Kellgren v. Petco Animal Supplies, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Erik Kellgren
Defendant: Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., Petco Holdings, Inc. and Does 1 to 100
Case Number: 3:2013cv00644
Filed: March 19, 2013
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Karen S. Crawford
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. Whelan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 23, 2016 188 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Joint 179 Motion Regarding Defendants Petco Animal Supplies, Inc., and Petco Holdings, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Certain Opt-In Plaintiffs for Failure to Respond to Discovery and Comply with Court Orders. The Court grants the parties leave until on or before January 23, 2017 to file a Joint Motion to Dismiss or Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 11/23/16. (dlg).
September 3, 2015 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 60 Motion for Conditional Collective Action Certification. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 9/3/2015. (sjt)
June 6, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 21 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; granting 28 Motion for equitable tolling. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 6/6/2014. (sjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kellgren v. Petco Animal Supplies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Kellgren
Represented By: Kevin T Barnes
Represented By: Gregg Lander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petco Animal Supplies, Inc.
Represented By: Carolina Bravo-Karimi
Represented By: Meryl C Maneker
Represented By: Claudette G Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petco Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Carolina Bravo-Karimi
Represented By: Meryl C Maneker
Represented By: Claudette G Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?