Mir v. Medical Board of California et al
Plaintiff: Jehan Zeb Mir
Defendant: Medical Board of California, Linda Whitney and Sharon Levine
Case Number: 3:2012cv02340
Filed: September 25, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: David H. Bartick
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P. Curiel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER Denying 299 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Reopen Case. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/24/17. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER Denying 292 Plaintiff's Ex-Parte Application for an Order to Stay Proceedings and Amend Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying Without Prejudice Plaintiff's Motion 294 Motion for Change of Venue. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/18/17. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER Granting Defendants' 266 Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying Plaintiff's 255 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/26/17. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER Overruling Plaintiff's Objections and Affirming Magistrate Judges' Orders 183 , 185 , 215 . Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/17/17. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER Affirming Magistrate Judge Porter's Order Denying 200 Motion to Compel Further Deposition of Linda Whitney 205 . The Court overrules Plaintiff's Objections and affirms Magistrate Judge Porter's order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/19/16. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER Denying Joint 201 Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Documents from Sharon Levine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 11/14/16. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER Regarding 197 Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute Regarding Deposition of Linda Whitney. Plaintiff's motion to compel a further deposition of Ms. Whitney is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter on 10/19/16. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER Denying 190 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Compel Whitney to Answer Deposition Question. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 8/23/16. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER Denying 166 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration and Denying as Moot Plaintiff's Ex Parte 181 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/16/16. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 177 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Ex Parte 148 Application to Compel Defendant Kirchmeyer to Produce Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 7/1/16.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER Granting 163 , 165 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Applications to Compel Depositions of Kimberly Kirchmyeyer and Sharon Levine. Plaintiff's request for reimbursement of the $200.00 airline rebooking fee is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 6/29/16. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Ex Parte 150 Application to Compel Deposition of Joshua Bardin. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 6/27/16. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 154 Ex Parte Application to Compel Defendant Levine to Answer Plaintiff's Request for Admissions. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 6/22/16. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Ex Parte 148 Application to Compel Defendant Kirchmeyer to Produce Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 6/21/16. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER Granting in Part 156 Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order. The Mandatory Settlement Conference currently scheduled for August 5, 2016 shall be continued to October 14, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Bartick. The p roposed pretrial order shall be lodged with the district judge's chambers on or before November 21, 2016. The final pretrial conference that is currently scheduled on the calendar of the Honorable Gonzalo P. Curiel for September 23, 2016 shall be continued to December 2, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 5/17/16. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER Granting 131 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The Court grants Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiffs "individual capacity"; and Grants Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiffs "official capacity". Plain tiff has sufficiently stated a claim for violation of the Fourteenth Amendment under Section 1983 against Defendants Kirchmeyer and Levine to survive a motion to dismiss. Thus, what remains is Plaintiffs Section 1983 claim for prospective relief against Defendants Kirchmeyer and Levine in their official capacities only. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/11/16. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER Granting 90 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Third Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint on or by September 25, 2015. The hearing set for September 4, 2015 shall be vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/3/15. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part 50 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is granted forty-five (45) days to amend or file a notice that he intends to proceed on the Second Amended Comp laint without further amendment of his allegations. Defendants shall have fourteen (14) days to file an answer to Plaintiffs' remaining claims. The Court Vacates the hearing date set for this matter on May 30, 2014 at 1:30PM. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/30/2014. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER (1) Granting 13 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; (2) Denying 26 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration and Request for Recusal. Plaintiff may file a second amended complaint within thirty days. The Court hereby Vacates the hearing set on May 10, 2013 at 1:30pm. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/8/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Denying 17 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Granting 18 Defendant's Request For Judicial Notice. The Court Vacates the hearing set for this matter scheduled on March 22, 2013. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/19/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mir v. Medical Board of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jehan Zeb Mir
Represented By: John J. Schimmenti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Board of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?