Cohen v. Trump Featured Case

Plaintiff: Art Cohen
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Case Number: 3:2013cv02519
Filed: October 18, 2013
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P. Curiel
Referring Judge: William V. Gallo
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2017 336 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 332 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Leeland O. White. A review of the record reflects that this appeal may be frivolous. The USCA may dismiss a case at any time, if the court determines the case is frivolous. Within 35 days after the date of this order, appellant must: (1) file a motion to dismiss this appeal, see FRAP 42(b), OR (2) file a statement explaining why the appeal is not frivolous and should go forward. If appellant does not respond to this order, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal for failure to prosecute, without further notice. If appellant files a motion to dismiss the appeal, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal, pursuant to FRAP 42(b). If appellant submits any response to this order other than a motion to dismiss the appeal, the court may dismiss this appeal as frivolous, without further notice. If appellant files a statement that the appeal should go forward, appellees may file a response within 10 days after service of appellant's statement. The briefing schedule for this appeal remains stayed. The Clerk shall serve on appellant: (1) a form motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal, and (2) a form statement that the appeal should go forward. Appellant may use the enclosed forms for any motion to dismiss this appeal or statement that the appeal should go forward. (akr)
August 1, 2017 335 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 332 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Leeland O. White. A review of the docket reflects that appellant has not paid the docketing and filing fees for this appeal. Within 21 days from the date of this order, appellant shall: (1) file a motion with the USCA to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) pay $505 to the USDC as the docketing and filing fees for this appeal and provide proof of payment to the USCA; or (3) otherwise show cause why the appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. The filing of a motion to proceed in forma pauperis will automatically stay the briefing schedule under Ninth Circuit Rule 27-11. Any motion to proceed in forma pauperis must include a financial declaration such as the attached Form 4. If appellant fails to comply with this order, this appeal will be dismissed automatically by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. (akr)
July 24, 2017 334 USCA Time Schedule Order as to 332 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Leeland O. White. (NOTICE TO PARTIES of deadlines regarding appellate transcripts: Appellant shall file transcript designation and ordering form with the US District Court, provide a copy of the form to the court reporter, and make payment arrangements with the court reporter on or by 8/21/2017 (see Ninth Circuit Rule 10-3.1); Due date for filing of transcripts in US District Court is 9/19/2017.) (cc: Court Reporter). (akr)
July 24, 2017 333 USCA Case Number 17-56051 for 332 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Leeland O. White. (akr)
July 14, 2017 332 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit as to 330 Order denying Leeland O. White's "Amended Motion to Set Aside Judgment" and "Amended Motion to Vacate Settlement Agreement and Reverse Denial of Motion to Intervene," filed by Leeland O. White. Fee not paid. (Notice of Appeal electronically transmitted to the US Court of Appeals.) (akr)
July 7, 2017 331 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Notice of Attending Court Hearing by Leeland White. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Civ.L. Rule 5.1(h) Filer not a party to case. No provisions for acceptance. The July 14, 2017 hearing was vacated per the Courts June 27, 2017 Order and will not be held. See Dkt. No. 330. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/7/17.(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2017: # 1 Rejected Document) (Discrepancy sent via US Mail to filer) (dlg).
June 27, 2017 330 Featured Case ORDER denying Leeland O. White's "Amended Motion to Set Aside Judgment" and "Amended Motion to Vacate Settlement Agreement and Reverse Denial of Motion to Intervene (ECF 311 , 315 ). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/27/2017. (fth)
June 20, 2017 328 REPLY to Response to Motion re 315 MOTION to Vacate, 311 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment filed by Leeland O. White. Nunc pro tunc 6/16/17 (dlg)
June 20, 2017 327 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Accepting Document: Petitioner Leeland O. White's Reply to Defendant's Response. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document. Nunc Pro Tunc 6/16/17. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/19/17. (document sent via U.S. Mail to filer)(dlg)
June 19, 2017 329 Featured Case ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 318 Plaintiffs' Motion for Appeal Bond. Simpson is directed to post an appeal bond of $500 to cover taxable costs within seven days of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/19/17. (dlg)
June 14, 2017 326 REPLY to Response to Motion re 318 MOTION for Appeal Bond re 309 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, # 2 Exhibit 16-18 to Jensen Declaration)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
June 14, 2017 325 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Helen I. Zeldes by Art Cohen (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service)(Eck, Amber) (dlg).
June 8, 2017 324 NOTICE of Firm Name Change by Art Cohen (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Certificate of Service)(Eck, Amber) (dlg).
June 8, 2017 323 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sherri B. Simpson re 322 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Friedman, Gary) (dlg).
June 7, 2017 322 RESPONSE in Opposition re 318 MOTION for Appeal Bond re 309 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, Memorandum of Law filed by Sherri B. Simpson. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gary B. Friedman, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Friedman, Gary) QC EMAIL - missing certificate of service (fth).
May 30, 2017 321 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 309 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Sherri B. Simpson. The plaintiffs-appellees' unopposed motion to expedite is granted in part. This case is expedited and shall be calendared as soon as possible upon completion of briefing. Briefing schedule issued. The provisions of Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(a) regarding streamlined extensions shall not apply to this case, and any motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b) is strongly disfavored and must be supported by a showing of compelling circumstances. (akr)
May 25, 2017 320 NOTICE of Joinder by Art Cohen re 319 Response in Opposition to Motion [Plaintiff's Notice of Joinder in Defendants' Opposition to Leeland White's Motion to Set Aside Judgment] (Pfefferbaum, Daniel) (dlg).
May 25, 2017 319 RESPONSE in Opposition re 311 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment filed by Donald J. Trump. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
May 24, 2017 318 MOTION for Appeal Bond re 309 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in support thereof, # 3 Exhibit 1-15 to Jensen Declaration, # 4 Declaration of Edward A. Wulff in support thereof, # 5 Declaration of Charles Marr in support thereof)(Jensen, Rachel)(dlg).
May 23, 2017 317 Featured Case ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 311 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment and 315 MOTION to Vacate : Any response by the existing parties to the case shall be filed by June 2, 2017. In the event that a response is filed, any reply by Mr. White shall be filed by June 16, 2017. The hearing set for July 14, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. currently remains on calendar. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/23/17.(dlg)
May 23, 2017 316 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Amended Motion to Vacate Settlement Agreement and Reverse Denial of Motion to Intervene by Leeland White. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Duplicate filing as to Dkt. No. 315. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/23/17.(Discrepancy mailed to filer) (dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/23/2017: # 1 Rejected Document) (dlg).
May 22, 2017 315 Amended MOTION to Vacate Settlement Agreement and Reverse Denial of Motion to Intervene filed by Leeland O. White. (dlg)
May 3, 2017 314 USCA Time Schedule Order as to 309 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Sherri B. Simpson. (NOTICE TO PARTIES of deadlines regarding appellate transcripts: Appellant shall file transcript designation and ordering form with the US District Court (see attached), provide a copy of the form to the court reporter, and make payment arrangements with the court reporter on or by 5/31/2017 (see Ninth Circuit Rule 10-3.1); Due date for filing of transcripts in US District Court is 6/30/2017.) (cc: Court Reporter). (Attachments: # 1 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form). (akr)
May 3, 2017 313 USCA Case Number 17-55635 for 309 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Sherri B. Simpson. (akr)
May 3, 2017 312 Featured Case ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 311 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment : A hearing has been scheduled for July 14, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. The Court hereby sets the following briefing schedule. Any response by the existing parties to the case shall be filed by May 26, 2017. In the event that a response is filed, any reply by Mr. White shall be filed by June 9, 2017. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/3/17.(Mr. White served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
May 3, 2017 311 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment filed by Leeland O. White. Nunc pro tunc 5/1/17.(dlg)
May 3, 2017 310 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Accepting Document: Motion to Set Aside Judgment by Leeland O. White. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Missing table of contents and/or table of authorities;. Nunc Pro Tunc 5/1/17. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/3/17.(dlg)
May 1, 2017 309 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit as to 306 Final Judgment, 305 Order, by Sherri B. Simpson. (Filing fee $ 505 receipt number 0974-10035995.) (Notice of Appeal electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals.) (Eng, Kevin). (Modified on 5/1/2017: Edited docket text re linked Judgment and Order.) (akr).
April 4, 2017 308 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/30/2017, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Bowery. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 4/25/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/5/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/3/2017. (Transcript filed in case numbers 10-cv-00940-GPC-WVG and 13-cv-02519-GPC-WVG.) (akr)
April 3, 2017 307 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Letter (Ex Parte). Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Ex parte communication prohibited. Case closed. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/3/17.(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/3/2017: # 1 Rejected Document) (dlg).
March 31, 2017 306 Featured Case FINAL JUDGMENT. Effective as of the date of the Final Approval Order, this Judgment is binding on all Parties and all Class Members and extinguishes all Released Claims of Releasing Plaintiffs and Class Members and Releasing Defendants that were released pursuant to the Agreement. The Actions, including the individual claims of Plaintiffs and Class claims resolved in them, are hereby dismissed on the merits and with prejudice without fees or costs to any Party, except as provided in the Agreement. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/31/2017.(jao)
March 31, 2017 305 Featured Case ORDER (1) Granting 294 Joint Motion For Final Approval of The Proposed Class Action Settlement; and (2) Granting 295 Plaintiffs' Motion For Approval of Class Representative Awards. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/31/2017. (jao)
March 30, 2017 304 Minute Order. for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel:Final Approval Hearing held on 3/30/2017; Motion Hearing held on 3/30/2017 re 294 Joint MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Art Cohen, - taken under submission 295 MOTION for Approval of Class Representative Service Awards filed by Art Cohen - taken under submission. (Court Reporter/ECR Chari Bowery). (Plaintiff Attorney Amber Eck, Jason Forge, Patrick Coughlin, Rachel Jensen, Daniel Pfefferbaum and Jeffrey Stein).(Defendant Attorney David Kirman, Daniel Petrocelli, Jill Martin).(Gary Friedman for Objector Sherri Simpson and IIann Maazel). (no document attached) (ksr)
March 27, 2017 303 Featured Case ORDER Denying 287 Leeland O. White's Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/27/17. (Order mailed to Leeland O. White) (dlg) Modified on 4/4/2017 to mail order again to Leeland White (dlg).
