9826 LFRCA, LLC v. Hurwitz et al

Plaintiff: 9826 LFRCA, LLC
Defendant: Robert A. Hurwitz and Hurwitz-James Company
Case Number: 3:2013cv01042
Filed: May 1, 2013
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Jan M. Adler
Presiding Judge: M. James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 20, 2017 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 107 Motion to Exclude. Defendant may not introduce evidence of post contract execution activity for the specific purpose of negating Plaintiffs claim of justifiable reliance. Defendants proffered evidence regarding Plaintiffs alleged failure to mitigate damages is relevant. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on October 20, 2017. (dsn)
May 9, 2017 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 74 Motion for Reconsideration and denying as Moot 84 Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order. All four of Plaintiffs claims may proceed to trial. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 5/9/2017. (sjt)
July 31, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 24 Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint. Third-party Defendant Burns shall file an Answer to the third-party complaint on orbefore August 11, 2014. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/30/2014. (sjt)
March 10, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 16 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Burns shall answer the third party complaint in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/10/2014. (sjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 9826 LFRCA, LLC v. Hurwitz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 9826 LFRCA, LLC
Represented By: Paul S Metsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Hurwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hurwitz-James Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?