Millennium Laboratories, Inc. v. Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc.

Plaintiff: Millennium Laboratories, Inc.
Defendant: Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv02280
Filed: September 18, 2012
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Karen S. Crawford
Presiding Judge: Marilyn L. Huff
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 25, 2016 235 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant's 219 Motion for Reconsideration; granting Defendant's 161 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Plaintiff's 156 Motion for Summary Judgment. Clerk ordered to enter judgment in favor of Defendant Allied World and against Plaintiff Millennium. Court denies as moot 218 Joint Ex Parte Motion to Reset Pretrial and Trial dates. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 2/25/2016. (jah)
September 30, 2015 217 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff Millennium's 156 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Defendant Allied World's 161 Motion for Summary Judgment. Pla's motion for summary judgment on Claims 1 (declaratory relief) and 2 (breach of contract ) is granted. Dft's motion for summary judgment is denied in its entirety. Parties are ordered to contact the Magistrate Judge within 14 days from the issuance of this Order to set a trial date and related deadlines for Pla's third claim for breach of good faith and fair dealing. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 9/30/2015. (jah)
November 21, 2014 200 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc's 176 Motion to Amend Responses to Requests for Admission. Court finds that AWAC's request is not supported by the Rule 36(b) factors not by good cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 11/20/2014. (jah). Modified on 11/21/2014 - Ok to file, not sealed per Chambers (jah).
June 12, 2014 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Parties' 167 170 173 Unopposed Ex Parte Applications to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 6/12/2014. (rlu)
January 15, 2014 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Determining Discovery Dispute. AWAC's request to conduct depositions in excess of ten is Granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 1/15/2014.(rlu)
July 29, 2013 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 74 Motion to Seal the Court's Order. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 7/29/2013. (rlu)
July 16, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Without Prejudice 70 Ex Parte Motion to Close Hearing and Temporarily Seal Record; and Continuing Hearing. Motion Hearing on on Millennium Labs' motion for summary judgment Continued to 7/17/2013 09:30 AM before Judge Marilyn L. Huff. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 7/16/2013. (srm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Millennium Laboratories, Inc. v. Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millennium Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Marc D. Halpern
Represented By: Vincent H Herron
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Matera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Inc.
Represented By: Thomas H Prouty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?