March 23, 2017 302 NOTICE of Joinder by Donald J. Trump re 301 Reply to Response to Motion, (Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
March 23, 2017 301 REPLY to Response to Motion re 294 Joint MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement , 295 MOTION for Approval of Class Representative Service Awards filed by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Reply Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support, # 2 Reply Declaration of Edward A. Wulff in Support, # 3 Declaration of Amber L. Eck in Support, # 4 Declaration of Charles Marr, Esq. in Support, # 5 Declaration of Robert Guillo)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
March 20, 2017 300 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Amended Motion and Memoranda Determine Concerning Conspiracy by Leeland O. White. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document, OTHER: not a party to the case, no provision for acceptance. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/20/17.(Discrepancy served via U.S. mail to filer)(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/20/2017: # 1 Rejected Document) (dlg).
February 24, 2017 299 Letter Objecting to Settlement from Harold Doe. Nunc pro tunc 2/23/17 (dlg)
February 24, 2017 298 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Accepting Document: Settlement Objection Letter by Harold Doe. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Settlement objection letter does not fully comply with the requirements for written objections set forth in the Courts December 20, 2016 Order. Nunc Pro Tunc 2/23/17. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/24/17.(dlg)
February 21, 2017 297 Leeland O. White's Amended REPLY to Response to Motion re 287 MOTION to Intervene. Nunc pro tunc 2/17/17. (dlg)
February 21, 2017 296 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Accepting Document: Amended Reply by Leeland O. White. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Document exceeds 10 pages without court order. Nunc Pro Tunc 2/17/17. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/21/17.(dlg)
February 17, 2017 295 MOTION for Approval of Class Representative Service Awards by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support thereof, # 2 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
February 17, 2017 294 Joint MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support thereof, # 2 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, # 3 Declaration of Edward A. Wulff in Support thereof)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
February 7, 2017 293 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Leave of Court to File Motion by Leeland O. White.. Non-compliance with local rule(s) OTHER:Reply brief was prematurely sent on February 3, 2017, prior to the response by the existing parties in the case filed on February 6, 2017. See the Courts January 24, 2017 Order Setting Briefing Schedule re: motion to intervene (Dkt. No. 288) (Any response by the existing parties to the case shall be filed by February 6, 2017. In the event that a response is filed, any reply by Mr. White shall be filed by February 21, 2017. (emphasis added)). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/7/2017.(fth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2017: # 1 Rejected Document) (fth).
February 6, 2017 292 NOTICE of Joinder by Art Cohen re 291 Response to Motion Plaintiff's Notice of Joinder in Defendants' Opposition to Leeland White's Motion to Intervene and to Object to Class Action Settlement (Pfefferbaum, Daniel) (fth).
February 6, 2017 291 RESPONSE to Motion re 287 MOTION to Intervene / Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Leeland White's Motion to Intervene and to object to Class Action Settlement filed by Donald J. Trump. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (fth).
February 3, 2017 290 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Motion to Determine Possible Conspiracy by Leeland O. White. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document, OTHER: not a party to the case, no provision for acceptance. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/3/17. (Discrepancy sent via U.S. Mail to Leeland O. White. dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2017: # 1 Rejected document) (dlg).
January 24, 2017 289 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Request for Claim Form or Docket Reflecting Counsel's Address filed by Gary A. Niswonger. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Ex parte communication; filer not a party to the case; no provisions for acceptance. Information pertaining to Settlement Claim Forms is set forth in the Courts December 20, 2016 Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/24/17.Document sent via U.S. Mail to filer. (dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2017: # 1 rejected document) (dlg).
January 24, 2017 288 Featured Case ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 287 MOTION to Intervene : Any response by the existing parties to the case shall be filed by February 6, 2017. In the event that a response is filed, any reply by Mr. White shall be filed by February 21, 2017. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/24/17. Leeland O. White served via U.S. Mail(dlg) (dlg).
January 24, 2017 287 AMENDED Ex Parte MOTION in Right to Intervene and Object. Nunc pro tunc 1/19/17. Filed by Leeland O. White. (dlg)
January 24, 2017 286 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Accepting Document: Amended Ex Parte Motion in Right to Intervene filed by Leeland O. White. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Incorrect format. Nunc Pro Tunc 1/19/17. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/24/17.Filer served via U.S. Mail. (dlg)
January 18, 2017 285 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Trump University Settlement Claim Form filed by DeWitt Jackson. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: No provisions for acceptance. All Settlement Claim Forms must be submitted as directed by the instructions provided on the form and in the Courts December 20, 2016 Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/18/17.(Filer served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/18/2017: # 1 Rejected document) (dlg).
January 11, 2017 284 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Amended Ex Parte Motion in Right to Intervene and to Object filed by Leeland O. White. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Missing certificate of service to demonstrate that the parties have been served as required by Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(c). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/11/17.(Discrepancy mailed to Leeland O. White)(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2017: # 1 Rejected Document) (dlg).
December 29, 2016 283 NOTICE of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. § 1715(B) by Donald J. Trump (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel M. Petrocelli, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
December 20, 2016 282 Featured Case ORDER Granting 281 Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; Directing Issuance of Notice; and Setting Final Approval Hearing. This Court shall hold a Final Approval Hearing on March 30, 2017 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. The motion for final approval and any application(s) for Service Awards shall be filed and served within sixty (60) calendar days of this Order. Any replies to any objections shall be filed and served at least seven (7) calendar days prior to the Final Approval Hearing. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/20/16. (dlg) (jao).
December 19, 2016 281 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulation of Class Action Settlement)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
November 28, 2016 280 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Ex Parte Motion to Intervene. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/28/16.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/28/2016: # 1 Rejected Document) (dlg).
November 18, 2016 279 Minute ORDER; Parties have entered into a Settlement Agreement. re 192 Motion for Decertification by Donald J. Trump. - Dismissed without prejudice; re 193 Motion to File Documents Under Seal - Dismissed without prejudice; re 256 Motion For Leave to Object to Evidence Filed In Support of Plaintiff's Reply to Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Joel Steckel, PH.D. - Dismissed without prejudice; All pending dates vacated. (no document attached) (ksr)
September 21, 2016 278 Featured Case ORDER Granting 277 Joint Motion to Allow Late Request for Exclusion from the Class. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/21/16. (dlg)
September 21, 2016 277 Joint MOTION to Allow Late Request for Exclusion from the Class by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
August 29, 2016 274 Featured Case ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 181 Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Michael A. Kamins; Denying Defendant's 188 Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Paul Habibi; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 184 Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Deforest McDuff, PH.D; Denying Plaintiff's Motions 187 , 189 to Exclude the Testimony of Alan D. Wallace, ESQ., and Joel Steckel, PH.D.; Granting Defendant's Motions to Seal 182 , 190 . Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/29/16. (dlg)
August 29, 2016 273 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motion Hearing) held on 8/26/2016, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Possell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 9/19/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/29/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/28/2016. (akr)
August 26, 2016 272 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Motion Hearing held on 8/26/2016 re 189 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert Joel Steckel, Ph.D. filed by Art Cohen, 190 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal filed by Donald J. Trump, 188 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Paul Habibi filed by Donald J. Trump, 181 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Michael A. Kamins filed by Donald J. Trump, 187 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert Alan D. Wallace, Esq. filed by Art Cohen, 184 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert DeForest McDuff, Ph.D. filed by Art Cohen, 182 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal filed by Donald J. Trump, Motions Submitted and the Court will prepare written order.(Court Reporter Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Xavier Jay Alvarez, Daniel Pfefferbaum, Rachel Jensen). (Defendant Attorney David Kirman, Daniel Petrocelli). (no document attached) (lsf)
August 25, 2016 271 Featured Case TENTATIVE ORDER: Granting in part and denying in part Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Michael A. Kamins. Denying Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Paul Habibi. Denying Plaintiff's Motions to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Experts Deforest McDuff, Ph.D; Alan D. Wallace, Esq.; and Joel Steckel, Ph.D. Granting Defendant's Motions to Seal, ECF Nos. 182, 190. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 08/25/16.(jpm)
August 10, 2016 270 NOTICE of Lodgment by Art Cohen re 269 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,, Order on Motion to Intervene,, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, 220 Response in Opposition to Motion,, [Notice of Lodgment of Exhibit L to the Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support of Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant Donald J. Trump's Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment] (Forge, Jason) (aef).
August 2, 2016 269 Featured Case ORDER Granting 238 Defendant's Motion to Amend Protective Order; Denying 233 Media Intervenors' Motion to Intervene and for An Order Modifying Stipulated Protective Order; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 230 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Electronic Exhibits. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/2/16. (dlg)
August 2, 2016 268 Featured Case ORDER Denying Defendant's 180 Motion For Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/2/16. (dlg)
July 26, 2016 267 Featured Case ORDER Granting Joint 266 Motion to Continue Pretrial Disclosures and Proceedings Until Resolution of Pending Motions. All of the dates in the Second Amended Scheduling Order are vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/26/16. (dlg)
July 25, 2016 266 Joint MOTION to Continue Pretrial Disclosures and Proceedings until Resolution of Pending Motions by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
July 25, 2016 265 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 184 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert DeForest McDuff, Ph.D., 187 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert Alan D. Wallace, Esq., 188 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Paul Habibi, 189 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert Joel Steckel, Ph.D., : Court schedules hearing, Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2016 01:30 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. (no document attached) (ksr)
July 25, 2016 264 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/22/2016, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Possell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 8/15/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/25/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/24/2016. (Transcript filed in case numbers 10-cv-00940-GPC-WVG and 13-cv-02519-GPC-WVG.) (akr)
July 22, 2016 263 Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Motion Hearing held on 7/22/2016, re 180 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Donald J. Trump, 181 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Michael A. Kamins filed by Donald J. Trump, 192 MOTION for Decertification filed by Donald J. Trump ; Motions Submitted and the Court will prepare written order. The Court will file a Notice of hearing re Motions to Exclude Experts testimony [184,187,188,189]. (Court Reporter/ECR Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Jason Forge, X. Jay Alvarez, amber Eck, Rachel Jensen, Daniel Pfefferbaum).(Defendant Attorney David Kirman, Daniel Petrocelli, Jill Martin). (no document attached) (lsf)
July 13, 2016 262 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/13/2016, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Possell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 8/3/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/11/2016. (Transcript filed in case numbers 10-cv-00940-GPC-WVG and 13-cv-02519-GPC-WVG.) (akr)
July 13, 2016 261 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Motion Hearing held on 7/13/2016 re 233 MOTION to Intervene of Media Intervenors to Intervene and for an Order Modifying Stipulated Protective Order filed by The New York Times Company, ABC, Inc., NBCUniversal Media, LLC, CBS Interactive Inc., Cable News Network, Inc. ("CNN"), CBS Broadcasting Inc., WP Company LLC d/b/a The Washington Post, Tribune Publishing Company, 238 MOTION to Amend/Correct Protective Order filed by Donald J. Trump, Motions Submitted, the Court will prepare a written order.(Court Reporter Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Jason Forge, Amber Eck, Rachel Jensen). (Defendant Attorney Daniel Petrocelli, David Kirman). (Media Intervenor Attorney Dan Laidman).(no document attached) (lsf)
July 12, 2016 260 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald J. Trump re 259 Reply to Response to Motion, (Petrocelli, Daniel) (aef).
