Industrial Technology Research Institute v. LG Electronics Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Industrial Technology Research Institute
Defendant: LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. and LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv02016
Filed: August 29, 2013
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P. Curiel
Referring Judge: Nita L. Stormes
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2015 195 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying ITRI's 162 Motion for Sanctions; denying as moot LGE's 189 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. The hearing set for 4/3/2015 is vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/1/2015. (jah)
February 5, 2015 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Denying 143 Industrial Technology Research Institute's Motion to Dismiss for Want of Subject Matter Jurisdiction; (2) Vacating Hearing Date. The hearing set for February 6, 2015, is Vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/5/2015. (srm)
December 9, 2014 150 Opinion or Order of the Court REDACTED ORDER Granting 98 ITRI's Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying LG Electronics' 112 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/9/2014. (srm)
December 8, 2014 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 65 Plaintiff Industrial Technology Research Institute's Motion to Strike Defendants from Arguing Invalidity Defenses During Claim Construction Proceedings. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/8/2014. (srm)
October 17, 2014 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying as Moot 66 Defendants' Motion for Issuance of a Letter of Request to LG Display Inc. in the Republic of Korea. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/17/2014. (srm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Industrial Technology Research Institute v. LG Electronics Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Industrial Technology Research Institute
Represented By: Jill Fawn Kopeikin(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?