' motion to lift the stay and orders the parties to file jointly proposed dates for the reinstatement of all relevant deadlines in this matter on or before September 27, 2012. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/10/2012. (jao)(jrd)
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER of USCA as to #45 Notice of Appeal. Appellants' unopposed motion to dismiss this appeal is granted. The copy of this order shall constitute the mandate of the USCA. (akr)
August 31, 2012 Filing 175 NOTICE by BP West Coast Products LLC Amended Certification Of Interested Parties (Lynch, Adriene) (jao).
August 23, 2012 Filing 174 Third Amended Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jao) (Main Document 174 replaced to refelct third amended on 8/23/2012) (jao).
August 22, 2012 Filing 173 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Third) against Rajesh Arora, Awans Enterprises Inc, BP West Coast Products LLC, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Farideh Behmard, Medhi Behmard, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown, Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Rafael Castillo, Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin, Jennifer Cohen, Matt Cohen, Cohens Gasoline Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Crossroad Petroleum, Inc.(a California Corporation), Crossroad Petroleum, Inc.(A California Corporation), Crossroad Petroleum, Inc., Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Ahd Haddad, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Harsico LLC, Basel Hassounch, Hartyoon Awanis Hilalian, Silva Hilalian, Hilalian Corp, Horizon Investment Group Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj, Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, MJS Engel No 1 Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Meetra Inc, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt, George Nimeh, Nimeh Inc, PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, David A Parker, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Arbind Rai, Maria Rai, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., AKM Oil Co Inc, Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush, Francois Alvandi, Khaja Ansari, Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A through F)New Summons Requested. (Jones, Deborah) (jao).
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Janis L. Sammartino: Rejecting Document, from Plaintiff BP West Coast Products LLC. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Document not properly captioned, complaints must list all party names individually, not "et al". IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/21/2012.(jao)(jrd)
August 10, 2012 Filing 171 **DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER #172 **AMENDED COMPLAINT (Third) against Rajesh Arora, Awans Enterprises Inc, Heidi Bahmani, Mohammad Bahmani, Bahman Baktar, Nesrin Barbat, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Farideh Behmard, Medhi Behmard, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown, Buyrite Gasoline Inc, Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Rafael Castillo, Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin, Jennifer Cohen, Matt Cohen, Cohens Gasoline Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Crossroad Petroleum, Inc., Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Ahd Haddad, Sylvia Haddadin, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Harsico LLC, Basel Hassounch, Hartyoon Awanis Hilalian, Silva Hilalian, Hilalian Corp, Horizon Investment Group Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Rafwant Jafal, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj, Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Omer Kassa, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Bahman Kianmahd, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, MJS Engel No 1 Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Tarun Maitra, Salah Mazloum, Meetra Inc, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Anit P.K. Natt, Gagan Natt, George Nimeh, Nimeh Inc, PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, David A Parker, Anup Patel, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, Soma Prasad, Muna Quasqas, R P Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Arbind Rai, Maria Rai, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Nader Sahih, Payam Sahih, Hy E Sao, Meng E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Kevin Tapia, Tracy Tapia, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Sheela Thomas, Brittany L Torres, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., AKM Oil Co Inc, Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush, Francois Alvandi, Khaja Ansari, Kotsai Wang, Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Jerry Zomorodian, Rebecca Zomorodian, Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A through F)New Summons Requested. (Jones, Deborah) Modified on 8/13/2012, per chambers new summons not prepared (srm). (Main Document 171 replaced on 8/21/2012) (jao). Modified to strike document on 8/21/2012 (jao).
August 8, 2012 Filing 170 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BP West Coast Products LLC of Defendant Dhaliwalsons LLC Without Prejudice (Lynch, Adriene) (leh).
July 27, 2012 Filing 169 REQUEST TO LIFT STAY - E-filed as SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Rajesh Arora, Raad Attisha, Saad Y. Attisha, Awans Enterprises Inc, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Medhi Behmard, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown, Buyrite Gasoline Inc, Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Carroll Centre, Inc., Rafael Castillo, Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin, Cohens Gasoline Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dhaliwalsons LLC, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Gas Depot Inc, Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Harsico LLC, Hartyoon Awanis Hilalian, Silva Hilalian, Hilalian Corp, Horizon Investment Group Inc, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Rafwant Jafal, Joelles Oil Co LP, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj, Moshail S. Kamel, Mohammad Kaskas, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Khurana Investments Inc, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, MDG Information Analysis Management Group LLC, MJS Engel No 1 Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Salah Mazloum, Meetra Inc, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Gagan Natt, George Nimeh, Nimeh Inc, Old Town Fuel Company, PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Karamali Pashmforoosh, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Arbind Rai, Maria Rai, Parmjit Randhawa, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Hy E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Aly Shakankiry, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Parviz Shamtoub, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, Trisha Enterprise Inc, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, John Vazirian, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., A Fine Enterprise & Company Inc., A Green Fuel Corporation, A J Services Inc, AKM Oil Co Inc, Abusham Petro LLC, Habib Alam, Manal Alam, Sharina Alloush, Francois Alvandi, Khaja Ansari, Venture Petroleum Company, Inc., Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Young-Westwood Enterprises, Inc., Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Zuma Arc Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proof of Service)(Ryan, Timothy) Modified on 7/30/2012 - Per chambers, changed filing event to a motion; edited document title in text to match pleading caption-title. (mdc)
July 9, 2012 Filing 168 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Parmjit Randhawa Without Prejudice by BP West Coast Products LLC (Lynch, Adriene). (jah).