July 8, 2016 259 REPLY to Response to Motion re 256 Ex Parte MOTION For Leave to Object to Evidence Filed In Support of Plaintiff's Reply to Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Joel Steckel, PH.D. filed by Donald J. Trump. (Petrocelli, Daniel) QC email, missing certificate of service (dlg).
July 1, 2016 258 RESPONSE in Opposition re 256 Ex Parte MOTION For Leave to Object to Evidence Filed In Support of Plaintiff's Reply to Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Joel Steckel, PH.D. filed by Art Cohen. (Pfefferbaum, Daniel)
June 30, 2016 257 NOTICE [Notice of Plaintiff's Intent to Oppose Defendant's Ex Parte Application for Leave to Object to Evidence Filed in Support of Plaintiff's Reply to Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Joel Stekel, Ph.D.] by Art Cohen re 256 Ex Parte MOTION For Leave to Object to Evidence Filed In Support of Plaintiff's Reply to Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Joel Steckel, PH.D. (Pfefferbaum, Daniel) (dlg).
June 30, 2016 256 Ex Parte MOTION For Leave to Object to Evidence Filed In Support of Plaintiff's Reply to Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Joel Steckel, PH.D. by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
June 27, 2016 255 REPLY to Response to Motion re 238 MOTION to Amend/Correct Protective Order filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
June 22, 2016 254 RESPONSE in Opposition re 238 MOTION to Amend/Correct Protective Order filed by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof, # 2 Exhibit 1-5 to the Forge Declaration)(Forge, Jason) (dlg).
June 22, 2016 253 REPLY to Response to Motion re 233 MOTION to Intervene of Media Intervenors to Intervene and for an Order Modifying Stipulated Protective Order and Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Amend Protective Order filed by ABC, Inc., CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Interactive Inc., Cable News Network, Inc. ("CNN"), Fox News Network, LLC, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, The New York Times Company, Tribune Publishing Company, WP Company LLC d/b/a The Washington Post. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Sager, Kelli) (dlg).
June 20, 2016 252 Featured Case ORDER Regarding 240 Joint Motion for Advancement of June 30, 2016 Hearing Date. The Court reschedules the hearing date related to Defendants' Motion to Amend Protective Order (ECF 238 ) and non-party Media Intervenors' motion to Intervene (ECF 233 ) to July 13, 2016, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/20/16. (dlg)
June 20, 2016 251 RESPONSE to Motion re 233 MOTION to Intervene of Media Intervenors to Intervene and for an Order Modifying Stipulated Protective Order filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
June 20, 2016 250 NOTICE re Non-Opposition [Plaintiff's Statement of Non-Opposition] by Art Cohen re 233 MOTION to Intervene of Media Intervenors to Intervene and for an Order Modifying Stipulated Protective Order (Pfefferbaum, Daniel) Incorrect event selected. Edited docket text to reflect filing (dlg).
June 17, 2016 249 RESPONSE in Support re 180 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment (Defendant's Response in Support of Defendant's Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of his Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment) filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
June 17, 2016 248 REPLY - Other re 180 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment (Defendant Donald J. Trump's Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment) filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
June 17, 2016 247 REPLY - Other re 192 MOTION for Decertification (Defendant Donald J. Trump's Reply in Support of Motion for Decertification) filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
June 17, 2016 246 REPLY - Other re 188 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Paul Habibi (Defendant Donald J. Trump's Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Paul Habibi) filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
June 17, 2016 245 REPLY - Other re 181 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Michael A. Kamins (Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Michael A. Kamins) filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
June 17, 2016 244 REPLY - Other re 186 Request for Judicial Notice, (Defendant's Reply in Support of Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Michael A. Kamins) filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
June 17, 2016 243 REPLY to Response to Motion re 189 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert Joel Steckel, Ph.D. filed by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel J. Pfefferbaum in Further Support thereof, # 2 Exhibit 4-16 to Pfefferbaum Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 17 to the Pfefferbaum Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 18 to the Pfefferbaum Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 19-27 to the Pfefferbaum Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 28-30 to the Pfefferbaum Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 31-33 to the Pfefferbaum Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 34 part 1 to the Pfefferbaum Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 34 part 2 to the Pfefferbaum Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 34 part 3 to the Pfefferbaum Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 35 and 36 part 1 to the Pfefferbaum Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 36 part 2 to the Pfefferbaum Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 37-38 to the Pfefferbaum Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 39-42 to the Pfefferbaum Declaration)(Alvarez, Xavier) (dlg).
June 17, 2016 242 REPLY to Response to Motion re 187 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert Alan D. Wallace, Esq. filed by Art Cohen. (Alvarez, Xavier) (dlg).
June 17, 2016 241 REPLY to Response to Motion re 184 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert DeForest McDuff, Ph.D. filed by Art Cohen. (Alvarez, Xavier) (dlg).
June 17, 2016 240 Joint MOTION to Continue June 30, 2016 hearing date by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
June 16, 2016 239 Featured Case ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 238 MOTION to Amend/Correct Protective Order: Any response is due on or before June 22, 2016. Any reply is due on or before June 27, 2016. A hearing is set for June 30, 2016, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/16/16.(dlg)
June 15, 2016 238 MOTION to Amend/Correct Protective Order by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
June 15, 2016 237 NOTICE of Joinder by Fox News Network, LLC re 233 MOTION to Intervene of Media Intervenors to Intervene and for an Order Modifying Stipulated Protective Order (Attachments: # 1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, # 2 Proof of Service)(Sager, Kelli) (dlg).
June 13, 2016 236 REPLY to Response to Motion re 230 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Electronic Exhibits [Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Leave to Allow the Non-Electronic Filing of Electronic Exhibits] filed by Art Cohen. (Forge, Jason) (dlg).
June 13, 2016 235 RESPONSE in Opposition re 230 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Electronic Exhibits filed by Donald J. Trump. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
June 10, 2016 234 Featured Case ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule (ECF No. 233 ). Any response shall be due on or before June 20, 2016. Any reply shall be due on or before June 22, 2016. A hearing is set for June 30, 2016, at 1:30 pm in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/10/2016.(knb)
June 10, 2016 233 MOTION to Intervene of Media Intervenors to Intervene and for an Order Modifying Stipulated Protective Order by WP Company LLC d/b/a The Washington Post, Cable News Network, Inc. ("CNN"), CBS Broadcasting Inc., CBS Interactive Inc., Tribune Publishing Company, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, ABC, Inc., The New York Times Company. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion of Media Intervenors to Intervene and for an Order Modifying Stipulated Protective Order, # 2 Declaration of Diana Palacios In Support of Motion of Media Intervenors to Intervene and for an Order Modifying Stipulated Protective Order, # 3 Exhibit A to Palacios Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B to Palacios Declaration, # 5 Exhibit C to Palacios Declaration, # 6 Exhibit D to Palacios Declaration, # 7 Exhibit E to Palacios Declaration, # 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Media Intervenors, # 9 Proof of Service)(Sager, Kelli)Attorney Kelli L. Sager added to party WP Company LLC d/b/a The Washington Post(pty:misc), Attorney Kelli L. Sager added to party Cable News Network, Inc. ("CNN")(pty:misc), Attorney Kelli L. Sager added to party CBS Broadcasting Inc.(pty:misc), Attorney Kelli L. Sager added to party CBS Interactive Inc.(pty:misc), Attorney Kelli L. Sager added to party Tribune Publishing Company(pty:misc), Attorney Kelli L. Sager added to party NBCUniversal Media, LLC(pty:misc), Attorney Kelli L. Sager added to party ABC, Inc.(pty:misc), Attorney Kelli L. Sager added to party The New York Times Company(pty:misc) (dlg).
June 10, 2016 232 NOTICE of Intent to Oppose Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application Seeking Leave to Allow the Non-Electronic Filing of Electronic Exhibits by Donald J. Trump re 230 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Electronic Exhibits (Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
June 9, 2016 231 Featured Case ORDER Granting 229 Joint Motion to Allow Late Request for Exclusion from the Class. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/9/2016. (knb)
June 9, 2016 230 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Electronic Exhibits by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, # 2 Exhibit A to Jensen Declaration)(Forge, Jason) (dlg).
June 9, 2016 229 Joint MOTION by Plaintiff and Defendant to Allow Late Request for Exclusion from the Class by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
June 8, 2016 228 Featured Case ORDER Returning Non-Electronic Lodgement of Videos in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion (ECF 220 ). Plaintiff's video submissions, ECF No. 220, Exs. D, L, M, shall not be filed as exhibits, but instead returned to Plaintiff. Plaintiff may seek to refile the exhibits in accordance with Section 2.k of the the Court's Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/8/16.(dlg) (jao).
June 8, 2016 227 Exhibit List re 220 Response in Opposition to Motion [Amended Index of Electronic Submissions Lodged with the Court in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Defendant Donald J. Trump's Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment] by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A)(Jensen, Rachel) QC email re incorrect filer. Attorney should Withdraw and re-file with proper signature (dlg).
