Paul v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: |
Marie Paul |
Defendant: |
United States of America and Jo Anne Barnhart |
Case Number: |
3:2013cv03128 |
Filed: |
December 20, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
San Diego |
Presiding Judge: |
Jan M. Adler |
Presiding Judge: |
Larry Alan Burns |
Nature of Suit: |
Social Security: RSI Tax Suits |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Account Receivable |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 17, 2015 |
Filing
23
ORDER granting 18 Motion to Dismiss. Paul's first and second claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE BUT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND, for lack of jurisdiction. Paul's third claim is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. All pending dates are VACATED and all pending motions and requests are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 7/16/15. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kas)
|
March 24, 2014 |
Filing
11
ORDER Screening Second Amended Complaint; Order Requiring Issuance of New Summons; and Order Directing U.S. Marshals Service. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/23/2014. (IFP packet prepared) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(knb)(jrd)
|
February 18, 2014 |
Filing
7
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Because the amended complaint is inadequate, it is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint no later than March 17, 2014. The amended complaint must be filed and entered in the docket by March 17, not m erely mailed. If the Plaintiff fails to amend within the time permitted, this action will be dismissed without leave to amend. The Clerk erroneously issued a summons in this case 6 . That summons is QUASHED and the Clerk is directed to remove it from the docket. Plaintiff is ORDERED not to serve it. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 2/17/14.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
|
January 14, 2014 |
Filing
3
ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint no later than the close of business on February 13, 2014. The amended complaint must be filed and entered in the docket by that time, not merely mailed. If the plaintiff fails to amend within the time permitted, this action will be dismissed without leave to amend. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 1/13/14. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?