July 9, 2012 Filing 167 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Trisha Enterprise Inc. Without Prejudice by BP West Coast Products LLC (Lynch, Adriene). (jah).
July 9, 2012 Filing 166 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Rajesh Arora served. (Lynch, Adriene) (mtb).
July 9, 2012 Filing 165 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Aly Shakankiry served. (Lynch, Adriene) (mtb).
July 9, 2012 Filing 164 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Mohammad Kaskas served. (Lynch, Adriene) (mtb).
July 9, 2012 Filing 163 Minute Entry by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: The Early Neutral Evaluation Conference previously scheduled for July 16, 2012 has been taken off calendar in light of the stay of all proceedings by the District Court.(no document attached) (plh) Modified to removed text re proceedings held. (pdc)
July 9, 2012 Filing 162 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Francois Alvandi served. (Lynch, Adriene) (mtb).
July 9, 2012 Filing 161 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Habib Alam served. (Lynch, Adriene) (mtb).
July 9, 2012 Filing 160 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Manal Alam served. (Lynch, Adriene). (jah).
July 3, 2012 Filing 159 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BP West Coast Products LLC of Defendant Khurana Investment, Inc. Without Prejudice (Lynch, Adriene) (mtb).
July 3, 2012 Filing 158 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BP West Coast Products LLC of Defendant Karamali Pashmforoosh Without Prejudice (Lynch, Adriene) (mtb).
July 3, 2012 Filing 157 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BP West Coast Products LLC of Defendant Buyrite Gasoline, Inc. Without Prejudice (Lynch, Adriene) (mtb).
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting Plaintiff BP West Coast Products, LLC's #154 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File to Refile Third Amended Complaint and Taking August 2 Hearing Off Calendar. Plaintiff shall file Third Amended Complaint by 8/10/2012. Court orders Clerk to strike the Franchisees' #94 Motion for More Definite Statement from the record. Court vacates the 8/2/2012 hearing on the pending motions and stays all other proceedings in this matter. Parties shall within 14 days of the date the Ninth Circuit rules on the pending appeal, file a joint motion to lift the stay with proposed dates for the reinstatement of all relevant deadlines in this matter. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/28/2012. (jah)
June 28, 2012 Filing 155 NON Opposition re #154 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint and Taking August 2 Hearing Date Off-Calendar filed by Saad Y. Attisha, Awans Enterprises Inc, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Paul Baskaron, Battir Oil Inc, Medhi Behmard, Younes Dobli Bennani, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown, Buyrite Gasoline Inc, Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Carroll Centre, Inc., Rafael Castillo, Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin, Cohens Gasoline Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dhaliwalsons LLC, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Gas Depot Inc, Ibrahim Ghallab, Ghallab Brothers Inc, Maret Golnazarian, Razmik Golnazarian, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Harsico LLC, Hartyoon Awanis Hilalian, Silva Hilalian, Hilalian Corp, Horizon Investment Group Inc, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Rafwant Jafal, Joelles Oil Co LP, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj, Moshail S. Kamel, Tahssen Kaskas, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Sahar Kermiz, William Kermiz, Khurana Investments Inc, Behzad Kianmahd, Kalur S Kishan, MDA Fuel Inc, MDG Information Analysis Management Group LLC, MJS Engel No 1 Inc, Ammar Maaytah, Randa Maaytah, Salah Mazloum, Meetra Inc, Ani Mirzaian, Liliana Monteagudo, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Senan F Naoum, Gagan Natt, George Nimeh, Nimeh Inc, Old Town Fuel Company, PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Karamali Pashmforoosh, Perfect Fuel Inc, Tigran Pogosyan, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Mostafa Rahgozar, Rahgozar Inc, Arbind Rai, Maria Rai, Parmjit Randhawa, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Hy E Sao, Himanshu D Sarvaiya, Sonal Shah, Yogesh Shah, Claude Shamaah, Shamaah Inc, Parviz Shamtoub, Ruchira Sharma, Hamza Shilleh, Shomers Group LLC, Vache Simonyan, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Sayed Majid Tavabi, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, Trisha Enterprise Inc, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, John Vazirian, Venture Petroleum Company, Inc., Ara Wansikehian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., A Fine Enterprise & Company Inc., A Green Fuel Corporation, A J Services Inc, AKM Oil Co Inc, Abusham Petro LLC, Sharina Alloush, Khaja Ansari, Raad Attisha, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Young-Westwood Enterprises, Inc., Marie Zorenkelian, Toros Zorenkelian, Zuma Arc Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Ryan, Timothy) (mdc)
June 27, 2012 Filing 154 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint and Taking August 2 Hearing Date Off-Calendar by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Sandra B. Gallini)(Sperling, Elizabeth) (mtb).