June 7, 2016 226 Amended Exhibit, NOTICE Regarding Exhibit Attachment by Donald J. Trump re 180 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 11-Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 11-Part 2)(Petrocelli, Daniel) Modified on 6/9/2016 to add 'amended exhibit' to docket text (dlg).
June 7, 2016 225 Exhibit List re 220 Response in Opposition to Motion [Index of Electronic Video Submissions Lodged with the Court in Support of Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Donald J. Trump's Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment] by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A)(Forge, Jason) (dlg).
June 3, 2016 224 RESPONSE re 186 Request for Judicial Notice, [Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Donald J. Trump's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Michael A. Kamins] filed by Art Cohen. (Alvarez, Xavier) (dlg).
June 3, 2016 223 RESPONSE in Opposition re 181 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Michael A. Kamins filed by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel J. Pfefferbaum in Support thereof, # 2 Exhibit 1-16 to the Pfefferbaum Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 17-29 to the Pfefferbaum Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 30-41 to the Pfefferbaum Declaration)(Alvarez, Xavier) (dlg).
June 3, 2016 222 RESPONSE in Opposition re 188 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Paul Habibi filed by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brian E. Cochran in Support thereof, # 2 Exhibit 1-24 to the Cochran Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 25-37 to the Cochran Declartion)(Alvarez, Xavier) (dlg).
June 3, 2016 221 RESPONSE in Opposition re 192 MOTION for Decertification filed by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, # 2 Exhibit 1-17 to Jensen Declaration)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
June 3, 2016 220 RESPONSE in Opposition re 180 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof, # 2 Exhibit A through D Forge Declaration, # 3 Exhibit E part 1 to Forge Declaration, # 4 Exhibit E part 2 to Forge Declaration, # 5 Exhibit E part 3 to Forge Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E part 4 to Forge Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F through U to Forge Declaration, # 8 Exhibit V to Forge Declaration, # 9 Exhibit W through BB to Forge Declaration, # 10 Statement of Facts Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's Separate Statement of Purported Undisputed "Facts")(Forge, Jason) (dlg).
June 3, 2016 219 RESPONSE in Opposition re 187 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert Alan D. Wallace, Esq. filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
June 3, 2016 218 RESPONSE in Opposition re 189 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert Joel Steckel, Ph.D. filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
June 3, 2016 217 RESPONSE in Opposition re 184 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert DeForest McDuff, Ph.D. filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David L. Kirman, # 2 Exhibit 1-13 to the Kirman Declaration, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
June 2, 2016 216 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting Document: Notice to the Court of Contemptuous Statements. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: ex parte communication; not a proper party to this action. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/2/2016.(nbp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/2/2016: # 1 Rejected Document) (nbp).
June 2, 2016 215 NOTICE (Defendant's Notice of Filing Redacted Versions of Exhibits 2, 25, 26, and 33 to the Stagg Declaration in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification) by Donald J. Trump re 213 Order, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Martin, Jill) (dlg).
June 1, 2016 214 NOTICE [Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Redacted Versions of Exhibits 14-16 to the Forge Declaration in Support of Motion for Class Certification] by Art Cohen re 213 Order, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Dkt. No. 39-2, Forge Decl., Ex. 14), # 2 Exhibit B (Dkt. No. 39-2, Forge Decl., Ex. 15), # 3 Exhibit C (Dkt. No. 39-2, Forge Decl., Ex. 16))(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
May 31, 2016 213 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER Re: Sealing Order. Plaintiff shall file redacted versions of Exhibits 14-16 to the Forge Declaration and, and Defendant shall file redacted versions of Exhibits 2, 25, 26, and 33 to the Stagg Declaration on or before June 2, 2016. The Court also unseals Exhibit 24 to the Forge Declaration as the parties agreed to unseal that document. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/31/16.(dlg) (jao).
May 31, 2016 212 NOTICE [Plaintiff's Notice of Filing Unsealed Versions of the Playbooks] by Art Cohen re 211 Order on Motion to Intervene (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Dkt. No. 39-2, Forge Decl., Ex. 6) part 1, # 2 Exhibit A (Dkt. No. 39-2, Forge Decl., Ex. 6) part 2, # 3 Exhibit B (Dkt. No. 39-2, Forge Decl., Ex. 21), # 4 Exhibit C (Dkt. No. 39-2, Forge Decl., Ex. 27), # 5 Exhibit D (Dkt. No. 39-2, Forge Decl., Ex. 28))(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
May 27, 2016 211 Featured Case ORDER Granting 176 Motion of Non-Party Press Organization for Limited Purpose Intervention and Order Unsealing Court Records. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/27/2016. (rlu) (Documents #48-6, #48-7, #48-8, #48-9, #48-12, #48-13, #48-14 and #49-1, #49-2, #49-3, #49-4, #49-5 unsealed) (sjt). Modified to notate the documents being unsealed on 5/31/2016 (sjt).
May 27, 2016 210 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Motion Hearing held on 5/27/2016 re 176 MOTION to Intervene of Non-Party Press Organization For Limited Purpose Intervention and Order Unsealing Court Records filed by WP Company LLC d/b/a The Washington Post, Motions Submitted, Court will prepare a written order.(Court Reporter Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Rachel Jensen, Jason Forge, Amber Eck). (Defendant Attorney Jill Martin). (Attorney Washington Post: Dan Laidman).(no document attached) (lsf)
May 26, 2016 209 Featured Case ORDER Granting 208 Joint Motion to Modify Case Management Conference Order Regarding Pretrial Conference; Second Amended Case Management Order. Pretrial Disclosures shall be prepared, served and lodged with the Clerk of the Court on or before August 5, 2016. The final pretrial conference shall be held before the Honorable Gonzalo P. Curiel, United States District Judge, on August 24, 2016, at 1:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/26/16. (dlg)
May 26, 2016 208 Joint MOTION to Modify Case Management Conference Order Regarding August 12, 2016 Pretrial Conference by Donald J. Trump. (Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
May 24, 2016 207 Featured Case ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants 203 Ex Parte Application to Continue Pretrial Disclosure Filings: Amended Case Management Order. Pretrial Disclosures shall be prepared, served and lodged with the Clerk of the Court on or before August 5, 2016. The final pretrial conference shall be held before the Honorable Gonzalo P. Curiel, United States District Judge, on August 12, 2016, at 1:30 p.m., in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/24/16. (dlg)
May 22, 2016 206 REPLY to Response to Motion re 203 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue (Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Continue Pretrial Disclosure Filings until the Court decides the Dispositive Motions in this Case) filed by Donald J. Trump. (Petrocelli, Daniel)
May 20, 2016 205 RESPONSE in Opposition re 203 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue (Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Continue Pretrial Disclosure Filings until the Court decides the Dispositive Motions in this Case) filed by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof, # 2 Exhibit A-C to Forge Declaration)(Forge, Jason)
May 19, 2016 204 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Intent to Oppose Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Continue Pretrial Deadlines by Art Cohen re 203 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue (Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Continue Pretrial Disclosure Filings until the Court decides the Dispositive Motions in this Case) (Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
May 18, 2016 203 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue (Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Continue Pretrial Disclosure Filings until the Court decides the Dispositive Motions in this Case) by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David L. Kirman, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (dlg).
May 13, 2016 202 REPLY to Response to Motion re 176 MOTION to Intervene of Non-Party Press Organization For Limited Purpose Intervention and Order Unsealing Court Records filed by WP Company LLC d/b/a The Washington Post. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Wickers, Alonzo) (dlg).
May 9, 2016 201 NOTICE of Appearance by Helen Irene Zeldes on behalf of Art Cohen (Zeldes, Helen)Attorney Helen Irene Zeldes added to party Art Cohen(pty:pla) (dlg).
May 9, 2016 200 NOTICE of Appearance by Alreen Haeggquist on behalf of Art Cohen (Haeggquist, Alreen)Attorney Alreen Haeggquist added to party Art Cohen(pty:pla) (dlg).
May 6, 2016 199 RESPONSE in Opposition re 176 MOTION to Intervene of Non-Party Press Organization For Limited Purpose Intervention and Order Unsealing Court Records filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jill A. Martin, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Martin, Jill) (dlg).
May 6, 2016 198 NOTICE of Change of Hearing on Motions: 188 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Paul Habibi, 187 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert Alan D. Wallace, Esq., 182 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal, 190 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal, 180 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment, 184 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert DeForest McDuff, Ph.D., 193 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal, 189 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert Joel Steckel, Ph.D., 181 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Michael A. Kamins, 192 MOTION for Decertification . Court reschedules Motion Hearing set for 7/18/2016 to 7/22/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. (no document attached) (lsf)
May 6, 2016 197 NON-OPPOSITION, NOTICE [Plaintiff's Statement of Non-Opposition] by Art Cohen re 176 MOTION to Intervene of Non-Party Press Organization For Limited Purpose Intervention and Order Unsealing Court Records (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel J. Pfefferbaum in Support thereof, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Pfefferbaum Declaration)(Pfefferbaum, Daniel) QC email re incorrect event. Edited dockete text to reflect non-oppo. (dlg).
May 3, 2016 196 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Stein on behalf of Art Cohen (Stein, Jeffrey)Attorney Jeffrey J. Stein added to party Art Cohen(pty:pla) (dlg).
April 25, 2016 195 Featured Case ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule (ECF NOs. 180 , 181 , 182 , 184 , 187 , 188 , 189 , 190 , 192 , 193 .) The Court hereby sets the following briefing schedule: Any responses shall be due on or before June 3, 2016. Any replies shall be due on or before June 17, 2016. A hearing is set for July 18, 2016, at 1:30 pm in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/25/2016.(nbp) (jao).
April 22, 2016 194 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 193 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Petrocelli, Daniel). (jah).
April 22, 2016 193 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Petrocelli, Daniel). (jah).
April 22, 2016 192 MOTION for Decertification by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of David L. Kirman in Support, # 3 Exhibits 1-15, # 4 Exhibits 16-26, # 5 Exhibits 27-42, # 6 Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (nbp)
April 22, 2016 191 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 190 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Petrocelli, Daniel). (jah).
April 22, 2016 190 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Petrocelli, Daniel). (jah).
