Kormylo, M.D. et al v. Forever Resorts, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Nicholas Kormylo, M.D., Kimberly Kormylo and Bruce Kormylo
Defendant: Does 1-50, Forever Resorts, LLC and Kenneth Williams
Case Number: 3:2013cv00511
Filed: March 5, 2013
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: William V. Gallo
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2015 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Granting BSA and BSA-SD's 77 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, but also Grants Williams and Forever Resorts' request for leave to amend the allegations regarding the Boy Scouts. Any amended third-party complaint must be filed within fourteen (14) days after entry of this order and should remedy the defects identified in this order; (2) Denying BSA and BSA-SD's 78 Motion to Strike, on grounds that it is moot; and (3) Granting in part and Denying in Par t Mark Allen and Chris Waddell's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. The court Denies the motion as to Mark Allen. The court Grants the motion as to Chris Waddell and dismisses him for lack of personal jurisdiction. Finally, the court Denies Williams and Forever Resorts' requests for jurisdictional discovery and for leave to amend the jurisdictional allegations regarding Waddell. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 1/6/2015. (rlu)
September 13, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint. Court grants Forever Resorts' motion for leave to file a third-party complaint w/o prejudice to further challenge the complaint should circumstances warrant. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 9/13/2013. (jah)
August 5, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 44 Motion for Leave to File a third party complaintwithout prejudice to further challenge of the complaint should circumstances warrant.Defendants shall file the third party complaint within 10 days of this order.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 8/5/14. (av1)
August 18, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended order after telephonic Discovery Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/18/2014.(av1)
November 4, 2014 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Appointing Guardian Ad Litem for Third-Party Defendant Taylor Hetherington. Thomas Max Hetherington II is appointed guardian ad litem for Taylor Hetherington. (ECF# 87 ) Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 11/4/14. (rlu)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kormylo, M.D. et al v. Forever Resorts, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Kormylo, M.D.
Represented By: Robert J Francavilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Kormylo
Represented By: Robert J Francavilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Kormylo
Represented By: Robert J Francavilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forever Resorts, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.