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule as to #149 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Crossroad Petroleum, Inc. shall file their Response in Opposition by 7/19/2012, BPWCP shall file their Reply, if any, by 7/26/2012. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/21/2012.(leh)
June 21, 2012 Filing 152 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Toros Zorenkelian served. (Lynch, Adriene)(aef).
June 21, 2012 Filing 151 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Marie Zorenkelian served. (Lynch, Adriene)(aef).
June 21, 2012 Filing 150 SUMMONS Returned Executed (for Second Amended/Consolidated Complaint, Doc. #76 ) by BP West Coast Products LLC. Vache Simonyan served. (Lynch, Adriene) Modified on 6/22/2012 - Added "(for Second Amended...)" to text (as is indicated on the actual document). (mdc)
June 20, 2012 Filing 149 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gallini, Sandra) (leh).
June 20, 2012 Filing 148 Partial ANSWER to Amended Counterclaim by BP West Coast Products LLC.(Gallini, Sandra) (leh).
June 20, 2012 Filing 147 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BP West Coast Products LLC of Defendant Gas Depot, Inc. Without Prejudice (Lynch, Adriene) (leh).
June 20, 2012 Filing 146 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BP West Coast Products LLC of Defendant John Vazirian Without Prejudice (Lynch, Adriene) (leh).
June 19, 2012 Filing 145 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Ani Mirzaian served. (Lynch, Adriene) (mtb).
June 19, 2012 Filing 144 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Hamza Shilleh served. (Lynch, Adriene) (mtb).
June 19, 2012 Filing 143 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Himanshu D Sarvaiya served. (Lynch, Adriene) (mtb).
June 19, 2012 Filing 142 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Gagan Natt served. (Lynch, Adriene) (mtb).
June 19, 2012 Filing 141 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Claude Shamaah served. (Lynch, Adriene) (mtb).
June 19, 2012 Filing 140 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Hy E Sao served. (Lynch, Adriene) (mtb).
June 18, 2012 Filing 139 SUMMONS Returned Executed (for Second Amended/Consolidated Complaint, Doc. #76 ) by BP West Coast Products LLC. Senan F Naoum served. (Lynch, Adriene) Modified on 6/19/2012 - Added "(for Second Amended...)" to text (as is indicated on the actual document). (mdc)
June 18, 2012 Filing 138 SUMMONS Returned Executed (for Second Amended/Consolidated Complaint, Doc. #76 ) by BP West Coast Products LLC. Tahssen Kaskas served. (Lynch, Adriene) Modified on 6/19/2012 - Added "(for Second Amended...)" to text (as is indicated on the actual document). (mdc)
June 18, 2012 Filing 137 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Sayed Majid Tavabi served. (Lynch, Adriene)(aef).
June 18, 2012 Filing 136 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Ara Wansikehian served. (Lynch, Adriene)(aef).
June 18, 2012 Filing 135 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Kulwant Singh Jafal served. (Lynch, Adriene)(aef).
June 18, 2012 Filing 134 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Behzad Kianmahd served. (Lynch, Adriene)(aef).
June 18, 2012 Filing 133 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Maria Rai served. (Lynch, Adriene)(aef).
June 18, 2012 Filing 132 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Arbind Rai served. (Lynch, Adriene) (cge).
June 18, 2012 Filing 131 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Yogesh Shah served. (Lynch, Adriene) (kaj).
June 18, 2012 Filing 130 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Sonal Shah served. (Lynch, Adriene)(yeb).
June 18, 2012 Filing 129 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Rafwant Jafal served. (Lynch, Adriene)(yeb).
June 18, 2012 Filing 128 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Liliana Monteagudo served. (Lynch, Adriene)(yeb).
June 18, 2012 Filing 127 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Randa Maaytah served. (Lynch, Adriene)(yeb).
June 18, 2012 Filing 126 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Ammar Maaytah served. (Lynch, Adriene)(yeb).
June 18, 2012 Filing 125 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Rafael Castillo served. (Lynch, Adriene) (kaj).
June 18, 2012 Filing 124 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Salah Mazloum served. (Lynch, Adriene) (kaj).
June 18, 2012 Filing 123 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Silva Hilalian served. (Lynch, Adriene) (kaj).
June 18, 2012 Filing 122 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Hartyoon Awanis Hilalian served. (Lynch, Adriene) (kaj).
June 18, 2012 Filing 121 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Tigran Pogosyan served. (Lynch, Adriene) (cge).
June 18, 2012 Filing 120 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Ruchira Sharma served. (Lynch, Adriene) (cge).
June 18, 2012 Filing 119 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Kalur S Kishan served. (Lynch, Adriene) (cge).
June 18, 2012 Filing 118 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Ibrahim Ghallab served. (Lynch, Adriene) (cge).
June 18, 2012 Filing 117 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Khaja Ansari served. (Lynch, Adriene) (rlu).
June 18, 2012 Filing 116 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Sahar Kermiz served. (Lynch, Adriene) (jpp).