April 22, 2016 189 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert Joel Steckel, Ph.D. by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Daniel J. Pfefferbaum in Support thereof, # 3 Exhibit 1-3 to the Pfefferbaum Declaration)(Alvarez, Xavier) (nbp)
April 22, 2016 188 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Paul Habibi by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of David L. Kirman in Support, # 3 Exhibits 1-7, # 4 Exhibits 8-11, # 5 Exhibit 12, # 6 Exhibits 13-28, # 7 Exhibits 29-36, # 8 Exhibits 37-41, # 9 Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (nbp)
April 22, 2016 187 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert Alan D. Wallace, Esq. by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of X. Jay Alvarez in Support thereof, # 3 Exhibit 1-13 to Alvarez Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 14 part 1 to Alvarez Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 14 part 2 to Alvarez Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 14 part 3 to Alvarez Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 15 to Alvarez Declaration)(Alvarez, Xavier) (nbp)
April 22, 2016 186 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Donald J. Trump re 181 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Michael A. Kamins (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (nbp)
April 22, 2016 185 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 182 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Petrocelli, Daniel). (jah).
April 22, 2016 184 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Rebuttal Expert DeForest McDuff, Ph.D. by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Brian E. Cochran in Support thereof, # 3 Exhibit 1-6 to Cochran Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 7-8 to Cochran Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 9-13 to Cochran Declaration)(Alvarez, Xavier) (nbp)
April 22, 2016 183 NOTICE of Appearance by Xavier Jay Alvarez on behalf of Art Cohen (Alvarez, Xavier)Attorney Xavier Jay Alvarez added to party Art Cohen(pty:pla) (nbp)
April 22, 2016 182 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Petrocelli, Daniel). (jah).
April 22, 2016 181 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Michael A. Kamins by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of David L. Kirman in Support, # 3 Exhibits 1-14, # 4 Exhibits 15-23, # 5 Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (nbp)
April 22, 2016 180 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of David L. Kirman in Support, # 3 Exhibits 1-2, # 4 Exhibits 3-21, # 5 Exhibits 22-23, # 6 Exhibits 24-28, # 7 Exhibits 29-30, # 8 Exhibits 31-41, # 9 Exhibits 42-47, # 10 Statement of Facts, # 11 Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (nbp)
April 20, 2016 179 Featured Case ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 176 MOTION to Intervene of Non-Party Press Organization For Limited Purpose Intervention and Order Unsealing Court Records : Any response shall be due on or before May 6, 2016. Any reply shall be due on or before May 13, 2016. A hearing is set for May 27, 2016, at 1:30 pm in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 4/20/16.(dlg) (jao).
April 4, 2016 178 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by WP Company LLC d/b/a The Washington Post re 177 Corporate Disclosure Statement, 176 MOTION to Intervene of Non-Party Press Organization For Limited Purpose Intervention and Order Unsealing Court Records (Wickers, Alonzo) (dlg).
April 1, 2016 177 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WP Company LLC d/b/a The Washington Post identifying Corporate Parent Nash Holdings LLC for WP Company LLC d/b/a The Washington Post.. (Wickers, Alonzo) QC email missing certificate of service (dlg).
April 1, 2016 176 MOTION to Intervene of Non-Party Press Organization For Limited Purpose Intervention and Order Unsealing Court Records by WP Company LLC d/b/a The Washington Post. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion of Non-Party Press Organization for Limited Purpose Intervention and Order Unsealing Court Records, # 2 Declaration of Dan Laidman In Support of Motion of Non-Party Press Organization for Limited Purpose Intervention and Order Unsealing Court Records, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Dan Laidman, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Dan Laidman, # 5 Exhibit C (Part 1) to Declaration of Dan Laidman, # 6 Exhibit C (Part 2) to Declaration of Dan Laidman, # 7 Exhibit C (Part 3) to Declaration of Dan Laidman, # 8 Exhibit C (Part 4) to Declaration of Dan Laidman, # 9 Exhibit C (Part 5) to Declaration of Dan Laidman, # 10 Exhibit C (Part 6) to Declaration of Dan Laidman, # 11 Exhibit D to Declaration of Dan Laidman, # 12 Proposed Order Granting Motion of Non-Party Press Organization for Limited Purpose Intervention and Order Unsealing Court Records)(Wickers, Alonzo)Attorney Alonzo Wickers, IV added to party WP Company LLC d/b/a The Washington Post(pty:dft) QC email re attached proposed order and missing certificate of service (dlg).
March 29, 2016 175 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Mandatory Settlement Conference held on 3/29/2016(no document attached) (mcb)
March 22, 2016 174 Featured Case ORDER Granting 173 Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Excuse Daniel M. Petrocelli From Attending the Mandatory Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/22/2016. (nbp) (jao).
March 21, 2016 173 Ex Parte MOTION to Excuse Appearance of Daniel M. Petrocelli at Mandatory Settlement Conference, or, Alternatively, to Permit Mr. Petrocelli to Appear Telephonically by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David L. Kirman in Support, # 2 Proof of Service)(Petrocelli, Daniel) (nbp)
March 14, 2016 172 Featured Case ORDER Re: Confidential Portions of Deposition Transcript. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/14/16.(dlg)(jao).
March 10, 2016 171 Featured Case ORDER Granting 170 Joint Motion to Modify Case Management Conference Order. The Court grants the Joint Motion and continues the deadline for the completion of all expert discovery to April 21, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/10/16. (dlg) (jao).
March 9, 2016 170 Joint MOTION for Order Modifying Case Management Conference Order Regulating Discovery by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David L. Kirman, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Kirman, David) (dlg).
February 25, 2016 169 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Conference held on 2/25/2016(no document attached) (lms)
February 19, 2016 168 Featured Case ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE. The Court will convene a telephonic Discovery Conference on February 25, 2016, at 7:00 a.m. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel intending to appear shall provide their name and contact information to the Court no later than February 24, 2016, at noon. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 2/19/2016.(nbp) (jao).
February 2, 2016 167 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J Coughlin on behalf of Art Cohen (Coughlin, Patrick)Attorney Patrick J Coughlin added to party Art Cohen(pty:pla) (srm).
February 2, 2016 166 Featured Case ORDER Granting 165 Joint Motion to Allow Late Request for Exclusion from the Class. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/2/16. (dlg)
February 2, 2016 165 Joint MOTION to Allow Late Request for Exclusion from the Class by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Jensen, Rachel) (srm).
February 1, 2016 164 Featured Case ORDER Rescheduling Mandatory Settlement Conference for 3/29/2016 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 2/1/2016.(srm)
January 25, 2016 163 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian E. Cochran on behalf of Art Cohen (Cochran, Brian)Attorney Brian E. Cochran added to party Art Cohen(pty:pla)
January 21, 2016 162 Featured Case ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 438 Joint Motion Regarding January 27, 2016 Settlement Conference. Plaintiff Art Cohen's request to attend the conference telephonically is denied. Counsel for the Makaeff case is ordered to report to Judge Gallo's Chambers whether the Makaeff Named Plaintiffs will be appearing no later than Monday, January 25, 2016, at noon. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 1/21/16. (dlg)
January 19, 2016 161 Joint MOTION re 149 Scheduling Order,, 160 Order on Motion for Order,, [Joint Motion Regarding January 27, 2016 Settlement Conference] by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof)(Forge, Jason) (dlg).
January 5, 2016 160 Featured Case ORDER Granting 159 Joint Motion to Modify Case Management Order Regarding January 27, 2016 Settlement Conference. The Court's November 15, 2015 Case Management Conference Order is modified to allow Mr. Alan Garten, defendant Donald Trump's General Counsel to attend the January 27, 2016 Settlement Conference in place of Mr. Trump. The Court further orders that Parties make arrangements for Honorable Daniel Weinstein (Ret.) to attend the Settlement Conference either telephonically or in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 1/5/16. (dlg)
December 31, 2015 159 Joint MOTION for Order (Joint Motion to Modify Case Management Order Regarding January 27, 2016 Settlement Conference) by Donald J. Trump. (Kirman, David) (dlg).
December 29, 2015 158 Featured Case ORDER Granting 156 Substitution of Counsel on Behalf of Donald Trump. Daniel M. Petrocelli and David L. Kirman of OMelveny & Myers LLP are hereby substituted as counsel of record in place and instead of Nancy L. Stagg and Benjamin J. Morris. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/22/15. (dlg)
December 24, 2015 157 Featured Case ORDER re: discovery conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 12/24/2015.(lms)
December 18, 2015 156 MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE RE NOTICE by Donald J. Trump of Substitution of Counsel on Behalf of Donald J. Trump (Stagg, Nancy) QC email sent re wrong event selected. Edited docket text. Attorney to email proposed order to Chambers(dlg).
December 18, 2015 155 Featured Case ORDER Re: Discovery Dispute: Telephonic Status Conference held 12/17/2015. Telephonic Attorneys only Status Conference set for 12/24/2015 at 8:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 12/18/2015. (srm)
November 24, 2015 154 NOTICE by Art Cohen re 130 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1), [Plaintiffs' Notice of Timely Requests for Exclusion from the Class] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Letter from Class Administrator with List of Opt Outs)(Jensen, Rachel) (aef).
November 23, 2015 153 NOTICE of Appearance by David Lee Kirman on behalf of Donald J. Trump (Kirman, David)Attorney David Lee Kirman added to party Donald J. Trump(pty:dft) (srm).
November 23, 2015 152 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Petrocelli on behalf of Donald J. Trump (Petrocelli, Daniel)Attorney Daniel M. Petrocelli added to party Donald J. Trump(pty:dft) (srm).
November 23, 2015 151 Featured Case ORDER Denying 150 Joint Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/20/2015. (srm)
November 20, 2015 150 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases [Joint Motion for Order Consolidating Cases for Trial and Aligning Pretrial Schedules] by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Cohen Case Joint Discovery Plan)(Forge, Jason) (srm).
