Mauss v. Nuvasive, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Danny Popov
Defendant: Nuvasive, Inc., Alexis V. Lukianov, Kevin C. O'Boyle and Michael J. Lambert
Case Number: 3:2013cv02005
Filed: August 28, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Presiding Judge: William McCurine
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT 253 AND GRANTING IN PART MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES, REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES, AND AWARDS FOR PLAINTIFFS 254 . Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 12/5/2018. (sjm)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER Granting Conditional Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement [Doc. No. 246 ]. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 6/11/2018. (jjg)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER granting 244 Motion to Continued Status Conference set for 3/19/2018 to 3/26/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5D before Judge Jeffrey T. Miller. If a Motion for Preliminary Approval is filed by March 23, 2018, the Status Conference hearing date will be vacated. In the event the Motion for Preliminary Approval is not filed by March 23, 2018, all counsel shallappear, in person, for the March 26, 2018 Status Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 3/19/2018.(gac)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER granting 242 JOINT MOTION TO ADJOURN CONFERENCE Motions for preliminary approval of settlement (and form of notice) due by 3/16/2018. Status Conference set for 3/8/2018 is vacated and continued to 3/19/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5D before Judge Jeffrey T. Miller. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 3/6/2018. (gac)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER denying 152 Defendants' (1) Motion for Summary Judgment; 154 Motion to Exclude testimony; and 168 Motion to Strike exhibits. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 2/01/2018. (jpp)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER Granting 160 Plaintiffs' Application to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 10/13/2017. (lrf)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Denying 132 Ex Parte Application to Stay Action Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 4/27/2017. (rlu)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER Granting 106 Motion to Class Certification; Appointing Class Representatives; and Appointing Class Counsel. The court grants the motion for class certification, appoints Brad Mauss and David Popov as class representatives, and appoints Pomerantz and GPM as class counsel. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 3/22/2017. (rlu)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Denying in part and Granting in part Defendant's 73 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fifth Amended Complaint. The claims against Defendant O'Boyle are dismissed without leave to amend. Remaining Defendants are to file an answer to the Second Amended Complaint within 14 days after the entry of this order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 7/12/2016. (rlu)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Dismissing Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint With Leave To Amend: Defendants' motion to dismiss (Doc. 31 ) is granted. Plaintiff's request for leave to amend, however, is granted. If Plaintiff wishes to file a third amended complaint, he must do so within fourteen days after entry of this order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 12/9/2014. (mdc)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with leave to amend. Should Plaintiff wish to file a second amendedcomplaint, he must do so within twenty days of this order.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 8/19/2014. (av1)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TRANSFER ORDER. It is hereby ordered that this case be transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Mitchell D. Dembin, to the calendar of the Honorable Jill L. Burkhardt, for all further proceedings. All conference or hearing dates set before Magi strate Judge Dembin, if any, are VACATED and will be rescheduled before Magistrate Judge Burkhardt. Any dates set before any district judge remain unchanged. The new case number is 13cv2005 JM (JLB). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 03/28/14.(jcj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mauss v. Nuvasive, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Popov
Represented By: Lionel Z Glancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nuvasive, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexis V. Lukianov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin C. O'Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?