June 18, 2012 Filing 115 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. William Kermiz served. (Lynch, Adriene) (mtb).
June 18, 2012 Filing 114 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. George Nimeh served. (Lynch, Adriene) (leh).
June 18, 2012 Filing 113 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Medhi Behmard served. (Lynch, Adriene) (leh).
June 18, 2012 Filing 112 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Paul Baskaron served. (Lynch, Adriene)(leh).
June 18, 2012 Filing 111 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Younes Dobli Bennani served. (Lynch, Adriene) (leh).
June 15, 2012 Filing 110 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Mostafa Rahgozar served. (Lynch, Adriene) (ag).
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting #103 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer of BP West Products LLC; granting #105 Joint Motion to Continue Responsive Pleading Deadline. BP West Coast Products LLC shall file answer to First Amended Counterclaim of Crossroad Petroleum, Inc by 6/20/2012. Gas Depot Inc shall file answer to the Second Amended and Consolidated Complaint by BP West Coast Products LLC by 6/27/2012. All parties are further advised that future requests for extensions of time shall be made at least 3 days in advance of the deadline the parties are seeking to extend. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/14/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
June 14, 2012 Filing 108 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BP West Coast Products LLC of Defendant Parviz Shamtoub Without Prejudice. (Lynch, Adriene) (mdc) Modified on 6/19/2012 - Defendant Parviz Shamtoub was termed on the docket as of 6/14/2012. (mdc)
June 14, 2012 Filing 107 SUMMONS Returned Executed (for Second Amended/Consolidated Complaint, Doc. #76 ) by BP West Coast Products LLC. Maret Golnazarian served. (Lynch, Adriene) Modified on 6/15/2012 - Added "(for Second Amended...)" to text (as is indicated on the actual document). (mdc)
June 14, 2012 Filing 106 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Razmik Golnazarian served. (Lynch, Adriene) (knb).
June 13, 2012 Filing 105 Joint MOTION to Continue Responsive Pleading Deadline of Gas Depot, Inc. to June 27, 2012 by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Lynch, Adriene) (mtb).
June 13, 2012 Filing 104 MOTION to Dismiss (Rule 12(b)(1) and (6)) by Saad Y. Attisha, Awans Enterprises Inc, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Battir Oil Inc, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown, Buyrite Gasoline Inc, Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Carroll Centre, Inc., Rafael Castillo, Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin, Cohens Gasoline Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dhaliwalsons LLC, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Gas Depot Inc, Ghallab Brothers Inc, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Harsico LLC, Hilalian Corp, Horizon Investment Group Inc, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Joelles Oil Co LP, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj, Moshail S. Kamel, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Khurana Investments Inc, MDA Fuel Inc, MDG Information Analysis Management Group LLC, MJS Engel No 1 Inc, Meetra Inc, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Gagan Natt, Nimeh Inc, Old Town Fuel Company, PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Karamali Pashmforoosh, Perfect Fuel Inc, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Rahgozar Inc, Parmjit Randhawa, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Shamaah Inc, Parviz Shamtoub, Shomers Group LLC, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, Trisha Enterprise Inc, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, John Vazirian, Venture Petroleum Company, Inc., West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Young-Westwood Enterprises, Inc., Toros Zorenkelian, Zuma Arc Inc, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., A Fine Enterprise & Company Inc., A Green Fuel Corporation, A J Services Inc, AKM Oil Co Inc, Abusham Petro LLC, Sharina Alloush, Khaja Ansari, Raad Attisha. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Ryan, Timothy) (mtb).
June 13, 2012 Filing 103 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer of BP West Coast Products LLC to June 20, 2012 by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Sperling, Elizabeth). Modified on 6/14/2012 - Edited text (jah).
June 12, 2012 Filing 102 Vacation Letter dated 6/1/2012 from David A. Schiller. NUNC PRO TUNC 6/11/2012. (jah)
June 12, 2012 Filing 101 Notice of Document Discrepancies by the Chambers of Judge Janis L. Sammartino Accepting Document: Vacation Letter from David Schiller for Consol Plaintiffs. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: No Proof of Service. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is to be filed nunc pro tunc to date received.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jah)(jrd)
June 12, 2012 Filing 100 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BP West Coast Products LLC of Defendant Joelle's Oil Co., LP Without Prejudice (Lynch, Adriene) (kaj).
June 8, 2012 Filing 99 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Cohens Gasoline Inc served. (Lynch, Adriene) (kaj).
June 7, 2012 Filing 98 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Dhaliwalsons LLC served. (Lynch, Adriene) (ag).
