Wahoo International, Inc. v. Phix Doctor, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Wahoo International, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Phix Doctor, Inc. and Does 1-10 |
Case Number: |
3:2013cv01395 |
Filed: |
June 14, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
San Diego |
Presiding Judge: |
Gonzalo P. Curiel |
Presiding Judge: |
Barbara Lynn Major |
Nature of Suit: |
Trademark |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 1114 Trademark Infringement |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 27, 2015 |
Filing
136
ORDER Denying 130 Motion to Alter or Amend. The Court Denies Defendant's request to certify the sanctions issue on appeal. The hearing scheduled on October 30, 2015 is vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/27/2015. (srm)
|
June 23, 2015 |
Filing
119
ORDER Granting 107 Counterdefendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Counterclaim. The Court Grants Counterdefendants' motion to dismiss the counterclaim without leave to amend. The hearing set for June 26, 2015 isvacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/23/2015. (srm)
|
January 29, 2015 |
Filing
99
ORDER Granting In Part 84 Defendant's Motion to Alter or Amend. The Court reduces the amount of attorneys' fees and cost award to $5,749.50. Defendant is Ordered to comply with the Court's order and pay Plaintiff $5,749.50 within three months. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/29/2015. (srm)
|
December 2, 2014 |
Filing
80
ORDER Denying 68 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment; Denying as Moot 71 Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Default; and Granting Plaintiff's Request for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. The default entered on July 18, 2014, (Dkt . No. 54 ), is vacated. The Court grants Plaintiff's request for sanctions in the amount of $9,749.50 in attorneys' fees and costs. The hearing set for December 5, 2014 is vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/2/2014. (srm)
|
October 28, 2014 |
Filing
73
ORDER Granting 59 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint. Plaintiff shall file a first amended complaint within seven (7) days. The hearing set for October 31, 2014 is vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/28/2014. (srm)
|
July 18, 2014 |
Filing
55
ORDER: (1) Denying 50 Defendant's Ex Parte Motion to Quash Third Party Subpoenas; (2) Directing Parties to Execute a Protective Order; (3) Modifying Plaintiff's Subpoenas. Protective Order due filed with Court on 8/1/2014. The third part ies on whom the subpoenas were served must produce all documents and information responsive to these requests by August 8, 2014. Plaintiff is ordered to serve a copy of this order on the five subpoenaed entities by July 23, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 7/18/2014. (srm)
|
June 24, 2014 |
Filing
49
ORDER Denying 36 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. The Court Denies Defendant's requests for judicial notice and Sustains 39 Plaintiff's objection to Gowen's declaration. The hearing set for June 27, 2014 is Vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/24/2014. (srm)
|
May 20, 2014 |
Filing
47
ORDER Denying 40 Ex Parte Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/20/2014. (srm)
|
March 17, 2014 |
Filing
34
ORDER Granting 26 Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Default. Plaintiff's request for attorney's fees and costs is Denied. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading within fourteen (14) days. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/17/2014. (srm)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?