Wert v. U.S. Bancorp et al
Plaintiff: |
Monica R. Wert |
Defendant: |
U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank National Association and Does 1-10, Inclusive |
Case Number: |
3:2013cv03130 |
Filed: |
December 20, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of California |
Office: |
San Diego Office |
County: |
San Diego |
Presiding Judge: |
John A. Houston |
Presiding Judge: |
Barbara Lynn Major |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Labor Litigation |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 7, 2017 |
Filing
106
ORDER overruling 97 the Objections of Lonnie Tiran; granting 96 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs; granting 98 Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 11/7/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc)
|
May 5, 2017 |
Filing
94
ORDER granting 86 Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Court conditionally certifies a class for settlement purposes only. Court appoints Monica Wert as Class Representative. Court appoints Matthew S. Dente and Diane E. Richard of Dente Richard LLP, George C. Aguilar and Brian Robbins of Robbins Arroyo LLP, and London D. Meservy of Merservy Law P.C., as Class Counsel to represent the Class. Court appoints Rust Consulting, Inc. as the Settlement Administrator. Court preliminarily approves the Settlement Agreement and the terms and conditions of Settlement, subject to further consideration at a Final Approval Hearing. Final Approval Hearing set for 9/25/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Cynthia Bashant. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 5/5/2017. (jah)
|
March 22, 2016 |
Filing
60
ORDER denying Defendants' 46 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 3/22/2016. (jah)
|
June 9, 2015 |
Filing
43
ORDER denying Plaintiff's 38 Motion for Reconsideration re 37 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order on Motion for Leave to File a Document; denying as moot Defendants' 39 Ex Parte Motion to Reinstate Motions to Dismiss ans Strike. Pla is given leave to file Second Amended Complaint by 6/16/2015. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 6/9/2015. (jah)
|
December 18, 2014 |
Filing
37
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 22 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Pla shall file Second Amended Complaint, revised in a manner consistent with this Order, by 1/8/2015. Dfts' 20 Motion to Dism iss for Failure to State a Claim and Strike is terminated as moot. If Pla fails to amend her complaint by the deadline, Dfts shall an ex parte application notifying Court of such failure and requesting to reinstate their motions to dismiss and strike by 1/15/2015. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 12/18/2014. (jah)
|
June 23, 2014 |
Filing
18
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 6 Motion to Dismiss. Court denies the motion as to Pla's fourth claim for violations of Labor Code 226(a) and grants the motion as to all of the remaining claims and dismisses those claims. Court grants Pla's request for for leave to amend, if Pla chooses to file an amended complaint as to any of the claims dismissed, she must do to by 7/14/2014. Court denies Dfts' motion to dismiss all claims against U.S. Bancorp, and strike all mentions of U.S. Bancorp in the complaint because Pla adequately alleges that both dfts employed her. Court denies Dfts' motion for a more definite statement as to any claims not dismissed by this Order under FRCP 12(e) because Dfts fail to provide adequate ground to justify granting such relief. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 6/23/2014. (jah)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?