November 12, 2015 149 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings: A Mandatory Settlement Conference shall be conducted on January 27, 2016, at 2:00 p.m., in the chambers of Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Pretrial Disclosures shall be prepared, served and lodged with the Clerk of the Court on or before June 10, 2016. The final pretrial conference shall be held before the Honorable Gonzalo P. Curiel, United States District Court Judge, on June 17, 2016, at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 11/12/15.(dlg)
October 29, 2015 148 Featured Case ORDER Denying 141 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the October 9, 2015 Order Denying Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge's July 31, 2015 Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/29/2015. (srm)
October 22, 2015 147 Featured Case ORDER Following Telephonic Status Conference. Telephonic Status Conference held 10/21/2015. Within two business days of Judge Curiel's ruling on Plaintiff's pending Motion for Reconsideration, Plaintiff's counsel shall contact this Court to reschedule another telephonic Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/22/2015. (srm)
October 21, 2015 146 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Status Conference held on 10/21/2015(no document attached) (mcb)
October 20, 2015 145 REPLY to Response to Motion re 141 MOTION for Reconsideration re 136 Order on Motion to File Documents Under Seal, [Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Reconsideration of the October 9, 2015 Order Denying Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge's Jul filed by Art Cohen. (Forge, Jason)
October 19, 2015 144 RESPONSE in Opposition re 141 MOTION for Reconsideration re 136 Order on Motion to File Documents Under Seal, [Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Reconsideration of the October 9, 2015 Order Denying Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge's Jul y 31, 2015 Order filed by Donald J. Trump. (Stagg, Nancy) (srm).
October 14, 2015 143 Featured Case ORDER 142 Setting Briefing Schedule re 141 Any response shall be due on or by October 19, 2015. Any reply shall be due on or by October 20, 2015. A hearing is set for November 6, 2015, at 1:30 pm in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/14/15. (dlg)
October 13, 2015 142 Joint MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the October 9, 2015 Order Denying Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge's July 31, 2015 Order by Art Cohen. (Forge, Jason) (dlg).
October 13, 2015 141 MOTION for Reconsideration re 136 Order on Motion to File Documents Under Seal, [Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Reconsideration of the October 9, 2015 Order Denying Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge's July 31, 2015 Order] by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support thereof, # 2 Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof)(Forge, Jason) (dlg).
October 13, 2015 140 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference. Telephonic Counsel Only Status Conference Reset for 10/21/2015 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. The Status Conference set for October 14, 2015, at 9:30 a.m., is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/13/2015. (srm)
October 9, 2015 139 Featured Case ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE. Telephonic, Counsel Only Status Conference set for 10/14/2015 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/9/2015. (srm)
October 9, 2015 136 Featured Case ORDER Denying 123 Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge's July 31, 2015 Order granting 124 , 134 Motions to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/8/2015. (sjt)
October 2, 2015 135 (Document filed s Sealed Document 138 ) SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 134 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Forge, Jason). (jah). (Main Document 135 replaced on 10/9/2015) (sjt). Modified to add filing date of lodgement on 10/9/2015 (sjt).
October 2, 2015 134 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Forge, Jason). (jah).
October 2, 2015 133 REPLY - Other re 123 Objection, [Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Objection to Magistrate Judge's July 31, 2015 Order] filed by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel J. Pfefferbaum in Further Support, # 2 Exhibit 16-19 [REDACTED])(Forge, Jason) (dlg).
September 24, 2015 132 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING Amended Return Postcard (Doc. 131 ). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/23/2015. (srm)
September 23, 2015 131 NOTICE by Art Cohen re 130 [Plaintiffs' Notice of Unopposed Filing of Amended Return Postcard for Inclusion in the Mailed Notice] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Return Postcard)(Jensen, Rachel) (srm).
September 21, 2015 130 Featured Case ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiffs' 61 Motion for Approval of Class Notice and Directing Class Notice Procedures: The Proposed Class Notices are approved for dissemination of class notice. The parties are authorized to make non-substantive changes to the notice, as long as they are acceptable to both parties, to reflect deadlines, mailing addresses, and similar information or to format the notice for printing. Plaintiffs will submit an amended Return Postcard that is consistent with this Order within seven (7) days of the Order. Epiq Systems, Inc. is approved as "Notice Administrator" to supervise and carry out the notice procedure. The deadline for exclusion from the Class shall be forty-five (45) days after the Notice Date. The Notice Administrator is ordered to provide counsel for both parties with a list of all timely requests for exclusion within seven (7) business days after the Opt-Out Deadline. Plaintiffs are ordered to file such list with the Court within three (3) days thereafter. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/21/15. (dlg)
September 18, 2015 129 RESPONSE re 123 Objection, Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Objection to Magistrate Judge's July 31, 2015 Order filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Benjamin J. Morris in Support of Defendant's Response)(Stagg, Nancy) (dlg).
August 19, 2015 128 Featured Case ORDER Following Telephonic Discovery Conference on August 17, 2015 Related to Deposition of Mr. Harris. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/19/2015. (srm)
August 18, 2015 127 Featured Case ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 123 Plaintiff's Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order: The Court resets the hearing for 10/23/2015 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Any response shall be due on or by 9/18/2015. Any reply shall be due on or by 10/2/2015. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/18/2015. (srm)
August 17, 2015 126 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Conference held on 8/17/2015(no document attached) (mcb)
August 14, 2015 125 (Document filed s Sealed Document 137 ) SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 124 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Forge, Jason). (jah). (Main Document 125 replaced on 10/9/2015) (sjt). Modified to add filing date of lodgement on 10/9/2015 (sjt).
August 14, 2015 124 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Forge, Jason). (jah).
August 14, 2015 123 OBJECTION by Art Cohen re 110 Order [Plaintiff's Objection to Magistrate Judge's July 31, 2015 Order]. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel J. Pfefferbaum in Support thereof, # 2 Exhibit 1-15 to Pfefferbaum Declaration [Public Version])(Forge, Jason) (srm).
August 12, 2015 122 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Telephonic, Counsel Only Discovery Conference set for 8/17/2015 at 7:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/12/2015. (srm)
August 7, 2015 121 Featured Case ORDER Granting 119 Parties' Joint Motion to Vacate Expert Discovery and Other Pretrial Dates Pending Reset Deadline for Fact Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/7/2015. (srm)
August 6, 2015 120 Featured Case ORDER VACATING DISCOVERY HEARING. The Court Vacates the Discovery Hearing set for August 7, 2015, at 7:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/6/2015. (srm)
August 5, 2015 119 Joint MOTION to Vacate 110 Order, 58 Scheduling Order, 102 Order, 111 Order [Joint Motion to Vacate Expert Discovery and Other Pretrial Dates Pending Reset Deadline for Fact Discovery] by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof)(Jensen, Rachel) (srm).
August 5, 2015 117 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 114 Motion to File Exhibits 3d-3f to the Declaration of Jason A. Forge Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/5/2015. (jah)
August 5, 2015 116 Featured Case ORDER Following Telephonic Discovery Conference on July 29, 2015. Telephonic Discovery Conference held. Plaintiff's request to issue an amended subpoena to Mr. Harris is Denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/5/2015. (srm)
August 5, 2015 115 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 8/5/2015] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 114 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Forge, Jason). (jah). (Main Document 115 replaced on 8/5/2015) (jah). Modified on 8/5/2015 - Added file date of lodgment (jah).
August 5, 2015 114 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Forge, Jason). (jah).
August 5, 2015 113 Joint MOTION re 112 Order [Joint Statement of Determination of Discovery Dispute] by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason A. Forge, # 2 Exhibit 1-5 to Forge Declaration (public), # 3 Declaration of Benjamin J. Morris and Exhibits A-S thereto)(Forge, Jason) (srm).
August 4, 2015 112 Featured Case ORDER to File Joint Statement and Setting Discovery Hearing. Joint Statement due by 8/5/2015 at 9:00AM. Discovery Hearing set for 8/7/2015 at 7:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo, United States Courthouse, Courtroom 2A, Second Floor, 221 West Broadway, San Diego, California. Counsel for both parties must be present. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/4/2015. (srm)
July 31, 2015 111 Featured Case ORDER VACATING FACT DISCOVERY DEADLINE. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/31/2015. (srm)
July 31, 2015 110 Featured Case ORDER Ruling on Joint Statement for Determination of Discovery Disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/31/2015. (srm)
July 30, 2015 109 Featured Case ORDER Granting 108 Plaintiff's Unopposed Ex Parte Application to Amend June 30, 2015 Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/30/2015. (srm)
July 29, 2015 108 Ex Parte MOTION to Amend/Correct 102 Order,, [Plaintiff's Unopposed Ex Parte Application to Amend June 30, 2015 Order] by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof)(Forge, Jason) (srm).
July 29, 2015 107 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Conference held on 7/29/2015(no document attached) (mcb)
July 15, 2015 106 Featured Case ORDER Following Discovery Conference on July 10, 2015; Order to File Joint Statement for Determination of Discovery Disputes. Joint Statement for Determination of Discovery Dispute due by July 16, 2015, at 12:00 p.m. The parties are Ordered to meet and confer in person in good faith before filing the Joint Statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/15/2015. (srm)
July 14, 2015 105 Featured Case ORDER Granting Parties' Joint Request to Extend Deadline to Depose Defendant. The Court grants the parties' joint request to depose Defendant on August 26, 2015. No other dates will be extended. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/14/2015. (srm)
July 10, 2015 104 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Conference held on 7/10/2015(no document attached) (mcb)
July 9, 2015 103 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Telephonic, Counsel Only Discovery Conference set for 7/10/2015 at 8:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 7/9/2015. (srm)
June 30, 2015 102 Featured Case ORDER Sustaining in Part and Overruling in Part Plaintiff's Objection to Magistrate Judge's May 13, 2015 Order (EFC 76 ). The Court finds that Plaintiff has failed to make a sufficient showing as to these non-party defendants and, therefore, overrules Plaintiff's objection. The Court also overrules Plaintiff's objection to the extent he seeks an order allowing any further written or document discovery or authorizing any further discovery of anykind in the Makaeff case. The fact discovery cut-off date shall be extended to August 10, 2015 for the limited purpose of completing these depositions. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/30/15.(dlg)
June 29, 2015 100 Featured Case ORDER granting Plaintiff's 88 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/29/2015. (jah)
June 24, 2015 98 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Conference held on 6/24/2015(no document attached) (mcb)
June 23, 2015 97 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/5/2015, before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Court Reporter/Transcriber: James C. Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 7/14/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/24/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2015. (akr)
June 18, 2015 95 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Conference held on 6/18/2015(no document attached) (mcb)
June 17, 2015 94 NOTICE of Change of Address by Amber Lee Eck (Eck, Amber) (srm).
