October 3, 2014 |
Filing
218
ORDER Denying: (1) Reconsideration of Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery; and (2) Reconsideration of Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Quash (Docs. 191 , 193 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 10/3/2014. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (srm)
|
July 15, 2014 |
Filing
211
ORDER: (1) Adopting 186 Report and Recommendation; (2) Denying 143 Motion to Strike; (3) Granting 144 Motion to Dismiss; and (4) Denying Motion to Strike and Granting Alternative Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 146 ). Plaintiff's request f or leave to amend his claim for deliberate indifference to serious medical needs against Cawagas and Serra is Granted. If Plaintiff wishes to file a second amended complaint to cure the deficiencies of this claim (and only this claim), Plaintiff shall do so on orbefore August 8, 2014. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/15/2014. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
|
March 12, 2014 |
Filing
182
ORDER Denying As Moot Plaintiff's 137 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Pro Per Status. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 3/12/2014. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)(jrd)
|
March 5, 2014 |
Filing
177
ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part 87 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 3/5/2014. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
|
March 4, 2014 |
Filing
176
ORDER: (1) Granting In Part and Denying In Part 84 Defendants' Motion to Quash Filed June 28, 2013; Granting 165 Defendants' Motion to Quash Filed February 10, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 3/4/2014. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (srm)
|
February 13, 2014 |
Filing
170
ORDER Denying as Moot 116 Plaintiff's Motion for Trial Before District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 2/13/2014. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
|
November 25, 2013 |
Filing
145
ORDER Granting 123 Motion to Reopen Discovery and Modifying Scheduling Order; Denying as moot Plaintiff's motion for a new scheduling order. The mandatory settlement conference scheduled before Judge Skomal on December 11, 2013 is Vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 11/25/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)(jrd)
|
October 8, 2013 |
Filing
113
ORDER Adopting 82 Report and Recommendation Regarding Plaintiff's Various Motions to Amend Complaint; Granting 53 , 59 , 69 Plaintiff's Motions for leave to Amend his Complaint to add Deputy Garcia, Henton, Pierson, Lawson, and Wh ittaker as Defendants; Denying as moot 57 Motion for Extension of Time to File; Denying 64 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Supplement Complaint to Add Sheriff William Gore and the County of San Diego. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/8/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
|
September 12, 2013 |
Filing
107
ORDER Denying 88 Plaintiff's Motion Requesting Reconsideration for the Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 9/12/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
|
June 25, 2013 |
Filing
83
ORDER Denying 67 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 6/25/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
|
February 21, 2013 |
Filing
47
ORDER Denying 46 Plaintiff's Motion For Court Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 2/21/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)(jrd)
|
December 20, 2012 |
Filing
34
ORDER Denying 32 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 12/20/2012. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)(jrd)
|
August 21, 2012 |
Filing
6
ORDER: Granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Dismissing Defendants For Failing to State a Claim; Directing US Marshal to Effect Service of Complaint; and Denying 3 Motion for TRO. The Watch Commander, or his designee, is ord ered to collect from prison trust account the $350 balance of the filing fee owed in this case by collecting monthly payments from the trust account in an amount equal to 20% of the preceding month income credited to the account and forward payments to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 in accordance with 28 USC 1915(b)(2). It is ordered Defendants Gore and Clamser are Dismissed from this action without prejudice. The Clerk shall issue a summons as to Plaintiff's Complaint upon the remaining Defendants. Defendants are thereafter Ordered to Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 8/21/2012. (Copy Sent to Watch Commander) (Pro Per Package Prepared) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
|