Gusman v. Comcast Corporation

Plaintiff: James Gusman
Defendant: Comcast Corporation
Case Number: 3:2013cv01049
Filed: May 2, 2013
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: David H. Bartick
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P. Curiel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 14, 2015 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 71 Plaintiff's Motion for Additional Limited Discovery; and Setting Briefing Schedule on Motion for Class Certification: Plaintiff shall file a motion for class certification on or before Decem ber 8, 2015 and shall disclose his expert on class certification a week before the motion for class certification. Defendant shall be file an opposition on or before January 15, 2015 and shall disclose its expert a week before its opposition. Plaintiff shall file a reply on or before January 22, 2016. A hearing is set on February 5, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/14/15. (dlg)
September 24, 2015 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY and Setting Status Conference. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/2/2015 at 1:00 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/24/2015. (srm)
May 21, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 34 Defendant's Motion to Stay; Denying 46 Motion to File Documents Under Seal Without Prejudice; Denying 57 Motion to Certify Class Without Prejudice. The parties shall submit a joint status report regarding the status of the FCC petitions every 120 days. The hearings set for May 23, 2014 and July 25, 2014 are vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/21/2014. (srm)
April 2, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Resolving 29 Joint Motion for Determination of Discovery Dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge David H. Bartick on 4/2/2014. (srm)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gusman v. Comcast Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Gusman
Represented By: Todd M. Friedman
Represented By: Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Matthew Michael Loker
Represented By: Joshua Swigart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?