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule: Oppositions shall be filed by 7/5/2012. Franchisees, if they wish, shall file a Reply due by 7/12/2012. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 06/06/2012.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(yeb)(jrd)
June 5, 2012 Filing 96 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Parviz Shamtoub served. (Sperling, Elizabeth) (mdc)
June 5, 2012 Filing 95 MOTION to Dismiss (Rule 12(b)(1) and (6)) by Saad Y. Attisha, Awans Enterprises Inc, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Battir Oil Inc, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown, Buyrite Gasoline Inc, Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Carroll Centre, Inc., Rafael Castillo, Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin, Cohens Gasoline Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Gas Depot Inc, Ghallab Brothers Inc, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Harsico LLC, Hilalian Corp, Horizon Investment Group Inc, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Joelles Oil Co LP, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj, Moshail S. Kamel, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Khurana Investments Inc, MDA Fuel Inc, MDG Information Analysis Management Group LLC, MJS Engel No 1 Inc, Meetra Inc, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Gagan Natt, Nimeh Inc, Old Town Fuel Company, PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Karamali Pashmforoosh, Perfect Fuel Inc, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Rahgozar Inc, Parmjit Randhawa, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Shamaah Inc, Parviz Shamtoub, Shomers Group LLC, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, Trisha Enterprise Inc, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, John Vazirian, Venture Petroleum Company, Inc., West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Young-Westwood Enterprises, Inc., Toros Zorenkelian, Zuma Arc Inc, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., A Fine Enterprise & Company Inc., A Green Fuel Corporation, A J Services Inc, AKM Oil Co Inc, Abusham Petro LLC, Sharina Alloush, Khaja Ansari, Raad Attisha. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Ryan, Timothy) (atty contacted no p's and a's instructed to refile) (mtb). Modified on 6/14/2012 - Motion termed. Atty refile Motion #104 on 6/13/2012(jah).
June 5, 2012 Filing 94 DOCUMENT ORDERED STRICKEN PER 6/28/2012 ORDER #156 - MOTION for More Definite Statement (August 2, 2012) by Saad Y. Attisha, Awans Enterprises Inc, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, Battir Oil Inc, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown, Buyrite Gasoline Inc, Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Carroll Centre, Inc., Rafael Castillo, Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin, Cohens Gasoline Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Gas Depot Inc, Ghallab Brothers Inc, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Harsico LLC, Hilalian Corp, Horizon Investment Group Inc, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Joelles Oil Co LP, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj, Moshail S. Kamel, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Khurana Investments Inc, MDA Fuel Inc, MDG Information Analysis Management Group LLC, MJS Engel No 1 Inc, Meetra Inc, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Gagan Natt, Nimeh Inc, Old Town Fuel Company, PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Karamali Pashmforoosh, Perfect Fuel Inc, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Rahgozar Inc, Parmjit Randhawa, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Shamaah Inc, Parviz Shamtoub, Shomers Group LLC, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, Trisha Enterprise Inc, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, John Vazirian, Venture Petroleum Company, Inc., West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Young-Westwood Enterprises, Inc., Toros Zorenkelian, Zuma Arc Inc, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., A Fine Enterprise & Company Inc., A Green Fuel Corporation, A J Services Inc, AKM Oil Co Inc, Abusham Petro LLC, Sharina Alloush, Khaja Ansari, Raad Attisha. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Ryan, Timothy) (ag). Modified on 6/28/2012- Edited to reflect as stricken. Motion and judge association termed. (jah). (Main Document 94 replaced on 6/28/2012) (jah).
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER (1) Striking Documents from the Record re #85 Motion for More Definite Statement, re #86 MOTION to Dismiss (Rule 12(b)(1) and (6)) and #87 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim; and (2) Sua Sponte Extending Deadline to Respond: IT IS SO ORDERED that the Court rejects the documents and ORDERS that the Clerk STRIKE all three documents from the record. Defendants SHALL REFILE either their motions or their answer on or before June 5, 2012. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 06/01/2012.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(yeb)(jrd)
May 31, 2012 Filing 92 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Parmjit Randhawa served. (Sperling, Elizabeth)(yeb).
May 31, 2012 Filing 91 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. John Vazirian served. (Sperling, Elizabeth)(aef).
May 31, 2012 Filing 90 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Joelles Oil Co LP served. (Sperling, Elizabeth)(yeb).
May 31, 2012 Filing 89 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Gas Depot Inc served. (Sperling, Elizabeth)(yeb).
May 31, 2012 Filing 88 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BP West Coast Products LLC. Trisha Enterprise Inc served. (Sperling, Elizabeth)(yeb).
May 31, 2012 Filing 87 STRICKEN - ANSWER to #76 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against BP West Coast Products LLC by Battir Oil Inc, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown, Buyrite Gasoline Inc, Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Carroll Centre, Inc., Rafael Castillo, Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin, Cohens Gasoline Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Gas Depot Inc, Ghallab Brothers Inc, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Harsico LLC, Hilalian Corp, Horizon Investment Group Inc, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Joelles Oil Co LP, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj, Moshail S. Kamel, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Khurana Investments Inc, MDA Fuel Inc, MDG Information Analysis Management Group LLC, MJS Engel No 1 Inc, Meetra Inc, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Gagan Natt, Nimeh Inc, Old Town Fuel Company, PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Karamali Pashmforoosh, Perfect Fuel Inc, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Rahgozar Inc, Parmjit Randhawa, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Shamaah Inc, Parviz Shamtoub, Shomers Group LLC, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, Trisha Enterprise Inc, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, John Vazirian, Venture Petroleum Company, Inc., West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Young-Westwood Enterprises, Inc., Toros Zorenkelian, Zuma Arc Inc, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., A Fine Enterprise & Company Inc., A Green Fuel Corporation, A J Services Inc, AKM Oil Co Inc, Abusham Petro LLC, Sharina Alloush, Khaja Ansari, Raad Attisha, Saad Y. Attisha, Awans Enterprises Inc, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Ryan, Timothy)(yeb). Document stricken per order signed on 6/1/2012. (yeb).
