Ortega et al v. San Diego Police Department et al
Plaintiff: |
Shakina Ortega, Tamia Ortega and Jacob Ortega |
Defendant: |
San Diego Police Department, Jonathan McCarthy, San Diego, City of and Does 1 through 10 |
Case Number: |
3:2013cv00087 |
Filed: |
January 11, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
San Diego |
Presiding Judge: |
Jan M. Adler |
Presiding Judge: |
Larry Alan Burns |
Nature of Suit: |
P.I.: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 29, 2019 |
Filing
216
AMENDED JUDGMENT in Favor of Defendants San Diego Police Department, the City of San Diego, and Jonathan McCarthy. The Court amends the prior Judgment to include an award of costs in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiffs, jointly and severally, in the amount of $38,402.06. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/29/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jdt)
|
May 4, 2017 |
Filing
195
ORDER Denying 190 Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis. The Court finds that Ortega's contentions aren't supported by the record, her request to proceed in forma pauperis is Denied. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 5/4/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(lrf)
|
December 8, 2014 |
Filing
87
ORDER Staying Proceedings Pending Appeal. This action is stayed pending the resolution of the appeal. The parties shall notify this Court immediately upon the issuance of a final order resolving the appeal. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 12/8/14.(kas)
|
November 14, 2014 |
Filing
82
ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendants' 49 Motion for Summary Judgment. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 2/9/2015 12:00 PM before Judge Larry Alan Burns. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 11/13/14. (kas)
|
May 20, 2014 |
Filing
62
ORDER denying 54 Motion for Leave to File Over-Length Brief, denying 58 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. The hearing currently on calendar for Monday, June 2, 2014 at 11:30 a.m. on the motion for summary judgment is vacated, along with the b riefing deadlines. Plaintiffs shall file an amended opposition by 6/6/2014, and Defendants may file their Reply by 6/16/2014. After the briefing is filed, the Court may reset a hearing if appropriate, but otherwise the matter will be taken under submission on the papers. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 5/20/14. (kaj)
|
October 21, 2013 |
Filing
30
ORDER On 26 Joint Motion Regarding Ortega's "Pitchess" Request to Obtain Defendant Jonathan McCarthy's San Diego Police Department Personnel File. The Court orders Defendants to produce all documents required to be produced in this Order pursuant to the Protective Order entered by the Court on July 24, 2013. All documents shall be produced to Plaintiffs within one week of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 10/21/13. (kaj)(jrd)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?