June 9, 2015 93 Featured Case ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 86 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery. The Court orders that the depositions of Mr. Matejek and Mr. Sexton be reopened to fully explore the questions foreclosed by Defendant's objection to the source of payment for the witnesses' attorneys' fees. The Court orders that the deposition of Mr. Matejek be reopened for the purpose of inquiring about TU's business operations, performance, or finances. The depositions of Mr. Matejek and Mr. Sexton shall take place on or before July 9, 2015. The Court denies Plaintiff's request to re-open the Makaeff discovery regarding the litigation hold and document perseveration. Defendant is ordered to produce all documents pursuant to this compromise on or before June 12, 2015. The Court denies Plaintiff's Motion to Compel as to the 2011 documents. Defendant is ordered to identify all previously disclosed documents of which Trump Organization was the source on or before June 12, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 6/9/15. (dlg)
June 5, 2015 92 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Hearing held on 6/5/2015(no document attached) (mcb)
June 4, 2015 91 RESPONSE in Opposition re 86 MOTION to Compel filed by Non-Party The Trump Organization and filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Benjamin J. Morris in Support, # 2 Exhibit A-E to Morris Declaration in Support, # 3 Declaration of Daniel Borbet in Support)(Morris, Benjamin) (dlg).
June 4, 2015 90 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motion Hearing) held on 5/22/2015, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Possell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 6/25/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/2/2015. (Transcript filed in case numbers 10-cv-00940-GPC-WVG and 13-cv-02519-GPC-WVG.) (akr)
June 3, 2015 89 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 6/29/2015] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 88 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Forge, Jason). (jah). (Main Document 89 replaced on 6/29/2015) (jah). Modified on 6/29/2015 - Added file date of lodgment (jah).
June 3, 2015 88 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Forge, Jason). (jah).
June 3, 2015 87 REPLY - Other re 84 Response - Other, [Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Objection to Magistrate Judge's May 13, 2015 Order] filed by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof, # 2 Exhibit B-E to Forge Declaration [Public Version])(Forge, Jason) (dlg).
June 2, 2015 86 MOTION to Compel by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support thereof, # 2 Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof, # 3 Exhibit 1-26 to the Forge Declaration)(Forge, Jason) (dlg).
May 30, 2015 85 Discovery Hearing set for 6/5/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 05/30/15.(mcb)
May 29, 2015 84 RESPONSE re 76 Objection, Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Objection to Magistrate Judge's May 13, 2015 Order filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nancy L. Stagg in Support)(Stagg, Nancy) (dlg).
May 27, 2015 83 Featured Case ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 76 : Plaintiff filed an objection to the magistrate judge's May 13, 2015 order. The Court set a hearing date of July 17, 2015, at 1:30 p.m. Defendant shall file his opposition on or by May 29, 2015. Any reply shall be due by June 3, 2015. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/27/15.(dlg)
May 22, 2015 82 Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel:Motion Hearing held on 5/22/2015. 61 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Class Notice and Directing Class Notice Procedures filed by Art Cohen, 77 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time [Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for Briefing and Hearing of (Dkt. No. 76) Objection to Magistrate Judge's May 13, 2015 Order] filed by Art Cohen ; Motions Submitted, the Court will prepare a written order. (Court Reporter Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Jason Forge, Rachel Jensen).(Defendant Attorney Nancy Stagg, Benjamin Morris). (no document attached) (lsf)
May 21, 2015 81 REPLY to Response to Motion re 77 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time [Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for Briefing and Hearing of (Dkt. No. 76) Objection to Magistrate Judge's May 13, 2015 Order] filed by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel J. Pfefferbaum in Support thereof, # 2 Exhibit A to Pfefferbaum Declaration)(Pfefferbaum, Daniel) (ag).
May 21, 2015 80 RESPONSE in Opposition re 77 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time [Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for Briefing and Hearing of (Dkt. No. 76) Objection to Magistrate Judge's May 13, 2015 Order] filed by Donald J. Trump. (Stagg, Nancy) (mdc)
May 20, 2015 79 NOTICE by Donald J. Trump of Intention to Oppose Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for Briefing and Hearing of Objection to Magistrate Judge's May 13, 2015 Order [Dkt No. 77] (Stagg, Nancy) (dlg).
May 20, 2015 78 NOTICE THE TIME CHANGE for Hearing on Motion 61 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Class Notice and Directing Class Notice Procedures : Court reschedules the Motion Hearing to 01:00 PM on 5/22/2015 in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. (no document attached) (lsf)
May 19, 2015 77 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time [Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for Briefing and Hearing of (Dkt. No. 76) Objection to Magistrate Judge's May 13, 2015 Order] by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof)(Forge, Jason) (dlg).
May 19, 2015 76 OBJECTION by Art Cohen re 73 Order [Plaintiff's Objection to Magistrate Judge's May 13, 2015 Order]. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof, # 2 Exhibit A to the Forge Declaration)(Forge, Jason) (dlg).
May 19, 2015 75 Featured Case ORDER Following Telephonic Discovery Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/19/15.(dlg)
May 14, 2015 74 Featured Case ORDER Granting 72 Joint Motion to Extend Fact Discovery Cut-Off Date by One Week to Complete Deposition of defendant Donald J. Trump: The fact discovery cut-off date will remain set at July 2, 2015, for all fact discovery, except for the completion of Defendant's deposition. Defendant's deposition shall be completed on or before July 9, 2015. No further extension requests will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/14/15. (dlg)
May 13, 2015 73 Discovery Order Ruling on Parties' Joint Statement for Determination of Discovery Dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/13/15.(dlg)
May 12, 2015 72 Joint MOTION to Extend Fact Discovery Cut-Off Date by One Week to Complete Deposition of Defendant Donald J. Trump by Donald J. Trump. (Stagg, Nancy) (dlg).
May 1, 2015 71 REPLY to Response to Motion re 61 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Class Notice and Directing Class Notice Procedures filed by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits and Exhibits A-D in Support thereof, # 2 Declaration of Cameron R. Azari, Esq. in Support thereof)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
May 1, 2015 70 PRO HAC APPROVED: Matthew R. Maron appearing for Defendant Donald J. Trump. (no document attached) (vam)
April 30, 2015 69 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-8033875.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Maron, Matthew)
April 17, 2015 68 RESPONSE in Opposition re 61 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Class Notice and Directing Class Notice Procedures filed by Donald J. Trump. (Stagg, Nancy) (dlg).
April 14, 2015 67 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Discovery Conference held on 4/14/2015(no document attached) (mcb)
April 1, 2015 66 PRO HAC APPROVED: Jeffrey L. Goldman appearing for Defendant Donald J. Trump (no document attached) (ag)
March 31, 2015 65 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Goldman, Jeffrey) (ag).
March 27, 2015 64 Featured Case ORDER On Parties' Joint Statement Regarding Deposition Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/27/15.(dlg)
March 26, 2015 63 Featured Case ORDER Following Telephonic Discovery Conference Regarding Dispute Over Scheduling Depositions: On or before March 27, 2015, at 12:00 p.m., the parties shall have met and conferred in good faith about the deposition schedule. On or before March 27, 2015, at 12:00 p.m., the parties shall inform the Court that they have either agreed upon a set global schedule for the depositions in this case, or that they have not reached an agreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/26/15.(dlg)
February 24, 2015 62 Featured Case ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 61 : The Court set a hearing date of May 22, 2015, at 1:30 p.m. Defendant shall file his opposition on or by April 17, 2015. Any reply shall be due by May 1, 2015. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/24/15.(dlg)
February 20, 2015 61 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Class Notice and Directing Class Notice Procedures by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support thereof, # 2 Declaration of Rachel L. Jensen in Support thereof, # 3 Exhibit 1-5 to Jensen Declaration)(Jensen, Rachel) (dlg).
February 9, 2015 60 Order Setting Combined Mandatory Settlement Conference: A Mandatory Settlement Conference shall be conducted on March 12, 2015, at 8:00 a.m., in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Gallo. Counsel shall submit settlement statements directly to chambers no later than March 5, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 2/9/15.(dlg)
February 2, 2015 59 Featured Case ORDER of USCA in USCA Case Number 14-80162. The court, in its discretion, denies the petition for permission to appeal the USDC's October 27, 2014 order granting class action certification. (akr)
November 20, 2014 58 Case Management Conference Order Regulating Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings: Case Management Conference held on 11/19/2014. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 7/30/2015 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/5/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2016 at 1:30 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 11/20/2014. (srm)
November 12, 2014 57 USCA Case Number 14-80162 for Petition for Permission to Appeal under 23(f) filed by Donald J. Trump. (akr)
November 7, 2014 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen E. Mueller on behalf of Art Cohen (Mueller, Maureen)Attorney Maureen E. Mueller added to party Art Cohen(pty:pla) (srm).
November 7, 2014 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Jacob Pfefferbaum on behalf of Art Cohen (Pfefferbaum, Daniel)Attorney Daniel Jacob Pfefferbaum added to party Art Cohen(pty:pla) (srm).
October 30, 2014 54 Featured Case ORDER Following Telephonic Discovery Conference; Setting Case Management Conference. Telephonic, Counsel Only Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2014 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/30/2014. (srm)
October 27, 2014 53 Featured Case ORDER Granting 39 Motion For Class Certification; Appointing Class Representative; and Appointing Class Counsel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/24/2014. (srm)
October 27, 2014 52 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motion Hearing) held on 9/26/2014, before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Chari L. Possell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 11/17/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/28/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/26/2015. (akr)
September 26, 2014 51 DECLARATION re 45 Response in Opposition to Motion, Supplemental Evidence in Support of Defendant's Opposition by Defendant Donald J. Trump. (Stagg, Nancy) (srm).