May 31, 2012 Filing 86 STRICKEN - MOTION to Dismiss (Rule 12(b)(1) and (6)) by Battir Oil Inc, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown, Buyrite Gasoline Inc, Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Carroll Centre, Inc., Rafael Castillo, Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin, Cohens Gasoline Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Gas Depot Inc, Ghallab Brothers Inc, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Harsico LLC, Hilalian Corp, Horizon Investment Group Inc, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Joelles Oil Co LP, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj, Moshail S. Kamel, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Khurana Investments Inc, MDA Fuel Inc, MDG Information Analysis Management Group LLC, MJS Engel No 1 Inc, Meetra Inc, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Gagan Natt, Nimeh Inc, Old Town Fuel Company, PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Karamali Pashmforoosh, Perfect Fuel Inc, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Rahgozar Inc, Parmjit Randhawa, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Shamaah Inc, Parviz Shamtoub, Shomers Group LLC, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, Trisha Enterprise Inc, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, John Vazirian, Venture Petroleum Company, Inc., West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Young-Westwood Enterprises, Inc., Toros Zorenkelian, Zuma Arc Inc, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., A Fine Enterprise & Company Inc., A Green Fuel Corporation, A J Services Inc, AKM Oil Co Inc, Abusham Petro LLC, Sharina Alloush, Khaja Ansari, Raad Attisha, Saad Y. Attisha, Awans Enterprises Inc, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Ryan, Timothy) (knb). Document stricken per order signed on 06/1/2012
May 31, 2012 Filing 85 STRICKEN - MOTION for More Definite Statement by Battir Oil Inc, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown, Buyrite Gasoline Inc, Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Carroll Centre, Inc., Rafael Castillo, Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin, Cohens Gasoline Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Gas Depot Inc, Ghallab Brothers Inc, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Harsico LLC, Hilalian Corp, Horizon Investment Group Inc, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Joelles Oil Co LP, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj, Moshail S. Kamel, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Khurana Investments Inc, MDA Fuel Inc, MDG Information Analysis Management Group LLC, MJS Engel No 1 Inc, Meetra Inc, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Gagan Natt, Nimeh Inc, Old Town Fuel Company, PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Karamali Pashmforoosh, Perfect Fuel Inc, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Rahgozar Inc, Parmjit Randhawa, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Shamaah Inc, Parviz Shamtoub, Shomers Group LLC, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, Trisha Enterprise Inc, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, John Vazirian, Venture Petroleum Company, Inc., West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Young-Westwood Enterprises, Inc., Toros Zorenkelian, Zuma Arc Inc, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., A Fine Enterprise & Company Inc., A Green Fuel Corporation, A J Services Inc, AKM Oil Co Inc, Abusham Petro LLC, Sharina Alloush, Khaja Ansari, Raad Attisha, Saad Y. Attisha, Awans Enterprises Inc, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Ryan, Timothy) (knb). (yeb). Document stricken per order signed on 06/1/2012
May 30, 2012 Filing 84 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BP West Coast Products LLC of Defendant Zuma Arc, Inc. Without Prejudice (Lynch, Adriene) (leh).
May 25, 2012 Filing 83 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BP West Coast Products LLC (of Defendants Abusham Petro LLC; Saad Y. Attisha; and MDG Information Anaylsis Management Group, LLC Without Prejudice [F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)]) (Lynch, Adriene)(aef).
May 23, 2012 Filing 82 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Battir Oil Inc, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown, Buyrite Gasoline Inc, Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Carroll Centre, Inc., Rafael Castillo, Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin, Cohens Gasoline Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Gas Depot Inc, Ghallab Brothers Inc, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Harsico LLC, Hilalian Corp, Horizon Investment Group Inc, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Joelles Oil Co LP, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj, Moshail S. Kamel, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Khurana Investments Inc, MDA Fuel Inc, MDG Information Analysis Management Group LLC, MJS Engel No 1 Inc, Meetra Inc, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Gagan Natt, Nimeh Inc, Old Town Fuel Company, PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Karamali Pashmforoosh, Perfect Fuel Inc, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Rahgozar Inc, Parmjit Randhawa, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Shamaah Inc, Parviz Shamtoub, Shomers Group LLC, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, Trisha Enterprise Inc, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, John Vazirian, Venture Petroleum Company, Inc., West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Young-Westwood Enterprises, Inc., Toros Zorenkelian, Zuma Arc Inc, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., A Fine Enterprise & Company Inc., A Green Fuel Corporation, A J Services Inc, AKM Oil Co Inc, Abusham Petro LLC, Sharina Alloush, Khaja Ansari, Raad Attisha, Saad Y. Attisha, Awans Enterprises Inc, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo *AMENDED NOTICE AS TO THRIFTY OIL CO. ONLY* (Ryan, Timothy) (mtb).
May 23, 2012 Filing 81 AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against BP West Coast Products LLC, filed by Crossroad Petroleum, Inc.(A California Corporation). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits Part 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibits Part 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibits Part 3) (Kerbs, Michael) (mtb).
May 23, 2012 Filing 80 ANSWER to #76 Amended Complaint, by Crossroad Petroleum, Inc., Crossroad Petroleum, Inc.(A California Corporation).(Kerbs, Michael) (mtb).
May 22, 2012 Filing 79 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Battir Oil Inc, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown, Buyrite Gasoline Inc, Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Carroll Centre, Inc., Rafael Castillo, Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin, Cohens Gasoline Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Gas Depot Inc, Ghallab Brothers Inc, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Harsico LLC, Hilalian Corp, Horizon Investment Group Inc, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Joelles Oil Co LP, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj, Moshail S. Kamel, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Khurana Investments Inc, MDA Fuel Inc, MDG Information Analysis Management Group LLC, MJS Engel No 1 Inc, Meetra Inc, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Gagan Natt, Nimeh Inc, Old Town Fuel Company, PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Karamali Pashmforoosh, Perfect Fuel Inc, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Rahgozar Inc, Parmjit Randhawa, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Shamaah Inc, Parviz Shamtoub, Shomers Group LLC, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, Trisha Enterprise Inc, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, John Vazirian, Venture Petroleum Company, Inc., West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Young-Westwood Enterprises, Inc., Toros Zorenkelian, Zuma Arc Inc, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., A Fine Enterprise & Company Inc., A Green Fuel Corporation, A J Services Inc, AKM Oil Co Inc, Abusham Petro LLC, Sharina Alloush, Khaja Ansari, Raad Attisha, Saad Y. Attisha, Awans Enterprises Inc, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo *as to Thrifty Oil Co ONLY* (Ryan, Timothy) (ecs).
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER of USCA as to #45 Notice of Appeal, #47 Notice of Appeal. The USCA sua sponte severs consolidated preliminary injunction appeal Nos. 12-55723 and 12-55734. These appeals are no longer consolidated. Appellant Crossroad Petroleum's motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal No. 12-55734 (doc. #47 ) is granted. Accordingly, appeal No. 12-55734 is dismissed. This order served on the USDC shall act as and for the mandate of the USCA in appeal No. 12-55734. The parties' joint motion to supplement the record in appeal No. 12-55723, which is related to the USCA's request for briefing on the matter of mootness, is referred to the panel that shall hear the merits of the appeal. In appeal No. 12-55723, principal briefing is complete and the Clerk shall schedule oral argument as soon as possible. (akr)
May 11, 2012 Filing 77 Summons Issued on Second Amended Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (lmt)
May 10, 2012 Filing 76 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Battir Oil Inc, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown, Buyrite Gasoline Inc, Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Rafael Castillo, Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin, Cohens Gasoline Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Crossroad Petroleum, Inc.(A California Corporation), Crossroad Petroleum, Inc.(a California Corporation), Crossroad Petroleum, Inc., Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Gas Depot Inc, Ghallab Brothers Inc, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Harsico LLC, Hilalian Corp, Horizon Investment Group Inc, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Joelles Oil Co LP, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Khurana Investments Inc, MDA Fuel Inc, MDG Information Analysis Management Group LLC, Meetra Inc, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Gagan Natt, Nimeh Inc, PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Karamali Pashmforoosh, Perfect Fuel Inc, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Rahgozar Inc, Parmjit Randhawa, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Shamaah Inc, Parviz Shamtoub, Shomers Group LLC, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Toros AM-PM Mini Market Inc, Brittany L Torres, Trisha Enterprise Inc, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, John Vazirian, West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Toros Zorenkelian, Zuma Arc Inc, 2United Oil LLC, 3 Star Management, Inc., AKM Oil Co Inc, Abusham Petro LLC, Sharina Alloush, Khaja Ansari, Awans Enterprises Inc, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo, filed by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through E) New Summons Requested. (Sperling, Elizabeth) (lmt).
May 8, 2012 Filing 75 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Crossroad Petroleum, Inc.(A California Corporation) re #71 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Counter Claim as to Thrifty Oil Co. (Kerbs, Michael) (lmt).