September 26, 2014 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: Motion Hearing held on 9/26/2014 re 39 MOTION to Certify Class , Appointment of Class Representative and Appointment of Class Counsel filed by Art Cohen, Motions Submitted. Court will prepare written order. (Court Reporter Chari Possell). (Plaintiff Attorney Jason A. Forge, Rachel Jensen, Amber Eck). (Defendant Attorney Nancy Stagg, Jill Martin, Benjamin Morris). (no document attached) (lsf)
September 22, 2014 49 Dft's Opposition to Motion for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representative, and Appointment of Class Counsel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, 3, 7-8, # 2 Exhibit 9-15, # 3 Exhibit 16-21, # 4 Exhibit 22, 24, # 5 Exhibit 27, 28, 34, 36, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 25, 26, # 8 Exhibit 33)(jah) Modified per 211 Order, on 5/27/2016 (rlu). Modified on to correct document description and Sealed Documents on 5/31/2016 (sjt).
September 22, 2014 48 Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representative and Appintment of Class Counsel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6, # 2 Exhibit 16, # 3 Exhibit 21, # 4 Exhibit 24, # 5 Exhibit 28, # 6 Exhibit 30, # 7 Exhibit 32, # 8 Exhibit 32, Part 2, # 9 Exhibit 33, 34a, 36, 37, 38, 40, 44, # 10 Exhibit 27), # 11 Exhibit 12, 14, 15), # 12 Exhibit 29, 30, (13) Exhibit 17, 18, 19, 20, # 14 Exhibit 12 (jah) Modified to unseal, per 211 Order on 5/27/2016 (rlu). Modified on to update documents on 5/31/2016 (sjt).
September 22, 2014 47 Featured Case ORDER granting 37 Motion to File Documents Under Seal; granting 43 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/22/2014. (jah)
August 1, 2014 46 REPLY to Response to Motion re 39 MOTION to Certify Class , Appointment of Class Representative and Appointment of Class Counsel [Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representative and Appointment of Class Counsel] filed by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof, # 2 Exhibit 45-49 to Forge Declaration)(Forge, Jason) (srm).
July 21, 2014 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re 39 MOTION to Certify Class , Appointment of Class Representative and Appointment of Class Counsel filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nancy L. Stagg in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1-30 ISO Stagg Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 31-40 ISO Stagg Declaration, # 4 Request for Judicial Notice in Support)(Stagg, Nancy) (srm).
July 21, 2014 44 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 9/22/2014] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 43 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Stagg, Nancy). (jah). (Main Document 44 replaced on 9/22/2014) (jah). Modified on 9/22/2014 - Added file date of lodgment (jah).
July 21, 2014 43 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Stagg, Nancy). (jah).
July 17, 2014 42 Featured Case ORDER Granting 40 Defendant's Ex Parte Motion to Enlarge Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification. The Court grants Defendant five (5) additional pages of briefing for his opposition to Plaintiff's motion for class certification, for a total opposition brief length of thirty (30) pages. Plaintiff shall have leave to file a fifteen (15) page brief in reply. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/17/2014. (srm)
July 14, 2014 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re 40 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages; to Extend Page Limit of Opposition to Class Certification Motion [Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Ex Parte Motion to Extend Page Limit of Opposition to Class Certification Motion] filed by Art Cohen. (Forge, Jason) (srm).
July 14, 2014 40 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Extend Page Limit of Opposition to Class Certification Motion by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Benjamin J. Morris in Support)(Morris, Benjamin)(srm).
June 16, 2014 39 MOTION to Certify Class , Appointment of Class Representative and Appointment of Class Counsel by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support thereof, # 2 Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof, # 3 Exhibit 1-17 [Redacted] to Forge Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 18 part 1 [Redacted] to Forge Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 18 [Redacted] Part 2 to Forge Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 19-44 [Redacted] to Forge Declaration, # 7 Appendix A - Class Cert Ex Equivalency Table)(Forge, Jason) (srm).
June 16, 2014 38 [FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 9/22/2014] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 37 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Forge, Jason) (sjt). (Main Document 38 replaced on 9/22/2014) (jah). Modified on 9/22/2014 - Added file date of lodgment (jah).
June 16, 2014 37 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Forge, Jason) (sjt).
June 16, 2014 36 Featured Case ORDER Granting 35 Joint Motion to Allow the Non-Electronic Filing of a Video as an Exhibit to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 06/16/2014. (ag)
June 13, 2014 35 Joint MOTION for Leave to File to Allow the Non-Electronic Filing of a Video as an Exhibit in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification by Art Cohen. (Forge, Jason) (srm).
May 23, 2014 34 Featured Case ORDER Following Telephonic Status Conference. Hearing hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification set for 9/26/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 5/23/2014. (srm)
May 23, 2014 33 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Telephonic Status Conference held on 5/23/2014(no document attached) (jmy)
May 12, 2014 32 Featured Case ORDER Granting 31 Substitution of Counsel on Behalf of Donald J. Trump. It is Ordered that Nancy L. Stagg and Benjamin J. Morris of Foley & Lardner LLP are hereby substituted as counsel of record in place and instead of Betty M. Shumener, John D. Spurling, and Staci M. Tomita. Jill A. Martin will remain as counsel of record for Donald J. Trump. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/12/2014. (srm)
April 29, 2014 31 NOTICE by Donald J. Trump re Substitution of Counsel and [Proposed] Consent Order (Shumener, Betty) Modified on 4/29/2014, QC Mailer sent re proposed orders (srm). Modified on 5/12/2014 (srm).
April 24, 2014 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin James Morris on behalf of Donald J. Trump (Morris, Benjamin)Attorney Benjamin James Morris added to party Donald J. Trump(pty:dft) (srm).
April 24, 2014 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Nancy L. Stagg on behalf of Donald J. Trump (Stagg, Nancy)Attorney Nancy L. Stagg added to party Donald J. Trump(pty:dft) (srm).
April 18, 2014 28 Featured Case ORDER Following Telephonic Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/18/2014. (mdc)
April 17, 2014 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/17/2014(no document attached) (jmy)
April 10, 2014 26 Order Following ENE. Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 4/10/2014. Telephonic Counsel Only Status Conference set for 5/23/2014 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 4/10/2014. (srm)
April 10, 2014 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 4/10/2014. Court to issue Order.(no document attached) (jmy)
March 28, 2014 24 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER for Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation Conference reset for 4/10/2014 at 7:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo, United States Courthouse, Courtroom 2A, Second Floor, 221 West Broadway, San Diego, California. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/28/2014. (srm)
March 14, 2014 23 Featured Case ORDER for Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation set for 4/10/2014 8:00 AM in Courtroom 2A before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/14/2014.(srm)
March 4, 2014 22 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Donald J. Trump.(Shumener, Betty)
February 21, 2014 21 Featured Case ORDER: (1) Denying 9 Motion to Dismiss; (2) Denying 10 Motion to Strike. Defendant's request for judicial notice, (Dkt. No. 18-1), is Denied. Defendant shall file an answer to the Complaint within 14 days. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/21/2014. (srm)
February 20, 2014 20 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel, Motions Submitted 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , 10 MOTION to Strike Portions of Complaint and the Court will prepare a written Order. Motion hearing 2/21/2014 is vacated.(no document attached) (lsf)
January 6, 2014 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re 10 MOTION to Strike Portions of Complaint filed by Donald J. Trump. (Shumener, Betty) (srm).
January 6, 2014 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Request for Judicial Notice, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Shumener, Betty)(srm).
December 20, 2013 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re 10 MOTION to Strike Portions of Complaint filed by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plainitff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Forge, Jason) (srm).
December 20, 2013 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason A. Forge in Support thereof, # 2 Exhibit 1 to the Forge Declaration)(Forge, Jason) (srm).
December 19, 2013 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill Ann Martin on behalf of Donald J. Trump (Martin, Jill)Attorney Jill Ann Martin added to party Donald J. Trump(pty:dft) (srm).
December 10, 2013 14 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *US D652,407,*, *8,455,758* cc:USPTO (kcm)
November 15, 2013 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel L Jensen on behalf of Art Cohen (Jensen, Rachel)Attorney Rachel L Jensen added to party Art Cohen(pty:pla) (ag).
November 15, 2013 11 NOTICE by Donald J. Trump of Errata Re Hearing Date of Motion to Strike Portions of Complaint and Motion to Dismiss (Shumener, Betty) (ag).
November 14, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER Resetting Hearing Date and Setting Briefing Schedule 9 and 10 . Due to an opening on the Court calendar, the Court hereby resets the hearing date to February 21, 2014 at 1:30 p.m. Plaintiffs shall file a response on or by December 20, 2013. Any reply shall be due by January 6, 2014. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/14/13.(dlg) (av1).
November 14, 2013 10 MOTION to Strike Portions of Complaint by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Shumener, Betty) (dlg).
November 14, 2013 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Shumener, Betty)Attorney Betty M Shumener added to party Donald J. Trump(pty:dft) (dlg).
November 5, 2013 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Art Cohen. Donald J. Trump served. (Forge, Jason) (srm).
October 22, 2013 7 Featured Case ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. The Case has been reassigned to Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo for all further proceedings. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks are no longer assigned to this case. Create association to 3:10-cv-00940-GPC-WVG. The new case number is 13-cv-02519-GPC-WVG. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/18/2013. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/21/2013.(aef)(jrd)
October 22, 2013 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron M. Olsen on behalf of Art Cohen (Olsen, Aaron)Attorney Aaron M. Olsen added to party Art Cohen(pty:pla) (srm).
October 22, 2013 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Amber Lee Eck on behalf of Art Cohen (Eck, Amber)Attorney Amber Lee Eck added to party Art Cohen(pty:pla) (srm).
October 18, 2013 4 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Art Cohen (Forge, Jason) (aef).
October 18, 2013 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Art Cohen of case(s) 3:10-cv-0940-GPC(WVG) . (Forge, Jason) Modified on 10/21/2013-Low number order prepared (aef).
October 18, 2013 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dls) (av1).
October 18, 2013 1 COMPLAINT against Donald J. Trump (filing fee $400 receipt number 0974-6411097), filed by Art Cohen. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Case Cover Sheet).The new case number is 3:13-cv-2519-DMS-RBB. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks are assigned to the case. (Forge, Jason)(dls) (av1).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohen v. Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Art Cohen
Represented By: Amber Lee Eck
Represented By: Jason A Forge
Represented By: Rachel L Jensen
Represented By: Aaron M. Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Represented By: Betty M Shumener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?