May 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #69 Motion to Continue ENE: The Early Neutral Evaluation set for 5/23/12 is continued to 7/16/2012 at 09:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 5/5/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)
May 4, 2012 Filing 73 RESPONSE in Opposition re #69 MOTION to Continue (Reschedule) Early Neutral Evaluation Conference Opposition to Application of BP West Coast Products LLC to Reschedule Early Neutral Evaluation Conference filed by Battir Oil Inc, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Big Daddys Oil 15 Inc, Denise Brown, Buyrite Gasoline Inc, Cal Coast Inc, California Fuel Dispensing Inc, Carroll Centre, Inc., Rafael Castillo, Chase Products Inc, Susan Shen Chin, Cohens Gasoline Inc, Crestview Consolidated Inc, Daisie Enterprises Inc, Issa T Demes, Dream Petroleum, Inc., Gas Depot Inc, Ghallab Brothers Inc, H&O Inc, HRMP Corp, Hadaf Inc, Hamlet Enterprises Inc, Harsico LLC, Hilalian Corp, Horizon Investment Group Inc, I and M Oil Inc, Kulwant Singh Jafal, Joelles Oil Co LP, K & T Park79, Inc., Parshotam Kamboj, Moshail S. Kamel, Kaskas Enterprises Inc, Khurana Investments Inc, MDA Fuel Inc, MDG Information Analysis Management Group LLC, MJS Engel No 1 Inc, Meetra Inc, Monteagudo Enterprise Inc, NP Petroleum Corp, NRRM Corp, Gagan Natt, Nimeh Inc, Old Town Fuel Company, PB Inc, Pacific Expotech Petro Mart Inc, Karamali Pashmforoosh, Perfect Fuel Inc, R P Oil Inc, RP Oil Inc, Rahgozar Inc, Parmjit Randhawa, Rasna LLC, Ruchisys Inc, S M O Oil Inc, Shamaah Inc, Parviz Shamtoub, Shomers Group LLC, South West Petroleum LLC, Southland Petroleum Inc, Taftan Incorporated, Brittany L Torres, Trisha Enterprise Inc, United Family LLC, Vayasa Oil Co Inc, John Vazirian, Venture Petroleum Company, Inc., West Coast Petroleum Services LLC, Westminster Mini Market Inc, Young-Westwood Enterprises, Inc., Toros Zorenkelian, Zuma Arc Inc, 2United Oil LLC, A Fine Enterprise & Company Inc., A Green Fuel Corporation, A J Services Inc, AKM Oil Co Inc, Abusham Petro LLC, Sharina Alloush, Khaja Ansari, Raad Attisha, Saad Y. Attisha, Awans Enterprises Inc, Salman D. Barbat, Basel Hassounch and Rafael Castillo. (Ryan, Timothy) (lmt).
May 4, 2012 Filing 72 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BP West Coast Products LLC of Defendant A.J. Services Inc. (Sperling, Elizabeth) (lmt).
May 4, 2012 Filing 71 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Crossroad Petroleum, Inc.(A California Corporation) as to Thrifty Oil Co. (Kerbs, Michael) (atty contacted re cert of service) (lmt).
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #67 Joint Motion to Consolidate Cases and Setting Amended Pleading Schedule: All future docketing shall be done in the lead case, BP West Coast Products LLC v. Crossroad Petroleum, Inc., 12-CV-665 JLS (KSC). It is further ORDERED that BP West Coast Products LLC SHALL FILE an amended and restated complaint by 5/10/12. Any responsive pleadings and any counterclaims and/or cross-claims SHALL BE FILED within 21 days of service of the amended and restated complaint. Responsive pleadings to any counterclaims and/or cross- claims SHALL BE FILED within 21 days of service of the same. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/2/12. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt) (jrl).
May 2, 2012 Filing 69 MOTION to Continue (Reschedule) Early Neutral Evaluation Conference by BP West Coast Products LLC. (Sperling, Elizabeth) (lmt).
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Janis L. Sammartino: Rejecting Document, from Plaintiff BP West Coast Products LLC. Non-compliance with local rule(s), ECF 2(h): Includes a proposed order or requires judges signature. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/2/12.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lmt)
May 1, 2012 Filing 67 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases and to Set Amended Pleading Schedule by BP West Coast Products LLC. (DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER #68 ORDER - Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gallini, Sandra) (atty contacted re proposed order) (lmt). Modified on 5/2/2012 (lmt).
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER of USCA as to #45 Notice of Appeal, #47 Notice of Appeal. In these consolidated preliminary injunction appeals, the USCA grants appellants' opposed motion to expedite briefing. Amended briefing schedule issued. In their briefs, the parties shall address the following: (1) the expiration dates of the leases in dispute; and (2) why the USCA should not dismiss this appeal as moot due to expiration of the leases. The parties are reminded of the USCA's preference for joint briefing. (akr)
April 27, 2012 Filing 65 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM by 3 Star Management, Inc., A Fine Enterprise & Company Inc., A Green Fuel Corporation, Abusham Petro LLC, Raad Attisha, Saad Y. Attisha, Salman D. Barbat, Big Daddy's Oil 14, Inc., Carroll Centre, Inc., Dream Petroleum, Inc., K & T Park79, Inc., Moshail S. Kamel, Old Town Fuel Company, Venture Petroleum Company, Inc., Young-Westwood Enterprises, Inc. for proceedings held on April 17, 2012 re #45 Notice of Appeal. (Ryan, Timothy). (akr).
April 27, 2012 Filing 64 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BP West Coast Products LLC of Moshail S. Kamel (Sperling, Elizabeth) (lmt).
April 25, 2012